ABECASSIS et al v. OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Naftali Lanzkron, TZURIA AMOSI, Katerina Peline, CHAGAI AMAR, Rachel Glam, Yedidia Lanzkron, Meir Lanzkron, Tamar Levenson, Joseph Rubinoff, Gerald Markowitz, Shiran Zayat, Ricky Kleinman, MAXIM AZULAI, Assaf Myara, David Glam, Shirin Mordechai, David Elisha-Sherf, Kinnert Rahamin, Estate of Eliran Rozenberg, Sharon Gili Hefetz, Gidon Regev, Shimon Levi, Miriam Izhaki, Ester Ifat Sultan, Tzvi Yehuda Goldenberg, Mazal Fahima, MAIMON AMSALEM, Hava Lanzkron, Yaffa Rokach, Brakha Hershkovitz, Joseph Rokach, All Plaintiffs, Avi Turgeman, Hana Segal, Aviva Levi, Estate of Meir Fahima, Shmuel Shfaim, Tzvia Ris, Carmela Litmanovic, TZACHI AMAR, Aviva Rubinoff, Olesya Sorokin, Ira Yehuda Schnall, Fairna Gantovnik, Tamar Oziel, Eli Sarusi, Michael Jay Rubinoff, Hila Levi, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, Sharon Segal, IZAK AROAS, ORTAL ALEVI, Naomi Kalfa, Ester Fahima, Estate of Zeev Hanik, PERACH BARUCH, Lidor Fahima, Pnina Drimmer, Noga Zayat, Ortal Ganon, YURI ABRAMOV, Irina Tal, Naima Shimon, Ora Rubinoff, SOL BEN EZRA, Yekhiel Lanzkron, Avi Zino, Alexander Plotkin, Orit Furman, Gabi Fahima, Ina Segal, Amira Turgeman, Refael Sommer, Tuvia Ris, HANI DRIMMER, Michal Ganon, SOLANGE AZRAN, Rahel Drimmer, Victor Peline, Estate of Shoshana Ris, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, Liat Rokach, Iris Shfaim, Daniel Navon (Fahima), Alexander Sorokin, GETAUN AZANU, ZILA COHEN, Naomi Shfaym, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, Ilana Vaknin, HILA CHEN, ANAT AMAR, NOAM AMAR, Frances Nati Schnall, OSHRA AVITZUR, AMRAM BEN EZRA, Dikla Hadad, Netanel Lanzkron, SHIR AMAR, Shalom Fahima, DORON BOROCOV, RACHEL ASSRAF, Sarah Mordechai, Estate of Golan Turgeman, Estate of Menashe Regev, NEGBA AMAR, ESTATE OF NIR BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, Dorit Yadid (Borocov), Mordechai Elezra, Sabine Ris, Anat Ris, Rahmim Hason, Baruch Naim, Maayan Furman, Dimitry Gantovnik, Estate of Vladislav Sorokin, Shoshana Rotenberg, Rosalyn Shoshana Pearl, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, Estate of Yossi Elerza, MAZAL ALEVI, Moria Rabi, Zehava Hershkovitz, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, SHAY AMAR, Ben-Israel Fahima, Anderi Tailakov, Moran Rokach, LEA BEN EZRA, Ezra Sharabi, Eliezer Rubinoff, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, Diane Segal, GUY BARUCH, Christina Segal, Viviane Asraf Ganon, HABASTA AZANU, Lia Lihi Mizrachi, Merav Shamir, Dana Mizrachi, Ariel Mahfud, Elisheva Lanzkron, Yael Elezra, Zeev Zayat, Shimon Hershkovitz, Boris Hanik, GAFNIT AMAR, Gila Schnall, Malka Nisim, Michael Ysaia, PNINA ALTEROVICH, Meital Maymony, Hila Zayat, Lisa Myara, Ortal Fahima, Shirly Elezra, Bosmat Glam, Yissachar Zvi Lebowitz, Michal Zayat Rozenberg and Noam Zayat
Defendant: El Paso Energy Corporation, BAYOIL(USA), INC. and BAYOIL SUPPLY & TRADING LIMITED
3Rd Party Defendant: Merial S.A.S., AWB, Ltd., Cilag (AG International), SmithKline Beecham International, Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE, Ebewe Pharma Ges M.B.H., Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Vitol, S.A., Secalt S.A., ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, Ingersoll-Rand Benelux N.V., Flowserve Pompes S.A.S., Glaxo SmithKline Walls House, Aesculap AG & Co. KG, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, ABB Near East Trading Ltd., ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., B. Braun Medical Industries SDN BHD (Malaysia), Liebherr France, SA, F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, Chevron Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., ABB Solyvent-Ventec, Valtra do Brazil Ltda, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, Chevron Corp., including as a successor to Texaco Corp., David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., Solar Turbines Europe S.A., Dresser International, The Weir Group, Kia Motors, Evapco Austria, Serono Pharma International, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V., Railtech International, Sulzer Pumpen, Volvo Construction Equipment International AB, Daewoo International Corp., Buhler Ltd., Aesculap Motric S.A., Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Woodhouse International, ABB Industrie Champagne, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, Daewoo International Corporation, AGCO Danmark A/S, Rohm and Haas France S.A. and Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., David B. Chalmers, Jr., Bayoil (USA), Inc. and NUCOASTAL CORPORATION
In Re: Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Case Number: 4:2009cv03884
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING #561 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. Case terminated on 7/21/2016(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 14, 2016 Filing 561 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dickens, David)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER Denying #557 Motion to Amend scheduling order.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
May 12, 2016 Filing 559 REPLY in Support of #557 MOTION to Amend #517 Scheduling Order,, filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickens, David)
May 6, 2016 Filing 558 RESPONSE in Opposition to #557 MOTION to Amend #517 Scheduling Order,, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
April 15, 2016 Filing 557 MOTION to Amend #517 Scheduling Order, by ODELIA ABECASSIS, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order)(Dickens, David)
April 13, 2016 Filing 556 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by David J. Dickens for Transcript of Status conference on 9/17/2015. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Dickens, David)
April 11, 2016 Filing 555 STATUS REPORT by ODELIA ABECASSIS, filed.(Dickens, David)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 4/1/2016 re: #551 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 16-20139. Under Fed R. APP. P. 42(b), the appeal is dismissed as of April 1, 2016, pursuant to appellants' unopposed motion, filed.(scastillo, 1)
March 11, 2016 Filing 553 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by El Paso Energy Corporation/Ashley M. Kleber. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Hearing 01/21/10. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner. This order form relates to the following: #119 Transcript, #551 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed. (Kleber, Ashley)
March 7, 2016 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 16-20139 re: #551 Notice of Appeal, filed.(scastillo, 1)
February 29, 2016 Filing 552 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #551 Notice of Appeal,,. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): ERO; J. Sanchez, filed. (Attachments: #1 NOA, #2 Final Judgment, #3 Order, #4 Public Docket Sheet) (dnoriega, 1)
February 29, 2016 Appeal Review Notes re: #551 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 2, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
February 26, 2016 Filing 551 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #550 Final Judgment, #118 Memorandum and Order, by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, Paul Drimmer, Pnina Drimmer, Rahel Drimmer, ESTATE OF HAIM BEN EZRA, ESTATE OF NIR BOROCOV, AMRAM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, Mordechai Elezra, Omer Elezra, Shirly Elezra, Yael Elezra, Omer Eliav, David Elisha-Sherf, Estate of Eliran Rozenberg, Estate of Golan Turgeman, Estate of Meir Fahima, Estate of Menashe Regev, Estate of Naftali Lanzkron, Estate of Shoshana Ris, Estate of Vladislav Sorokin, Estate of Yossi Elerza, Estate of Zeev Hanik, Ben-Israel Fahima, Ester Fahima, Gabi Fahima, Kokhava Fahima, Lidor Fahima, Mazal Fahima, Natali Fahima, Ortal Fahima, Shalom Fahima, Maayan Furman, Orit Furman, Michal Ganon, Ortal Ganon, Robert Ganon, Viviane Asraf Ganon, Dimitry Gantovnik, Fairna Gantovnik, Shula Gaon, Bosmat Glam, David Glam, Rachel Glam, Tzvi Yehuda Goldenberg, Orly Turgeman Goldshmit, Roy Gordon, Dikla Hadad, Boris Hanik, Lior Hanik, Carmela Hason, Rahmim Hason, Sharon Gili Hefetz, Brakha Hershkovitz, Dor Hershkovitz, Sapir Hershkovitz, Shimon Hershkovitz, Zehava Hershkovitz, Adi Hoja, Miriam Izhaki, Naomi Kalfa, Ricky Kleinman, Elisheva Lanzkron, Hava Lanzkron, Meir Lanzkron, Netanel Lanzkron, Oria Lanzkron, Yedidia Lanzkron, Yehuda Lanzkron, Yekhiel Lanzkron, Tamar Levenson, Aviva Levi, Hila Levi, Shimon Levi, Carmela Litmanovic, Ariel Mahfud, Meital Maymony, Dana Mizrachi, Lia Lihi Mizrachi, Assaf Myara, Lisa Myara, Baruch Naim, Daniel Navon (Fahima), Malka Nisim, Tamar Oziel, Galina Peline, Katerina Peline, Victor Peline, Lilian Peretz, Alexander Plotkin, Moria Rabi, Kinnert Rahamin, Gidon Regev, Anat Ris, Sabine Ris, Tuvia Ris, Tzvia Ris, Joseph Rokach, Liat Rokach, Moran Rokach, Yaffa Rokach, Shoshana Rotenberg, Michal Zayat Rozenberg, Mark Rudin, Simona Rudin, Eli Sarusi, Christina Segal, Diane Segal, Hana Segal, Ina Segal, Sharon Segal, Merav Shamir, Ezra Sharabi, Iris Shfaim, Shmuel Shfaim, Naomi Shfaym, Yaakov Shfaym, Naima Shimon, Shoshana Simon, Refael Sommer, Alexander Sorokin, Olesya Sorokin, Ester Ifat Sultan, Anderi Tailakov, Hannanel Touito, Amira Turgeman, Avi Turgeman, Edna Turgeman, Moshe Turgeman, Ilana Vaknin, Dorit Yadid (Borocov), Michael Ysaia, Sinai Zaken, Hila Zayat, Noam Zayat, Noga Zayat, Shiran Zayat, Zeev Zayat, Yunis Zeid, Avi Zino, Viki Zino (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-16244282), filed.(Dickens, David)
January 28, 2016 Filing 550 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Wyatt defendants only.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
January 25, 2016 Filing 549 REPLY in Support of #543 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Joint Motion to Dismiss, filed by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Alex)
January 20, 2016 Filing 548 RESPONSE in Opposition to #543 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Joint Motion to Dismiss, filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS. (Dickens, David)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER Granting #546 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael L Rice terminated.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
January 6, 2016 Filing 546 Unopposed MOTION for Michael L. Rice to Withdraw as Attorney by The Weir Group, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, William)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER VACATING #544 Final Judgment as to Wyatt defendants only. Plaintiffs shall file their response to defendants motion for entry of final judgment within fourteen days of this order.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
January 5, 2016 Filing 544 FINAL JUDGMENT as to the Wyatt defendants only.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 29, 2015 Filing 543 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Joint Motion to Dismiss by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(B))(Roberts, Alex)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #539 Motion to Dismiss El Paso Corporation and El Paso Energy Corporation with prejudice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER GRANTING #540 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice All Claims Brought by Plaintiffs Against Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., Nucoastal Corporation, and Nucoastal Trading Co., S.A. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 9, 2015 Filing 540 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice All Claims Brought by Plaintiffs Against Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., Nucoastal Corporation, and Nucoastal Trading Co., S.A. by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Alex)
December 7, 2015 Filing 539 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice All Claims Brought by Plaintiffs Against El Paso Corporation and El Paso Energy Corporation by El Paso Corporation, El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Robin)
October 5, 2015 Filing 538 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Taylor on behalf of The Weir Group, filed. (Taylor, William)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting #536 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Evan Saul Storm terminated. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 22, 2015 Filing 536 MOTION for Evan S. Storm to Withdraw as Attorney by Tractel International SAS, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Chris)
September 17, 2015 Filing 535 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gray H. Miller. Status/discovery hearing held on 9/17/2015. Appearances: David J. Dickens, David S Toy, Francis I Spagnoletti, Ashley McKeand Kleber, Don Chapple Nelson, Carl A Parker, David J Beck., Alex Roberts, Sam Cruse.(Court Reporter: J.Sanchez), filed.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting #532 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marcos Rosales terminated. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
September 14, 2015 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex B. Roberts on behalf of Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. (Beck, David)
September 14, 2015 Filing 532 MOTION for Marcos Rosales to Withdraw as Attorney by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 531 AMENDED ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H. Miller.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/17/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H. Miller.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting #527 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Steven Richard Selsberg terminated.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER granting #526 Motion for Kyle Flet to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
June 18, 2015 Filing 527 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kyle J. Fiet in place of Steven R. Selsberg by Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Novo Nordisk, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selsberg, Steven)
June 18, 2015 Filing 526 MOTION for Kyle Fiet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Novo Nordisk, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2015. (Selsberg, Steven)
June 16, 2015 Filing 525 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Don Chapple Nelson re: #519 Order, filed. (jengonzalez, 7)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER Granting #522 Carl Parker's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Nucoastal Corporation.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER GRANTING #521 Unopposed MOTION for Don C. Nelson to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant Wyatt.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
May 28, 2015 Filing 522 Unopposed MOTION for Carl A. Parker to Withdraw as Attorney by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
