Bazzrea et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bazzrea, Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden and Caleb Wadsworth
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Commandant Linda Fagan, Secretary Defense Lloyd J. Austin III, Acting Commissioner Janet Woodcock, Alejandro Mayorkas, Linda Fagan, Lloyd J. Austin III and Janet Woodcock
Intervenor Plaintiff: Hannah Allen, Lars Anderson, Cassidy Andrews, David Andrizzi, Chad Atwood, Michael Bannon, Rachel Beckwith, James Berry, Eileen Best, Marc Block, Darrel Boyles, Christian Brewer, Jeffrey Broom, Nicholas Brozusky, Mark Byrd, Heather Caldwell, Josh Candelaria, David Carrier, Kyle Carter, Richard Chapman, Nathan Chatwin, Michael Chynoweth, Alexis Colasurdo, Brennen Coles, Brandon Collins, James Copeland, Chad Coppin, Benjamin Coutts, Alan Crawford, Ryan Curry, Zachary Curry, Noah Denend, Christopher Devine, Antonio Diaz, Paul Diedricks, Stephanie Diedricks, Andrew Donadio, Nicole Edwards, Kennedy Eilerman, Kalena Exner, Michael Fambro, James Fielder, Brandi Flinn, Berlin Gabretti, Luke Galat, John Garland, Brandon Garofalo, Laura Garofalo, Dan Gomez, Colleen Griffin, Amy Haley, Josh Handeland, Richard Hardwick, Christopher Harkins, Joshua Harris, Daniel Hauser, James Head, Craig Hermiller, Michael Hernon, Sean Hill, Joshua Hudson, Shango Indomitus, Connor Jeanneret, Ian Jobs, Earl Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Richard Joy, Courtney Keith, Laurie Kennedy, Jong Kim, Jodie Knox, Brian Kudrle, Kelcie Laroche, Andrew Larsen, John Lazear, Alina Lehman, Georgette Lopez, Heman Madrid, Hal Martin, Elizabeth Mastorides, Charles Mathis, Jackson McGinnis, Christopher Meedel, James Merrill, Caleb Miller, Zachary Morand, Daniel Morrissey, Emily Muhlenbeck, Justin Munk, Andre Murphy, Corley Myres, Margaret Nakoa, Matthew Newkirk, Shane Nolan, Nicholas Poehler, Matthew Powers, Michael Price, Casey Reynolds, Tyler Reynolds, Bettina Richardson, Edward Richardson, Christopher Roberts, Ricardo Rodriguez Valentin, Shelby Rodriguez, Robert Rogers, Heather Sands, Roby Scherler, Brett Schmitt, A. J. Schur, Ryan Shaw, Zachary Stetzel, Parker Sublette, Zach Sullivan, Jason Thorne, Jeffrey Tucker, Skyler Vyse, Jason Wallace, Charles Watson III, Bradley Weikert, Jacob Wharton, Jacob White, Tyler Wilkinson, Steven Wojick, Tabitha Woolery, Michael Akey, Austin Albright, Elizabeth Albritton, Ashley Anderson, Nathaniel Anderson, Martin Andrada, Stanley Andriski, Stephanie Aninos, Zachary Atchison, Altara Avery, Justin Baker, Brett Barker, William Beckham, Mary Bender, Scott Bleicken, Noah Bodey, Jenny Bone, William Brennan, Jadeon Brooks, Dean Capps, Adam Carr, Adrian Chuquillangui, Christopher Collins, Jeff Daily, Adam DeLano, Richard Deleon, Daniel DeRito, Maikalani Dias, Taylor Dickinson, Edward DiPierro, Paul Dorpema, Lauren Emmons, Jonathan Fassnacht, Jason Fields, John Flores, Stephen Fortin, Carrie Gagnon, Joseph Garofalo, Alec Gaudin, Margarito Gonzales, Jr., Nicole Goodrich, Jentzen Green, Robert Haden, Michael Hamaide, Robyn Hamilton, Brooks Hargrove, Matthew Heaton, Dylan Hennigan, Timothy Hicks, Thomas Higham, Justin Jerry, Carlton Kennedy, Christine Kennedy, Andrew Kucharczyk, Ian LeBlanc, Natalie Little, Brett Mangiaracina, Ken Marks, Taylor McDevitt, Jason Mozingo, Joshua Muhlenbeck, Christopher Musgrave, Timothy Navarro, Haley Nix, Isaak Olson, Caleb Peacock, Stephen Prevatt, Dion Purcell, Carlos Quintero, Blake Rausch, Robert Rendon, Stephen Ricardo, Adam Rieck, Angel Rios, Andrew Ross, Jason Ruffenach, Joshua Schweinsberg, Richard Sheill, Matthew Shelton, Jason Shiflett, Kathleen Smith, Brittney Sonnier, Eason Spinelli, Stephen Spotts, Timothy Stamm, Jacob Stonecipher, Benaia Stowell, Jeremiah Strombeck, Daniel Szuba, Melinda Thibodeau, Jeremy Troyer, Simon Truman, Robert Turner, Pedro Vargas, Leonardo Vega, Brett Watts, Christiane Weber, Mitchell Weimann, Paul Winchell, Benjamin Wolhaupter, Clay Yancey, Matthew Yee and Christy York
Case Number: 3:2022cv00265
Filed: July 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Status Conference held on December 6, 2022 before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Mr. Jody Lowenstein Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2023., filed. (Wells, Laura)
December 8, 2022 Filing 64 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants/Jody D. Lowenstein for Transcript of Status Conference on 12/6/22 before Judge Brown. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Lowenstein, Jody)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
December 6, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/6/2022. Appearances: Dale Saran, Jody D. Lowenstein, Travis Wilson Miller, Brandon Johnson, J. Andrew Meyer.(Court Reporter: Laura Wells), filed.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
December 5, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Woodcock, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Alvarado Order)(Lowenstein, Jody)
December 5, 2022 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to #50 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing, filed by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Moderna Fact Sheet)(Saran, Dale)
December 5, 2022 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2022. (Saran, Dale)
December 1, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM in by telephone before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 29, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Resetting re: #57 Notice of Setting/Resetting FORM - CV. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom Galveston before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 29, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Setting re: #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2023 at 09:30 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom Galveston before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 28, 2022 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition to #50 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing, filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Woodcock, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Suppl. Rans Decl.)(Snyder, Cassie)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for J. Andrew Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 11, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION for J. Andrew Meyer, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sabrina Wilder, Michael Bazzrea, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2022. (Meyer, J.)
