Valdez v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts
Plaintiff: Roland S. Valdez
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts
Case Number: 3:2019cv00235
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts served on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019, filed.(Golub, Andrew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Knettel on behalf of O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts, filed. (Knettel, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Stuhldreher on behalf of O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts, filed. (Stuhldreher, Peter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Roland S. Valdez, filed.(Golub, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22818043) filed by Roland S. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golub, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland S. Valdez
Represented By: Andrew S Golub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts
Represented By: Peter Justin Stuhldreher
Represented By: Paul M. Knettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?