McCullough v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Aquilla McCullough
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00230
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aquilla McCullough, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on Defendant)(Sedita, Frank)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc, filed.(Ramirez, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc, filed.(Ramirez, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd District Court, Magatorda County, Texas, case number 19-H-0355 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22774169) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquilla McCullough
Represented By: Adam Ramji
Represented By: Frank Allan Sedita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Represented By: Kaitlyn Ann King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?