In Re: Maersk Tankers
Plaintiff: In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Maersk Tankers, as Owner and Operator of the M/T Carla Maersk, for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Case Number: 3:2015cv00106
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Galveston Office
County: Galveston
Presiding Judge: George C. Hanks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 295 Report and Recommendations GRANTING 268 MOTION for Summary Judgment; The Claimant/Counter-Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 268] is GRANTED and DENIED as follows: Conti's count erclaim against Evans for negligence is dismissed with prejudice and without exemption of any liability of the Maersk parties to the extent, if any, that the claim is in excess of $1,000.00 Conti's counterclaim is subject to a $1,000. 00 limitation pursuant to Rule 66.083 of the Texas Transportation Code. The Claimant/Counter-Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt 268) is DENIED as follows: Evans shall not be dismissed from the case based upon his offer to deposit $1,000.00 in the Court's registry. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER ADOPTING 297 MAGISTRATE'S AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 269 MOTION for Judgment (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 302 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss , Mac Metal Sales PA, Inc. terminated(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 192 Report and Recommendations, 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Economic Damage Claimants (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr). The Motion for Summary Judgment as to claimants Mac Metal, Travelers, and Catlin is DENIED; and The Motion for Summary Judgment as to Magellan is GRANTED. Parties notified.(lusmith, 3)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 217 Report and Recommendations, It is hereby ORDERED that the counter-claims against Houston Pilots (Dkts. 147, 166) are hereby DISMISSED. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 197 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief as to Claimants Gordon Estergren, Sandy Westergren, Michael Donelson, Richard Helmle, Carole Helmle, Chris Miller, Kimberly Miller, Peter Sundt and Brian Johnson (hereinafter collectively referred to as the Mostyn Claimants) as set forth in Order. Any further relief requested is DENIED..(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying 177 Motion to Extend the Claim Filing Deadline an Additional 45 Days.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Maersk Tankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Maersk Tankers, as Owner and Operator of the M/T Carla Maersk, for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Represented By: William A Durham
Represented By: Robert L Klawetter
Represented By: Christina K Schovajsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?