May 28, 2015 Filing 521 Unopposed MOTION for Don C. Nelson to Withdraw as Attorney by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
May 27, 2015 Filing 520 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Beck, Marcos Rosales, and Jacqueline M. Furlow on behalf of Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. (Beck, David)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER GRANTING #518 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Robin C. Gibbs in place of William R. Pakalka. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
April 20, 2015 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Robin C. Gibbs in place of William R. Pakalka by El Paso Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Robin)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 517 SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/15/2016. Deft Expert Report due by 2/12/2016. Discovery due by 3/11/2016. Mediation due by 3/31/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/22/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/22/2016. Objections due by 8/19/2016 Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2016. Docket Call set for 8/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H. Miller(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 13, 2015 Filing 516 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by ODELIA ABECASSIS, filed.(Dickens, David)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER GRANTING #514 MOTION for Harry P. Weitzel, Robert L. Hickok, Barak A. Bassman, and Michele C. Zarychta to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Harry Paul Weitzel; Michele Zarychta; Barak Bassman and Robert Hickok terminated(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 31, 2014 Filing 514 MOTION for Harry P. Weitzel, Robert L. Hickok, Barak A. Bassman, and Michele C. Zarychta to Withdraw as Attorney by Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE, Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., SmithKline Beecham International, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weitzel, Harry)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER DENYING #486 MOTION For Permission To Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) And Memorandum In Support. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER GRANTING #510 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Jacobs to Withdraw as Attorney.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 29, 2014 Filing 511 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #486 MOTION Motion For Permission To Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) And Memorandum In Support by El Paso Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kruse, Layne)
August 28, 2014 Filing 510 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Jacobs to Withdraw as Attorney by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Roche Diagnostics GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Matthew)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER GRANTING #494 MOTION to Quash Interrogatories.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER GRANTING #504 MOTION for Michael R. Miner to Withdraw as Attorney.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER GRANTING #503 MOTION to Seal Mark E. Kunik, M.D. Report.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER GRANTING #502 Unopposed MOTION for Grace L. Hill to Withdraw as Attorney.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 8, 2014 Filing 505 Sealed REPORT by Dr Mark Kunik, filed. Modified on 8/20/2014 (rkonieczny, 4).
August 6, 2014 Filing 504 MOTION for Michael R. Miner to Withdraw as Attorney by Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Charles)
August 5, 2014 Filing 503 MOTION to Seal Mark E. Kunik, M.D. Report by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
July 24, 2014 Filing 502 Unopposed MOTION for Grace L. Hill to Withdraw as Attorney by David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Grace)
July 9, 2014 Filing 501 NOTICE Of Supplemental Authority Regarding Its re: #486 MOTION Motion For Permission To Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) And Memorandum In Support by El Paso Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Order List)(Rodgers, Anne)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER that Oscar Wyatt, Jr. submit to a mental examination by Dr. Mark E. Kunik to determine whether he is competent to testify and respond to discovery. Wyatt shall be examined by Dr. Mark E. Kunik at a time and date mutually agreeable by the parties within the next 30 days.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 3, 2014 Filing 499 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Recommendations for Independent Medical Examination re: #497 Order, by All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickens, David)
July 2, 2014 Filing 498 SUPPLEMENT to #497 Order, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed.(Parker, Carl)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER that the parties have until Thursday, July 3, 2014 to submit an agreed proposed order, or alternatively, submit their respective lists of certified examiners. The court will continue to take defendants motion to quash (Dkt. 494) and plaintiffs motion to compel (Dkt. 496) under advisement until the examination is complete.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
June 13, 2014 Filing 496 RESPONSE in Opposition to #494 MOTION to Quash Interrogatories, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Dickens, David)
June 9, 2014 Filing 495 **TERMINATED - MOTION remains before Judge Gray H Miller**NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson re #494 MOTION to Quash Interrogatories, filed. (sclement, 4) Modified on 6/17/2014 (rkonieczny, 4).
June 5, 2014 Filing 494 MOTION to Quash Interrogatories by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Doris Simmons, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Attar, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Lynn Wyatt, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Wilson, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Wyatt's Motion to Quash)(Parker, Carl)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting #492 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 20, 2014 Filing 492 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by El Paso Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Anne)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER GRANTING #487 Unopposed MOTION for Dale Jefferson, Raul H. Suazo to Withdraw as Attorney. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
May 14, 2014 Filing 490 REPLY in Support of #486 MOTION Motion For Permission To Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) And Memorandum In Support, filed by El Paso Corporation. (Turner, Eliot)
May 14, 2014 Filing 489 MOTION Exceed the Reply Brief Page Limit by El Paso Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Eliot)
May 7, 2014 Filing 488 RESPONSE in Opposition to #486 MOTION Motion For Permission To Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) And Memorandum In Support, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lcayce, 2)
May 7, 2014 Filing 487 Unopposed MOTION for Dale Jefferson, Raul H. Suazo to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Suazo, Raul)
April 15, 2014 Filing 486 MOTION Motion For Permission To Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(B) And Memorandum In Support by El Paso Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Anne)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART #235 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant El Paso Corporation's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #237 MOTION for Judgment, #462 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings).(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER STRIKING #398 MOTION for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #330 MOTION for Kyle J. Fiet to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #341 MOTION for James P. Gillespie to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #342 MOTION for Karen DeSantis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #319 MOTION for Gregory L. Baker to Appear as Attorney in Charge. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #389 MOTION to Dismiss, #468 MOTION to Dismiss, #387 MOTION to Dismiss, #332 MOTION to Dismiss, #331 MOTION to Dismiss, #333 MOTION to Dismiss, #344 MOTION to Dismiss, #351 MOTION to Dismiss, #383 MOTION to Dismiss, #262 MOTION to Dismiss, #471 MOTION to Dismiss, #352 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss, #354 MOTION to Dismiss, #391 MOTION to Dismiss, #390 MOTION for Joinder, #335 MOTION to Dismiss, #367 MOTION to Dismiss, #349 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss, #466 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, #410 MOTION to Dismiss, #346 MOTION to Dismiss, #375 MOTION to Dismiss, #366 MOTION to Dismiss, #336 MOTION to Dismiss, #365 MOTION to Dismiss, #360 MOTION to Dismiss, #475 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss, #347 MOTION TO DISMISS, #380 MOTION to Dismiss, #343 MOTION to Dismiss, #358 MOTION to Dismiss, #210 MOTION to Dismiss; and DENYING AS MOOT #216 MOTION to Dismiss and #394 MOTION to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER GRANTING #481 MOTION for Ranah Esmaili to Withdraw as Attorney and substitute Samuel E Stubbs on behalf of third party defendants.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
November 5, 2013 Filing 481 MOTION for Ranah Esmaili to Withdraw as Attorney and Substituting Samuel E. Stubbs by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mmapps, 4)
November 1, 2013 Filing 480 REPLY in Support of #468 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V.. (Slade, Jared)
October 30, 2013 Filing 479 RESPONSE in Opposition to #475 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
October 30, 2013 Filing 478 RESPONSE in Opposition to #471 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
October 22, 2013 Filing 477 Corrected PROPOSED ORDER re: #475 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed.(Rice, Michael)
October 22, 2013 Filing 476 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Weir Group, filed.(Rice, Michael)
October 22, 2013 Filing 475 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by The Weir Group, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rice, Michael)
October 16, 2013 Filing 474 RESPONSE in Opposition to #468 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
October 8, 2013 Filing 473 RESPONSE in Opposition to #466 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr, NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
October 7, 2013 Filing 472 STATEMENT of Service of Third Party Complaint (Third Amended) by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed.(Toy, David)
September 30, 2013 Filing 471 MOTION to Dismiss by Flowserve Pompes S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crapster, Carla)
September 30, 2013 Filing 470 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve Pompes S.A.S. identifying Flowserve Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Crapster, Carla)
September 25, 2013 Filing 469 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V. identifying Crompton Greaves Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Slade, Jared)
September 25, 2013 Filing 468 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting CG Holdings' Motion to Dismiss)(Slade, Jared)
September 23, 2013 Filing 467 STATEMENT Second Amended Statement on Service of Third Party Complaint by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed.(Toy, David)
September 17, 2013 Filing 466 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by ABB Solyvent-Ventec, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint)(Worthington, Dan)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER DENYING #184 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion, DENYING #185 MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 12, 2013 Filing 464 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bena Ochs as to Ares Trading S.A. re: #460 Order, filed. (mmapps, 4)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER DENYING #197 MOTION for More Definite Statement.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
September 6, 2013 Filing 462 MOTION to Dismiss (Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
September 6, 2013 Filing 461 SUPPLEMENT by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Parker, Carl)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER GRANTING #428 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion of Certain Third-Party Defendants to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
August 30, 2013 Filing 459 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., filed. (Van Kirk, Robert)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORAL ORDER: Temporarily denying #449 MOTION for Discovery. The court needs more information on Mr. Wyatt's ability to communicate.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson) Parties notified.(sbutler, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 457 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson. Proceedings held on 8/29/2013. Oral Order to follow. Appearances:Danny David, Kyle Feit (By phone), David Dickens (By phone), Andrew Pruitt (By phone), Megan Ann Whitlock, Gary W Davis, Jr (By phone), Layne Edwin Kruse, Carl A Parker (By phone).(ERO:Yes), filed.(sbutler, )
August 27, 2013 Filing 456 RESPONSE to #449 MOTION for Discovery , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C)(Suazo, Raul)
August 26, 2013 Filing 455 RESPONSE to #449 MOTION for Discovery filed by El Paso Energy Corporation. (Kruse, Layne)
August 23, 2013 Filing 454 REPLY in Support of #394 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G. (Clouston, Stephanie)
August 21, 2013 Filing 453 NOTICE of Setting re: #449 MOTION for Discovery. Parties notified. Discovery Hearing set for 8/29/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson, filed. (sbutler, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 452 RESPONSE in Opposition to #410 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,,, filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER REFERRING #449 Discovery motion to Magistrate Judge Nancy Johnson.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
August 16, 2013 Filing 450 DESIGNATION of Elliot Cohen as attorney in charge of AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., filed.(Lynn, Lawrence)
August 15, 2013 Filing 449 MOTION for Discovery by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Attar's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Dr. Ertan Letter)(Parker, Carl)
August 13, 2013 Filing 444 Docketed in Error- MOTION for Evan Mannering to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2013. (sclement, ) Modified on 8/13/2013 (sclement, ).