November 9, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison on November 9, 2022. Initial Conference held. Docket Control Order to be entered. Appearances: Dale Saran, Travis Miller and Brandon Johnson for Plaintiff, Jody Lowenstein and Cassie Snyder for Defendant A. Mayorkas,. (ERO: yes) (rcastro, 3)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/9/2023. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/9/2023. Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/21/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 7/21/2023. Discovery due by 9/15/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/22/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/17/2023. Exchange Pretrial Materials due by 1/5/2024. Docket Call set for 1/12/2024 at 09:30 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom Galveston before Judge Jeffrey V Brown(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
November 8, 2022 Filing 52 First SUPPLEMENT to #50 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Coppin Declaration)(Saran, Dale)
November 7, 2022 Filing 51 REPLY to #48 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth. (Miller, Travis)
November 7, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Miller, Travis)
November 7, 2022 Minute Entry: mediation held. (rcastro, 3)
November 1, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Mediation set for 11/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (rcastro, 3)
October 31, 2022 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to #38 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Grant Decl.)(Snyder, Cassie)
October 30, 2022 Filing 47 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Woodcock, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, filed.(Lowenstein, Jody)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Referring Case to Mediation.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying #42 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #42 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Discovery and Case Management PlanAgreed MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference.; denying #42 Motion for Continuance; Motion-related deadline set re: #42 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Discovery and Case Management PlanAgreed MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference..(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
October 25, 2022 Filing 44 Amended SUPPLEMENT to #43 Reply to Response to Motion by Sabrina Wilder, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RAAG Tool, #2 Exhibit Fill-In Phrases, #3 Exhibit Comirnaty Gray Cap PI)(Saran, Dale)
October 24, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #39 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Sabrina Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cong Ltr)(Saran, Dale)
October 24, 2022 Filing 42 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan( Motion Docket Date 11/14/2022.), Agreed MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Janet Woodcock, Alejandro Mayorkas, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Jody)
October 20, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to #39 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Janet Woodcock, Alejandro Mayorkas, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decl. of Rear Admiral C. David Barata)(Lowenstein, Jody)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Responses due by 10/20/2022. Replies due by 10/24/2022(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
October 12, 2022 Filing 39 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 11/2/2022.), Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit NOID 24 Aug 2022, #3 Affidavit Rachel Saran, #4 Exhibit Counsel Meet Confer, #5 Exhibit Status Report, #6 Exhibit CI 6000-7)(Saran, Dale)
October 10, 2022 Filing 38 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Saran Declaration, #2 Exhibit Meyer Declaration, #3 Exhibit Johnson Declaration, #4 Exhibit Miller Declaration, #5 Exhibit Serrano Declaration, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miller, Travis)
October 7, 2022 Filing 37 SURREPLY to #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Janet Woodcock, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Burk Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 - Burk Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Robinson Decl., #4 Exhibit 4 - DMED Info Paper, #5 Exhibit Index)(Snyder, Cassie)
September 30, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #28 Amended MOTION to Intervene, filed by Christopher Roberts, Ricardo Rodriguez Valentin, Robert Rogers, Heather Sands, Roby Scherler, Brett Schmitt, A. J. Schur, Ryan Shaw, Brandi Flinn, Berlin Gabretti, Luke Galat, John Garland, Brandon Garofalo, Laura Garofalo, Dan Gomez, Colleen Griffin, Amy Haley, Bradley Weikert, Jacob Wharton, Jacob White, Tyler Wilkinson, Steven Wojick, Tabitha Woolery, David Carrier, Kyle Carter, Richard Chapman, Nathan Chatwin, Michael Chynoweth, Alexis Colasurdo, Brennen Coles, Brandon Collins, James Copeland, Chad Coppin, Benjamin Coutts, Alan Crawford, Ryan Curry, Zachary Curry, Jessie Johnson, Richard Joy, Courtney Keith, Laurie Kennedy, Jong Kim, Jodie Knox, Brian Kudrle, Kelcie Laroche, Andrew Larsen, John Lazear, Alina Lehman, Georgette Lopez, Heman Madrid, Josh Handeland, Richard Hardwick, Christopher Harkins, Joshua Harris, Daniel Hauser, James Head, Craig Hermiller, Michael Hernon, Sean Hill, Joshua Hudson, Shango Indomitus, Connor Jeanneret, Ian Jobs, Earl Johnson, Hal Martin, Elizabeth Mastorides, Charles Mathis, Jackson McGinnis, Christopher Meedel, James Merrill, Caleb Miller, Zachary Morand, Daniel Morrissey, Emily Muhlenbeck, Justin Munk, Andre Murphy, Corley Myres, Margaret Nakoa, Hannah Allen, Lars Anderson, Cassidy Andrews, David Andrizzi, Chad Atwood, Michael Bannon, Noah Denend, Christopher Devine, Antonio Diaz, Paul Diedricks, Stephanie Diedricks, Andrew Donadio, Nicole Edwards, Kennedy Eilerman, Kalena Exner, Michael Fambro, James Fielder, Matthew Newkirk, Shane Nolan, Nicholas Poehler, Matthew Powers, Michael Price, Casey Reynolds, Tyler Reynolds, Bettina Richardson, Edward Richardson, Zachary Stetzel, Parker Sublette, Zach Sullivan, Jason Thorne, Jeffrey Tucker, Skyler Vyse, Jason Wallace, Charles Watson III, Rachel Beckwith, James Berry, Eileen Best, Marc Block, Darrel Boyles, Christian Brewer, Jeffrey Broom, Nicholas Brozusky, Mark Byrd, Heather Caldwell, Josh Candelaria. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Saran Decl)(Saran, Dale)
