Orion Marine Construction, Inc.
Defendant: All Potential Claimants, Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, Nicole Cola and South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC
Petitioner: Orion Marine Construction, Inc. and In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd"
Claimant: Lizeth Guajardo, Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo, Cipriano Rivera, Alejandra Dominguez, Maria Isabel Rivera, Jose Delgado, Mareli Martinez, Bertha Cavazos, Michael Angel Martinez, Efren Rivera, Juan Guajardo, Rafael Espinoza, Lucero Rivera, Estate of Miguel Martinez, Nicole Coca, Joel Rivera, Litzy Lopez, Carlos Rivera, Priscilla Martinez, M. C., Arturo Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, Lucio Silva, Endedelia Martinez, Maria Delcarmen Espinoza and Jesus Rivera
Case Number: 3:2020cv00309
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Andrew M Edison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46:30511
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 61 CLAIM filed by Alejandra Dominguez, Juan Guajardo, Maria Delcarmen Espinoza, Rafael Espinoza, Litzy Lopez.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 2, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alejandra Dominguez, Juan Guajardo, Litzy Lopez, Rafael Espinoza, Lizeth Guajardo, Maria Delcarmen Espinoza, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 2, 2020 Filing 59 CLAIM filed by Michael Angel Martinez, Estate of Miguel Martinez, Priscilla Martinez, Endedelia Martinez, Mareli Martinez.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 2, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Endedelia Martinez, Priscilla Martinez, Mareli Martinez, Michael Angel Martinez, Estate of Miguel Martinez, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 2, 2020 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division, #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division Objections to M&R due by 12/16/2020(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
December 1, 2020 Filing 56 CLAIM filed by Lucio Silva.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 1, 2020 Filing 55 CLAIM filed by Jose Delgado.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 1, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lucio Silva, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
December 1, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jose Delgado, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
November 24, 2020 Filing 52 ANSWER to #36 Claim by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
November 24, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to #32 Claim by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
November 20, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by FELA OLIVAREZ on behalf of Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed. (Guerra, Michael)
November 18, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to #31 Claim by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
November 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Orion Marine Group LLC by Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo, filed. (Buzbee, Anthony)
November 12, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to #26 Claim by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
November 12, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY in Support of #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division, filed by Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos. (Guerra, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 44 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo, filed. (Buzbee, Anthony)
November 10, 2020 Filing 43 Amended CLAIM filed by Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo.(Buzbee, Anthony)
November 10, 2020 Filing 42 CLAIM filed by Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo.(Buzbee, Anthony)
November 10, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
November 6, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division, filed by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Piccolo, Frank)
November 6, 2020 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 re: #28 Response to Motion,,, filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
November 5, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to #7 Claim by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
November 4, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division, filed by Carlos Rivera, Cipriano Rivera, Efren Rivera, Jesus Rivera, Joel Rivera, Lucero Rivera, Maria Isabel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Rumley, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 36 CLAIM filed by Karla Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Arturo Cavazos.(Guerra, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed.(Guerra, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to #8 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division , filed by Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC. (Noble, Brooke)
November 4, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC, filed.(Noble, Brooke)
November 4, 2020 Filing 32 CLAIM filed by South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC, Enterprise Products Operating, LLC.(Noble, Brooke)
October 30, 2020 Filing 31 Amended CLAIM filed by Nicole Coca.(Buzbee, Anthony)
October 30, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nicole Coca, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
October 30, 2020 Filing 29 CLAIM filed by Nicole Cola.(Buzbee, Anthony)
October 28, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division filed by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit F-1, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Proposed Order)(Piccolo, Frank)
October 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector Canales on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC, filed. (Canales, Hector)
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 CLAIM for Damages filed by EPIC Crude Terminal Company, LP.(Adams, Kent)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EPIC Crude Terminal Company, LP, filed.(Adams, Kent)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger D. Townsend and Dana Livingston on behalf of In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed. (Livingston, Dana)
October 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Javier Gutierrez on behalf of Carlos Rivera, Cipriano Rivera, Efren Rivera, Jesus Rivera, Joel Rivera, Lucero Rivera, Maria Isabel Rivera, filed. (Gutierrez, J.)
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Terry on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC, filed. (Terry, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David Keltner on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC, filed. (Keltner, David)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L Noble on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, filed. (Noble, Stephanie)
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Hoffman on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, filed. (Hoffman, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Mizell on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, filed. (Mizell, Patrick)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Ferguson McNiel on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, filed. (McNiel, D)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke A. Noble on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, filed. (Noble, Brooke)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell L. Barger on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating, LLC, South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC, filed. (Barger, Darrell)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Blake Brunkenhoefer on behalf of M. C., Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed. (Brunkenhoefer, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd", filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by M. C., Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed.(Guerra, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carlos Rivera, Cipriano Rivera, Efren Rivera, Jesus Rivera, Joel Rivera, Lucero Rivera, Maria Isabel Rivera, filed.(Rumley, David)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division by Karla Cavazos, M. C., Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2020. (Guerra, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division by Carlos Rivera, Cipriano Rivera, Efren Rivera, Jesus Rivera, Joel Rivera, Lucero Rivera, Maria Isabel Rivera, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Affidavit, #13 Proposed Order)(Rumley, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 CLAIM filed by Joel Rivera, Carlos Rivera, Cipriano Rivera, Jesus Rivera, Maria Isabel Rivera, Efren Rivera, Lucero Rivera.(Rumley, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Maria Isabel Rivera, Cipriano Rivera, Jesus Rivera, Carlos Rivera, Joel Rivera, Efren Rivera, Lucero Rivera, filed.(Rumley, David)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0541-25302549.) filed by Orion Marine Construction, Inc..(Piccolo, Frank)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE To Claimants by Orion Marine Construction, Inc., filed. (Piccolo, Frank)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Approval of Valuation and Security, Approve Notice to Claimants and Manner of Publication, and to Enjoin Prosecution of Claims (ad interim stipulation) by Orion Marine Construction, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piccolo, Frank)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Potential Claimants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25302117) filed by Orion Marine Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Piccolo, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orion Marine Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Potential Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Products Operating, LLC
Represented By: David Evans Keltner
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Noble
Represented By: Michael G Terry
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Represented By: Hector Canales
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Cola
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Texas NGL Pipelines, LLC
Represented By: David Evans Keltner
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Noble
Represented By: Michael G Terry
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Represented By: Hector Canales
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Orion Marine Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re Orion Marine Construction, Inc. as Owner and/or Owner Pro Hac Vice of the Dredge "Waymon L Boyd and Several Vessels Working in a Flotilla with the Waymon L Boyd"
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Represented By: Heather Scilley von Sternberg
Represented By: John Martin Ribarits
Represented By: Kenneth Howard Tribuch
Represented By: Dana Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lizeth Guajardo
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Roxana Yamileth Rivas-Cornejo
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cipriano Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alejandra Dominguez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Isabel Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jose Delgado
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mareli Martinez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bertha Cavazos
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Angel Martinez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Efren Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Juan Guajardo
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rafael Espinoza
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lucero Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estate of Miguel Martinez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nicole Coca
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joel Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Litzy Lopez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlos Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Priscilla Martinez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: M. C.
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arturo Cavazos
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Karla Cavazos
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lucio Silva
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Endedelia Martinez
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maria Delcarmen Espinoza
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jesus Rivera
Represented By: David L Rumley
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?