Winfred Fields et al

Appellant: Winfred Fields and Fields Enterprises
Appellee: Apollo Companies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00165
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE of Appeal Deficiencies re: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court,. Parties notified., filed. Renoticed on 6/14/2019. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicholas A. Milazzo, counsel for Apollo Companies Inc., Apollo Companies Inc., filed. **Address Updated**(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 5/22/2019, Apollo Companies, Inc filed a notice of CROSS-APPEAL. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge George Hanks, Civil Action 19-165. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Cross Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 5/13/2019, Winfred Fields and Fields Enterprises filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge George Hanks, Civil Action 19-165. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winfred Fields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Winfred Fields
Represented By: Marcellous Scott McZeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fields Enterprises
Represented By: Marcellous Scott McZeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Apollo Companies Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Milazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?