Jack v. Tejani et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Jack
Defendant: Irfan M Tejani and Mulberry Oil, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00380
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mulberry Oil, LLC, Irfan M Tejani, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parzivand, Hessam)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
November 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to Mulberry Oil, LLC, Irfan M Tejani. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Woodson, Clark)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21253927) filed by Jennifer Jack.(Woodson, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack v. Tejani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irfan M Tejani
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulberry Oil, LLC
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jack
Represented By: Clark Woodson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?