Jones et al v. Halliburton Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiff worked at Camp Hope in Baghdad, Iraq. She alleges that employees at Halliburton Company and Kellogg Brown & Root sexually harassed her, retaliated against her when she complained, and sexually assaulted her. Additionally, she asserts that Defendants had knowledge of the hostile work environment, negligently hired and supervised its employees, and failed to provide safe working and living environments.

Plaintiff: Jamie Leigh Jones and Joseph Daigle
Defendant: Halliburton Company, KBR Technical Services Inc., Overseas Administrative Services LTD, Eric Iler, Charles Boartz, Unknown Parties, The United States of America, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc, KBR Inc. and Kellogg Brown & Root Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv02719
Filed: August 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2011 Filing 362 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Jamie Leigh Jones re: Writ of Execution, filed.(hler, )
October 18, 2011 Filing 360 Abstract of Judgment Issued, filed.(mmapps, )
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 355 Sealed Event, DENYING 354 MOTION for Attorney Fees.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
September 2, 2011 Costs Taxed in the amount of $ 145,073.19 re: 353 Bill of Costs,,, filed. (mmapps, )
August 18, 2011 Filing 358 RESPONSE to KBR Defendant's Application for Costs Against Todd Kelly, filed by Jamie Leigh Jones. (Vicknair, Heidi)
August 18, 2011 Filing 357 RESPONSE to KBR Defendant's Application for Costs, filed by Jamie Leigh Jones. (Vicknair, Heidi)
August 18, 2011 Filing 356 RESPONSE to KBR Defendants' Application and Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to Title VII and Request For Briefing Schedule, filed by Jamie Leigh Jones. (Vicknair, Heidi)
August 17, 2011 Filing 355 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 17, 2011 Filing 353 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $145073.19 by Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Overseas Administrative Services Ltd, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3 part 1, # 5 Exhibit A-3 part 2, # 6 Exhibit A-3 part 3, # 7 Exhibit A-3 part 4, # 8 Exhibit A-3 part 5, # 9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vorpahl, Joanne)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 352 JUDGMENT. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff Jamie Leigh Jones take nothing and recover nothing in her lawsuit against KBR Defendants or Defendant Charles Bortz. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(aalonzo)
August 3, 2011 Filing 351 MOTION for Judgment by Charles Boartz, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2011. (McKinney, Andrew)
August 3, 2011 Filing 350 MOTION for Judgment by Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Overseas Administrative Services Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2011. (Vorpahl, Joanne)
July 14, 2011 Filing 348 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 347 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, )
July 13, 2011 Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT re: Pretrial Conference held on 6-8-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber C. Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 346 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 345 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 349 Jury Note No. 6, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Note)(sloewe)
July 8, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SEVENTEENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 7/8/2011. Final jury charge conference. Closing arguments. VERDICT. Appearances:Appearances: (Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe)
July 8, 2011 Filing 345 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 7-8-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 344 JURY VERDICT in favor of Charles Boartz, Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Overseas Administrative Services Ltd, Several John Doe Rapists, filed.(sloewe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2011: # 1 Unredacted VERDICT) (sloewe, ).
July 8, 2011 Filing 343 Jury Note No. 5, filed.(sloewe ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2011: # 1 Unredacted Jury Note 5) (sloewe, ).
July 8, 2011 Filing 342 Jury Note No. 4, filed.(sloewe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2011: # 1 Unredacted Jury Note 4) (sloewe, ).
July 8, 2011 Filing 341 Jury Note No. 3, filed.(sloewe ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2011: # 1 Unredacted Jury Question) (sloewe, ).
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER to provide meal to jury on July 8, 2011.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
July 7, 2011 Filing 339 Jury Note No. 2, filed.(sloewe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2011: # 1 Unredacted Note) (sloewe, ).