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting #419 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(sclement, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(sclement, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting #317 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(sclement, )
August 12, 2013 Filing 445 Docketed in Error- MOTION for Gregory L. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2013. (sclement, ) Modified on 8/13/2013 (sclement, ).
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #401 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert L. Hickok.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(olindor, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #402 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Barak A. Bassman.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(olindor, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting #403 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michele C. Zarychta.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(olindor, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elliot Cohen.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(olindor, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting #399 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(smurdock, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting #305 Motion for Grace L. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #409 Motion for Jennifer B. Maisel to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #408 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(smurdock, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #420 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rosaldana)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #425 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rosaldana)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting #314 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rosaldana)
August 12, 2013 Filing 432 REPLY in Support of #380 MOTION to Dismiss ("Third-Party Defendant Agrium Asia Pacific Limited's Motion To Dismiss The Third-Party Complaint Against Agrium Asia Pacific Limited, Incorrectly Named As AWB Ltd."), filed by ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., ASTRAZENECA AB, AWB, Ltd., Aesculap AG & Co. KG, Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, Buhler Ltd., Cilag (AG International), Daewoo International Corp., David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., Dow AgroSciences, Eli-Lilly Export S.A., F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Flowserve Corp., Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE, Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Kia Motors Corporation, Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, Merial S.A.S., Novo Nordisk, Railtech International, Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Secalt S.A., Serono Pharma International, SmithKline Beecham International, Solar Turbines Europe S.A., St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., Vitol, S.A.. (Baron, Robert)
August 12, 2013 Filing 431 REPLY in Support of #366 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Novo Nordisk. (Selsberg, Steven)
August 12, 2013 Filing 430 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dow AgroSciences, filed.(Brem, Michael)
August 12, 2013 Filing 429 REPLY in Support of #375 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Against Vitol S.A. Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6), filed by Vitol, S.A.. (Manne, Neal)
August 12, 2013 Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion of Certain Third-Party Defendants to Dismiss by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (proposed pleading), #2 Proposed Order)(Whitlock, Megan)
August 9, 2013 Filing 427 Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notices returned undeliverable from arleth@spaglaw.com on the account of David S Toy. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, )
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER GRANTING #423 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Third-Party Defendant Serono Pharma International to File its Reply and To Defer Ruling on Serono's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) Pending a Ruling on Serono's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6). (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
August 7, 2013 Filing 425 MOTION for Karl Geercken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of review of Local Rules of the Southern District of Texas and the Court Prodedures of Judge Gray H. Miller, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clouston, Stephanie)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson) Parties notified.(sbutler, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 423 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Third-Party Defendant Serono Pharma International to File its Reply and To Defer Ruling on Serono's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) Pending a Ruling on Serono's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCleary, Roger)
August 7, 2013 Filing 422 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson. Discovery Hearing held on 8/7/2013. Order to follow. Appearances:Kyle Fiet, Andrew Pruitt, Gregory Baker, Gail Gottehrer, Evan Mannering, Alexander Lorenzo, Robert Hickok, Brock Bassman, Michelle Zarychta, Megan Whitlock, Ryan Caughey, Lawrence Lynn. Timothy G Cameron, Stephanie D Clouston, Ranah L. Esmaili, Christopher Henry Domingo, Meir Feder, Gary W Davis, Jr, Anne M Rodgers, Michael J Mazzone.(ERO:Yes), filed.(sbutler, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 421 Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from jcasell@cov.com on the account of Jason Harold Casell. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, )
August 6, 2013 Filing 420 MOTION for Alexander S. Lorenzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of review of Local Rules of the Southern District of Texas and the Court Prodedures of Judge Gray H. Miller, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clouston, Stephanie)
August 5, 2013 Filing 419 MOTION for Gail L. Gottehrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Secalt S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2013. (Reynolds, Chris)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting #407 Joint Motion for Entry of Order.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(amaly)
August 2, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Discovery Hearing set for 8/7/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson, filed. (sbutler, )
August 1, 2013 Filing 416 RESPONSE in Opposition to #344 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #387 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, against Sulzer Turbo Ltd. and Sulzer Pumpen (Deutschland) GmbH, #347 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Reassertion of its 12(b)(2)(4-5) Motions to Dismiss, #333 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #380 MOTION to Dismiss ("Third-Party Defendant Agrium Asia Pacific Limited's Motion To Dismiss The Third-Party Complaint Against Agrium Asia Pacific Limited, Incorrectly Named As AWB Ltd."), #383 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Against Buhler Ltd. and Buhler AG, #366 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #335 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint, #336 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint, #389 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #362 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #352 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Janssen Pharmaceutica NV, #358 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #375 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Against Vitol S.A. Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6), #331 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #349 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Cilag AG, #365 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., #360 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #351 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #391 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #346 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against AstraZeneca AB, #410 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,,, #394 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #367 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #390 MOTION for Joinder, #343 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , #354 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Merial S.A.S., #332 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
August 1, 2013 Filing 415 RESPONSE in Opposition to #262 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,,, #390 MOTION for Joinder, filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
August 1, 2013 Filing 414 RESPONSE in Opposition to #366 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
August 1, 2013 Filing 413 RESPONSE in Opposition to #375 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Against Vitol S.A. Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6), filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
July 31, 2013 Filing 412 The parties' outstanding discovery dispute is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nancy Johnson for disposition. Parties notified.(rkonieczny )
July 30, 2013 Filing 411 Rule 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Third-Party Defendant Doosan Infracore Benelux, S.A., by Ingersoll-Rand Benelux, N.V., filed.(sbejarano)
July 30, 2013 Filing 410 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Benelux N.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sscotch, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 409 MOTION for Jennifer B. Maisel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingersoll-Rand Benelux N.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2013. (bcampos, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 408 MOTION for Robert P. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingersoll-Rand Benelux N.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2013. (lusmith, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 407 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Establishing an Orderly Schedule for Responses to Third-Party Complaint by ABB Solyvent-Ventec, Bayoil (USA), Inc., CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slade, Jared)
July 29, 2013 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared M. Slade on behalf of CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V., filed. (Slade, Jared)
July 15, 2013 Filing 405 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daewoo International Corp., Daewoo International Corporation identifying POSCO as Corporate Parent, filed.(Davis, Gary)
July 15, 2013 Filing 404 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kia Motors, Kia Motors Corporation identifying Hyundai Motor Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Davis, Gary)
July 8, 2013 Filing 403 MOTION for Michele c. Zarychta to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2013. (Weitzel, Harry)
July 8, 2013 Filing 402 MOTION for Barak A. Bassman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2013. (Weitzel, Harry)
July 8, 2013 Filing 401 MOTION for Robert L. Hickok to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2013. (Weitzel, Harry)
July 3, 2013 Filing 400 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AWB, Ltd. identifying Agrium Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Baron, Robert)
July 2, 2013 Filing 399 MOTION for Michael M. Maya to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ASTRAZENECA AB, Cilag (AG International), Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Merial S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael M. Maya)(Casell, Jason)
July 2, 2013 Filing 398 MOTION for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ASTRAZENECA AB, Cilag (AG International), Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Merial S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark H. Lynch)(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 397 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B. Braun Melsungen A.G, filed.(Clouston, Stephanie)
July 1, 2013 Filing 396 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B. Braun Medical France identifying B. Braun Melsungen AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(Clouston, Stephanie)
July 1, 2013 Filing 395 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aesculap AG & Co. KG identifying B. Braun Surgical GmbH as Corporate Parent, filed.(Clouston, Stephanie)
July 1, 2013 Filing 394 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Volker Daum, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Clouston, Stephanie)
July 1, 2013 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D. Clouston on behalf of Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, filed. (Clouston, Stephanie)
July 1, 2013 Filing 392 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed.(Parker, Charles)
July 1, 2013 Filing 391 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Charles)
July 1, 2013 Filing 390 MOTION for Joinder by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (McCleary, Roger)
July 1, 2013 Filing 389 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 388 BRIEF in Support ("Consolidated Brief In Support Of Third-Party Defendants' Motions To Dismiss The Third-Party Complaint Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(6) Or Rule 12(c)") re: #380 MOTION to Dismiss ("Third-Party Defendant Agrium Asia Pacific Limited's Motion To Dismiss The Third-Party Complaint Against Agrium Asia Pacific Limited, Incorrectly Named As AWB Ltd.") by ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., ASTRAZENECA AB, AWB, Ltd., Aesculap AG & Co. KG, Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, Buhler Ltd., Cilag (AG International), Daewoo International Corp., David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., Dow AgroSciences, Eli-Lilly Export S.A., F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Flowserve Corp., Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE, Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Kia Motors, Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, Merial S.A.S., Novo Nordisk, Railtech International, Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Secalt S.A., SmithKline Beecham International, Solar Turbines Europe S.A., St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., Vitol, S.A., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order with Appendix A)(Baron, Robert)
July 1, 2013 Filing 387 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, against Sulzer Turbo Ltd. and Sulzer Pumpen (Deutschland) GmbH by Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 386 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sulzer Turbo Ltd. identifying Sulzer AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 385 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sulzer Pumpen identifying Sulzer AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 384 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS identifying AB Volvo as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 383 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Against Buhler Ltd. and Buhler AG by Buhler Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 382 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buhler Ltd. identifying Buhler UK Holdings Ltd. which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Bhler Holding AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 381 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buhler Ltd. identifying Buhler Holding AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 380 MOTION to Dismiss ("Third-Party Defendant Agrium Asia Pacific Limited's Motion To Dismiss The Third-Party Complaint Against Agrium Asia Pacific Limited, Incorrectly Named As AWB Ltd.") by AWB, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baron, Robert)
July 1, 2013 Filing 379 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S. identifying ABB Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kaplan, Lee)
July 1, 2013 Filing 378 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vitol, S.A. identifying Vitol Holding B.V., a privately held Dutch company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Manne, Neal)
July 1, 2013 Filing 377 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH identifying AB Volvo as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Hilder, Philip E. Urofsky and Miriam Farber on behalf of ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, Buhler Ltd., Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., filed. (Hilder, Philip)
July 1, 2013 Filing 375 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, Against Vitol S.A. Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Vitol, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Granting Vitol S.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint Against Vitol S.A. Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6))(Manne, Neal)
