Ruth F. Mortenson et al v. The Boeing Company

Plaintiff: PROVOST UMPHREY LAW FIRM, L.L.P., ATTORNEY James Furman, Margo Bishop, Ruth F. Mortenson and Kami M. Lowe
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00225
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Galveston Office
County: Galveston
Presiding Judge: Andrew M Edison
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 23 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT entered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 26, 2018 22 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 21, 2018 21 FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Case terminated on 9/21/2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 20, 2018 20 MOTION for Entry of Judgment by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Hicks, Pamela)
September 17, 2018 MOTREF flag cleared.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
September 17, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER TO TRANSFER RE CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by All Parties (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
September 17, 2018 18 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 17, 2018 17 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 14, 2018 16 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by The Boeing Company, filed.(Hicks, Pamela)
September 14, 2018 15 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge for the Guardians Ad Litem, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 14, 2018 14 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Margo Bishop, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 12, 2018 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Settlement Conference held on September 11, 2018. The Court heard testimony in regards to the proposed settlement agreement. Judge Edison indicated that he believes the settlement is fair, and in the best interests of the children. The parties will submit a proposed Agreed Final Judgment. The Ad litem fees are taken under advisement. Appearances: David Wilson for the plaintiff Margo Bishop, Nicole Perdue ad litem, and Patrick Bell; James Furman for the plaintiff Ruth Mortenson, George Fleming ad litem and; James Furman for the plaintiff Kami Lowe, Greg Brown ad litem, Paul Krystynik, and Pam Hicks and Michael Scoville for the defendant Boeing. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 4, 2018 13 Unopposed AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Boeing Company filed by Kami M. Lowe. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Furman, James)
August 29, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting #10 Motion for Michael E Scoville to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kami M. Lowe, filed.(Furman, James)
August 27, 2018 10 MOTION for Michael E. Scoville to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2018. (Hicks, Pamela) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Continuation) (SusanGram, 3).
August 16, 2018 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Attachment)(Wilson, David)
August 16, 2018 8 NOTICE of Setting as to #4 MOTION for Hearing. Parties notified. Settlement Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in the 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
August 16, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 15, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Guardians Ad Litem. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
August 14, 2018 5 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #3 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Guardians Ad Litem, #4 MOTION for Hearing,, filed. (jegonzalez, 3)
August 13, 2018 4 LETTER OF AGREEMENT re: Request for Settlement Hearing by Margo Bishop, filed.(Wilson, David) . Modified on 8/16/2018 (wbostic, 4).
August 13, 2018 3 Joint MOTION for Appointment of Guardians Ad Litem by Margo Bishop, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilson, David)
August 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to The Boeing Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
August 10, 2018 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Boeing Company, filed.(Wilson, David)
August 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The Boeing Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20639361) filed by PROVOST UMPHREY LAW FIRM, L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth F. Mortenson et al v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVOST UMPHREY LAW FIRM, L.L.P.
Represented By: David P Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATTORNEY James Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Bishop
Represented By: David P Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth F. Mortenson
Represented By: James Housley Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kami M. Lowe
Represented By: James Housley Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Michael Edward Scoville
Represented By: Pamela Clark Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?