September 30, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #23 Opposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by Angel Rios, Andrew Ross, Jason Ruffenach, Joshua Schweinsberg, Richard Sheill, Matthew Shelton, Jason Shiflett, Kathleen Smith, Brittney Sonnier, Eason Spinelli, Stephen Spotts, John Flores, Stephen Fortin, Carrie Gagnon, Joseph Garofalo, Alec Gaudin, Margarito Gonzales, Jr, Nicole Goodrich, Jentzen Green, Robert Haden, Michael Hamaide, Robyn Hamilton, Brett Watts, Christiane Weber, Mitchell Weimann, Paul Winchell, Benjamin Wolhaupter, Clay Yancey, Matthew Yee, Christy York, Adrian Chuquillangui, Christopher Collins, Jeff Daily, Adam DeLano, Daniel DeRito, Carlton Kennedy, Christine Kennedy, Andrew Kucharczyk, Ian LeBlanc, Natalie Little, Brett Mangiaracina, Brooks Hargrove, Matthew Heaton, Dylan Hennigan, Timothy Hicks, Thomas Higham, Justin Jerry, Ken Marks, Taylor McDevitt, Jason Mozingo, Joshua Muhlenbeck, Christopher Musgrave, Michael Akey, Austin Albright, Elizabeth Albritton, Ashley Anderson, Nathaniel Anderson, Martin Andrada, Stanley Andriski, Stephanie Aninos, Zachary Atchison, Altara Avery, Justin Baker, Brett Barker, Richard Deleon, Edward DiPierro, Maikalani Dias, Taylor Dickinson, Paul Dorpema, Lauren Emmons, Jonathan Fassnacht, Jason Fields, Timothy Navarro, Haley Nix, Isaak Olson, Caleb Peacock, Stephen Prevatt, Dion Purcell, Carlos Quintero, Blake Rausch, Robert Rendon, Stephen Ricardo, Adam Rieck, Timothy Stamm, Jacob Stonecipher, Benaia Stowell, Jeremiah Strombeck, Daniel Szuba, Melinda Thibodeau, Jeremy Troyer, Simon Truman, Robert Turner, Pedro Vargas, Leonardo Vega, William Beckham, Mary Bender, Scott Bleicken, Noah Bodey, Jenny Bone, William Brennan, Jadeon Brooks, Dean Capps, Adam Carr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Madeline Johnson)(Serrano, Simon)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint..(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(rcastro, 3)
September 29, 2022 Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Janet Woodcock, Alejandro Mayorkas, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Jody)
September 23, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #28 Amended MOTION to Intervene, #23 Opposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by Janet Woodcock, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan. (Snyder, Cassie)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Jody D. Lowenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Cassandra Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
September 12, 2022 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Intervene by Christopher Roberts, Ricardo Rodriguez Valentin, Robert Rogers, Heather Sands, Roby Scherler, Brett Schmitt, A. J. Schur, Ryan Shaw, Brandi Flinn, Berlin Gabretti, Luke Galat, John Garland, Brandon Garofalo, Laura Garofalo, Dan Gomez, Colleen Griffin, Amy Haley, Bradley Weikert, Jacob Wharton, Jacob White, Tyler Wilkinson, Steven Wojick, Tabitha Woolery, David Carrier, Kyle Carter, Richard Chapman, Nathan Chatwin, Michael Chynoweth, Alexis Colasurdo, Brennen Coles, Brandon Collins, James Copeland, Chad Coppin, Benjamin Coutts, Alan Crawford, Ryan Curry, Zachary Curry, Jessie Johnson, Richard Joy, Courtney Keith, Laurie Kennedy, Jong Kim, Jodie Knox, Brian Kudrle, Kelcie Laroche, Andrew Larsen, John Lazear, Alina Lehman, Georgette Lopez, Heman Madrid, Josh Handeland, Richard Hardwick, Christopher Harkins, Joshua Harris, Daniel Hauser, James Head, Craig Hermiller, Michael Hernon, Sean Hill, Joshua Hudson, Shango Indomitus, Connor Jeanneret, Ian Jobs, Earl Johnson, Hal Martin, Elizabeth Mastorides, Charles Mathis, Jackson McGinnis, Christopher Meedel, James Merrill, Caleb Miller, Zachary Morand, Daniel Morrissey, Emily Muhlenbeck, Justin Munk, Andre Murphy, Corley Myres, Margaret Nakoa, Hannah Allen, Lars Anderson, Cassidy Andrews, Chad Atwood, Michael Bannon, Noah Denend, Christopher Devine, Antonio Diaz, Paul Diedricks, Stephanie Diedricks, Andrew Donadio, Nicole Edwards, Kennedy Eilerman, Kalena Exner, Michael Fambro, James Fielder, Matthew Newkirk, Shane Nolan, Nicholas Poehler, Matthew Powers, Michael Price, Casey Reynolds, Tyler Reynolds, Bettina Richardson, Edward Richardson, Zachary Stetzel, Parker Sublette, Zach Sullivan, Jason Thorne, Jeffrey Tucker, Skyler Vyse, Jason Wallace, Charles Watson III, Rachel Beckwith, James Berry, Eileen Best, Marc Block, Darrel Boyles, Christian Brewer, Jeffrey Broom, Nicholas Brozusky, Mark Byrd, Heather Caldwell, Josh Candelaria, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Intrvng Complt, #3 Affidavit Ex 2 - Brozusky, #4 Affidavit Ex 3 - Reynolds, #5 Affidavit Ex 4 - Sands, #6 Affidavit Ex 5 - Nolan, #7 Affidavit Ex 6 - Thorne, #8 Affidavit Ex 7 - Sublette)(Saran, Dale)
September 9, 2022 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT to #25 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Ex. 3 - W Attachmnts)(Saran, Dale)
September 9, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Janet Woodcock, Alejandro Mayorkas, Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2022. (Snyder, Cassie)
September 6, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Sabrina Wilder, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Michael Bazzrea, Caleb Wadsworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence Table, #2 Exhibit Sen Johnson Ltr, #3 Affidavit LT Coppin Decl, #4 Exhibit Comirnaty Offer Email, #5 Exhibit Pfizer Bivalent EUA, #6 Exhibit Moderna Bivalent EUA, #7 Exhibit CDC Guide, #8 Affidavit Bazzrea Suppl. Decl, #9 Affidavit Brown Suppl. Decl., #10 Affidavit Wadsworth Suppl. Decl., #11 Exhibit DoD 6200.02)(Saran, Dale)