July 1, 2013 Filing 374 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novo Nordisk, filed.(Selsberg, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 373 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd. identifying Roche Holding Ltd as Corporate Parent, filed.(Mazzone, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 372 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd. identifying Ingersoll-Rand plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Selsberg, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 371 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roche Diagnostics GmbH identifying Roche Deutschland Holding GmbH as Corporate Parent, filed.(Mazzone, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 370 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA identifying Ingersoll-Rand plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Selsberg, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 369 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eli-Lilly Export S.A. identifying Eli Lilly and Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Selsberg, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 368 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Brown Transmissions France, S.A. identifying David Brown Group Limited (UK), David Brown Systems UK Limited, David Brown Systems S.a.r.l. (Luxembourg), David Brown Systems (Holdings) S.a.r.l. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Turner, Katherine)
July 1, 2013 Filing 367 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Roche Diagnostics GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mazzone, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 366 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Novo Nordisk, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selsberg, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 365 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against David Brown Transmissions France, S.A. by David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting David Brown Transmissions France, S.A.'s Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against David Brown Transmissions France, S.A.)(Turner, Katherine)
July 1, 2013 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Turner on behalf of David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., filed. (Turner, Katherine)
July 1, 2013 Filing 363 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA identifying Liebherr-EMtec GmbH as Corporate Parent, filed.(LeBlanc, Beau)
July 1, 2013 Filing 362 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (LeBlanc, Beau)
July 1, 2013 Filing 361 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven R. Selsberg, attorney-in-charge; Kyle J. Fiet, pro hac vice pending on behalf of Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Novo Nordisk, filed. (Selsberg, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 360 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Stubbs, Samuel)
July 1, 2013 Filing 359 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Secalt S.A. identifying Tractel International SAS as Corporate Parent, filed.(Reynolds, Chris)
July 1, 2013 Filing 358 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Secalt S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Chris)
July 1, 2013 Filing 357 STATEMENT by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., filed.(Stubbs, Samuel)
July 1, 2013 Filing 356 ANSWER to #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., filed.(Stubbs, Samuel)
July 1, 2013 Filing 355 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merial S.A.S. identifying Sanofi 4 as Corporate Parent, filed.(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 354 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Merial S.A.S. by Merial S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Merial S.A.S.'s Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Merial S.A.S.)(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 353 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals identifying Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson European Treasury Company, and Johnson & Johnson International as Corporate Parent, filed.(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 352 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Janssen Pharmaceutica NV ( Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013.) by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Janssen Pharmaceutica NV's Motion to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative, to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Janssen Pharmaceutica NV)(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 351 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013.) by Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weitzel, Harry)
July 1, 2013 Filing 350 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cilag (AG International) identifying Cilag Holding AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 349 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Cilag AG ( Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013.) by Cilag (AG International), filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Cilag AG's Motion to Quash Service of Process, and in the Alternative, to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against Cilag AG)(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 348 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASTRAZENECA AB identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 347 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Reassertion of its 12(b)(2)(4-5) Motions to Dismiss by St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Robert)
July 1, 2013 Filing 346 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against AstraZeneca AB by ASTRAZENECA AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting AstraZeneca AB's Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint Against AstraZeneca AB)(Casell, Jason)
July 1, 2013 Filing 345 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Ford on behalf of St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, filed. (Ford, Robert)
July 1, 2013 Filing 344 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013.) by ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
July 1, 2013 Filing 343 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Howell, Bradley)
July 1, 2013 Filing 342 MOTION for Karen DeSantis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Kaplan, Lee)
July 1, 2013 Filing 341 MOTION for James P. Gillespie to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Kaplan, Lee)
July 1, 2013 Filing 338 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AGCO S.A. identifying AGCO France S.A., AGCO Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Lynn, Lawrence)
July 1, 2013 Filing 337 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AGCO Danmark A/S identifying AGCO A/S, AGCO Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Lynn, Lawrence)
July 1, 2013 Filing 336 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint by AGCO S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Lynn, Lawrence)
July 1, 2013 Filing 335 MOTION to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint by AGCO Danmark A/S, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Lynn, Lawrence)
July 1, 2013 Filing 334 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney-in-Charge by AWB, Ltd., filed. (David, Daniel)
July 1, 2013 Filing 333 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Daewoo International Corp., Kia Motors, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Gary)
July 1, 2013 Filing 332 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Dow AgroSciences, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Brem, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 331 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Railtech International, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Mark)
June 28, 2013 Filing 330 MOTION for Kyle J. Fiet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Novo Nordisk, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selsberg, Steven)
June 28, 2013 Filing 329 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E. identifying GlaxoSmithKline plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Weitzel, Harry)
June 28, 2013 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry P. Weitzel on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline Export Limited, GlaxoSmithKline International Limited, GlaxoSmithKline S.A.E., filed. (Weitzel, Harry)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting #300 Motion for Michael R. Miner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #298 Motion for Clay J. Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER GRANTING #311 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Establishing an Orderly Schedule for Responses to the Third-Party Complaint.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER GRANTING #282 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Service of Third Party Complaint. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
June 27, 2013 Filing 325 AFFIDAVIT of Clay J. Pierce re: #298 MOTION for Clay J. Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed.(Parker, Charles)
June 26, 2013 Filing 324 STATEMENT ON SERVICE OF THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED) by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., filed.(Toy, David)
June 26, 2013 Filing 322 STATEMENT ON SERVICE OF THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., filed.(Toy, David)
June 26, 2013 Filing 321 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solar Turbines Europe S.A. identifying Caterpillar Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Howell, Bradley)
June 26, 2013 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Baker, Brad K. Howell and Evan M. Mannering on behalf of Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. (Howell, Bradley)
June 26, 2013 Filing 319 MOTION for Gregory L. Baker to Appear as Attorney in Charge by Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2013. (Howell, Bradley)
June 26, 2013 Filing 318 MOTION for Evan M. Mannering to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Evan M. Mannering)(Howell, Bradley)
June 26, 2013 Filing 317 MOTION for Gregory L. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Solar Turbines Europe S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory L. Baker)(Howell, Bradley)
June 26, 2013 Filing 316 JOINDER by Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed.(Parker, Charles)
June 25, 2013 Letter Rogatory Issued as to ABB Near East Trading Ltd., Valtra do Brazil Ltda, Aesculap Surgical Instruments SDN, Ebewe Pharma Ges M.B.H. Nfg.KG, Evapco Austria, St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, Woodhouse International LLC, York Air Conditioning and Refrigeration FZE, filed.(kpicota)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #281 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 25, 2013 Filing 315 AFFIDAVIT of Michael R. Miner re: #300 MOTION for Michael R. Miner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed.(Parker, Charles)
June 25, 2013 Filing 314 MOTION for Bennet Moskowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Bennet Moskowitz)(Lynn, Lawrence)
June 25, 2013 Filing 313 MOTION for Elliot Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Elliot Cohen)(Lynn, Lawrence)
June 25, 2013 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A. Lynn on behalf of AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., filed. (Lynn, Lawrence)
June 25, 2013 Filing 311 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Establishing an Orderly Schedule for Responses to the Third-Party Complaint by AWB, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(David, Daniel)
June 25, 2013 Filing 305 MOTION for Grace L. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(amwilliams, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting #292 Motion for Matthew Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #291 Motion for Jason McCullough to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #293 Motion for Brian Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #295 Motion for Robert Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #294 Motion for Timothy Cameron to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
June 24, 2013 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Armstrong on behalf of Railtech International, filed. (Armstrong, Mark)
June 21, 2013 Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Pharr Hefley on behalf of AWB, Ltd., filed. (Hefley, Amy)
June 21, 2013 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny David on behalf of AWB, Ltd., filed. (David, Daniel)
June 19, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Miner on behalf of Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. (Parker, Charles)
June 19, 2013 Filing 300 MOTION for Michael R. Miner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2013. (Parker, Charles)
June 19, 2013 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Clay J. Pierce on behalf of Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. (Parker, Charles)
June 19, 2013 Filing 298 MOTION for Clay J. Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2013. (Parker, Charles)
June 19, 2013 Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Tabolsky on behalf of Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. (Tabolsky, Marc)
June 19, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Parker on behalf of Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed. (Parker, Charles)
June 19, 2013 Filing 295 MOTION for Robert H Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AWB, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF)(smurdock, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 294 MOTION for Timothy G Cameron to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AWB, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 ECF)(smurdock, ) Modified on 6/19/2013 (smurdock, ).
June 17, 2013 Filing 293 MOTION for Brian S. Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Roche Diagnostics GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian S. Weinstein)(Jefferson, Lamont)
June 17, 2013 Filing 292 MOTION for Matthew Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Roche Diagnostics GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Jacobs)(Jefferson, Lamont)
June 17, 2013 Filing 291 MOTION for Jason McCullough to Appear Pro Hac Vice by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Roche Diagnostics GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jason McCullough)(Jefferson, Lamont) Modified on 6/21/2013 (dhansen, ).
June 17, 2013 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Beau E. LeBlanc on behalf of Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, filed. (LeBlanc, Beau)
June 17, 2013 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip H. Hilder, Philip E. Urofsky and H. Miriam Farber on behalf of ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., filed. (Hilder, Philip)
June 7, 2013 Filing 288 PROPOSED ORDER re: #285 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Clouston, Stephanie)
June 7, 2013 Filing 287 PROPOSED ORDER re: #286 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Clouston, Stephanie)
June 7, 2013 Filing 286 RESPONSE in Opposition to #281 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, filed by Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Melsungen A.G. (Clouston, Stephanie)
June 7, 2013 Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition to #282 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Service of Third Party Complaint, filed by Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Melsungen A.G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alexander S. Lorenzo)(Clouston, Stephanie)
June 7, 2013 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D. Clouston on behalf of Aesculap AG & Co. KG, B. Braun Melsungen A.G, filed. (Clouston, Stephanie)
June 5, 2013 Filing 283 RESPONSE in Opposition to #282 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Service of Third Party Complaint, filed by Chevron Corporation. (Domingo, Christopher)
May 31, 2013 Filing 282 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Service of Third Party Complaint by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
May 31, 2013 Filing 281 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
May 28, 2013 Filing 280 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Ranah L. Esmaili as to Atlas Copco Airpower N.V. re: #273 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (wbostic)
May 20, 2013 Filing 279 Mail Returned Undeliverable, Attempted Not Known Unable to Forward as to attorney Ranah L. Esmaili as to Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB re: #264 Order, filed. (megarcia)
May 20, 2013 Filing 278 Mail Returned Undeliverable, Attempted Not Known Unable to Forward as to attorney Don Chapple Nelson as to Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr re: #264 Order, filed. (megarcia)
May 17, 2013 Filing 277 RESPONSE to #237 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by plaintiffs. (Suazo, Raul) Modified on 5/21/2013 (rkonieczny).
