Been v. Davis
Petitioner: Johnathan Pierce Been
Respondent: Edward Marshall and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00314
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 RECEIPT of Transfer received via email notification re: transfer of case to Western District of Texas. New Case # assigned: 5:19-cv-01176 and received on 09/30/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Interdistrict transfer to USDC Western District, San Antonio Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 9/30/19, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Johnathan Pierce Been, filed. (Attachment(s): #1 Authorization) (JessicaVillarreal, 3).
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Johnathan Pierce Been, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Johnathan Pierce Been. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Been v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edward Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnathan Pierce Been
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?