Wolz et al v. Berryman Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wolz and Rickey Wolz
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company, Shell Offshore, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, PPG Industries, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, BP Amoco Chemical Company, Berryman Products, Inc., Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc., Kinder Morgan, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Oxy USA Inc., Hess Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Radiator Specialty Company, Texaco, Inc., The Sherwin Williams Company, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Union Oil Company Of California, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, W.M. Barr & Company, Inc., Shell Oil Company, United States Steel Corporation and ConocoPhillips Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 43:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 68 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Hess Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
March 8, 2021 Filing 67 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Berryman Products, Inc., filed.(Hill, Cynthia)
March 8, 2021 Filing 66 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 65 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Notice of Settlement (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
March 8, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Settlement by Cynthia Wolz, Rickey Wolz, filed. (Black, James)
March 8, 2021 Filing 62 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Occidental Chemical Corporation, Oxy USA Inc., filed.(Baker, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Filing 61 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company Of California, filed.(Baker, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 60 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company, filed.(Dillard, Stephen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by United States Steel Corporation, filed.(Pujol, Patrice)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pete F. Andarsio to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
March 2, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Berryman Products, Inc., filed.(Hill, Cynthia)
March 2, 2021 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Radiator Specialty Company, filed.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 2, 2021 Filing 55 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Radiator Specialty Company, filed.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 2, 2021 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Radiator Specialty Company, filed.(Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 2, 2021 Filing 53 AMENDED ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Radiator Specialty Company, filed. (Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by The Sherwin Williams Company, filed.(Landry, Andre)
March 1, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by PPG Industries, Inc., filed.(Landry, Andre)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
February 26, 2021 Filing 49 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Cynthia Wolz, Rickey Wolz, filed.(Black, James)
February 26, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 47 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, re: DE #46 filed. Disregard Original. (Flora, Robert) (Modified on 2/26/2021 per LT-JessicaVillarreal, 3).
February 26, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Berryman Products, Inc., filed.(Hill, Cynthia)
February 26, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Marathon Oil Company, filed.(Moir, Peter)
February 26, 2021 Filing 43 STIPULATION re: Enlarging Time for Defendant to File Answer by United States Steel Corporation, filed.(Pujol, Patrice)
February 26, 2021 Filing 42 First AMENDED ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Hess Corporation, filed. (Perry, Charles)
February 26, 2021 Filing 41 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Occidental Chemical Corporation, Oxy USA Inc., filed.(Baker, Michael)
February 26, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company Of California, filed.(Baker, Michael)
February 25, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kinder Morgan, Inc., filed.(Bounds, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company, filed.(Dillard, Stephen)
February 24, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company, filed.(Dillard, Stephen)
February 19, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., filed.(Galbraith, James)
February 12, 2021 Filing 35 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Cynthia Wolz, Rickey Wolz.(Black, James)
February 12, 2021 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc. identifying Exxon Mobil Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Carrington, M)
February 11, 2021 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Sherwin Williams Company, filed.(Landry, Andre)
February 11, 2021 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PPG Industries, Inc., filed.(Landry, Andre)
February 9, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BP Products North America Inc., filed.(Galbraith, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BP Exploration & Production, Inc., filed.(Galbraith, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BP Corporation North America Inc., filed.(Galbraith, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BP Amoco Chemical Company, filed.(Galbraith, James)
February 9, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc., filed.(Carrington, M)
February 9, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Hess Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
February 9, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION re: Stip Ext Time to Answer Complaint by Berryman Products, Inc., filed.(Hill, Cynthia)
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Kinder Morgan, Inc., filed.(Bounds, Diane)
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company Of California, filed.(Baker, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Occidental Chemical Corporation, Oxy USA Inc., filed.(Baker, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Texaco, Inc., Union Oil Company Of California, filed.(Baker, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Occidental Chemical Corporation, Oxy USA Inc., filed.(Baker, Michael)
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States Steel Corporation, filed.(Pujol, Patrice)
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by United States Steel Corporation, filed.(Pujol, Patrice)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Marathon Oil Company, filed.(Moir, Peter)
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Marathon Oil Company, filed.(Moir, Peter)
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 ***Docketed In Error*** (JessicaVillarreal, 3).
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pete F. Andarsio to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marathon Oil Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2021. (Pujol, Patrice)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kinder Morgan, Inc., filed.(Bounds, Diane)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hess Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, filed.(Flora, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation, #7 Continuation, #8 Continuation, #9 Continuation, #10 Continuation, #11 Continuation, #12 Continuation, #13 Continuation, #14 Continuation, #15 Continuation, #16 Continuation, #17 Continuation, #18 Continuation, #19 Continuation, #20 Continuation, #21 Continuation, #22 Continuation, #23 Continuation, #24 Continuation, #25 Continuation, #26 Continuation, #27 Continuation)(Black, James)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cynthia Wolz, Rickey Wolz, filed.(Black, James)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation, #7 Continuation, #8 Continuation, #9 Continuation, #10 Continuation, #11 Continuation, #12 Continuation, #13 Continuation, #14 Continuation, #15 Continuation, #16 Continuation, #17 Continuation, #18 Continuation, #19 Continuation, #20 Continuation, #21 Continuation, #22 Continuation, #23 Continuation, #24 Continuation, #25 Continuation, #26 Continuation, #27 Continuation)(Black, James)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Cynthia Wolz, Rickey Wolz.(Black, James)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25778525) filed by Cynthia Wolz, Rickey Wolz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolz et al v. Berryman Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Stephen C Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Robert J Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Andre M Landry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Chemical Company
Represented By: James B Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berryman Products, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc.
Represented By: M C Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Represented By: Diane K Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy USA Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc.
Represented By: James B Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil Corporation
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Pete F. Andarsio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiator Specialty Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Haekcker Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin Williams Company
Represented By: Andre M Landry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: M C Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company Of California
Represented By: Michael Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: James B Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation North America Inc.
Represented By: James B Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: M C Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.M. Barr & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Robert J Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Patrice Pujol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Stephen C Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wolz
Represented By: James Robert Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Wolz
Represented By: James Robert Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?