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Danielle McLaughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting #256 Motion for Fred Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #255 Motion for Tarae Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(amaly )
May 15, 2013 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Opposition to #231 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Chevron's Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, filed by Chevron Corporation. (Domingo, Christopher)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #246 Motion for Ranah Esmaili to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #244 Motion for Anne Lefever to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #245 Motion for Edward Flanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #249 Motion for Evan Storm to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #248 Motion for John D. Harkrider to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #261 Motion Brett Spain to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
May 13, 2013 Filing 266 REPLY to #265 Response Defendant El Paso Corporation's Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by El Paso Energy Corporation. (Rodgers, Anne)
May 8, 2013 Filing 265 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant El Paso Corporation's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Suazo, Raul) Modified on 5/9/2013 (rkonieczny).
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING #259 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Third-Party Complaint, #260 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Third Party Complaint, #247 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond, #243 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Secalt S.A. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond, #241 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Third Party Defendant Serono Pharma International to Answer, Mover, or Otherwise Respond, #253 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Eli Lilly Export S.A. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond, #251 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Vitol S.A. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond. Third party defendants' deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond is extended up to and including 7/1/2013. All responses to motions is extended up to and including 8/1/2013; VACATING #239 Order.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
May 6, 2013 Filing 263 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Serono Pharma International identifying Merck KGaA as Corporate Parent, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
May 6, 2013 Filing 262 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 50-Off Stores Opinion, #2 Covington Marine Opinion, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Glyn Harris in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(McCleary, Roger)
May 6, 2013 Filing 261 MOTION for Brett A. Spain to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/28/2013. (mmapps, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 260 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Third Party Complaint by ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hilder, Philip)
May 3, 2013 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Third-Party Complaint by ASTRAZENECA AB, Cilag (AG International), filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casell, Jason)
May 3, 2013 Filing 258 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB identifying Atlas Copco AB as Corporate Parent, filed.(Stubbs, Samuel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 257 ANSWER to #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed.(Stubbs, Samuel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 256 MOTION for Fred A. Kelly, Jr, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (mlothmann, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 255 MOTION for Tarae L. Howell, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (mlothmann, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 254 MOTION for Danielle M. McLaughlin, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (mlothmann, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Eli Lilly Export S.A. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Eli-Lilly Export S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selsberg, Steven)
May 3, 2013 Filing 252 Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from dward@susmangodfrey.com on the account of Alexander Lyle Kaplan. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 251 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Vitol S.A. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by Vitol, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Alexander)
May 3, 2013 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Manne, Alex Kaplan, and Ryan Caughey on behalf of Vitol, S.A., filed. (Kaplan, Alexander)
May 3, 2013 Filing 249 MOTION for Evan S. Storm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Secalt S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (Reynolds, Chris)
May 3, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION for John D. Harkrider to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Secalt S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2013. (Smith, Nathan)
May 2, 2013 Filing 247 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mazzone, Michael)
May 2, 2013 Filing 246 MOTION for Ranah L. Esmail to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2013. (rdv)
May 2, 2013 Filing 245 MOTION for Edward Flanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2013. (ccarnew, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 244 MOTION for Anne C. Lefever to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed. Affidavit not included. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2013. (ccarnew, )
May 1, 2013 Filing 243 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Secalt S.A. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Secalt S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Chris)
May 1, 2013 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Reynolds and Nathan Smith on behalf of Secalt S.A., filed. (Reynolds, Chris)
May 1, 2013 Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Third Party Defendant Serono Pharma International to Answer, Mover, or Otherwise Respond by Serono Pharma International, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCleary, Roger)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #231 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Chevron's Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, DENYING AS MOOT #233 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to St. Jude Medical Export's Motion to Dismiss, GRANTING IN PART #238 Joint MOTION to Suspend Third Party Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Third Party Complaint. Briefing schedule due 7/1/2013. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
April 26, 2013 Filing 238 Joint MOTION to Suspend Third Party Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Third Party Complaint by Buhler Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hilder, Philip)
April 26, 2013 Filing 237 MOTION for Judgment by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
April 25, 2013 Filing 240 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS, Third Party Complaint, and Judge's Procedures Executed as to F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd. served on 4/11/2013, answer due 5/2/2013, filed.(kpicota) Modified on 5/2/2013 (kpicota, ).
April 24, 2013 Filing 236 REPLY in Support of #210 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,,, filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Soler, #2 Proposed Order)(Domingo, Christopher)
April 17, 2013 Filing 235 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant El Paso Corporation's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit A (part 3), #4 Exhibit A (part 4), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Anne)
April 16, 2013 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition to #216 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service of Process and 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service of Process and 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
April 16, 2013 Filing 233 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to St. Jude Medical Export's Motion to Dismiss by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
April 12, 2013 Filing 232 RESPONSE in Opposition to #210 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,,, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr, David B. Chalmers, Jr., NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
April 12, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Chevron's Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by BAYOIL(USA), INC., Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr, David B. Chalmers, Jr., NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #209 Motion for H. Miriam Farber to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING #228 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to St. Jude Medical Export GmbH's Motion to Dismiss (response due 4/16/2013); GRANTING #226 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Chevron Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (response due 4/12/2013; reply due 4/24/2013). (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
April 2, 2013 Filing 228 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to St. Jude Medical Export GmbH's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Service of Process and 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
March 28, 2013 Filing 227 REPLY to #218 Response Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Submission Regarding the Unconstitutionality of Retroactive Application of the January 2, 2013 Amendment to the Antiterrorism Act, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Rodgers, Anne)
March 28, 2013 Filing 226 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Chevron Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting Philip Urofsky #219 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Parties notified.(mmapps, )
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING #215 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
March 19, 2013 Filing 223 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Conference re: #215 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Redden, Joe)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Granting #213 MOTION for Meir Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified. (wbostic)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting #211 MOTION for Thomas E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified. (wbostic)
March 18, 2013 Filing 220 DECLARATION re: #209 MOTION for H Miriam Farber to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed.(Farber, H)
March 15, 2013 Filing 218 RESPONSE to #172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Suazo, Raul)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING #212 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Third Party Complaint. Deadline 4/26/2013.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
March 14, 2013 Filing 219 MOTION for Philip Urofsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Buhler Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2013. (wbostic)
March 12, 2013 Filing 216 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service of Process and 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Redden, Joe)
March 12, 2013 Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Redden, Joe)
March 12, 2013 Filing 214 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron Corporation, filed.(Domingo, Christopher)
March 11, 2013 Filing 213 MOTION for Meir Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chevron Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Meir Feder)(Domingo, Christopher)
March 11, 2013 Filing 212 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Third Party Complaint by Buhler Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hilder, Philip)
March 8, 2013 Filing 211 MOTION for Thomas E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chevron Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas E. Lynch)(Domingo, Christopher)
March 7, 2013 Filing 210 MOTION to Dismiss #186 Third Party Complaint,,,,,,, by Chevron Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Soler, #7 Proposed Order)(Domingo, Christopher)
March 6, 2013 Filing 209 MOTION for H Miriam Farber to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Buhler Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2013. (cfelchak)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING #201 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Chevron Corporation to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond (Response due 3/7/2013), GRANTING #204 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Flowserve's Motion for More Definite Statement (Response due 3/1/2013)(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING #205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Third Party Complaint until 5/31/2013.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
March 1, 2013 Filing 206 RESPONSE in Opposition to #197 MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
February 27, 2013 Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Third Party Complaint by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
February 21, 2013 Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Flowserve's Motion for More Definite Statement (Doc. 197) by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
February 15, 2013 Filing 203 Joint BRIEF of Defendants re the Unconstitutionality of Applying the January 2, 2013 Amendment to the Anti-Terrorism Act to Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Summary Judgment re: #184 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and OpinionJoint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rodgers, Anne)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER setting briefing schedule regarding pending motions for reconsideration. Defendants' brief due 2/15/2013. Plaintiffs' response due 3/15/2013. Defendants' reply due 3/28/2013. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
February 4, 2013 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Third-Party Defendant Chevron Corporation to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Chevron Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Domingo, Christopher)
February 1, 2013 Filing 200 STATUS REPORT by ODELIA ABECASSIS, BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed.(Rodgers, Anne)
February 1, 2013 Filing 199 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve Corp., filed.(Carnegie, Jack)
January 31, 2013 Filing 198 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve Corp., filed.(Carnegie, Jack). Per attorney incorrect document attached. Attorney will refile correct document. Modified on 2/1/2013 (rsmith).
