McPeters v. Edwards et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Karen McPeters
Defendant: Frederick E Edwards, Barbara Gladden Adamick, Montgomery County, Texas and Reed Elsevier, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv01103
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE of Receipt of Record on Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 114 Notice of Appeal (USCA No. 11-20373). Record received by USCA on 9/13/2011, filed.(glyons)
September 9, 2011 Filing 131 CD Request: re Certified Record on Appeal re: 129 Request for Record filed by Karen McPeters. Record Mailed Fed Ex per Request, filed.(lfilmore, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 130 Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 114 Notice of Appeal. A paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in 1 volumes. CD containing the electronic record is being forwarded. (USCA No. 11-20373), filed.(blacy, )
September 9, 2011 Supplemental Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: 114 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 11-20373, filed.(smurdock, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 129 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 114 Notice of Appeal by Karen McPeters, filed.(amaly)
August 31, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Documents for Rule 12(b)(6) Determination by Karen McPeters, filed. (Mays, Robert)
August 19, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Receipt of Record on Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 114 Notice of Appeal (USCA No. 11-20373). Record received by USCA on 8/15/2011, filed.(jekdall, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Receipt of Record on Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 114 Notice of Appeal (USCA No. 11-20373). Record received by USCA on 8/8/2011, filed.(jekdall, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 125 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 124 Request for Record filed by Montgomery County, Texas, Barbara Gladden Adamick, filed. (smurdock, )
August 9, 2011 Filing 124 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 114 Notice of Appeal by Barbara Gladden Adamick, Montgomery County, Texas, filed.(Johnson, Rayborn)
August 4, 2011 Filing 123 Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 114 Notice of Appeal. A paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in 7 volumes. CDs containing the electronic record have been forwarded. (USCA No. 11-20373) Tracking #1Z7262750347186872, filed.(blacy, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 122 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 121 Request for Record filed by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. (smurdock, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 121 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 114 Notice of Appeal by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed.(emathis, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 120 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 119 Request for Record Sent via FedEx, filed. (smurdock, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 119 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 114 Notice of Appeal, filed.(aboyd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2011: # 1 Unredacted) (aboyd, ).
June 15, 2011 Certified electronic record on appeal forwarded to Allison Miller re: 118 re: 114 Notice of Appeal. (USCA No. 11-20373), filed.(jdav, )
June 14, 2011 Filing 118 REQUEST for Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 114 Notice of Appeal, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted)(lcampbell) Modified on 6/14/2011 (lcampbell, ).
June 13, 2011 Electronic record on appeal certified (only) to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: 116 USCA Case Number, 114 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 11-20373, filed.(lfilmore, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 117 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Robert L. Mays Jr.. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes.. This order form relates to the following: 114 Notice of Appeal, filed.(saustin, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 116 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 11-20373 re: 114 Notice of Appeal, filed.(saustin, )
May 13, 2011 Filing 115 Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. DKT13 transcript order form was mailed to appellant. Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 114 Notice of Appeal, filed. (Attachments: # 1 NOA, # 2 Order, # 3 Docket Sheet, # 4 DKT13 form)(smurdock, )
May 13, 2011 APPEAL FILING FEE Filing fee re: 114 Notice of Appeal : $455.00, receipt number HOU012691, filed. Paid by Robert L. Mays, Jr., Atty. (ejones, )
May 12, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 113 Final Judgment, 111 Memorandum and Order, by Karen McPeters (Filing fee $ 455), filed.(rosaldana)
April 19, 2011 Filing 113 FINAL JUDGMENT.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
April 15, 2011 Filing 112 NOTICE Re: Robert L. Mays, Jr. will be on vacation between 6/20/2011-7/2/2011, filed. (aboyd)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 106 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration of 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order, DENYING 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order,.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
