Securities & Exchange Commission v. Kaleta et al
Plaintiff: |
Securities & Exchange Commission |
Defendant: |
Albert Fase Kaleta, Kaleta Capital Management, Inc. and Daniel Frishberg |
Receiver: |
Thomas L Taylor III |
Consol_defendant: |
Brian De Armas and ProTechnik Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2009cv03674 |
Filed: |
November 13, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Texas |
Office: |
Houston Office |
County: |
Harris |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy F. Atlas |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 7, 2018 |
Filing
320
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED 318 MOTION for New Trial MOTION to Alter Judgment (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
|
April 10, 2018 |
Filing
316
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED 314 MOTION for Leave to File To File Lawsuit Against Thomas Taylor, Sec Receiver (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
294
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED 286 MOTION to Modify Bar Order as to 210 Order (Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
|
July 23, 2013 |
Filing
248
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTED 241 MOTION for Approval of SETTLEMENT WITH BARRINGTON FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. AND WILLIAM C. HEATH (Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
|
May 31, 2013 |
Filing
243
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court concludes that the Settlement between the Receiver and the Insurance Company is fair, just, and equitable, and overrules the Frishbergs Objections. The Court also approves the Receivers proposed distribution of Settle ment proceeds. The Court further concludes that the Settlement between the Receiver and Albert F. Kaleta is fair, just, and equitable. Both Settlements are in the best interest of the Receivership estate and the claimants for distribution of the Estates assets Granting 235 MOTION for Approval of Settlement with Albert F. Kaleta, 234 MOTION for Approval of Settlement re: Certain Insurance Proceeds (Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(gkelner, )
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
205
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED 181 MOTION to Lift Stay ( Status Report due by 8/30/2012)the Receiver must report the status of his claim for theDFFS Policy proceeds by August 30, 2012 and file a status report every fourmonths thereafter(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
|
March 13, 2012 |
Filing
180
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.the Barrington Motion [Doc. # 158] is DENIED. It isfurtherORDERED that the Frishberg Motion [Doc. # 161] is GRANTED in partand DENIED in part.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
|
February 7, 2012 |
Filing
170
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.the Receivers Motion for Order Approving ProposedSettlement and for Ancillary Orders [Doc. # 113] is GRANTED and theObjectors objections [Doc. # 124] are OVERRULED. It is furtherORDERED that the Receivers request relief from the September 23, 2011deadline to add third parties is DENIED as MOOT.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
|
December 2, 2011 |
Filing
156
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Investors Objections seeking priority security interests in the proceeds of the sale of the BR Houston radio station assets are DENIED.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?