Bowman v. Prida Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dana Bowman
Defendant: Waterfront Housing, LLC and Prida Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00066
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Waterfront Housing, LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019, filed.(Calhoun, Eric)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Prida Construction, Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019, filed.(Calhoun, Eric)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Prida Construction, Inc., Waterfront Housing, LLC, filed.(Soto, Andres)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prida Construction, Inc., Waterfront Housing, LLC, filed.(Soto, Andres)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dana Bowman, filed.(Calhoun, Eric)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
February 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Prida Construction, Inc., Waterfront Housing, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Calhoun, Eric)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21876449) filed by Dana Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calhoun, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Prida Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Housing, LLC
Represented By: Andres Omar Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prida Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Andres Omar Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Bowman
Represented By: Eric Graham Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?