Harmon et al v. Shell Oil Company, et. al. et al
Defendant: et al Shell Oil Company
Petitioner: Charles Harmon, Brian Coble, Asur Vallejos and David Lawrence
Interested Party: Financial Engines Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00024
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Setting re: #37 Joint REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (rcastro, 4)
February 3, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
January 28, 2022 Filing 37 Joint REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Rohlf, Joel)
January 28, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Related Cases by Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. (Rohlf, Joel)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Matthew E. Layden to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Joel D. Rohlf to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 27, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Matthew E. Layden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Support of Pro Hac Vice)(Tramuto, Robert)
January 27, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Joel D. Rohlf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Support of Pro Hac Vice)(Tramuto, Robert)
January 27, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Tramuto on behalf of Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. (Tramuto, Robert)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Elizabeth L.Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Sarah M.Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 25, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Elizabeth L Woods to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2022. (agould, 3)
January 25, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Sarah M Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2022. (agould, 3)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
January 21, 2022 Filing 25 Case transferred in from Massachusetts. Case Number 1:21-mc-91762; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
January 20, 2022 Filing 24 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion to Transfer Case (Quinn, Thomas)
January 19, 2022 Filing 23 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION #19 Assented to MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas filed by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC to (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
January 12, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Edelman Financial Engines, LLC for Financial Engines Advisors, LLC.. (Adams, Sarah)
January 12, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Woods on behalf of Financial Engines Advisors, LLC (Woods, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 Assented to MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas. filed by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC. (Adams, Sarah)
January 12, 2022 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas. by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC.(Adams, Sarah)
January 12, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Financial Engines Advisors, LLC (Adams, Sarah)
January 11, 2022 Filing 17 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Elizabeth L. Woods. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 11, 2022 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah M. Adams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 11, 2022 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 10 days following the later of any order on the motion to transfer or when the motion is docketed in Southern District of Texas to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents
January 11, 2022 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #5 MOTION to Correct ALLOWED. (Thomson, Katherine)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 10 days following the later of any order on the motion to transfer or when the motion is docketed in Southern District of Texas to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah M. Adams in Support of Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Exhibit A)(Lazazzero, Joseph)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth L. Woods Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9131595 by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lazazzero, Joseph)
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah M. Adams Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9131574 by Financial Engines Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lazazzero, Joseph)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Lazazzero on behalf of Financial Engines Advisors, LLC (Lazazzero, Joseph)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Motions referred: #1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, #5 MOTION to Correct #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, to Compel & Exhibit # 6. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. The matter will be redrawn to the following months emergency judge. (Maynard, Timothy)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Correct #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, to Compel & Exhibit # 6 by Charles Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Naumes, Christopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Petitioner Charles Harmon. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMADC-9115948. Payment Type : MBD INITIATING DOCUMENT. (Naumes, Christopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Financial Engines Advisors, LLC filed by Charles Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit)(Naumes, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Charles Harmon.(Naumes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon et al v. Shell Oil Company, et. al. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Harmon
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Joel D Rohlf
Represented By: Matthew E Layden
Represented By: Robert M Tramuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Coble
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Joel D Rohlf
Represented By: Matthew E Layden
Represented By: Robert M Tramuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asur Vallejos
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Lawrence
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Joel D Rohlf
Represented By: Matthew E Layden
Represented By: Robert M Tramuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: et al Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Financial Engines Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Lazazzero
Represented By: Elizabeth L Woods
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?