Tennessee Football, Inc. et al v. Matthews et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Tennessee Football, Inc. and National Football League Management Council
Defendant: Bruce Matthews and National Football League Players Association
Case Number: 4:2010cv02847
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Bruce Matthews, National Football League Players Association by Tennessee Football, Inc., National Football League Management Council, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal)(Clayton, J.)
August 11, 2010 Summons Issued as to National Football League Players Association, filed.(rsmith)
August 11, 2010 Summons Issued as to Bruce Matthews, filed.(rsmith)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/21/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Attachments: # 1 Judge's Procedure) Parties notified.(rsmith)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 39 receipt number 0541-6769504.) filed by Tennessee Football, Inc., National Football League Management Council.(Clayton, J.). Summons attached. Per attorney docketed in error. Modified on 8/11/2010 (rsmith, ). Modified on 8/12/2010 - Finance has voided this $39 payment.(ltien, ).
August 11, 2010 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 39 receipt number 0541-6769405.) filed by National Football League Management Council.(Clayton, J.). Summons attached. Per attorney docketed in error. Modified on 8/11/2010 (rsmith). Modified on 8/12/2010 - Finance has voided this $39 payment.(ltien, ).
August 10, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE Rule 7.1 Statement re: 1 Complaint, by Tennessee Football, Inc., filed. (Clayton, J.)
August 10, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce Matthews, National Football League Players Association (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-6765676) filed by Tennessee Football, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhbit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clayton, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Football, Inc. et al v. Matthews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Represented By: J. Josh Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Football League Management Council
Represented By: J. Josh Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?