JP Morgan Chase Bank N A et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank N A and Craig T. Rawley
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00341
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Craig T. Rawley, filed.(Evans, Randall)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Sucec on behalf of Craig T. Rawley, filed. (Sucec, David)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall E. Evans on behalf of Craig T. Rawley, filed. (Evans, Randall)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for David A. Sucec to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Randall E. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for David A. Sucec to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig T. Rawley, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Randall E. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig T. Rawley, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Gilbert on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. (Gilbert, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gavioli, Laura)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed.(Gavioli, Laura)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L. Gavioli on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. (Gavioli, Laura)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Nicole K. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for David A. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Nicole Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Turner, Calli)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for David A. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Turner, Calli)
October 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, Internal Revenue Service. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet - Corrected re: #1 Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. (Turner, Calli)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. (Turner, Calli)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, IRS, Attorney General of the United States, US Attorney, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Turner, Calli)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23361807) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A.(Turner, Calli)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP Morgan Chase Bank N A et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank N A
Represented By: Calli Anne Turner
Represented By: David A Baker
Represented By: Laura L Gavioli
Represented By: Nicole K Mann
Represented By: John Ralph Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig T. Rawley
Represented By: David A Sucec
Represented By: Randall E. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?