Beatty v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Carl F. Beatty
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00308
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Carl F. Beatty, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Vilt, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Valerie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED PETITION against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Carl F. Beatty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vilt, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Henderson, Valerie)
September 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. Pre-Motion Conference held on September 20, 2019 as to [Dkt. 3] Request for pre-motion conference. The Court made the following rulings: Plaintiff will be allowed to file an Amended Complaint by Friday, October 18, 2019. Defendant can file a motion to dismiss without the need to file a pre-motion request by Friday, November 1, 2019. Plaintiff will file a response to the motion to dismiss by Friday, November 22, 2019. Defendant can file a reply if it desires by Wednesday, December 11, 2019. Appearances: Robert Vilt for the plaintiff and Valerie Henderson for the defendant. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting as to #3 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #3 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Henderson, Valerie)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
September 11, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 0541-23157328, filed. (knguyen, 4)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 212th Judicial District Court, Galveston County, Texas, case number 19-CV-1489 () filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit C-2, #7 Exhibit C-3, #8 Exhibit C-4, #9 Exhibit C-5, #10 Exhibit C-6, #11 Exhibit C-7, #12 Exhibit C-8, #13 Exhibit C-9, #14 Exhibit C-10, #15 Exhibit C-11, #16 Exhibit C-12, #17 Exhibit D)(Henderson, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Valerie Anne Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl F. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?