September 2, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of WDrawal of MTI re: #13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Intervene MOTION to Intervene by Christopher Roberts, Shelby Rodriguez, Ricardo Rodriguez Valentin, Robert Rogers, Heather Sands, Roby Scherler, Brett Schmitt, A. J. Schur, Ryan Shaw, Brandi Flinn, Berlin Gabretti, Luke Galat, John Garland, Brandon Garofalo, Laura Garofalo, Dan Gomez, Colleen Griffin, Amy Haley, Bradley Weikert, Jacob Wharton, Jacob White, Tyler Wilkinson, Steven Wojick, Tabitha Woolery, David Carrier, Kyle Carter, Richard Chapman, Nathan Chatwin, Michael Chynoweth, Alexis Colasurdo, Brennen Coles, Brandon Collins, James Copeland, Chad Coppin, Benjamin Coutts, Alan Crawford, Ryan Curry, Zachary Curry, Jessie Johnson, Richard Joy, Courtney Keith, Laurie Kennedy, Jong Kim, Jodie Knox, Brian Kudrle, Kelcie Laroche, Andrew Larsen, John Lazear, Alina Lehman, Georgette Lopez, Heman Madrid, Josh Handeland, Richard Hardwick, Christopher Harkins, Joshua Harris, Daniel Hauser, James Head, Craig Hermiller, Michael Hernon, Sean Hill, Joshua Hudson, Shango Indomitus, Connor Jeanneret, Ian Jobs, Earl Johnson, Hal Martin, Elizabeth Mastorides, Charles Mathis, Jackson McGinnis, Christopher Meedel, James Merrill, Caleb Miller, Zachary Morand, Daniel Morrissey, Emily Muhlenbeck, Justin Munk, Andre Murphy, Corley Myres, Margaret Nakoa, Hannah Allen, Lars Anderson, Cassidy Andrews, David Andrizzi, Chad Atwood, Michael Bannon, Noah Denend, Christopher Devine, Antonio Diaz, Paul Diedricks, Stephanie Diedricks, Andrew Donadio, Nicole Edwards, Kennedy Eilerman, Kalena Exner, Michael Fambro, James Fielder, Matthew Newkirk, Shane Nolan, Nicholas Poehler, Matthew Powers, Michael Price, Casey Reynolds, Tyler Reynolds, Bettina Richardson, Edward Richardson, Zachary Stetzel, Parker Sublette, Zach Sullivan, Jason Thorne, Jeffrey Tucker, Skyler Vyse, Jason Wallace, Charles Watson III, Rachel Beckwith, James Berry, Eileen Best, Marc Block, Darrel Boyles, Christian Brewer, Jeffrey Broom, Nicholas Brozusky, Mark Byrd, Heather Caldwell, Josh Candelaria, filed. (Saran, Dale)
September 2, 2022 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION to Intervene by Michael Akey, Austin Albright, Elizabeth Albritton, Ashley Anderson, Nathaniel Anderson, Martin Andrada, Stanley Andriski, Stephanie Aninos, Zachary Atchison, Altara Avery, Justin Baker, Brett Barker, William Beckham, Mary Bender, Scott Bleicken, Noah Bodey, Jenny Bone, William Brennan, Jadeon Brooks, Dean Capps, Adam Carr, Adrian Chuquillangui, Christopher Collins, Jeff Daily, Adam DeLano, Richard Deleon, Daniel DeRito, Maikalani Dias, Taylor Dickinson, Edward DiPierro, Paul Dorpema, Lauren Emmons, Jonathan Fassnacht, Jason Fields, John Flores, Stephen Fortin, Carrie Gagnon, Joseph Garofalo, Alec Gaudin, Margarito Gonzales, Jr, Nicole Goodrich, Jentzen Green, Robert Haden, Michael Hamaide, Robyn Hamilton, Brooks Hargrove, Matthew Heaton, Dylan Hennigan, Timothy Hicks, Thomas Higham, Justin Jerry, Carlton Kennedy, Christine Kennedy, Andrew Kucharczyk, Ian LeBlanc, Natalie Little, Brett Mangiaracina, Ken Marks, Taylor McDevitt, Jason Mozingo, Joshua Muhlenbeck, Christopher Musgrave, Timothy Navarro, Haley Nix, Isaak Olson, Caleb Peacock, Stephen Prevatt, Dion Purcell, Carlos Quintero, Blake Rausch, Robert Rendon, Stephen Ricardo, Adam Rieck, Angel Rios, Andrew Ross, Jason Ruffenach, Joshua Schweinsberg, Richard Sheill, Matthew Shelton, Jason Shiflett, Kathleen Smith, Brittney Sonnier, Eason Spinelli, Stephen Spotts, Timothy Stamm, Jacob Stonecipher, Benaia Stowell, Jeremiah Strombeck, Daniel Szuba, Melinda Thibodeau, Jeremy Troyer, Simon Truman, Robert Turner, Pedro Vargas, Leonardo Vega, Brett Watts, Christiane Weber, Mitchell Weimann, Paul Winchell, Benjamin Wolhaupter, Clay Yancey, Matthew Yee, Christy York, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Intervenor Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Intervening Complaint of 103 Additional Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Akey, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Austin Albright, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Albritton, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Ashley Anderson, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Nathaniel Anderson, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Martin Andrada, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Stanley Andriski, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie Aninos, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Zachary Atchison, #12 Exhibit Declaration of Altara Avery, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Justin Baker, #14 Exhibit Declaration of Brett Barker, #15 Exhibit Declaration of William Beckham, #16 Exhibit Declaration of Mary Bender, #17 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Bleicken, #18 Exhibit Declaration of Noah Bodey, #19 Exhibit Declaration of Jenny Bone, #20 Exhibit Declaration of William Brennan, #21 Exhibit Declaration of Jadeon Brooks, #22 Exhibit Declaration of Dean Capps, #23 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Carr, #24 Exhibit Declaration of Adrian Chuquillangui, #25 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Collins, #26 Exhibit Declaration of Jeff Daily, #27 Exhibit Declaration of Adam DeLano, #28 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Deleon, #29 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel DeRito, #30 Exhibit Declaration of Maikalani Dias, #31 Exhibit Declaration of Taylor Dickinson, #32 Exhibit Declaration of Edward DiPierro, #33 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Dorpema, #34 Exhibit Declaration of Lauren Emmons, #35 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan Fassnacht, #36 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Fields, #37 Exhibit Declaration of Johhn Flores, #38 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Fortin, #39 Exhibit Declaration of Carrie Gagnon, #40 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Garofalo, #41 Exhibit Declaration of Alec Gaudin, #42 Exhibit Declaration of Margarito Gonzales, #43 Exhibit Declaration of Nicole Goodrich, #44 Exhibit Declaration of Jentzen Green, #45 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Haden, #46 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Hamaide, #47 Exhibit Declaration of Robyn Hamilton, #48 Exhibit Declaration of Brooks Hargrove, #49 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Heaton, #50 Exhibit Declaration of Dylan Hennigan, #51 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Hicks, #52 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas Higham, #53 Exhibit Declaration of Justin Jerry, #54 Exhibit Declaration of Carlton Kennedy, #55 Exhibit Declaration of Christine Kennedy, #56 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Kucharczyk, #57 Exhibit Declaration of Ian LeBlanc, #58 Exhibit Declaration of Natalie Little, #59 Exhibit Declaration of Brett Mangiaracina, #60 Exhibit Declaration of Ken Marks, #61 Exhibit Declaration of Taylor McDevitt, #62 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Mozingo, #63 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua Muhlenbeck, #64 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Musgrave, #65 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Navarro, #66 Exhibit Declaration of Haley Nix, #67 Exhibit Declaration of Isaak Olson, #68 Exhibit Declaration of Caleb Peacock, #69 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Prevatt, #70 Exhibit Declaration of Dion Purcell, #71 Exhibit Declaration of Calos Quintero, #72 Exhibit Declaration of Blake Rausch, #73 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Rendon, #74 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Ricardo, #75 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Rieck, #76 Exhibit Declaration of Angel Rios, #77 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Ross, #78 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Ruffenach, #79 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua Schweinsberg, #80 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Sheill, #81 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Shelton, #82 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Shiflett, #83 Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Smith, #84 Exhibit Declaration of Brittney Sonnier, #85 Exhibit Declaration of Eason Spinelli, #86 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen Spotts, #87 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Stamm, #88 Exhibit Declaration of Jacob Stonecipher, #89 Exhibit Declaration of Benaia Stowell, #90 Exhibit Declaration of Jeremiah Strombeck, #91 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Szuba, #92 Exhibit Declaration of Melinda Thibodeau, #93 Exhibit Declaration of Jeremy Troyer, #94 Exhibit Declaration of Simon Truman, #95 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Turner, #96 Exhibit Declaration of Pedro Vargas, #97 Exhibit Declaration of Leonardo Vega, #98 Exhibit Declaration of Brett Watts, #99 Exhibit Declaration of Christiane Weber, #100 Exhibit Declaration of Mitchell Weimann, #101 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Winchell, #102 Exhibit Declaration of Benjamin Wolhaupter, #103 Exhibit Declaration of Clay Yancey, #104 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Yee, #105 Exhibit Declaration of Christy York)(Serrano, Simon)
August 30, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Woodcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stanley Decl, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rans Decl, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jones Decl, #4 Exhibit 4 - Aber Decl, #5 Exhibit 5 - Smith Decl, #6 Exhibit 6 - Govertsen Decl, #7 Exhibit 7 - Vasilarakis Decl, #8 Exhibit 8 - Grant Decl, #9 Exhibit 9 - Dunn Opinion, #10 Exhibit 10 - Wilder RAR, #11 Exhibit 11 - Wadsworth RAR, #12 Exhibit 12 - Jorden RAR, #13 Exhibit 13 - McClenathan Decl, #14 Exhibit 14 - Table of Exhibits)(Snyder, Cassie)
August 26, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Jody D Lowenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Woodcock, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2022. (gclair, 4)
August 26, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Cassandra Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lloyd J. Austin III, Linda Fagan, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Woodcock, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2022. (gclair, 4)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(rcastro, 4)
August 19, 2022 Filing 18 EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 9/9/2022.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit CDC Guidance, #3 Exhibit Byrd NOID, #4 Exhibit Candelaria NOID, #5 Affidavit Candelaria Decl, #6 Exhibit Colasurdo Disenroll, #7 Affidavit Colasurdo Decl, #8 Affidavit Crawford Decl, #9 Exhibit Crawford Msg, #10 Affidavit Curry Decl, #11 Exhibit Curry Emails, #12 Exhibit Flinn NOID, #13 Exhibit Lehman NOID, #14 Exhibit Nolan NOID, #15 Exhibit Schur Disenroll, #16 Exhibit Stetzel ISL, #17 Exhibit DoJ Emails)(Saran, Dale)
August 16, 2022 Filing 17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Draft, #2 Exhibit DoD Inst. 6205.02, #3 Exhibit Biden Remarks, #4 Exhibit WH XCript, #5 Affidavit Bhattacharya, #6 Exhibit CDC Guidance, #7 Affidavit Rans, #8 Appendix Long, #9 Exhibit Parasidis Law Rev, #10 Affidavit Navy SEALs decl, #11 Exhibit ALCOAST 270/22, #12 Exhibit DAF Stats, #13 Exhibit Army Stats, #14 Exhibit USMC Stats, #15 Exhibit Navy Stats, #16 Affidavit DoD June Resp, #17 Exhibit FDA EUA Reissuance, #18 Exhibit OLC Opinion)(Saran, Dale)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION Briefing Schedule + Page Limits by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saran, Dale)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Miller, Travis)
August 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Intervene, MOTION to Intervene( Motion Docket Date 9/1/2022.) by Hannah Allen, Lars Anderson, Cassidy Andrews, David Andrizzi, Chad Atwood, Michael Bannon, Rachel Beckwith, James Berry, Eileen Best, Marc Block, Darrel Boyles, Christian Brewer, Jeffrey Broom, Nicholas Brozusky, Mark Byrd, Heather Caldwell, Josh Candelaria, David Carrier, Kyle Carter, Richard Chapman, Nathan Chatwin, Michael Chynoweth, Alexis Colasurdo, Brennen Coles, Brandon Collins, James Copeland, Chad Coppin, Benjamin Coutts, Alan Crawford, Ryan Curry, Zachary Curry, Noah Denend, Christopher Devine, Antonio Diaz, Paul Diedricks, Stephanie Diedricks, Andrew Donadio, Nicole Edwards, Kennedy Eilerman, Kalena Exner, Michael Fambro, James Fielder, Brandi Flinn, Berlin Gabretti, Luke Galat, John Garland, Brandon Garofalo, Laura Garofalo, Dan Gomez, Colleen Griffin, Amy Haley, Josh Handeland, Richard Hardwick, Christopher Harkins, Joshua Harris, Daniel Hauser, James Head, Craig Hermiller, Michael Hernon, Sean Hill, Joshua Hudson, Shango Indomitus, Connor Jeanneret, Ian