Aden v. Saul
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Aden, III
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00022
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Andrew M Edison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Attorney General-Department of Justice on 20/06/2020 re: Complaint and Summons, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to Office of Regional Chief COUnsel, Region VI, SOcial Security Administration on 2/4/20 re: Complaint and Summons, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN of Service Executed as to Ryan K. Patrick, U.S. Attorney on 02/03/20 re: Complaint and Summons, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/30/2020) (dwilkerson, 3). Modified on 1/30/2020 (dwilkerson, 3). * REMARK FOR CASE MGMT PURPOSES - INCORRECT IMAGE ORIGINALLY DOCKETED ON 1/29/2020 - IMAGE REPLACED AND REGENERATED ON 1/30/2020 *
January 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons hand delivered to US Marshals in person, filed.(agould, 3)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul filed by Robert Charles Aden, III. (Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 1/28/2020 by Judge Brown). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(agould, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aden v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Aden, III
Represented By: Ronald D Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?