Hensley v. Arlan's Market
Plaintiff: Laura Hensley and Lauretta Hensley
Defendant: Arlan's Market and Bexar County Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00311
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bexar County Markets, Inc., filed.(Alaniz, Laura)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bexar County Markets, Inc., filed.(Alaniz, Laura)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lauretta Hensley, filed.(Woodson, Clark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bexar County Markets, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Woodson, Clark)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR-See DE #3 for Corrective Entry*** ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23171322) filed by Laura Hensley.(Woodson, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Arlan's Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauretta Hensley
Represented By: Clark Woodson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlan's Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?