Martinez v. Crowley Maritime Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Johan Martinez
Defendant: Crowley Maritime Corp., Intrepid Ship Management, Inc. and Vessel Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00304
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. Telephonic PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 11/28/2018. Defendant to file its motion to dismiss by Friday, December 7, 2018, at 5:00 PM. Plaintiffs response is due 21 days after motion is filed. Defendants reply, if necessary, is 7 days after the response is filed. Parties to work together regarding preliminary discovery, as stated on the record. Appearances:Alton Hall. Christopher L Evans, Paul R Miller.(Digital # 2:37PM - 2:49PM)(ERO:Andy Gould), filed.(agould, 3)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Johan Martinez.(Miller, Paul)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting as to #4 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Motion Conference Request, #5 Response in Opposition to Motion. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/28/2018 at 02:15 PM in by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Motion Conference Request, filed by Johan Martinez. (Miller, Paul)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Motion Conference Request by Crowley Maritime Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2018. (Evans, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Summons Issued as to Crowley Maritime Corp., Intrepid Ship Management, Inc., Vessel Management Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Miller, Paul)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkersonadi, 3)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johan Martinez filed by Johan Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Crowley Maritime Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Maritime Corp.
Represented By: Christopher L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid Ship Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vessel Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johan Martinez
Represented By: Paul R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?