April 7, 2011 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM of Law by Karen McPeters, filed.(Mays, Robert)
April 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 4/6/2011. Arguments heard regarding Motion for Reconsideration. This matter is taken under advisement. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Mullkoff) William Scheel. Rayborn C Johnson, Allison Standish Miller, Robert L Mays, Emily L Shoemaker, S. Tameka Phillips, Amanda Marie Schaeffer, J. Allen Maines.(Court Reporter: Malone), filed.(sloewe)
April 5, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE of Resetting as to 105 Notice of Setting, 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order,. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Substitute, Attorney Miranda Tolar terminated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (aalonzo)
April 1, 2011 Filing 107 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney B. David L. Foster in place of Miranda Tolar by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Amanda)
March 28, 2011 Filing 106 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration of 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order, by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2011. (Mays, Robert)
March 11, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE of Setting as to 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order,. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe)
March 8, 2011 Filing 104 REPLY to Response to 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order,, filed by Karen McPeters. (Mays, Robert)
March 7, 2011 Filing 103 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order,, filed by Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration)(Miller, Allison)
February 15, 2011 Filing 102 PROPOSED ORDER re: 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order,, filed.(Mays, Robert)
February 15, 2011 Filing 101 MOTION for Reconsideration of 100 Memorandum and Order, by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Mays, Robert)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, Denying 71 Plaintiffs MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(aalonzo)
January 27, 2011 Filing 99 Supplemental BRIEF in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Karen McPeters, filed.(Mays, Robert)
January 6, 2011 Filing 98 Vacation Letter from Attorney, Robert Mays, Jr., filed. (bdaniel, )
December 29, 2010 Filing 97 Supplemental BRIEF in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Karen McPeters, filed.(Mays, Robert)
December 28, 2010 Filing 96 RESPONSE to 95 Brief in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss, filed by Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Tolar, Miranda)
December 23, 2010 Filing 95 Supplemental BRIEF in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Karen McPeters, filed.(Mays, Robert)
December 9, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 12/9/2010. Motions taken under advisement re: Motion-related deadline set re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b). Appearances:(Law Clerk: D. Mullkoff) Rayborn C Johnson, Allison Standish Miller, Robert L Mays.(Court Reporter: A. Manley), filed.(kstrouse, )
December 8, 2010 Filing 94 BRIEF in Opposition to Rule 12b(6) Motions to Dismiss by Karen McPeters, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation Hearing Brief No. 2, # 2 Continuation Hearing Brief No. 3, # 3 Continuation Hearing Brief No. 4, # 4 Continuation Hearing Brief No. 5, # 5 Continuation Hearing Brief No. 6, # 6 Continuation Hearing Brief No. 7)(Mays, Robert)
November 27, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE of Setting as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b). Parties notified. The parties should be prepared to discuss, in particular, Plaintiff's due process and equal protection claims under the U.S. Constitution, and whether such claims are sufficient for federal jurisdiction. As stated in the August 31 hearing, the Court will decide the pending motions to dismiss based on the Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe )
November 9, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (jhancock)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extend Dates. If a ruling in favor of Plaintiff occurs, the parties shall be required to submit a proposed scheduling order within 14 days of the ruling, proposing new deadlines for the completion of fact and expert discovery.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock)
November 5, 2010 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines in Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tolar, Miranda)
November 3, 2010 Filing 90 DESIGNATION of Rayborn C. Johnson, Jr. as attorney in charge of Montgomery County, Texas, filed.(Johnson, Rayborn)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING 87 Motion for Extension of Time; all defendants' unopposed joint motion and request for expedited ruling to stay responses to plaintiff's motions filed September 6, 2010. Document # 84 and Document# 86 is indefinitely STAYED until after such time as the Court has ruled on the Defendants' pending dispositive motions ( Document # 49 , 51 , 56 ).(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, ) Modified on 9/8/2010 (jegonzalez, ).
September 7, 2010 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Deadline for Responses to Plaintiffs' Filings of September 6, 2010, MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline for Responses to Plaintiff's Filings of September 6, 2010( Motion Docket Date 9/28/2010.) by Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING Motion for Stay of Deadline to Respond to Docket Nos. 84 & 86)(Miller, Allison)
September 6, 2010 Filing 86 Corrected MOTION to Certify Class by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Certifying Class)(Mays, Robert)
September 6, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION to Certify Class by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Certifying Class)(Mays, Robert)
September 6, 2010 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Parties by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extend Time to Join Parties)(Mays, Robert)
August 31, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 8/31/2010. The Court will rule on the motions to dismiss based on the 2nd Amended Complaint. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Mullkoff)., filed.(sloewe)
August 30, 2010 Filing 83 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition to 22 MOTION to Dismiss, 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b), filed by Karen McPeters. (Mays, Robert)
August 30, 2010 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Allow Supplemental Reply)(Mays, Robert)
August 30, 2010 Filing 81 Corrected RESPONSE in Opposition to 71 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, filed by Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Corrected Appendix to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's August 13, 2010 Motion to Amend)(Tolar, Miranda)
August 30, 2010 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition to 71 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, filed by Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Defendants' Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's August 13, 2010 Motion to Amend Complaint)(Tolar, Miranda)
August 24, 2010 Filing 79 REPLY in Support of 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix To Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(Tolar, Miranda)
August 23, 2010 Filing 78 Corrected REPLY to Response to 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b), filed by Frederick E Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Bryant v. Watts, # 2 Proposed Order GRANTING Motion to Dismiss)(Miller, Allison)
August 23, 2010 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b), filed by Frederick E Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Bryant v. Watts, # 2 Proposed Order GRANTING Motion to Dismiss)(Miller, Allison)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE AND ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 71 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2010 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
August 23, 2010 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, filed by Montgomery County, Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Forlano, Sara)
August 13, 2010 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support, 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Mays, Robert)
August 13, 2010 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition to 22 MOTION to Dismiss, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Mays, Robert)
August 13, 2010 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition to 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b), filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Mays, Robert)
August 13, 2010 Filing 71 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Grant leave to File Third Amended Complaint)(Mays, Robert)
August 13, 2010 Filing 70 Third AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc. filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List and Exhibits A-I, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits J-R)(Mays, Robert)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
August 10, 2010 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Excess Pages)(Mays, Robert)
August 5, 2010 Filing 67 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Montgomery County, Texas, filed.(Forlano, Sara)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: 5 Days. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2010, Joinder of Parties due by 9/6/2010, Pltf Expert Witness List due by 2/4/2011, Pltf Expert Report due by 2/4/2011, Deft Expert Witness List due by 3/4/2011, Deft Expert Report due by 3/4/2011, Discovery due by 5/4/2011, Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/4/2011, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/4/2011, Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2011, Jury Trial set for 10/3/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison), Deadlines terminated: Initial Conference set for 8/6/2010 at 11:15 PM in Room 3716 before Judge Keith P Ellison is CANCELLED. Parties submitted their Agreed DCO..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, )
July 27, 2010 Filing 65 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Karen McPeters, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Mays, Robert)
July 26, 2010 Filing 64 Letter from Robert L. Mays, Jr. re: Vacation, filed. (dgould)
July 25, 2010 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Frederick E Edwards, filed.(Miller, Allison)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denied in part 60 Motion to Determine Treatment of Motions ; Motion-related deadline set re: 60 Motion to Determine Treatment of Motions ( Plaintiff's Responsive briefs due by 8/15/2010).(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kstrouse, )
July 21, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. (Forlano, Sara)
July 20, 2010 Filing 60 MOTION Motion to Determine Treatment of Motions by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mays, Robert)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(esmith, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 54 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(esmith, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER mooting 13 and 22 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(esmith, )
July 14, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Under Rules 12(b)(6), 12(b)(1), and 9(b) by Frederick E Edwards, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/4/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Proposed Order GRANTING Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, # 9 Appendix, # 10 Appendix Tab A, # 11 Appendix Tab B, # 12 Appendix Tab C, # 13 Appendix Tab D)(Miller, Allison)
July 13, 2010 Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick, filed.(Forlano, Sara)
July 13, 2010 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Frederick E Edwards, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING Leave to File Extended Briefing)(Miller, Allison)
July 13, 2010 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File Excess Pages re: 52 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed.(Forlano, Sara)
July 13, 2010 Filing 52 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2010. (Forlano, Sara)
July 13, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas and Barbara Adamick by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Appendix 1)(Forlano, Sara)
July 13, 2010 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
July 13, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2010. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 6/30/2010 GRANTING 36 MOTION to Amend 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Shilpi Agarwal) Billy Shephed. Robert L Mays, Sara M Forlano, Emily L Shoemaker, Miranda Tolar.(Court Reporter: Manley), filed.(sloewe)
June 25, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE of Correction re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
June 16, 2010 Filing 46 JOINDER in 42 Response in Opposition to Motion, 40 Response in Opposition to Motion to Amend, filed by Frederick E Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order DENYING Motion to Amend; STRIKING McPeters's Second Amended Complaint; and REINSTATING McPeters's First Amended Complaint)(Miller, Allison)
June 16, 2010 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Judge Edwards to Answer or Move in Response to McPeters's Live Pleading by Frederick E Edwards, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING Extension of Time for Judge Edwards to Answer or Move in Response to McPeters's Live Pleading)(Miller, Allison)
June 16, 2010 Filing 44 APPENDIX re: 42 Response in Opposition to Motion by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
June 16, 2010 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER re: 42 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
June 16, 2010 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to 36 MOTION to Amend 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 14, 2010 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend re: 40 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Forlano, Sara)
June 14, 2010 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to 36 MOTION to Amend 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by Montgomery County, Texas. (Forlano, Sara)
June 9, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2010 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 36 MOTION to Amend 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. : Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. Parties may appear by telephone by calling in on the Court's Dial-In number 713250-5238.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
June 9, 2010 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER re: 36 MOTION to Amend 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed.(Mays, Robert)
June 9, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Amend 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Karen McPeters, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Second Amended, # 2 Exhibit A - I)(Mays, Robert)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 26 John Parker's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock)
June 7, 2010 Filing 35 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Frederick E Edwards served on 5/19/2010, answer due 6/9/2010, filed.(blacy, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 28 Emily Shoemaker's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 27 Allen Maines's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Tameka Phillips's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jhancock)
June 7, 2010 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss, filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION for S. Tameka Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2010. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION for Emily L. Shoemaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2010. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for J. Allen Maines to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2010. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for John G. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2010. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reed Elsevier, Inc. identifying Reed Elsevier U.S. Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 23 APPENDIX re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed.(Tolar, Miranda)
June 7, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Reed Elsevier, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2010. (Tolar, Miranda)
June 6, 2010 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER re 13 re: 20 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Mays, Robert)
June 6, 2010 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support, filed by Karen McPeters. (Mays, Robert)
June 6, 2010 Filing 19 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc. filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - I)(Mays, Robert)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(esmith, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(esmith, )
June 1, 2010 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant Honorable Frederick E. Edwards To Answer Or Move In Response To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Frederick E Edwards, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING Motion For Extension of Time)(Miller, Allison)
June 1, 2010 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re: 14 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed.(Forlano, Sara)
June 1, 2010 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2010. (Forlano, Sara)
June 1, 2010 Filing 13 DOCKETED IN ERROR. SHOULD BE MOTION TO DISMISS. ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Appendix 1)(Forlano, Sara) Modified on 6/2/2010 (sloewe).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER terminating as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
May 17, 2010 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, Reed Elsevier, Inc. filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I)(Mays, Robert)
May 17, 2010 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Montgomery County, Texas, filed.(Forlano, Sara)
May 11, 2010 ***Answer due for Reed Elsevier, Inc. 6/7/2010. (kgilyard, )
May 10, 2010 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Excuted as to Reed Elsevier, Inc. served on 4/7/2010, answer due 6/7/2010 (kgilyard, ) Modified on 5/11/2010 (kgilyard, ).
May 4, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Forlano, Sara)
May 3, 2010 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Montgomery County, Texas served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010, filed.(chorace)
May 3, 2010 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Barbara Gladden Adamick served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010, filed.(clamey, )
May 3, 2010 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Montgomery County, Texas served on 4/19/2010, answer due 5/10/2010, filed.(jhancock)
April 13, 2010 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Karen McPeters, filed.(Mays, Robert)
April 9, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL CONFERENCE. (Signed by Judge Keith P. Ellison) (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED DCO WITH PRESET COURT DATES)(dgould)
April 9, 2010 Summons Issued as to Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Texas, filed.(rosaldana)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/6/2010 at 11:15 PM in Room 3716 before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(dclark, )
April 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barbara Gladden Adamick, Frederick E Edwards, Montgomery County, Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-6214858) filed by Karen McPeters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mays, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPeters v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McPeters
Represented By: Robert L Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick E Edwards
Represented By: Allison Standish Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Gladden Adamick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Texas
Represented By: Sara M Forlano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier, Inc.
Represented By: J. Allen Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?