Archuleta v. Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leidy Archuleta and Leidy Tatiana Carvajal Archuleta
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Atlas Air, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00170
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Mary Schiavo to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Hicks, Pamela)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Atlas Air, Inc., filed.(Hicks, Pamela)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., filed.(Hicks, Pamela)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Mary Schiavo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leidy Tatiana Carvajal Archuleta, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2019. (Rhine, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Andrew Harakas to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Leidy Tatiana Carvajal Archuleta.(Rhine, Eric)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Atlas Air, Inc., filed.(Hicks, Pamela)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. 7/12/2019.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Andrew J. Harakas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., filed. (Hicks, Pamela)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer and Response by Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Pamela)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(Rhine, Eric)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22462792) filed by Leidy Archuleta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rhine, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archuleta v. Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Clark Hicks
Represented By: Andrew J Harakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Clark Hicks
Represented By: Andrew J Harakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Clark Hicks
Represented By: Andrew J Harakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Air, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Clark Hicks
Represented By: Andrew J Harakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leidy Archuleta
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leidy Tatiana Carvajal Archuleta
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Represented By: Mary F. Schiavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?