July 7, 2011 Filing 338 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 7-7-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
July 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SIXTEENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 7/7/2011. Final Charge Conference. Jury Charge. Closing Arguments. Jury Deliberates. Questions 1 and 2 answered. Jury recesses until 7/8/2011 at 8:30 for continued deliberations. Appearances: (Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe)
July 7, 2011 Filing 337 Jury Note No. 1, filed.(sloewe ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2011: # 1 Unredacted Jury Note 1) (sloewe, ).
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER to provide meal to jury and security personnel on 7/7/2011.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
July 7, 2011 Filing 335 Certification of Trial Exhibits, filed.(sloewe)
July 7, 2011 Filing 334 Jury Charge, filed.(sloewe)
July 7, 2011 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 7-6-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
July 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. FIFTEENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 7/6/2011. Rulings on Defendant's Motion and Amended Motion made. Testifying witnesses: Dr. James Paskowitz, MD, By Deposition Kristen Rumba, Sara Simco Trumberella, Pete Arroyo, Will Goodgine, Anthony Adams, Tyler Schmidt and Thomas Jones. Admitted Exhibits: B242, B185. All deposition excerpts admitted for the record only. Final Charge Conference. The trial resumes at 8:00 for attorneys and 9:30 a.m. for the jury and closing arguments. Appearances: (Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), (Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe) Modified on 7/6/2011 (sloewe). Modified on 7/6/2011 (sloewe ). Modified on 7/7/2011 (sloewe).
July 6, 2011 Filing 332 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Judgment by KBR Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vorpahl, Joanne)
July 6, 2011 Filing 331 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 327 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, )
July 6, 2011 Filing 330 RETURN of Service Executed as to Dr. James Paskowitz on July 5, 2011 re: Subpoena, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
July 6, 2011 Filing 329 RESPONSE to 326 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Judgment filed by Jamie Leigh Jones. (Vicknair, Heidi)
July 6, 2011 Filing 328 Page and Line Designations for Thomas Jones by KBR Inc., filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
July 5, 2011 Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 7-5-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
July 5, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. FOURTEENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 7/5/2011. Testifying witnesses: Dr. Victor Scarano, Teresa Westscott, Anna Mayo(EXCLUDED). Plaintiff Rests. Gabe Andino. Defendants KBR and Bortz filed a motion for Judgement as a matter of law. The matter is taken under advisement. Trial resumes at 8:00 a.m. with attorney argument, 8:30 a.m. for jury. Appearances:(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe) Modified on 7/6/2011 (sloewe).
July 5, 2011 Filing 326 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Judgment by KBR Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Vorpahl, Joanne)
July 4, 2011 Filing 325 by KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
July 3, 2011 Filing 324 TRIAL BRIEF in Support of Their Motion to Exclude Irrelevant "Me too" Testimony by KBR Inc., filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting 319 Motion.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(aalonzo, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 321 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 320 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-30-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber C. Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 30, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. THIRTEENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/30/2011. Testifying witneses: Jamie Amstrong, Joseph Kallan Daigle, Thomas King, Dwight Steward, Phd., Dawn Nelson. Admitted Exhibits: B83, B256 (for the record only), B195, B182, Plaintiff's 85. Trial resumes, Tuesday, July 5, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Appearances: (Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.((Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe ) Modified on 6/30/2011 (sloewe).
June 30, 2011 Filing 319 MOTION Withdrawal from ECF Notifications by Ted Poe, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment, # 2 Proposed Order)(McCarron, Katherine)
June 30, 2011 Filing 318 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 315 Transcript, 314 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (mmapps, )
June 29, 2011 Filing 317 Plaintiff's Page and Line Designations in Response to KBR's Direct Deposition Testimony by Jamie Leigh Jones, filed.(Vicknair, Heidi)
June 29, 2011 Filing 316 OBJECTIONS Plaintiff's Objections to KBR's Designated Page and Line, filed by Jamie Leigh Jones. (Vicknair, Heidi)
June 29, 2011 Filing 315 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-29-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 29, 2011 Filing 314 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-28-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 29, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. TWELFTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/29/2011. Testifying Witnesses: Dr. John Irwin, Breanna Morgan, Joseph Kallan Daigle. Admitted Exhibits: Joint Exhibits: JE105, JE113, JE147, JE93. Bortz's Exhibits: B181, B174, B173, B179, B180, B181, B182, B183, B184, B185, B186, B188, B247, B191, B247, B165, B6, B5, B10, B11, B35, B205, B153, B82, B83, B219, B204, B206, B207, B235, B221, Trial Resumes tomorrow at 6/30/2011 at 8:00 a.m. Appearances:(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe) Modified on 7/6/2011 (sloewe).
