Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation v. T/B B. No. 285 et al
Plaintiff: Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation
Defendant: T/B B. No. 285, B. No. 285 Corporation and Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00227
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Galveston Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NOTICE. Case DISMISSED with prejudice. FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 8/31/2018 (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Neil, William)
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to T/B B. No. 285 (USCG#923249) on 8/13/2018 re: Release of Vessel from Seizure, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of Service Executed as to T/B No. 285 on 8/13/18 re: Release of Vessel from Seizure, filed.(dperez, 3)
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN of Service Executed as to TBB No 285 USCG#923249 on 8/10/18 re: Service/Summons, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of Service Executed as to TBB No 285 USCG#923249 on 8/11/18 re: Order Appointing Substitute Custodian, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of Service Executed as to TBB No 285 USCG#92349 on 8/10/18 re: Rule C Maritime Arrest, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 Consent to Release of Vessel by Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation, filed.(O'Neil, William)
August 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian and for shifting of vessel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
August 11, 2018 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order)(O'Neil, William)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 WARRANT To Seize A Vessel issued (SusanGram, 3)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ To Seize A Vessel.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/10/2018) (SusanGram, 3).
August 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to T/B B. No. 285. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(agould, 3)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting as to #2 MOTION for Writ of Seizure of Vessel. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2018 at 03:15 PM Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (kpicota, 4)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKETED IN ERROR (NO IMAGE ATTACHED) NOTICE of Setting as to #2 MOTION for Writ of Seizure of Vessel. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2018 at 03:15 PM Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (kpicota, 4) Modified on 8/10/2018 (kpicota, 4).
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to T/B B. No. 285, filed.(O'Neil, William)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Seizure of Vessel by Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Warrant to Seize Vessel)(O'Neil, William)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20640096) filed by Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Neil, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation v. T/B B. No. 285 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T/B B. No. 285
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. No. 285 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: William Sean O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?