MOVE Texas Civic Fund et al v. Whitley et al
Plaintiff: Texas State Conference of NAACP Units, JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund and Nivien Saleh
Defendant: Kirsten Spies, David Whitley, Terri Hefner, Keith Ingram, Beth Rothermel, Pamela Ohlendorf, Cheryl Johnson, Janet Torres, Karen Nelson and Elections Administrator for Harrison County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 56 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Chiraag Bains as to JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh re: #24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (amireles, 2)
March 12, 2019 Filing 55 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jon M Greenbaum re: #36 Notice of Setting, filed. (ckrus, 4)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Mimi Marziani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Jennifer Nwachukwu to Appear Pro Hac Vice(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
February 22, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. At the hearing, the following rulings were made as stated on the record: 1. Telephonic status conference held. 2. All counsel agree to this case being transferred to Judge Biery in the Western District. Court will enter an Order.Appearances: Rebecca Stevens,Andre Segura, Patrick Sweeten,Todd Disher, Haley O'Neill Patrick K Sweeten, Andre Ivan Segura, Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy, Brian Klosterboer, Rebecca Elizabeth Stevens, Joaquin Gonzalez, Brenda Wright, Sophia Lin Lakin, Robert Barron Boemer, Barry C Willey.(Digital # 4:22pm - 4:27pm)(ERO:Dana Perez), filed.(ltrevino, 3)
February 22, 2019 Filing 49 RECEIPT of Transfer Letter re: transfer of case to USDC Western District of Texas. New Case # assigned: 5:19cv171 and received on 2/22/2019., filed. (mmapps, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. At the hearing, the following rulings were made as stated on the record:1. Pre-motion conference held regarding Defendants Texas Secretary of State David Whitley and Texas Director of Elections Keith Ingrams request for pre-motion conference. (Dkt #35 )2. Defendants request to transfer case to Judge Biery in the Western District TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT.Appearances:Todd Disher, Philip Barr Arnold, Patrick K Sweeten, Andre Ivan Segura, Jennifer Nwachukwu, Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy, Brian Klosterboer, Rebecca Elizabeth Stevens, Joaquin Gonzalez, Brenda Wright, Ezra D Rosenberg, Sophia Lin Lakin, Robert Barron Boemer, Barry C Willey.(Digital # 9:15am - 9:41am)(ERO:Dana Perez), filed.(ltrevino, 3)
February 21, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 2/21/19, filed. (dperez, 3)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
February 21, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 04:15 PM (Central Time Zone) by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
February 21, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher, Michael C. Toth, Rola Daaboul, Christopher D. Hilton, Haley O'Neill on behalf of Keith Ingram, David Whitley, filed. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #39 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
February 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Status Update Regarding Possible Transfer re: #36 Notice of Setting by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. (Segura, Andre)
February 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Status of Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Keith Ingram, David Whitley, filed. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 20, 2019 Filing 43 SUPPLEMENT to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, filed.(Wright, Brenda)
February 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Eric Magee and Philip Arnold on behalf of Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Terri Hefner, Karen Nelson, Pamela Ohlendorf, Beth Rothermel, Kirsten Spies, Janet Torres, filed. (Arnold, Philip)
February 20, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Letter Regarding Possible Transfer re: #36 Notice of Setting by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. (Segura, Andre)
February 19, 2019 Filing 40 Second SUPPLEMENT to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 19, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Joaquin Robert Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MOVE Texas Civic Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Rebecca)
February 19, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Mimi Marziani to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MOVE Texas Civic Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2019. (Stevens, Rebecca)
February 14, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to State Defendants' Notice Dkt. No. 35, filed by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh. (Segura, Andre)
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Setting as to #35 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 3)
February 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Keith Ingram, David Whitley, filed. (Sweeten, Patrick) .
February 13, 2019 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENT to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan V. Cox, #2 Affidavit of Rachel Dosch)(Segura, Andre)
February 13, 2019 Filing 33 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Pamela Ohlendorf served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 13, 2019 Filing 32 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Karen Nelson served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 13, 2019 Filing 31 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Beth Rothermel served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Jennifer Nwachukwu to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2019. (Segura, Andre) (Attachment #1 Order PHV) (SusanGram, 3).
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cheryl Johnson served on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019, filed.(Boemer, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT B. BOEMER, BARRY C. WILLEY on behalf of Cheryl Johnson, filed. (Boemer, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Ingram, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 12, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Keith Ingram, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Letter re: Notice to Defendants of Court's Scheduling Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. (Segura, Andre)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Brendan Downes to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Ezra Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Dale E. Ho to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Sophia Lin Lakin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Whitley served on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Keith Ingram served on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Sophia Lakin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Dale Ho to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Ezra Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Brendan Downes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Nivien Saleh, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Sixth Floor Courtroom before Judge George C Hanks Jr(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Brenda Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Chiraag Bains to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Stuart Naifeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
February 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Karen Nelson, Janet Torres. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Clay, #2 Affidavit Hilliard Drew Galloway, #3 Affidavit Grace Chimene, #4 Affidavit Nivien Saleh, #5 Affidavit Dr. Daniel Smith, #6 Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT regarding request for expedited schedule by League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, filed.(Segura, Andre)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Elections Administrator for Harrison County, Karen Nelson, Janet Torres, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment)(Segura, Andre)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, JOLT Initiative, MOVE Texas Civic Fund.(Segura, Andre)
February 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Terri Hefner, Keith Ingram, Cheryl Johnson, Pamela Ohlendorf, Beth Rothermel, Kirsten Spies, David Whitley. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Cases by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Units, filed. (Segura, Andre)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Stuart Naifeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Units, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Chiragg Bains to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Units, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Brenda Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOLT Initiative, League of Women Voters of Texas, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Units, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2019. (Segura, Andre)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment, #2 Unredacted attachment, #3 Unredacted attachment, #4 Unredacted attachment, #5 Unredacted attachment, #6 Unredacted attachment)(Segura, Andre)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21786534) filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, JOLT Initiative, MOVE Texas Civic Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Units. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Segura, Andre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOVE Texas Civic Fund et al v. Whitley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas State Conference of NAACP Units
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOLT Initiative
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Jon M Greenbaum
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Stevens
Represented By: Mimi Marziani
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Joaquin Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Texas
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Jon M Greenbaum
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Stevens
Represented By: Mimi Marziani
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Joaquin Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOVE Texas Civic Fund
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Jon M Greenbaum
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Stevens
Represented By: Mimi Marziani
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Joaquin Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nivien Saleh
Represented By: Jennifer Nwachukwu
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Jon M Greenbaum
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Brendan Downes
Represented By: Stuart Naifeh
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Mimi Marziani
Represented By: Brian Klosterboer
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Stevens
Represented By: Joaquin Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Spies
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Whitley
Represented By: Patrick K Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Hefner
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ingram
Represented By: Patrick K Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Rothermel
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Ohlendorf
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Johnson
Represented By: Barry C Willey
Represented By: Robert Barron Boemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Torres
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Nelson
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elections Administrator for Harrison County
Represented By: Philip Barr Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?