January 31, 2013 Filing 197 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Flowserve Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carnegie, Jack)
January 22, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H. Miller. Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, )
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 194 NOTICE of Post-Briefing Authority in Further Support of Their Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re: #190 Response in Opposition to Motion by All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Suazo, Raul)
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to B. Braun Medical Industries SDN BHD (Malaysia), B. Braun Melsungen A.G, Buhler Ltd., CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V., Cilag (AG International), filed.(thanniable, )
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to Chevron Corp., including as a successor to Texaco Corp., Daewoo International Corp., David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., Dow AgroSciences, Dresser International, Ebewe Pharma Ges M.B.H., Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Evapco Austria, F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Flowserve Corp., Flowserve Pompes S.A.S., Merial S.A.S., filed.(thanniable, )
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to Glaxo SmithKline Walls House, Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE, Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., Ingersoll-Rand Benelux N.V., Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Secalt S.A., Serono Pharma International, SmithKline Beecham International, Solar Turbines Europe S.A., St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, Sulzer Pumpen, filed.(sclement, )
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to Kia Motors, Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, N.V. Organon, Novo Nordisk, Railtech International, Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Rohm and Haas France S.A., Valtra do Brazil Ltda, Vitol, S.A., York Air Conditioning and Refrigeration FZE, filed.(sclement, )
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., The Weir Group, Vitol, S.A., Volvo Construction Equipment International AB, Woodhouse International, filed.(sclement, )
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to ABB Elektrik Sanayi A.S., ABB Industrie Champagne, ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., ASTRAZENECA AB, AWB, Ltd., Aesculap AG & Co. KG, Aesculap Surgical Instruments SDN, Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, filed.(thanniable, )
December 21, 2012 Summons Issued as to ABB Solyvent-Ventec, Aesculap Motric S.A., B. Braun Medical France, Evapco Austria, Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, filed.(thanniable, )
December 17, 2012 Filing 193 REPLY to Response to #184 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and OpinionJoint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.. (Rodgers, Anne)
December 17, 2012 Filing 192 Amended REPLY to Response to #185 MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Spagnoletti, Francis)
December 17, 2012 Filing 191 REPLY to Response to #185 MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Spagnoletti, Francis)
November 26, 2012 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition to #185 MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Suazo, Raul)
November 26, 2012 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition to #184 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and OpinionJoint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Suazo, Raul)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER entered GRANTING #187 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions. ( Replies due by 12/17/2012)(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 12, 2012 Filing 187 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions by All Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suazo, Raul)
October 30, 2012 Filing 186 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-GesellschaftmbH, AGCO Danmark A/S, AGCO S.A., ASTRAZENECA AB, AWB, Ltd., Aesculap AG & Co. KG, Aesculap Motric S.A., Aesculap Surgical Instruments SDN, Atlas Copco Airpower N.V., Atlas Copco CMT (Construction Mining Technique) Sweden AB, B. Braun Medical France, B. Braun Medical Industries SDN BHD (Malaysia), B. Braun Melsungen A.G, Bayoil (USA), Inc., Buhler Ltd., CG Holdings Belgium N.V. f/k/a Pauwels International N.V., Chevron Corp., including as a successor to Texaco Corp., Cilag (AG International), Daewoo International Corp., David B. Chalmers, Jr., David Brown Transmissions France, S.A., Dow AgroSciences, Dresser International, Ebewe Pharma Ges M.B.H., Eli-Lilly Export S.A., Evapco Austria, F. Hoffmann la Roche Ltd., Flowserve Corp., Flowserve Pompes S.A.S., Glaxo SmithKline Walls House, Glaxo Smithkline Egypt SAE, Glaxo Wellcome Export Ltd., Ingersol-Rand Italiana, SPA, Ingersoll-Rand Benelux N.V., Ingersoll-Rand World Trade, Ltd., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Kia Motors, Liebherr Export AG, Liebherr France, SA, Merial S.A.S., N.V. Organon, Novo Nordisk, NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., Railtech International, Renault Agriculture & Sonalika International, Renault V.I., currently called Renault Trucks SAS, Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Rohm and Haas France S.A., Secalt S.A., Serono Pharma International, SmithKline Beecham International, Solar Turbines Europe S.A., St. Jude Medical Export GmbH, Sulzer Pumpen, Sulzer Turbo Ltd., The Weir Group, Valtra do Brazil Ltda, Vitol, S.A., Volvo Construction Equipment International AB, Woodhouse International, York Air Conditioning and Refrigeration FZE filed by Bayoil (USA), Inc., David B. Chalmers, Jr., NuCoastal Corporation, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr..(Spagnoletti, Francis)
October 29, 2012 Filing 185 MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
October 29, 2012 Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration of #179 Memorandum and Opinion by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Anne)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER entered GRANTING #182 MOTION for Continuance of Status and Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference is reset for 2/1/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
October 22, 2012 Filing 182 MOTION for Continuance of Status and Scheduling Conference by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
October 12, 2012 Filing 181 Supplemental CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed.(Rodgers, Anne)
September 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER entered setting a status and scheduling conference: Scheduling Conference is set for 11/2/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
September 30, 2012 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING #172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 178 NOTICE of Post-Briefing Authority in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pakalka, William)
November 22, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE of Post-Briefing Authority in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pakalka, William)
November 1, 2011 Filing 176 Joint REPLY to Response to #172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Pakalka, William)
October 18, 2011 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition to #172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support, filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Suazo, Raul)
September 19, 2011 Filing 174 EXHIBITS re: #172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9-2, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit 22, #15 Exhibit 23, #16 Exhibit 24, #17 Exhibit 25, #18 Exhibit 26, #19 Exhibit 27, #20 Exhibit 28, #21 Exhibit 29, #22 Exhibit 30, #23 Exhibit 31, #24 Exhibit 32, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35)(Pakalka, William)
September 19, 2011 Filing 173 EXHIBITS re: #172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-2, #2 Exhibit 8-3, #3 Exhibit 8-4, #4 Exhibit 8-5, #5 Exhibit 8-6, #6 Exhibit 8-7, #7 Exhibit 8-8, #8 Exhibit 8-9, #9 Exhibit 8-10, #10 Exhibit 8-11, #11 Exhibit 8-12, #12 Exhibit 8-13, #13 Exhibit 8-14, #14 Exhibit 8-15, #15 Exhibit 8-16, #16 Exhibit 8-17, #17 Exhibit 8-18, #18 Exhibit 8-19 part 1, #19 Exhibit 8-19 part 2, #20 Exhibit 8-20, #21 Exhibit 8-21, #22 Exhibit 8-22, #23 Exhibit 8-23, #24 Exhibit 8-24, #25 Exhibit 8-25, #26 Exhibit 8-26, #27 Exhibit 8-27, #28 Exhibit 8-28)(Pakalka, William)
September 19, 2011 Filing 172 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment on Limitations Grounds and Memorandum in Support by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7-1, #9 Exhibit 7-2)(Pakalka, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 171 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #170 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, )
August 13, 2011 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT re: Discovery Hearing held on June 30, 2011 before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Court Reporter/Transcriber S. Carlisle. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2011., filed. (scarlisle)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER entered: On June 30, 2011, the Court held a premotion discovery conference to address a proposed motion for protection by Defendants and a proposed motion to compel by Plaintiffs in response to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Interrogatories, and Requests for Admissions, which were served on all Defendants on or about May 18, 2011. Plaintiffs withdrew their Requests for Admissions as to all Defendants, and for the reasons stated at the conference, this Court rules that Defendants are not compelled or required to provide responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents or Plaintiffs Interrogatories..(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
July 7, 2011 Filing 167 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Lauren Etlinger. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 6/30/2011 before Judge Lee H Rosenthal (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Stephanie Carlisle, filed. (ckrus, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 168 Minute entry for proceedings before the Honorable Lee H. Rosenthal. Discovery hearing held on June 30, 2011. The court heard argument and ruled on the defendants' objections to the plaintiffs' interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admissions, as stated on the record. The court requested counsel for El Paso to draft and to circulate an order reflecting this court's rulings. Appearances: David Dickens (by phone) for Pltfs. and, Francis Spagnoletti/David Toy/Anne Rodgers/Layne Kruse/John Shoemaker/Carl Parker/Don Nelson for Defts.(Court Reporter: S. Carlisle), filed.(leddins, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 166 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Discovery Hearing reset for 6/30/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, )
June 15, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Discovery Hearing set for 6/21/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, )
May 25, 2011 Filing 164 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #163 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, )
May 24, 2011 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT re: Status Conference held on April 18, 2011 before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mayra Malone. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2011., filed. (mmalone, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 162 STIPULATION re: Solely for Purposes of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Grounds of the Statute of Limitations Under the Antiterrorism Act by BAYOIL(USA), INC., YOSSEF COHEN, David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, Asael Fridman, Simon Lebowitz, Yissachar Zvi Lebowitz, Ester Devora Markowitz, Gerald Markowitz, Shifra Markowitz, Sarah Mordechai, Shirin Mordechai, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Rosalyn Shoshana Pearl, Aviva Rubinoff, Eliezer Rubinoff, Joseph Rubinoff, Michael Jay Rubinoff, Ora Rubinoff, Shoshana Rubinoff, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed.(Pakalka, William)
May 2, 2011 Filing 161 ANSWER to #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed.(Toy, David)
May 2, 2011 Filing 160 ANSWER to #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, with Jury Demand by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed.(Rodgers, Anne)
May 2, 2011 Filing 159 First AMENDED ANSWER to #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. (Parker, Carl)
May 2, 2011 Filing 158 First AMENDED ANSWER to #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed. (Parker, Carl)
April 28, 2011 Filing 157 ANSWER to #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed.(Parker, Carl)
April 28, 2011 Filing 156 ANSWER to #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed.(Parker, Carl)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SCHEDULING AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Joinder of Parties due by 5/2/2011. Written discovery requests on limitations to be served by 5/18/2011. Discovery on limitations to be completed due by 8/17/2011. Defendants' deadline to file Summary Judgment Motion on Limitations Filing due by 9/19/2011. Responses due by 10/18/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(clamey, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 155 Minute entry for proceedings before the Honorable Lee H. Rosenthal. Status conference held on April 18, 2011. The parties updated the court on the status of the case. The defendants will file their answers to the plaintiffs' amended complaint by May 2, 2011. The defendants will wait to add third parties until after this court rules on the summary judgment motion on limitations. The parties also agreed to a schedule for the summary judgment motion on limitations and the court will issue a scheduling order. To the extent the defendants moved for a rehearing of this court's ruling on their motions to dismiss, that motion was denied. Appearances: Raul Suazo/David Dickens for Pltfs. and Francis Spagnoletti/David Toy/Anne Rodgers/William Pakalka/Carl Parker/Don Nelson/Lauren Ettinger for Defts.(Court Reporter: M. Malone), filed.(leddins, )
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER; This updated Memorandum and Opinion corrects typos in this court's March 31, 2011 Memorandum and Opinion. The March 31 Memorandum and Opinion is otherwise unchanged.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Continuation) Parties notified.(bthomas, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 152 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Preliminary Chronology of Events Relevant to Statute of Limitations Defense by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed.(Pakalka, William)
April 11, 2011 Filing 151 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference reset for 4/18/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. NOTE: THE CHANGE IS TO TIME ONLY. (leddins, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Granting in part and Denying in part #127 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., Granting in part and Denying in part #128 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., Granting in part and Denying in part #130 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., Granting in part and Denying in part #133 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., and Granting in part and Denying in part #134 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Status Conference set for 4/18/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(clamey, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 149 PER CURIAM of USCA for the Fifth Circuit; re: #123 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 10-20309. This court is without jurisdiction and the appeal must be DISMISSED., filed.(jdav, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2010: #1 cover letter) (jdav, ).
July 23, 2010 Filing 148 REPLY in Support of #127 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by El Paso Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J)(Pakalka, William)
July 23, 2010 Filing 147 RESPONSE to #143 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION. (Parker, Carl)
July 23, 2010 Filing 146 RESPONSE to #143 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CNN Article, #2 Exhibit NY Times Article)(Parker, Carl)
July 23, 2010 Filing 145 REPLY to #142 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Spagnoletti, Francis)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered DENYING #125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b).(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition to #128 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, #134 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Suazo, Raul)
June 24, 2010 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition to #130 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Suazo, Raul)
June 24, 2010 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition to #127 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Suazo, Raul)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #137 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(esmith, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(esmith, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suazo, Raul)
June 18, 2010 Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suazo, Raul)
May 28, 2010 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition to #125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b), filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
May 24, 2010 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition to #125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b), filed by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order NuCoastal Opposition to Entry of Final Judgment)(Parker, Carl)
May 24, 2010 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Nucoastal Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Parker, Carl)
May 24, 2010 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Wyatt's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Parker, Carl)
May 24, 2010 Filing 132 RESPONSE to #125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) filed by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Wyatt Opposition to Plaintiffs' Entry of Final Judgment)(Parker, Carl)
May 24, 2010 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition to #125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b), filed by El Paso Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pakalka, William)
May 24, 2010 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
May 24, 2010 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition to #125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b), filed by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Parker, Carl)
May 24, 2010 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2010. (Parker, Carl)
May 24, 2010 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss #121 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Pakalka, William)
May 13, 2010 Filing 126 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 10-20309 re: #123 Notice of Appeal, filed.(rsmith)
May 7, 2010 Filing 125 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, Asael Fridman, Simon Lebowitz, Yissachar Zvi Lebowitz, Ester Devora Markowitz, Gerald Markowitz, Shifra Markowitz, Sarah Mordechai, Shirin Mordechai, Rosalyn Shoshana Pearl, Aviva Rubinoff, Eliezer Rubinoff, Joseph Rubinoff, Michael Jay Rubinoff, Ora Rubinoff, Shoshana Rubinoff, Frances Nati Schnall, Gila Schnall, Ira Yehuda Schnall, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/28/2010. (Suazo, Raul) Modified on 5/14/2010 (dhansen, ).