Jobs, Earl Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Richard Joy, Courtney Keith, Laurie Kennedy, Jong Kim, Jodie Knox, Brian Kudrle, Kelcie Laroche, Andrew Larsen, John Lazear, Alina Lehman, Georgette Lopez, Heman Madrid, Hal Martin, Elizabeth Mastorides, Charles Mathis, Jackson McGinnis, Christopher Meedel, James Merrill, Caleb Miller, Zachary Morand, Daniel Morrissey, Emily Muhlenbeck, Justin Munk, Andre Murphy, Corley Myres, Margaret Nakoa, Matthew Newkirk, Shane Nolan, Nicholas Poehler, Matthew Powers, Michael Price, Casey Reynolds, Tyler Reynolds, Bettina Richardson, Edward Richardson, Christopher Roberts, Ricardo Rodriguez Valentin, Shelby Rodriguez, Robert Rogers, Heather Sands, Roby Scherler, Brett Schmitt, A. J. Schur, Ryan Shaw, Zachary Stetzel, Parker Sublette, Zach Sullivan, Jason Thorne, Jeffrey Tucker, Skyler Vyse, Jason Wallace, Charles Watson III, Bradley Weikert, Jacob Wharton, Jacob White, Tyler Wilkinson, Steven Wojick, Tabitha Woolery, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motn 4 Lv 2 file Order, #2 Complaint Intervening Complt, #3 Proposed Order MTI Prop Order, #4 Affidavit Brozusky, #5 Affidavit Reynolds, #6 Affidavit Sands, #7 Affidavit Nolan, #8 Affidavit Thorne, #9 Affidavit Sublette)(Saran, Dale)
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed.(Miller, Travis)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Dale F. Saran, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Dale Saran to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court PHV form)(Saran, Dale)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3)
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Miller, Travis)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Brandon Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here<.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Simon Peter Serrano to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here; mooting #5 Motion for Simon Peter Serrano to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Simon Peter Serrano to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2022. (Miller, Travis)
July 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Simon Peter Serrano to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2022. (Miller, Travis)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(VanesaAranda, 3)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Brandon Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum, Timothy Jorden, Caleb Wadsworth, Sabrina Wilder, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Brandon)
July 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28513555) filed by Michael Bazzrea, Courtney Cheatum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Miller, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazzrea et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bazzrea
Represented By: Travis Wilson Miller
Represented By: Dale Saran
Represented By: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Wilder
Represented By: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Represented By: Travis Wilson Miller
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Cheatum
Represented By: Travis Wilson Miller
Represented By: Dale Saran
Represented By: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Jorden
Represented By: Dale Saran
Represented By: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Represented By: Travis Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Wadsworth
Represented By: Dale Saran
Represented By: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Represented By: Travis Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commandant Linda Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Defense Lloyd J. Austin III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Janet Woodcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Fagan
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin III
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Woodcock
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Hannah Allen
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lars Anderson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cassidy Andrews
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: David Andrizzi
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Chad Atwood
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Bannon
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rachel Beckwith
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James Berry
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Eileen Best
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marc Block
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Darrel Boyles
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christian Brewer
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeffrey Broom
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nicholas Brozusky
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mark Byrd
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Heather Caldwell
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Josh Candelaria
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: David Carrier
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kyle Carter
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Chapman
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nathan Chatwin
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Chynoweth
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alexis Colasurdo
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brennen Coles
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brandon Collins
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James Copeland
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Chad Coppin
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Benjamin Coutts
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alan Crawford
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ryan Curry
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zachary Curry
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Noah Denend
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Devine
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Antonio Diaz
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Paul Diedricks
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stephanie Diedricks
