Scott v. Scribd, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Elaine Scott
Defendant: Scribd, Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv03039
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 5 Deft's Motion to Strike Class Allegations; denying 9 Pltf's Motion to Strike Deft's Affirmative Defenses. To ensure that the class certificaiton issues are considered in a timely manner, it is further ORDERED that a Motion for Class Certification, if one is to be filed, must be filed no later than May 1, 2010. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) TEXT Modified on 2/24/2010 (htippen, ).
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2010 Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2010 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2010 Pltf Expert Report due by 6/1/2010 Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/1/2010 Deft Expert Report due by 7/1/2010 Discovery due by 6/30/2010 Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/30/2010 Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/30/2010 Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2010 Docket Call set for 10/22/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon. The two week trial term begins 10/25/2010.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, )
January 14, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/14/2010; docket control order to follow. Appearances: Kiwi Alejandro Danao Camara, Barry G Flynn, Daniel David Kistler.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:14 - 10:21)(ERO:K Strouse), filed.(bwhite, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Elaine Scott, Scribd, Inc, filed.(Camara, Kiwi Alejandro)
December 21, 2009 Filing 11 RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Strike 6 Answer to Complaint, filed by Scribd, Inc. (Kistler, Daniel)
December 3, 2009 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE OF REFERRAL re: referring 5 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint Class Allegations Or, In the Alternative, To Deny Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint Class Allegations Or, In the Alternative, To Deny Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 9 MOTION to Strike 6 Answer to Complaint to Magistrate Judge Frances Stacy. Parties notified., filed. (htippen, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike 6 Answer to Complaint by Elaine Scott, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi Alejandro)
November 30, 2009 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint Class Allegations Or, In the Alternative, To Deny Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint Class Allegations Or, In the Alternative, To Deny Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, filed by Elaine Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi Alejandro)
November 6, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Scribd, Inc, filed.(Flynn, Barry)
November 6, 2009 Filing 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Scribd, Inc, filed.(Flynn, Barry)
November 6, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint Class Allegations Or, In the Alternative, To Deny Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Scribd, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Barry)
October 5, 2009 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Elaine Scott, filed.(Camara, Kiwi Alejandro)
September 21, 2009 Filing fee re: 1 Complaint : $350.00, receipt number 605043, filed. (agould, )
September 18, 2009 Filing 3 Register of Copyrights, AO-121, Notified, filed.(blacy, )
September 18, 2009 Summons Issued as to Scribd, Inc, filed.(blacy, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy.( Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(blacy, )
September 18, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Elaine Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(blacy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Scribd, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Scott
Represented By: Kiwi Alejandro Danao Camara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scribd, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?