Strothers v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dennis Strothers and David Ryan Strothers
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00129
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 9/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Attorney General of the United States. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration c/o Office of the Regional Cheif Counsel, Region VI Social Security Administration. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26503581) filed by Dennis Strothers. (Attachments: #1 substitution of party, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(Dewberry, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strothers v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Strothers
Represented By: Donald Clifton Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ryan Strothers
Represented By: Donald Clifton Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?