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Andrew Donadio
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nicole Edwards
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kennedy Eilerman
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kalena Exner
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Fambro
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James Fielder
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brandi Flinn
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Berlin Gabretti
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Luke Galat
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John Garland
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brandon Garofalo
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Laura Garofalo
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dan Gomez
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Colleen Griffin
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Amy Haley
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Josh Handeland
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Hardwick
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Harkins
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joshua Harris
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Daniel Hauser
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James Head
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Craig Hermiller
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Hernon
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sean Hill
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joshua Hudson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shango Indomitus
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Connor Jeanneret
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ian Jobs
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Earl Johnson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jessie Johnson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Joy
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Courtney Keith
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Laurie Kennedy
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jong Kim
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jodie Knox
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brian Kudrle
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kelcie Laroche
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Andrew Larsen
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John Lazear
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alina Lehman
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Georgette Lopez
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Heman Madrid
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Hal Martin
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elizabeth Mastorides
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Charles Mathis
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jackson McGinnis
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Meedel
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James Merrill
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Caleb Miller
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zachary Morand
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Daniel Morrissey
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Emily Muhlenbeck
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Justin Munk
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Andre Murphy
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Corley Myres
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margaret Nakoa
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Matthew Newkirk
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shane Nolan
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nicholas Poehler
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Matthew Powers
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Price
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Casey Reynolds
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tyler Reynolds
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bettina Richardson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edward Richardson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Roberts
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ricardo Rodriguez Valentin
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Shelby Rodriguez
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Robert Rogers
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Heather Sands
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Roby Scherler
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brett Schmitt
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: A. J. Schur
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ryan Shaw
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zachary Stetzel
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Parker Sublette
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zach Sullivan
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jason Thorne
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeffrey Tucker
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Skyler Vyse
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jason Wallace
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Charles Watson III
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bradley Weikert
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacob Wharton
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacob White
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tyler Wilkinson
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Steven Wojick
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tabitha Woolery
Represented By: Dale Saran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Akey
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Austin Albright
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elizabeth Albritton
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ashley Anderson
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nathaniel Anderson
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Martin Andrada
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stanley Andriski
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stephanie Aninos