June 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. ELEVENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/28/2011. Testifying Witnesses: Gabriel Andino, William Goodgine-by deposition, Dr. Michael Ciaravino. Admitted Exhibits: Plaintiff's Exhibits: 2,3,4,9, 84, 12. Joint Exhibits: 106, 135, 55, 53, 75, 76, 80, 78, 84, 88, 89. Bortz's Admitted Exhibits: B197, B198, B210, KBR's 69, 70, 94. Court will resume at 8:30 a.m. on 6/29/2011.Appearances: Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe) Modified on 6/29/2011 (sloewe).
June 28, 2011 Filing 313 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 306 Transcript, 311 Transcript, 309 Transcript, 307 Transcript, 305 Transcript, 308 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dclark, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 312 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial by KBR Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vorpahl, Joanne)
June 27, 2011 Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-27-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. TENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/27/2011. Testifying witnesses: Dr. Susan Blank, Ms. Kristen Rumba by deposition, Dr. Jodi Schultz by deposition, Dr. Franklin Rose, Jamie Armstrong by deposition. Admitted Exhibits: B179, B180, KBR 94, KBR 70 (pages 90,92, 11, 28). Attorneys to be present by 8:00 a.m. for disputed arguments outside the presence of the jury. Jury Trial resumes at 8:30 tomorrow June 27, 2011. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe) Modified on 6/29/2011 (sloewe).
June 27, 2011 Filing 310 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Cheri L. Deason. This is to order a transcript of Pre Trial Hearing held on 6/8/2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (lfilmore, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-24-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber C. Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 308 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-23-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber C. Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-22-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber C. Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 306 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-21-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-20-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 26, 2011 Filing 304 Supplemental BRIEF in Support re: 230 MOTION to Exclude Irrelevant "Me Too" Testimony by KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order Granting KBR Defendants' Motion to Exclude)(Vorpahl, Joanne)
June 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. NINTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/24/2011. Testifying witnesses: Dr. Randall Tackett, Pete Arroyo by Deposition, Dr. Sabrina Lahiri, and Tyler Schmidt. Admitted Exhibits: B182, B164, JE105, KBR 70 (pge 42), KBR 71. Court resumes Monday at 8:30 a.m. Appearances:Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV. (Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe)
June 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. EIGHTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/23/2011. Admitted Exhibits: Plaintiff's 83, and Joint Exhibit: 185. Testifying witnesses: Charles Bortz, Sara Simco Tumbarella by deposition, Anthony Adams by deposition, Pete Arroyo by Deposition. Trial will resumes tomorrow at 8:30 a.m. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla)Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges, Andrew T McKinney, IV. (Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe)
June 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SEVENTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/22/2011. Testifying witnesses: Dr. Terri Scott, Jamie Leigh Jones, Kimberly Nichols, James Coin. Plaintiff's Exhibit: 82. Admitted Bortz's Exhibits: 170, 173, 177, 184, B232-only the page Bates numbered 000182, B98-only the page Bates numbered 000977. KBR's Admitted Exhibits: 106, 107, 108, and 109. Joint Admitted Exhibits: 106, 117 157, 193, 11, 37, 136, 36. The Court resumes tomorrow at 9:00 a.m. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla)Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges, Andrew T McKinney, IV. (Court Reporter: Barron) filed.(sloewe) Modified on 6/22/2011 by (sloewe).
