Lalla v. G & H Towing
Plaintiff: Curtis Lalla
Defendant: G & H Towing Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00244
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Curtis Lalla, filed.(Melton, John)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ETT: 3 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2019 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 2/21/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 2/21/2020. Deft Expert Witness List due by 4/3/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 4/3/2020. Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/12/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/10/2020. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 9/25/2020. Docket Call set for 10/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Case is subject to being called to trial on short notice during Oct/Nov 2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
November 13, 2019 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on November 13, 2019. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances: Christie M. Alcala and Michael Balcezak. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Michael Balcezak to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by G & H Towing Company, filed.(Alcala, Christie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Michael Balcezak to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Curtis Lalla, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2019. (Melton, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOhn F. Melton/The Melton Law Firm, PLLC, counsel for Curtis Lalla, filed. (Melton, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Curtis Lalla, filed.(Melton, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie M. Alcala on behalf of G & H Towing Company, filed. (Alcala, Christie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by G & H Towing Company, filed.(Porterfield, Tara)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by G & H Towing Company, filed.(Porterfield, Tara)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to G & H Towing Company served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019, filed.(Melton, John)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 5:19-cv-00542; received electronically.
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SD/TX, GALVESTON DIVISION. ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #4 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr) Modified on 7/26/2019, to edit text (mgr).
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by G & H Towing Company, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant G & H Towing Company (Porterfield, Tara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Curtis Lalla, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant G & H Towing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Melton, John)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by G & H Towing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steven Huttman, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Elaine Lauzon, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Porterfield, Tara)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to G & H Towing Company. (mgr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Curtis Lalla. (Melton, John)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12132601). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Curtis Lalla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lalla v. G & H Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & H Towing Company
Represented By: Tara Porterfield
Represented By: Christie M. Alcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lalla
Represented By: Michael Balcezak
Represented By: John F Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?