Boone v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Bradley Thomas Boone
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00175
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of Civil Complaint Executed as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR IFP GRANTED***CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (klove, 4) Modified on 6/11/2019 (agould, 3).
May 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, filed. 2 copies of summons along with 2 copies of Complaint, Order Granting IFP, and USM 285 hand delivered to USM-Galveston Division. (agould, 3)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Bradley Thomas Boone. Application to proceed IFP Granted by Judge George C Hanks, Jr on 5/23/2019. (agould, 3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #1 Unredacted attachment) (agould, 3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Thomas Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?