June 22, 2011 Filing 303 Second Exhibit List by KBR Inc., filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
June 21, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SIXTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/21/2011. Testifying witnesses: Jamie Leigh Jones. Admitted Bortz's Exhibits: 7, 10, 11, 73, 182, 192, 183, 186, 188, 105, 106, 107, 108, 54, 200, 99, 247, 11, 165, 158,155, 172, 160, 162, 247, 164, 165, 158, 166, 171, 153, 87, 10, 12, 13,. Admitted Joint Exhibits: 147, 56, 57, 169, 168, 164, 107, 108, 3, 97, 5, 29, 6, 139, 38, 115, 16, 140, 125, 30, 129, 130, 131, 132, 106, 93, 57, KBR EXHIBITS: 96, 46, 20, 86, 94, 103, 78, 75, 74, 77, 79, 81, 71, 80, 89, 93, 90, 103, 102, 82, 85, 25, 8, 20, Plaintiff's Admitted Exhibit: 29, 30, 19. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe) Modified on 6/22/2011 (sloewe).
June 21, 2011 Filing 302 RETURN of Service Executed as to Michael Eisemann, MD on 6/20/2011 re: Subpoena, filed.(blacy, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 301 RETURN of Service Executed as to Sabrina Lahiri, MD on 6/20/2011 re: Subpoena, filed.(blacy, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 300 RETURN of Service Executed as to Michael Ciaravino, MD on 6/20/2011 re: Subpoena, filed.(blacy, )
June 20, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. FIFTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/20/2011. Testifying. Witness: Jamie Leigh Jones. Joint Admitted Exhibit: 52, 112, 105, 130, 55, 103, 91, 168, 100, 137, 103, 133, 56, 57 and Bortz's Admitted Exhibits: 82, 219, 221, 81, 83, 225, 226, 153, 164, 3, 2, 7, 165, 110, 109, 250, 251, 69, 67, 124, Several rulings made regarding Line and Page Designations of various witness depositions. Court resumes for attorneys at 8:00 a.m. and Jury at 8:30 a.m. 6/21/2011. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), Modified on 6/21/2011 (sloewe).
June 20, 2011 Filing 299 Supplemental Exhibit List by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
June 20, 2011 Filing 298 OBJECTIONS to KBR Defendant's Page and Line Designations of Schmidt, Tumbarella and Adams, filed by Jamie Leigh Jones. (Vicknair, Heidi)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting 296 Motion to Quash.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
June 20, 2011 Filing 296 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to U.S. Representative Ted Poe by Ted Poe, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, 2, 3 & 4)(McCarron, Katherine)
June 20, 2011 Filing 295 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 288 Transcript, 285 Transcript, 286 Transcript, 287 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, )
June 19, 2011 Filing 294 First Supplement to Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
June 19, 2011 Filing 293 Amended Page and Line Designations by KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
June 19, 2011 Filing 292 Sealed Event, filed.
June 19, 2011 Filing 291 Charles Bortz's Response to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Bortz's Briefs in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Assault Arrests and Objection to "Mug Shot" Evidence by Charles Boartz, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(McKinney, Andrew)
June 19, 2011 Filing 290 Supplemental Exhibit List by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
June 19, 2011 Filing 289 Supplemental Exhibit List by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
June 18, 2011 Filing 288 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-16-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 18, 2011 Filing 287 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-15-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber C. Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 18, 2011 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-14-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 18, 2011 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial held on 6-13-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cher Barron. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2011., filed. (cbarron, )
June 18, 2011 Filing 284 Supplemental Exhibit List by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
June 17, 2011 Filing 283 TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHARLES BORTZ'S BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ASSAULT ARRESTS AND HIS OBJECTION TO "MUG SHOT" EVIDENCE by Jamie Leigh Jones, filed.(Vicknair, Heidi)
June 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. FOURTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/16/2011. Testifying witnesses: Kara Hall, Lorenzo Santuro, Jamie Leigh Jones. Admitted Exhibits: Joint Exhibits-5, and 106. Plaintiff's Exhibit 23, 24, 62, 42(also marked at KBR's Exh. 70 page 90 and 91), Plaintiff's Exh. 109, 1, 119, and 118. Bortz's 123-126. Testimony resumes Monday, June 20, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe)
