Viera et al v. Hudman et al
Defendant: Stacy Adams and Donald Payne
Petitioner: Patrice Viera, Kevin Henry and Brittany Darbonne
Respondent: Joyce Hudman, Matt Sebesta, Jr., Dude Payne, Ryan Cade and David Linder
Case Number: 3:2022cv00386
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss #5 Complaint , filed by Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Donald Payne, Matt Sebesta, Jr. (Blakley, Jesse)
December 21, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss #5 Complaint filed by Brittany Darbonne, Kevin Henry, Patrice Viera. (CynthiaBenavides, 3)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Patrice Vieira, Kevin C. Henry, Brittney A. Darbonne, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #5 Complaint by Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Donald Payne, Matt Sebesta, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2022. (Blakley, Jesse)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Donald Payne, Matt Sebesta, Jr, filed.(Blakley, Jesse)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Donald Payne, Matt Sebesta, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Blakley, Jesse)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Rules of Practice by Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Donald Payne, Matt Sebesta, Jr, filed. (Blakley, Jesse)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 EXHIBIT to DKT #5 - (1) flash drive containing court documents of Brazoria County case. Placed in an expandable folder on the clerk's shelf, by Brittany Darbonne, Kevin Henry, Patrice Viera, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Donald Payne, Matt Sebesta filed by Brittany Darbonne, Kevin Henry, Patrice Viera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VanesaAranda, 3)
November 10, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(VanesaAranda, 3)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 (DUPLICATE ENTRY OF D.E. #1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES). MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Brittany Darbonne, Kevin Henry, Patrice Viera, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(agould, 3)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Motion for Temporary Restraining Order against Stacy Adams, Ryan Cade, Joyce Hudman, David Linder, Dude Payne, Matt Sebesta, Jr filed by Brittany Darbonne, Kevin Henry, Patrice Viera.(agould, 3)
November 2, 2022 Filing fee: $402.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number GAL4734, filed. (agould, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viera et al v. Hudman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrice Viera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brittany Darbonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joyce Hudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt Sebesta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dude Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Adams
Represented By: Jesse Mark Blakley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Payne
Represented By: Jesse Mark Blakley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?