Trice et al v. Pearland Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: Dante Trice and Angela Washington
Defendant: Tony Barcelona, Pearland Independent School District, Helen Day and Jeannette Peterson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00286
Filed: August 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Andrew M Edison
2 Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs have until October 15, 2019 to amend the complaint. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Dante Trice, Angela Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kallinen, Randall)
October 13, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time amend complaint by one dayMotions referred to Andrew M Edison. by Dante Trice, Angela Washington, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kallinen, Randall)
September 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. Pre-Motion Conference held on [Dkt. 7], Dkt. 8], [Dkt. 9], and [Dkt. 10] Requests for pre-motion conferences. Plaintiff will file an Amended Complaint by October 11, 2019. Defendants can file motions to dismiss by November 1, 2019. Plaintiff will file responses to the motions to dismiss by November 22, 2019. Defendants may file replies in support of their motions to dismiss by December 6, 2019. Appearances: Randall Kallinen for the plaintiff, Christopher Gilbert for defendant Pearland ISD, Jamie Houston for defendant Tony Barcelona, and Michael Morris for defendants Helen Day and Jeannette Peterson. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L. Houston on behalf of Tony Barcelona, filed. (Houston, Jamie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Setting as to #7 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #10 REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #1 Complaint, #9 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #8 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Gilbert, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Morris, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Morris, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Grover, Clay)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Pearland Independent School District. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Pearland Independent School District, filed.(Kallinen, Randall)
August 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Tony Barcelona, Helen Day, Jeannette Peterson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 19, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Pearland Independent School District due to these deficiencies: Party named on summons is not a named defendant on the case. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Barcelona, #2 Exhibit Summons Day, #3 Exhibit Summons Peterson)(Kallinen, Randall)
August 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23000234) filed by Dante Trice, Angela Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kallinen, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trice et al v. Pearland Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Trice
Represented By: Randall Lee Kallinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Washington
Represented By: Randall Lee Kallinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Barcelona
Represented By: Clay T Grover
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearland Independent School District
Represented By: Christopher B Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Day
Represented By: Michael Patrick Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Peterson
Represented By: Michael Patrick Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?