Marcantel et al v. Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Marcantel and Amanda Marcantel
Defendant: Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Corporation Enterprise Products Operating, L.P., El Paso Field Services Management Inc, Tarpon Offshore, L.P., MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd., MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC, Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP, El Paso Company, El Paso Corporation and Enterprise Products Operating LP
Intervenor Plaintiff: American Interstate Insurance Company and L&L Sandblasting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2005cv00496
Filed: September 12, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Galveston Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel B Kent
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2006. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 6/29/06.( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(cmcbroom, )
June 13, 2006 Filing 34 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified Docket Call set for 7/6/2006 at 09:00 AM before Judge Samuel B Kent, filed. (cmcbroom, )
June 8, 2006 Filing 33 REPLY Regarding Intervenor's Notice of Dismissal, filed by American Interstate Insurance Company. (Elliott, John)
June 7, 2006 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #26 Opposed MOTION Leave to Designate a Responsible Third Party, filed by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Queenan, Michael)
June 1, 2006 Filing 31 NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: #26 Opposed MOTION Leave to Designate a Responsible Third Party by American Interstate Insurance Company, filed. (Elliott, John)
May 31, 2006 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #23 Notice of Dismissal of L&L Sandblasting, Inc., filed by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Queenan, Michael)
May 30, 2006 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by El Paso Company, EL Paso Corporation, Enterprise Products Operating LP, Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Field Services Management Inc, filed.(Watkins, James)
May 23, 2006 Filing 28 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by El Paso Company, EL Paso Corporation, Enterprise Products Operating LP, Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Field Services Management Inc, filed.(Watkins, James)
May 18, 2006 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER re: #26 Opposed MOTION Leave to Designate a Responsible Third Party, filed.(Watkins, James)
May 18, 2006 Filing 26 Opposed MOTION Leave to Designate a Responsible Third Party by El Paso Company, EL Paso Corporation, Enterprise Products Operating LP, Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Field Services Management Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2006. (Watkins, James)
May 11, 2006 Filing 25 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel, filed.(Queenan, Michael)
May 11, 2006 Filing 24 Amended INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against all parties filed by American Interstate Insurance Company.(Elliott, John)
May 11, 2006 Filing 23 NOTICE of Dismissal as to L&L Sandblasting, Inc. by L&L Sandblasting, Inc., filed. (Elliott, John)
April 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion For Partial Dismissal of dfts Tarpon Offshore, LP, MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd, MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC and Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP only, without prejudice .( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(ceaton, )
April 17, 2006 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Tarpon Offshore, L.P., MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd., MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC and Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2006. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' motion for partial dismissal)(Queenan, Michael)
March 9, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samuel B Kent. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2006 at request of counsel. Ruled as discussed with counsel. Appearances:Craig Eiland. Michael Kevin Queenan, James Richard Watkins., filed.(cmcbroom, )
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER approving Louis Selig as Mediator .( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(cmcbroom, )
January 20, 2006 Filing 19 Joint Submission of Agreed Mediator by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel, filed.(Queenan, Michael)
December 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf Expert Witness List due by 4/14/2006 Deft Expert Witness List due by 5/19/2006 Discovery due by 6/30/2006 Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2006 Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2006 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner Bench Trial set for 7/17/2006 at 08:30 AM before Judge Samuel B Kent.( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(cmcbroom, )
December 2, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samuel B Kent. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/2/2005. Non-Jury Trial set for 7/17/06. ETT 3 days. Docket Control Order to follow. Appearances:Craig Eiland. Michael Kevin Queenan, Charles L Stinneford, James Richard Watkins.(Court Reporter: J. Byers), filed.(cmcbroom, )
December 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Intervene .( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(cmcbroom, )
November 23, 2005 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel, filed.(Queenan, Michael)
November 22, 2005 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by L&L Sandblasting, Inc. and American Interstate Insurance Co., filed.(Elliott, John)
November 17, 2005 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by L&L Sandblasting, Inc. and American Interstate Insurance Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2005. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A)(Elliott, John)
November 8, 2005 Filing 13 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 12/2/2005 at 09:00 AM before Judge Samuel B Kent, filed. (cmcbroom, )
November 3, 2005 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by El Paso Company, EL Paso Corporation, Enterprise Products Operating LP, Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Corporation Enterprise Products Operating, L.P., El Paso Field Services Management Inc, filed.(Watkins, James)
November 3, 2005 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by El Paso Company, EL Paso Corporation, Enterprise Products Operating LP, Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Corporation Enterprise Products Operating, L.P., El Paso Field Services Management Inc, filed.(Watkins, James)
October 25, 2005 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tarpon Offshore, L.P. served on 10/4/2005, answer due 10/24/2005; MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd. served on 9/30/2005, answer due 10/20/2005; MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC served on 9/30/2005, answer due 10/20/2005; Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP served on 10/4/2005, answer due 10/24/2005; Enterprise Products Operating LP served on 10/4/2005, answer due 10/24/2005; Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC served on 10/4/2005, answer due 10/24/2005; High Island Offshore System, L.L.C. served on 10/4/2005, answer due 10/24/2005, filed.(Queenan, Michael)
October 18, 2005 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd., MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC, filed.(Stinneford, Charles)
October 18, 2005 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC, filed.(Stinneford, Charles)
October 18, 2005 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd., filed.(Stinneford, Charles)
October 17, 2005 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tarpon Offshore, L.P., Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP, filed.(gfrancis, )
October 17, 2005 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Tarpon Offshore, L.P., Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP, filed.(gfrancis, )
September 27, 2005 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel, filed.(Queenan, Michael)
September 14, 2005 Summons Issued as to EL Paso Corporation, Enterprise Products Operating LP , filed.(ceaton, )
September 14, 2005 Summons Issued as to Tarpon Offshore, L.P., MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd., MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC, Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP, El Paso Company, Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC, El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C., High Island Offshore System, L.L.C., El Paso Field Services II LP, El Paso Field Services Management Inc , filed.(ltrevino, )
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: Computer Codes Printed on Proposed Orders .( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(ceaton, )
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2005 at 09:40 AM before Judge Samuel B Kent.( Signed by Judge Samuel B Kent ) Parties notified.(ceaton, )
September 13, 2005 Filing fee re: #1 Complaint: $ 250.00, receipt number 319497 . (gfrancis, )
September 12, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 250) filed by Michael Marcantel, Amanda Marcantel.(Queenan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcantel et al v. Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marcantel
Represented By: Michael Kevin Queenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Marcantel
Represented By: Michael Kevin Queenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: American Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John C Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: L&L Sandblasting, Inc.
Represented By: John C Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise GTM Offshore Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Energy Partners Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Island Offshore System, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Field Services II LP
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Corporation Enterprise Products Operating, L.P.
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Field Services Management Inc
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarpon Offshore, L.P.
Represented By: W Ross Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCX Exploration (USA), Ltd.
Represented By: Charles L Stinneford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCX Gulf of Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Charles L Stinneford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarpon Offshore Ventures, LP
Represented By: W Ross Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Company
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Corporation
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Products Operating LP
Represented By: James Richard Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?