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Zachary Atchison
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Altara Avery
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Justin Baker
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brett Barker
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: William Beckham
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary Bender
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Scott Bleicken
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Noah Bodey
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jenny Bone
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: William Brennan
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jadeon Brooks
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dean Capps
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Adam Carr
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Adrian Chuquillangui
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeff Daily
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Adam DeLano
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Deleon
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Daniel DeRito
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maikalani Dias
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Taylor Dickinson
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edward DiPierro
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Paul Dorpema
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lauren Emmons
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jonathan Fassnacht
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jason Fields
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John Flores
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stephen Fortin
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carrie Gagnon
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joseph Garofalo
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alec Gaudin
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Margarito Gonzales, Jr.
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nicole Goodrich
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jentzen Green
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Robert Haden
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Hamaide
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Robyn Hamilton
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brooks Hargrove
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Matthew Heaton
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dylan Hennigan
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Timothy Hicks
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Thomas Higham
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Justin Jerry
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carlton Kennedy
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christine Kennedy
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Andrew Kucharczyk
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ian LeBlanc
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Natalie Little
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brett Mangiaracina
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ken Marks
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Taylor McDevitt
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jason Mozingo
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joshua Muhlenbeck
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Musgrave
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Timothy Navarro
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Haley Nix
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Isaak Olson
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Caleb Peacock
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stephen Prevatt
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Dion Purcell
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carlos Quintero
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Blake Rausch
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Robert Rendon
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stephen Ricardo
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Adam Rieck
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Angel Rios
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Andrew Ross
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jason Ruffenach
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joshua Schweinsberg
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Sheill
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Matthew Shelton
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jason Shiflett
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kathleen Smith
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brittney Sonnier
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Eason Spinelli
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stephen Spotts
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Timothy Stamm
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jacob Stonecipher
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Benaia Stowell
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeremiah Strombeck
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Daniel Szuba
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Melinda Thibodeau
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeremy Troyer
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Simon Truman
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Robert Turner
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pedro Vargas
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Leonardo Vega
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brett Watts
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christiane Weber
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mitchell Weimann
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Paul Winchell
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Benjamin Wolhaupter
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Clay Yancey
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Matthew Yee
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christy York
Represented By: Simon P Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?