April 30, 2010 Filing 124 Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. DKT13 transcript order form was not mailed to appellant. Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #123 Notice of Appeal,,,,, Record submitted to the 5th Circuit, filed.(smurdock, ) Record submittet to the 5th Circuit but has not been certified, Appellant counsel to file an amended NOA to add additional parties. Modified on 5/27/2010 (smurdock, ).
April 29, 2010 Filing 123 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #118 Memorandum and Order, by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, Simon Lebowitz, Ester Devora Markowitz, Gerald Markowitz, Shifra Markowitz, Sarah Mordechai, Shirin Mordechai, Rosalyn Shoshana Pearl, Aviva Rubinoff, Eliezer Rubinoff, Joseph Rubinoff, Michael Jay Rubinoff, Ora Rubinoff, Shoshana Rubinoff, Frances Nati Schnall, Gila Schnall, Ira Yehuda Schnall, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0541-6321788), filed.(Suazo, Raul) Modified on 5/13/2010 (dhansen, ).
April 23, 2010 Filing 122 Certificate of Service re: #121 First Amended Complaint by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed.(Suazo, Raul) Linked to #121 on 4/23/2010 (ltien, ).
April 23, 2010 Filing 121 First AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against BAYOIL SUPPLY & TRADING LIMITED, BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, El Paso Energy Corporation, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL.(Suazo, Raul)
April 6, 2010 Filing 120 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #119 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dclark, )
April 5, 2010 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on January 21, 2010 before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Court Reporter/Transcriber FWarner. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010., filed. (fwarner, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #76 MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #72 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #26 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #74 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint. Plaintiff may replead by April 23, 2010..(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen M. McNabb and Caroline M. Mew terminated.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
March 10, 2010 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Stephen M. McNabb and Caroline M. Mew to Withdraw as Attorney by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Anne)
March 9, 2010 Filing 116 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bena Ochs as to ODELIA ABECASSIS re: #95 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed. (blacy, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 115 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bena Ochs as to ODELIA ABECASSIS re: #87 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (bdaniel, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 113 Letter from Attorney, Stephen W. Grafman re: Request for removal from case, filed. (bdaniel, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Extension of Time; Responses due by 2/22/2010.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Extension of Time; Response due by 2/22/2010.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jewilliams, )
February 22, 2010 Filing 108 REPLY to #97 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
February 22, 2010 Filing 107 Cross REPLY in Support of #74 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, filed by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION. (Parker, Carl)
February 22, 2010 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
February 22, 2010 Filing 105 Cross REPLY in Support of #72 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, filed by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr. (Parker, Carl)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
February 16, 2010 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to #97 due by 2/22/2010 (dgould)
February 12, 2010 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
February 12, 2010 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
February 11, 2010 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Bayoil (USA), Inc. and David B. Chalmers, Jr.'s Motion to Dismiss by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
February 9, 2010 Filing 100 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bena Ochs as to ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, et al re: #96 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed. (RTS; not deliverable as addressed)(sguevara, )
February 5, 2010 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition to #74 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, filed by IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL. (Suazo, Raul)
February 5, 2010 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition to #72 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL. (Suazo, Raul)
February 5, 2010 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition to #76 MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Suazo, Raul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/7/2010) (smurdock, ).
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #93 Motion for a fifteen page extension of the page limitation for the statement of points and authorities in opposition to Defendant Bayoil USA Inc and David B Chalmers Jr motion to dismiss.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to respond #72 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, #74 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,, #76 MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint,. Responses due by 2/5/2010.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, )
January 25, 2010 Filing 94 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Anne M. Rodgers. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 1/21/2010 before Judge Lee H Rosenthal (original). Court Reporter: F. Warner, filed. (pcrawford, )
January 25, 2010 Filing 93 Agreed MOTION for a fifteen page extension of the page limitation for the statement of points and authorities in opposition to Defendant Bayoil USA Inc and David B Chalmers Jr motion to dismiss by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suazo, Raul)
January 25, 2010 Filing 92 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Suazo, Raul)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #86 Motion for David J. Dickens to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Gavriel Mairone to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Michael J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Bena Ochs to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(dgould)
January 21, 2010 Filing 91 Minute Entry Minute entry for motion hearing held before Judge Lee H. Rosenthal on 1/21/2010: The parties presented arguments on El Paso's motion to dismiss for lack of standing and for failure to state a claim. The court took the motion under advisement and will issue a written ruling. Appearances: Michael Miller/Gavriel Mairone/ Bena Ochs/Raul Suazo/David Dickens for Pltfs. and Don Nelson/Carl Parker for Deft. Wyatt, Layne Kruse/Anne Rodgers for Deft. El Paso Energy and David Toy for Deft. Chalmers.(Court Reporter: F. Warner), filed.(leddins, )
January 20, 2010 *** Attorney Dale Jefferson added for all plaintiffs. (ltien, )
January 20, 2010 Filing 86 MOTION for David J. Dickens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2010. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION for Gavriel Mairone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2010. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 84 MOTION for Michael J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2010. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 83 MOTION for Bena Ochs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2010. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 82 MOTION for Michael J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2010. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 81 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul H. Suazo on behalf of ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. (Suazo, Raul)
January 20, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Jefferson on behalf of ODELIA ABECASSIS, MARGARITA ABRAMOV, YURI ABRAMOV, MAZAL ALEVI, ORTAL ALEVI, PNINA ALTEROVICH, ANAT AMAR, BINYAMIN AMAR, CHAGAI AMAR, DAVID MICHEL AMAR, ELIAD AMAR, GAFNIT AMAR, NEGBA AMAR, NOAM AMAR, SHAY AMAR, SHIR AMAR, TZACHI AMAR, TZURIA AMOSI, MAIMON AMSALEM, EFRAIM AROAS, IZAK AROAS, YAFFA AROAS, RACHEL ASSRAF, AVIGAIL AVDAEV, BEN TZION AVDAEV, OVADIA AVDAEV, OSHRA AVITZUR, GETAUN AZANU, HABASTA AZANU, SOLANGE AZRAN, MAXIM AZULAI, All Plaintiffs, GUY BARUCH, PERACH BARUCH, YEHIEL BORNSTEIN, DORON BOROCOV, KOCHAVA BOROCOV, MORDECHAI BOROCOV, NIR BOROCOV, YOCHEVET BOROCOV, HILA CHEN, YOSSEF COHEN, ZILA COHEN, HANI DRIMMER, AMRAM BEN EZRA, HAIM BEN EZRA, LEA BEN EZRA, MORDECHAI BEN EZRA, SOL BEN EZRA, YOSSEF BEN EZRA, BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL, filed. (Jefferson, Dale)
January 15, 2010 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT to #26 MOTION to Dismiss by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed.(Rodgers, Anne)
January 13, 2010 Filing 77 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed.(Toy, David)
January 5, 2010 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint, by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/26/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
January 5, 2010 Filing 75 First MEMORANDUM in Support re: #74 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint, by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed.(Parker, Carl)
January 5, 2010 Filing 74 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint, by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/26/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Carl)
January 5, 2010 Filing 73 First MEMORANDUM in Support re: #72 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed.(Parker, Carl)
January 5, 2010 Filing 72 First MOTION to Dismiss #3 Complaint, by Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/26/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Wyatt Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Parker, Carl)
January 4, 2010 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/25/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toy, David)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for BAYOIL(USA), INC. 1/5/2010; David B. Chalmers, Jr 1/5/2010.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sjones, )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for NUCOASTAL CORPORATION 1/5/2010; Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr 1/5/2010.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sjones, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Extend Time)(Parker, Carl)
December 29, 2009 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Francis)
December 22, 2009 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr, filed.(Parker, Carl)
December 18, 2009 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by El Paso Energy Corporation, filed.(Rodgers, Anne)
December 18, 2009 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BAYOIL(USA), INC., David B. Chalmers, Jr, filed.(Spagnoletti, Francis)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER entered setting a hearing. The plaintiffs request for oral argument on the motion is granted. A hearing is set for January 21, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11-B. That hearing will also serve as the initial pretrial and scheduling conference. The Order entered on December 3, 2009, (Docket Entry No. 62), is vacated, and the April 2010 conference is canceled.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(hler, )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Docketed in Error No Image - ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(hler, ) Modified on 12/3/2009 (hler, ).
December 3, 2009 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of Columbia. Case Number 1:09-cv-00001; received electronically Modified on 12/3/2009 (hler, ).
November 30, 2009 Case transferred out to the USDC of Southern District of Texas, Houston, pursuant to Court Order entered 11/19/2009. Sent to Court Extraction. (dr)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting #24 Defendant NuCoastal Corporation's Motion to Transfer, granting #25 Defendant Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.'s Motion to Transfer, and granting #27 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 19, 2009. (NP)
October 15, 2009 Filing 58 RESPONSE re #52 MOTION for Hearing filed by DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR, BAYOIL(USA), INC.. (Toy, David)
October 14, 2009 Filing 57 RESPONSE re #52 MOTION for Hearing filed by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
October 13, 2009 Filing 56 RESPONSE re #52 MOTION for Hearing Response to Plantiff's Motion for Oral Argument filed by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. (Grafman, Stephen)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #28 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue Before Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on October 13, 2009. (NP)
October 9, 2009 Filing 55 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 & 4 filed by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. re #48 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Defendant Wyatt's Agreed Motion to File Additional Medical Information Under Seal. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 9, 2009. (NP)
October 9, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION for Hearing by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Michael)
October 7, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McNabb, Stephen)
September 15, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION for Order Agreed Motion to File Additional Medical Information Under Seal by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Attachment A Notice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Grafman, Stephen)
September 14, 2009 Filing 49 REPLY to opposition to motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Bayoil (USA), Inc. and Chalmers MOTION to Dismiss Bayoil (USA), Inc. and Chalmers filed by DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR, BAYOIL(USA), INC.. (Toy, David)
September 14, 2009 Filing 48 REPLY to opposition to motion re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case, #24 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Volcker Report at p. 11, #2 Exhibit Corporate Charter, #3 Exhibit being filed under seal, #4 Exhibit being filed under seal, #5 Exhibit Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Affidavit)(Grafman, Stephen)
September 14, 2009 Filing 47 REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION. (McNabb, Stephen)
September 14, 2009 Filing 46 REPLY to opposition to motion re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION. (McNabb, Stephen)
September 14, 2009 Filing 45 REPLY to opposition to motion re #28 MOTION to Have Venue Considered Before Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION. (McNabb, Stephen)
September 14, 2009 Filing 44 REPLY to opposition to motion re #28 MOTION to Have Venue Considered Before Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION. (Rodgers, Anne)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #43 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Consent Motion for Extension of the Page Limitation for its Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. El Paso Corporation's reply memorandum shall not exceed 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 11, 2009. (NP)
September 10, 2009 Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mew, Caroline)
August 11, 2009 Filing 42 ERRATA by ALL PLAINTIFFS #39 Memorandum in Opposition filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Miller, Michael)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave for Attorney Don C. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 30, 2009. (lchhk2.)
July 28, 2009 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen W. Grafman, :Firm- Sharp & Associates, PLLC, :Address- 1215 19th Street, NW, DC 20036. Phone No. - 202-467-1609. Fax No. - 202-467-1625 by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Grafman, Stephen)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memoranda. Defendants' reply memoranda are due by September 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 22, 2009. (lchhk2.)
