Diamond Services Corporation v. RLB Contracting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corporation
Defendant: RLB Contracting, Inc., Harbor Dredging, Inc. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00253
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Christopher Solop to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harbor Dredging, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2021. (Barfield, David)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Elliot Scharfenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for J. Megan Daily to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Elliot Scharfenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2021. (Cannon, Steven)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Megan Daily to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2021. (Cannon, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harbor Dredging, Inc., filed.(Barfield, David)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Harbor Dredging, Inc., filed.(Barfield, David)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance with LR 6 by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. (Cannon, Steven)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Cody Nathan Schneider terminated.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Steven K. Cannon in place of Mark C. Guthrie, Cody N. Schneider, and D. Blake Wilson by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cannon, Steven)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K. Cannon on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. (Cannon, Steven)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance with Local Rule 6 by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed. (Schneider, Cody)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by RLB Contracting, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed.(Schneider, Cody)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to RLB Contracting, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Harbor Dredging, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Diamond Services Corporation, filed.(Morse, Harry)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Harbor Dredging, Inc., RLB Contracting, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Errata, #2 Errata)(Morse, Harry)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harbor Dredging, Inc., RLB Contracting, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27051636) filed by Diamond Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Morse, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Services Corporation v. RLB Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corporation
Represented By: Harry Edson Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLB Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Cody Nathan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Dredging, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Elliot W Scharfenberg
Represented By: j. Megan daily
Represented By: Cody Nathan Schneider
Represented By: Steven Kyle Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?