Kozlowski et al v. Buck et al
Plaintiff: Stan Kozlowski, Justin Meador, Jason Hall, Jason Roberts, Mike Stallings and Kyle Jordan
Defendant: William Buck, Marcus Woodring and Roger Guenther
Case Number: 3:2020cv00365
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 2/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Docket Date 2/5/2021.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jason Hall, Stan Kozlowski, Jason Roberts, Mike Stallings, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Avery, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding appearance by ZOOM videoconference.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jason Hall, Kyle Jordan, Stan Kozlowski, Justin Meador, Jason Roberts, Mike Stallings, filed.(Dennis, Patrick)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Marcus Woodring served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021, filed.(Doyle, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Roger Guenther served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021, filed.(Doyle, Michael)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William Buck served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021, filed.(Doyle, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(Avery, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25582185) filed by Mike Stallings, Kyle Jordan, Stan Kozlowski, Jason Roberts, Justin Meador, Jason Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avery, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozlowski et al v. Buck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Kozlowski
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Meador
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Roberts
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Stallings
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Jordan
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Woodring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Guenther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?