July 20, 2009 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Bayoil (USA), Inc. and Chalmers MOTION to Dismiss Bayoil (USA), Inc. and Chalmers, #28 MOTION to Have Venue Considered Before Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 MOTION to Dismiss, #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 MOTION to Dismiss, #25 MOTION to Transfer Case, #24 MOTION to Transfer Case by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION, DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mew, Caroline)
July 14, 2009 Filing 39 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Miller, Michael)
July 14, 2009 Filing 38 Memorandum in opposition to re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Bayoil (USA), Inc. and Chalmers MOTION to Dismiss Bayoil (USA), Inc. and Chalmers filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Michael)
July 14, 2009 Filing 37 Memorandum in opposition to re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Miller, Michael)
July 14, 2009 Filing 36 Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case, #24 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Miller, Michael)
July 14, 2009 Filing 35 Memorandum in opposition to re #28 MOTION to Have Venue Considered Before Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Miller, Michael)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of the Page Limitations for the Statement of Points and Authorities in Opposition of Defendant El Paso Corporation's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 7, 2009. (lchhk2.)
July 6, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Defendant El Paso's Motion to Dismiss by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Michael)
May 8, 2009 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Mohammed Attar, M.D. by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 [Renewed] Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 8, 2009. (lchhk2.)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions #23 , #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 , and #28 . Plaintiff's opposition(s) is/are due on July 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 8, 2009. (lchhk2.)
May 7, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Michael)
May 6, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION Supplement Motion #29 by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Supplement to Motion to Seal)(Grafman, Stephen)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #29 Motion to Seal Medical Records. This motion is denied without prejudice because movant did not comply with LCvR 7(m) which imposes a duty on counsel to confer with opposing counsel before filing any nondispositive motion and to "include in its motion a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." The court further observes that "Rule 5(j) of the civil rules of this Court," which movant cites in support of its motion, does not exist. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 6, 2009. (lchhk2.)
May 5, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION To seal medical record by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Atta MD CV, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Grafman, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION to Have Venue Considered Before Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 MOTION to Dismiss by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Malone, #2 Exhibit A (pt. 1) to Malone Declaration, #3 Exhibit A (pt. 2) to Malone Declaration, #4 Exhibit A (pt. 3) to Malone Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Malone Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Malone Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Malone Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Malone Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1-A (part 1), #4 Exhibit 1-A (part 2), #5 Exhibit 1-A (part 3), #6 Exhibit 1-B, #7 Exhibit 1-C, #8 Exhibit 1-D, #9 Exhibit 1-E, #10 Exhibit 2 (part 1), #11 Exhibit 2 (part 2), #12 Exhibit 2 (part 3), #13 Exhibit 2 (part 4), #14 Exhibit 2 (part 5), #15 Exhibit 3, #16 Exhibit 4 (part 1), #17 Exhibit 4 (part 2), #18 Exhibit 5, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Case by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Transfer, #2 Statement of Facts and authorities in support of motion to transfer)(Grafman, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Case by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Transfer, #2 Memorandum in Support facts and authorities in support of transfer, #3 Affidavit Nelson, #4 Affidavit Watson, #5 Affidavit Simmons)(Grafman, Stephen)
May 4, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss BAYOIL(USA),INC. and Chalmers by BAYOIL (USA),INC. and DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal, #2 Memorandum in Support Points and Authorities in support of motion to dismiss, #3 Declaration Chalmers on Chalmers, #4 Declaration Chalmers on Bay Oil (USA), Inc.)(Grafman, Stephen) Modified on 5/5/2009 to correct docket text and party (tr). Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect the proper name of the party as BAYOIL(USA),INC. (jeb, ).
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Consent Motion for Extension of the Page Limit Limitation for the Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 30, 2009. (NP)
April 29, 2009 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of El Paso Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis I. Spagnoletti and David Toy. Attorneys Spagnoletti and Toy are admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of defendants Bayoil (USA), Inc. and David B. Chalmers, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 20, 2009. (NP)
April 17, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen W. Grafman, :Firm- Sharp & Associates, PLLC, :Address- 1215 19th Street, NW. Phone No. - 202-467-4114. Fax No. - 202-467-1625 by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Grafman, Stephen)
March 26, 2009 NOTICE OF ERROR re #20 Affidavit; emailed to mmiller@doctoratlaw.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Counsel is advised to use the proper event to docket pleadings Return of Service Unexecuted/Executed (tr, )
March 25, 2009 Filing 20 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT by ODELIA ABECASSIS. (Miller, Michael) Modified on 3/26/2009 (tr).
March 23, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BAYOIL (USA), INC. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Grafman, Stephen) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect the proper name of the party as BAYOIL(USA),INC. (jeb, ).
March 23, 2009 RESET DEADLINE: BAYOIL (USA), INC.'s answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 23, 2009. (NP)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Defendant Bayoil (USA), Inc.'s Agreed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, Bayoil (USA), Inc.'s answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 23, 2009. (NP)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Defendant Chalmers Amended Motion for Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, defendant Chalmers' answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 18, 2009. (NP)
March 18, 2009 Defendant David B. Chalmers, Jr.'s answer is due by May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 18, 2009. (NP)
March 17, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Agreed Extension of Time by DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR (Attachments: #1 Order)(Grafman, Stephen)
March 16, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR (Attachments: #1 Order)(Grafman, Stephen)
March 16, 2009 RESET DEADLINE: El Paso Corporation's answer is due by May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 16, 2009. (NP)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Agreed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. El Paso's answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 16, 2009. (NP)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Defendant David B. Chalmers, Jr.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint because movant did not comply with LCvR 7(m), which imposes a duty on counsel to confer with opposing counsel before filing any nondispositive motion and to "include [in the motion] a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 16, 2009. (NP)
March 16, 2009 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESET DEADLINE: David B. Chalmers, Jr.'s answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 16, 2009. (NP) Modified on 3/16/2009 Please disregard this docket entry (tr).
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Defendant David B. Chalmers, Jr. Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, defendant Chalmers' answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 16, 2009. (NP) Modified on 3/16/2009 (tr).
March 13, 2009 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Carl A. Parker's Admission Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Mr. Parker is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of defendants Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr., Nucostal Corporation, and Bayoil (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 12, 2009. (NP)
March 11, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carl A. Parker, :Firm- Parker Law Firm, :Address- 1 Plaza Square, Port Arthur, TX. Phone No. - 409-985-8814. by BAYOIL (USA),INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Texas Bar Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac vice)(Grafman, Stephen)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Defendant Oscar Wyatt Jr.'s Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 9, 2009. (NP)
March 9, 2009 Defendant Oscar S. Wyatt, Jr.'s answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 9, 2009. (NP)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Defendant Nucoastal Corporation's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Nucoastal's answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 9, 2009. (NP)
March 9, 2009 Nucoastal's answer is due May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 9, 2009. (NP)
March 6, 2009 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for extension of time to file answer to complaint by OSCAR S. WYATT, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extension of time to file answer)(Grafman, Stephen)
March 6, 2009 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION. (Grafman, Stephen)
March 6, 2009 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Answer Complaint by NUCOASTAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Grafman, Stephen)
February 12, 2009 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYOIL (USA), INC.. (Grafman, Stephen) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect the proper name of the party as BAYOIL(USA),INC. (jeb, ).
February 12, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BAYOIL(USA), INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to complaint)(Grafman, Stephen)Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect the proper name of the party as BAYOIL(USA),INC. (jeb, ).
February 12, 2009 RESET DEADLINE. Defendant Bayoil (USA), Inc.'s answer is due April 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 12, 2009. (NP)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Defendant Bayoil (USA), Inc.'s Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, Bayoil's answer is due on April 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 12, 2009. (NP)
February 10, 2009 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION served on 1/22/2009, answer due 2/11/2009 (tr)
February 10, 2009 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BAYOIL (USA),INC. served on 1/22/2009, answer due 2/11/2009 (tr) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect BAYOIL (USA),INC. as the correct defendant in this case (jeb, ).
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Defendant El Paso Corporation's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, defendant El Paso's answer is due April 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 10, 2009. (NP)
February 9, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline M. Mew on behalf of EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Mew, Caroline)
February 9, 2009 Filing 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (McNabb, Stephen)
February 9, 2009 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabb, Stephen)
January 21, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing of Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL)
January 2, 2009 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against OSCAR S. WYATT, JR, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION,BAYOIL (USA),INC.,DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR, BAYOIL SUPPLY & TRADING LIMITED ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616017339) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tr) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect BAYOIL (USA),INC. as the correct defendant in this case (jeb, ).
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/2/2009. (tr)(See Order for full details)
January 2, 2009 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tr)
January 2, 2009 Summons Issued(7) as to OSCAR S. WYATT, JR, NUCOASTAL CORPORATION, NUCOASTAL TRADING CO., S.A., EL PASO ENERGY CORPORATION, BAYOIL (USA),INC., INC., DAVID B. CHALMERS, JR, BAYOIL SUPPLY & TRADING LIMITED. (tr) Modified on 5/7/2009 to reflect BAYOIL (USA),INC. as the correct defendant in this case (jeb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABECASSIS et al v. OSCAR S. WYATT, JR. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Naftali Lanzkron
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TZURIA AMOSI
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katerina Peline
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAGAI AMAR
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Glam
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yedidia Lanzkron
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meir Lanzkron
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Levenson
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rubinoff
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Markowitz
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiran Zayat
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Kleinman
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXIM AZULAI
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assaf Myara
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Glam
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirin Mordechai
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elisha-Sherf
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinnert Rahamin
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Eliran Rozenberg
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gili Hefetz
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gidon Regev
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shimon Levi
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Izhaki
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Ifat Sultan
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tzvi Yehuda Goldenberg
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazal Fahima
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAIMON AMSALEM
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hava Lanzkron
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaffa Rokach
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brakha Hershkovitz
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rokach
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avi Turgeman
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hana Segal
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Levi
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Meir Fahima
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shmuel Shfaim
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tzvia Ris
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmela Litmanovic
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TZACHI AMAR
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Rubinoff
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olesya Sorokin
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Yehuda Schnall
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairna Gantovnik
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Oziel
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Sarusi
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jay Rubinoff
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hila Levi
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MICHEL AMAR
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Segal
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IZAK AROAS
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORTAL ALEVI
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Kalfa
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Fahima
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Zeev Hanik
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERACH BARUCH
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidor Fahima
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pnina Drimmer
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noga Zayat
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ortal Ganon
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YURI ABRAMOV
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Tal
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naima Shimon
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Rubinoff
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOL BEN EZRA
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yekhiel Lanzkron
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avi Zino
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Plotkin
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orit Furman
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabi Fahima
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Segal
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amira Turgeman
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Refael Sommer
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuvia Ris
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANI DRIMMER
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michal Ganon
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLANGE AZRAN
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahel Drimmer
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Peline
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Shoshana Ris
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARUCH YEHUDA ZIV BRILL
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liat Rokach
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Shfaim
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Navon (Fahima)
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sorokin
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GETAUN AZANU
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZILA COHEN
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Shfaym
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOSSEF BEN EZRA
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilana Vaknin
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILA CHEN
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAT AMAR
Represented By: David J. Dickens
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: Michael J Miller
Represented By: Raul Herman Suazo
Represented By: Bena Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |