Hall v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Gala Anne Young, Kenneth Edward Young and Jolene Young Hall
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00050
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Paul Skrabanek terminated.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for M. Paul Skrabanek to Withdraw as Attorney by Jolene Young Hall, Gala Anne Young, Kenneth Edward Young, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ford Motor Company, filed.(Bullion, Deborah)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jolene Young Hall, Gala Anne Young, Kenneth Edward Young, filed.(Skrabanek, Matthew)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21818221) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Bullion, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gala Anne Young
Represented By: Matthew Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Edward Young
Represented By: Matthew Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Young Hall
Represented By: Matthew Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Deborah Jean Bullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?