Cola et al v. Railserve, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Darren Cola, Katie Marie Cola, Jonathan Cola, Ellen Luton, John Tobin Cola and Cody Cola
Defendant: BWI Eagle, Inc., Leovardo Garcia Mata and Railserve, Inc.
Counter Plaintiff: The Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00199
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to #14 MOTION to Remand, filed by BWI Eagle, Inc., Railserve, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brem, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Resetting as to #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #5 Request for Pre-Motion Conference, #12 Response, #13 Response, #11 Response. The court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for file motion to remand. Motion due by 7/26/2019.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Cody Cola, Darren Cola, Jonathan Cola, Katie Marie Cola, Ellen Luton, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Unsworn Declration of KDPM, #2 Correspondence to Court)(Burrow, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's letter of July 2, 2019, filed by Railserve, Inc.. (Neuer, Raymond)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's letter of July 2, 2019, filed by BWI Eagle, Inc.. (Quinn, Wade)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Document Plaintiffs' Correspondence to Court Regarding Remand, filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Brem, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Document ( Responses due by 7/10/2019.)(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Dow Chemical Company, filed.(Brem, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Railserve, Inc., filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BWI Eagle, Inc., filed.(Quinn, Wade)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Response by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brem, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiffs' Correspondence to Court Regarding Remand by Cody Cola, Darren Cola, Jonathan Cola, Katie Marie Cola, Ellen Luton, filed.(Burrow, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Katie Marie Cola, Ellen Luton, filed.(Wilkins, Greg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cody Cola, Darren Cola, Jonathan Cola, Katie Marie Cola, Katie Marie Cola, Ellen Luton, Ellen Luton, filed.(Burrow, Justin)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 149th District Court of Brazoria County, Texas, case number 98403-CV (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22626709) filed by BWI Eagle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Documents Filed With Removal Action, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket & Filings, #4 Exhibit List of Parties, Attorneys and Court from Which Case is Being Removed, #5 Exhibit Defendant The Dow Chemical Company's Notice of Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit Defendant Railserve, Inc.'s Notice of Consent to Removal)(Quinn, Wade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cola et al v. Railserve, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Cola
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Justin David Burrow
Represented By: Fernando Francisco Valdes
Represented By: Eric T Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Marie Cola
Represented By: Greg C Wilkins
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Justin David Burrow
Represented By: Fernando Francisco Valdes
Represented By: Eric T Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cola
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Justin David Burrow
Represented By: Fernando Francisco Valdes
Represented By: Eric T Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Luton
Represented By: Greg C Wilkins
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Justin David Burrow
Represented By: Fernando Francisco Valdes
Represented By: Eric T Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tobin Cola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Cola
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Justin David Burrow
Represented By: Fernando Francisco Valdes
Represented By: Eric T Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Wade Rogers Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leovardo Garcia Mata
Represented By: Raymond A Neuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railserve, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond A Neuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Randy Edward Moore
Represented By: Michael Lamar Brem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?