June 15, 2011 Filing 282 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. THIRD day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/15/2011. Testimony continues. Testifying witnesses: Amy Katz, Robert Weatherford -taken on Defense Voir Dire. Court rules witness is EXCLUDED from testifying. Julie LeFranca, Linda Lindsey, and Jo Frederiksen. Admitted Exhibits: Plaintiff's Ex 66, and Boartz's 65 and 249. Testimony resumes tomorrow at 9:30 a.m. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Daniel K Hedges. Andrew T McKinney, IV.(Court Reporter: Barron), (sloewe)
June 15, 2011 Filing 281 TRIAL BRIEF In Support of Bortz's Objection to Mug Shot Evidence by Charles Boartz, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(McKinney, Andrew)
June 15, 2011 Filing 280 TRIAL BRIEF In Support of Bortz's Objection to Mug Shot Evidence by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
June 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SECOND day of JURY TRIAL held on 6/14/2011. Motions in Limine argued. Witness issues raised. Opening Statements made. Testimony begins. Testifying witness: Amy Katz. Admitted Exhibits: Plaintiff's 25,24,61, and 80. Trial resumes at 8:30 a.m.on 6/16/2011. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Vasudha Talla) Sharon Cullen, Stephanie Holcombe, Blake Runions, Stephanie Morris. Andrew T McKinney, IV, Lannie Todd Kelly, Stephanie Marie Morris, Daniel K Hedges, Joanne Meyer Vorpahl, Heidi Olsen Vicknair, Ron Estefan, Celia Balli, Susan Cates, Stephanie Marie Morris, Daniel K Hedges(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(sloewe)
June 12, 2011 Filing 278 Second Exhibit List by Jamie Leigh Jones, filed.(Vicknair, Heidi)
June 12, 2011 Filing 277 Amended Exhibit List by KBR Inc., filed.(Vorpahl, Joanne)
June 12, 2011 Filing 276 Amended Exhibit List by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
June 11, 2011 Filing 275 Amended Exhibit List by Jamie Leigh Jones, filed.(Vicknair, Heidi)
June 11, 2011 Filing 274 Supplemental Objections to Plaintiff's Page Line Deposition Experts by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING PART AND DENYING PART 173 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 150 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, GRANTING 188 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of 10-Page Limit, TERMINATING 204 Joint MOTION for Approval of Disclosing Report of Victor Scarano.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
October 11, 2010 Filing 119 ANSWER to 116 Amended Answer, Counterclaim by Jamie Leigh Jones, filed.(Vicknair, Heidi)
September 9, 2010 Filing 109 ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Charles Boartz, filed.(McKinney, Andrew)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART 45 MOTION to Compel arbitration and to stay proceedings.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(svaught)
March 13, 2008 Filing 61 ANSWER to [Fourth] Amended Complaint by KBR Technical Services Inc., Overseas Administrative Services Ltd, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Halliburton Company, filed.(Sloan, Shadow)
June 11, 2007 Filing 20 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Halliburton Company, KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD.(Sloan, Shadow) (Entered: 06/11/2007), filed.(mmapps, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones.(Kelly, Lannie) (Entered: 05/30/2007), filed.(mmapps, )
May 24, 2007 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones.(Kelly, Lannie) (Entered: 05/24/2007, filed.(mmapps, )
May 16, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 paid, receipt # 1-1-4139.) filed by Jamie Leigh Jones, Joseph Daigle. (pkb, ) Modified on 5/17/2007 (pkb, ). (Entered: 05/17/2007) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mmapps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Halliburton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Leigh Jones
Represented By: Paul F Waldner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Daigle
Represented By: Paul F Waldner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBR Technical Services Inc.
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overseas Administrative Services LTD
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Iler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Boartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root International Inc
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root LLC
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root S de R L
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBR Inc.
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root Inc
Represented By: Shadow Marie Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?