November 4, 2015 |
Filing
409
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered DENYING 388 MOTION to Exclude EXPERTS, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 381 MOTION for Attorney Fees, DENYING 390 Corrected MOTION to Exclude EXPERTS. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
|
June 23, 2015 |
Filing
406
ORDER entered DENYING 405 Opposed MOTION to Strike 404 Reply in Support of Motion . The parties are ordered to refrain from further filings on this issue without seeking leave of court.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
402
ORDER entered GRANTING IN PART 400 MOTION for Extension of Time for Rapid to File its Reply to Symetra's Supplement to its Rule 54 Motion for Fees and Expenses. The response is due by June 5, 2015. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
|
June 25, 2013 |
Filing
363
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered DENYING 357 MOTION to Alter Judgment; DENYING MOTION to Amend 354 Final Judgment, DENYING 355 MOTION to Alter Judgment. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
354
FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Case terminated on 12/13/12(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
November 21, 2012 |
Filing
352
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 329 AMENDED 316 MOTIONAmended MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Attorneys' Fees, MOOTING 316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Damages and for Fees Incurre d Due to Rapid's Contempt of Court, MOOTING 350 MOTION to Strike 347 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit and Post-Hearing Memorandum, and in the Alternative, Rapid's Motion for Leave to File Controverting Affidavit an d Its Opposition to Post-Hearing Memorandum MOTION to Strike 347 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit and Post-Hearing Memorandum, and in the Alternative, Rapid's Motion for Leave to File Controverting Affidavit and Its Opposition to Post-Hearing Memorandum, GRANTING 347 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit. Symestra and NASP must submit a proposed form of final judgment by 11/30/12. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
August 17, 2012 |
Filing
343
ORDER entered GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 342 MOTION for Leave to File response more than fifteen pages MOTION for Extension of Time filing response to Symetra's entirely new motion for summary judgment as to attorneys' fees MOTI ON for Leave to File Excess Pages. The defendants motion for an extension of time and for leave to file a 25-page brief, (Docket Entry No. 342), is granted in part and denied in part. For the reasons previously stated, the defendants brief is limite d to 15 pages. The defendant may file its brief and supplemental exhibits by 3:00 p.m. on Sunday, August 19, to CM/ECF. A hard copy of the brief and supplemental exhibits should be delivered to the court by 10:00 a.m. on Monday, August 20. The motion hearing will continue as scheduled for 5:00 p.m. on August 20.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
323
DECLARATORY JUDGMENT entered..(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
October 11, 2011 |
Filing
299
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING PART AND DENYING IN PART 276 AMENDED 265 MOTION Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 282 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING 261 Amended MOTION for Clarifica tion as to 253 Order, 252 Memorandum and Order, MOOTING 265 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. A Status Conference is set for 10/26/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal).(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, ) (Main Document 299 replaced on 10/11/2011) (leddins, ).
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
285
ORDER entered: Rapid Settlements, Ltd.'s request for additional time to respond to the National Association of Settlement Purchasers' motion for summary judgment is granted. The response is due by September 15, 2010.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing
253
ORDER entered GRANTING NASP's 206 MOTION for Permanent Injunction.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|
March 31, 2008 |
Filing
240
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING 168 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Awards and Brief in Support of Same, DENYING 182 MOTION for Reconsideration of 98 Preliminary Injunction, GRANTING 160 MOTION to D ismiss With Prejudice, DENYING AS MOOT 154 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:05-cv-03167 and Member Case No. 4:07-cv-02093, DENYING AS MOOT 178 MOTION for Protective Order, DENYING AS MOOT 193 MOTION to Exclude RAPID TESTIMONY, DENYI NG 181 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards, DENYING AS MOOT DENYING AS MOOT 192 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Compel Testimony of Symetra's Corporate Representative, DENYING 175 MOTION for Reconsideration of 148 Memorandum & Opinion, GRANTING 222 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Rapid's Claims as Alleged Assignee of Paul Patterson. An order of injunction will issue separately.( Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal ) Parties notified.(leddins, )
|