In Re: BP plc Securities Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert Ludlow, Alan R Higgs, Johnson Investment Counsel Inc, Thomas Yuen, Sunmi Ahn, John P Miles, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, City of New Orleans Employee's Retirement System, Frances O. Goldman, Lore Greenfield, Eugene McClurg, Victor Skomedal, Cody A Nedved and The Oklahoma Police Pension & Retirement System
Defendant: BP plc, BP America Inc, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, Carl-Henric Svanberg, H Lamar McKay, William Castell, Paul Anderson, Antony Burgmans, Cynthia Carroll, Erroll B Davis, Jr, Iain C Conn, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, George David, Ian Davis, Douglas J Flint, Deanne S Julius, Ian MG Prosser, BP Exploration & Production Inc, Tom McKillop, Edmund John Philip Browne, Peter Sutherland, Transocean, Ltd., Transocean Deepwater Inc, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services Inc, TA through TZ Insurance Companies as Insurers of Transocean, CA through CZ Insurance Companies as Insurers of Cameron International, HA through HZ Insurance Companies as Insurers of Halliburton and State Street Bank and Trust Co.
Movant: Thomas P DiNapoli, Richard A Cordray, Sacramento County Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Peter D. Lichtman, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Paul Huyck, Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio and State Teachers Retirement System Of Ohio ("STRS")
Case Number: 4:2010md02185
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 1616 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Reply Regarding Their Cross-Motion for Reconsideration re: 1587 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed.(Ford, Sammy)
September 21, 2017 1615 ANSWER to Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 21, 2017 1614 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1613 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1612 ANSWER to Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 21, 2017 1611 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1610 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1609 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1608 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1607 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1606 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1605 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1604 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1603 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1602 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1601 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1600 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1599 Sealed Event, filed.
September 21, 2017 1598 Sealed Event, filed.
September 13, 2017 1597 STIPULATION re: Time for Defendants to answer Plaintiffs' Complaints by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 1, 2017 1596 STIPULATION re: Scheduling of Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of their cross-motion for reconsideration by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 1, 2017 1595 STIPULATION re: Scheduling of time to file Amended Complaint or Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 30, 2017 1594 STIPULATION re: Joint Stipulation and [PROPOSED] Order Regarding Filing of Answers by Avalon Holdings, Inc., filed.(Kendall, Joe)
August 23, 2017 1593 REPLY to Response to 1583 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, William Castell, Anthony Hayward, Robert A Malone, Peter Sutherland, Carl-Henric Svanberg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Thomas W. Taylor, # 2 Exhibit A to Taylor Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Taylor Declaration)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 18, 2017 1592 Featured Case ORDER granting 1591 Stipulation ( Defendant Malone's reply brief and Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion shall both be filed by 8/23/2017.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 16, 2017 1591 STIPULATION re: Scheduling of Defendant Robert Malone's reply brief and Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' cross motion by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 15, 2017 1590 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. (Buttacavoli, Steven)
August 4, 2017 1589 Featured Case ORDER granting 1588 Stipulation ; Defendant Malone's reply brief and Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' cross motion re: 1583 MOTION for Reconsideration ( Replies due by 8/18/2017)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 3, 2017 1588 STIPULATION re: Motion and Cross-Motion for Reconsideration Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
July 28, 2017 1587 RESPONSE in Opposition to 1583 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
July 27, 2017 1586 STIPULATION re: Filing of Answers by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
July 18, 2017 1585 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (Langsen, Erica)
July 17, 2017 1584 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Reconsideration re: 1583 MOTION for Reconsideration by Robert A Malone, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier)(Taylor, Thomas)
July 17, 2017 1583 MOTION for Reconsideration by Robert A Malone, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 30, 2017 1582 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaints is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendant Raineys Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED for the reasons set forth at the motion hearing on May 8, 2017 ; and Plaintiffs Motion to Strike the Declaration of Martin Moore is DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
June 30, 2017 1581 Sealed Order, filed. (arrivera, 4).
