Ramos v. Nissan Motor CO., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Angel Ruby Ramos
Defendant: Nissan Motor CO., LTD. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00287
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose M. Luzarraga on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc., filed. (Davis, Gary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Davis, Gary)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc., filed.(Davis, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Milasincic on behalf of Angel Ruby Ramos, filed. (Ammons, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angel Ruby Ramos, filed.(Ammons, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Nissan Motor CO., LTD., Nissan North America, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nissan North America, Inc., filed.(Ammons, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nissan Motor CO., LTD., filed.(Ammons, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23010463) filed by Angel Ruby Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ammons, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Nissan Motor CO., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Ruby Ramos
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Adam A Milasincic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Gary W Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?