Horner et al v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Plaintiff: Marlene Horner and Charles William Horner
Defendant: Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Alfa Laval, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Inc, United Technologies Corporation, International Truck & Engine Corporation, Elliott Company, IMO Industries Inc, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, CBS Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goodrich Corporation, Solar Turbines Incorporated, Dresser-Rand Power Inc, Navistar, Inc., Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC, Crane Co, Riley Power Inc., Zurn Industries Inc, Guard-Line Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Power Systems, Inc., Honeywell International Inc, Sequoia Ventures Inc and Conoco Phillips Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv00464
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: P.I. : Asbestos Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2008 Filing 39 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-308) (certified copy) transferring case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania to be included in MDL Docket No. 875. Parties notified.(kcarr, )
June 6, 2008 MDL transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case electronically transferred. (kcarr, )
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case shall be administratively closed and parties are granted leave to move to reinstate the case on the Court's active docket after termination of the MDL 875 proceedings. Case terminated on 5/12/08.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, )
May 7, 2008 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, filed.(Oliver, David)
May 7, 2008 Filing 36 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, filed.(Smith, Michele)
May 7, 2008 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goodrich Corporation, filed.(Cox, Maryalyce)
May 7, 2008 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Financially Interested Parties by Goodrich Corporation, filed.(sguevara, )
May 7, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sepco Corporation, filed.(jegonzalez, )
May 6, 2008 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, filed.(Alfred, Gary)
May 6, 2008 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Honeywell International Inc, filed.(Polidoro, Donna)
May 6, 2008 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, filed.(Smith, Michele)
May 6, 2008 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Conoco Phillips Company, filed.(Derden, A)
May 6, 2008 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sequoia Ventures Inc, filed.(Arredondo, Robert)
May 6, 2008 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC, filed.(Masters, Shelly)
May 6, 2008 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Guard-Line Inc, filed.(Bosio, Nathaniel)
May 6, 2008 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navistar, Inc., filed.(Estes, David)
May 6, 2008 Filing 24 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed.(Alley, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2008 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, filed.(Sams, John)
May 6, 2008 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Solar Turbines Incorporated, filed.(Croyle, Robert)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ypippin, )
April 21, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified.Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2008 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (emares, )
April 15, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE of Tag Along Action by Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit copy of letter to Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation)(Alley, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:08-cv-464 and Member Case No. 4:08-cv-467; granting #13 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:08-cv-00464 and Member Case No. 4:08-cv-00467.( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(ypippin, )
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tyler R. Johnson.( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(chorace)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(ypippin, )
March 5, 2008 Filing 15 MOTION for Tyler R. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2008. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sams, John)
March 5, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION for Robert E. Boone, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2008. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sams, John)
February 26, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:08-cv-00464 and Member Case No. 4:08-cv-00467 by McDonnell Douglas Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2008. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sams, John)
February 21, 2008 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Oliver on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kettac, )
February 19, 2008 Filing 11 ANSWER to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand, ANSWER to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Sequoia Ventures Inc, filed.(Arredondo, Robert)
February 19, 2008 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Guard-Line Inc, filed.(Bosio, Nathaniel)
February 19, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Venue to Collin County Texas and Special Exception and AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand by International Truck & Engine Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/10/2008.(Estes, David) Motion added on 2/26/2008 (ltien, ).
February 19, 2008 Refund issued via Pay.Gov for receipt # 3464358 and 3464375, to Croyle, Robert for $350.00 each., filed. (sgreen, )
February 15, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Plaintiffs' Failure to State A Claim and, In the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement by IMO Industries Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2008. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Continuation Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss#3 Continuation IMO's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Asbestos Petition)(Thackston, Robert)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for James Dennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice.( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Jeffrey Alley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Amended) by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, filed. (Killen, Desiree)
February 8, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Alley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2008. (rvazquez, )
February 8, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for James R. Dennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2008. (rvazquez, )
February 8, 2008 CIVIL Filing fee re: #1 Notice of Removal : $350.00, receipt number 4-589033, filed. Paid by James R Dennis. (ejones, )
February 8, 2008 ***Party Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., and Conoco Phillips Company, and Zurn Industries, Inc., and Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC, and Crane Co., and Dresser-Rand Power, Inc., and Elliott Company added. (espencer, )
February 8, 2008 ***Party Riley Power, Inc added. (espencer, )
February 8, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2007-68718 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3464358, additional payment $ 350 receipt number 3464375) filed by Solar Turbines Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1#2 Exhibit A part 2#3 Exhibit A part 3#4 Exhibit A part 4#5 Exhibit A part 5#6 Exhibit B#7 Exhibit C#8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Croyle, Robert) Modified on 2/12/2008 to show two payments made (ltien, ).
February 8, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2007-68718 ( Filing fee $ 350) filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(espencer, )
February 8, 2008 ***Party A.W. Chesterton Company, and Alfa Laval, Inc., and Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, and Buffalo Pumps, Inc., and CBS Corporation added. (espencer, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horner et al v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Horner
Represented By: John J Spillane
Represented By: Chad Cotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles William Horner
Represented By: John J Spillane
Represented By: Chad Cotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust
Represented By: Gary E. Alfred
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Dale Elliston
Represented By: Jillian Janse Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S Alley
Represented By: James R Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonnell Douglas Corporation
Represented By: Tyler R Johnson
Represented By: John Griggs Sams
Represented By: Robert E Boone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: John A Koepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck & Engine Corporation
Represented By: David Herring Estes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Robert E Thackston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Darryl E Atkinson
Represented By: Patricia Kay Andrews
Represented By: Rhonda Bear Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: J Michael Myers
Represented By: David A Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Arthur Ray Almquist
Represented By: Maryalyce Walsh Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Turbines Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Terrell Croyle
Represented By: William Thomas Womble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser-Rand Power Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: David Herring Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC
Represented By: John Andrew LaBoon
Represented By: Melissa K Ferrell
Represented By: Shelly LeVick Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard-Line Inc
Represented By: Nathaniel Austin Bosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Sandra F Clark
Represented By: Michele Yennie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Gary Dale Elliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James L Walker
Represented By: John A Koepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Donna Polidoro Moye
Represented By: Dawn Marie Wright
Represented By: Joseph S. Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures Inc
Represented By: Robert David Arredondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco Phillips Company
Represented By: A Christopher Derden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?