June 29, 2017 1580 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance - Glen DeValerio by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. (DeValerio, Glen)
June 23, 2017 1579 REDACTION to 1552 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1578 REDACTION to 1551 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1577 REDACTION to 1546 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Lucier Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Lucier Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Lucier Declaration, # 5 Affidavit of Martin L. Moore, # 6 Exhibit List to Moore Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 1-1 to Moore Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 1-2 to Moore Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 1-3 to Moore Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 2-1 to Moore Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 2-2 to Moore Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 2-3 to Moore Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 2-4 to Moore Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 2-5 to Moore Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 2-6 to Moore Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 2-7 to Moore Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 2-8 to Moore Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 2-9 to Moore Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 2-10 to Moore Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 2-11 to Moore Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 2-12 to Moore Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 2-13 to Moore Declaration)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 23, 2017 1576 REDACTION to 1529 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 58, # 2 Exhibit 59, # 3 Exhibit 60, # 4 Exhibit 61, # 5 Exhibit 62)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1575 REDACTION to 1533 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42, # 2 Exhibit 43, # 3 Exhibit 44, # 4 Exhibit 45, # 5 Exhibit 46, # 6 Exhibit 47, # 7 Exhibit 48, # 8 Exhibit 49, # 9 Exhibit 50, # 10 Exhibit 51, # 11 Exhibit 52, # 12 Exhibit 53, # 13 Exhibit 54, # 14 Exhibit 55, # 15 Exhibit 56, # 16 Exhibit 57)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1574 REDACTION to 1532 Sealed Event by HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33, # 2 Exhibit 34, # 3 Exhibit 35, # 4 Exhibit 36, # 5 Exhibit 37, # 6 Exhibit 38, # 7 Exhibit 39, # 8 Exhibit 40, # 9 Exhibit 41)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1573 REDACTION to 1531 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19, # 6 Exhibit 20, # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22, # 9 Exhibit 23, # 10 Exhibit 24, # 11 Exhibit 25, # 12 Exhibit 26, # 13 Exhibit 27, # 14 Exhibit 28, # 15 Exhibit 29, # 16 Exhibit 30, # 17 Exhibit 31, # 18 Exhibit 32)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1572 REDACTION to 1530 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1571 REDACTION to 1539 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 2)(Ford, Sammy)
June 23, 2017 1570 REDACTION to 1419 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Affidavit of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 23, 2017 1569 REDACTION to 1418 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1206 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1205 by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, Carl-Henric Svanberg, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 9, 2017 1568 STIPULATION re: 4:16-cv-01307 by Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., filed.(Ford, Sammy)
June 5, 2017 1567 Letter to Judge Ellison regarding Plaintiffs' June 1, 2017 correspondence by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 1566 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
June 2, 2017 1565 MOTION to Dismiss Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., et al., Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Carl-Henric Svanberg, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 2, 2017 1564 REPLY in Support of 1551 Sealed Event, filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd.. (Ford, Sammy)
June 1, 2017 1563 Supplemental RESPONSE to 1418 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1206 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1205 filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chart)(Ford, Sammy)
June 1, 2017 1562 NOTICE of Withdrawal Appearance of Patrick J. Somers by Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
May 26, 2017 1561 MEMORANDUM In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike re: 1552 Sealed Event by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 22, 2017 1560 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1559 STIPULATION re: Time to Answer the Deka Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 19, 2017 1559 STIPULATION re: Time to Answer the Deka Amended Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 19, 2017 1558 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 1557 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
May 18, 2017 1557 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on May 8, 2017, before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Ordering Party Matthew L. Tuccillo Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2017., filed. (gdye, )
May 9, 2017 1556 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas G. Hoffman for Transcript of Motion to Dismiss Hearing on 5/8/2017 before the Honorable Keith P. Ellison. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye, filed. (Hoffman, Thomas)
May 9, 2017 1555 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Taylor for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 5/8/17 before Judge Keith P. Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
May 9, 2017 1554 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Matthew L. Tuccillo for Transcript of Motion to Dismiss Hearing on 5/8/2017; before the Honorable Keith P. Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye, filed. (Tuccillo, Matthew)
May 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 5/8/2017. The Court hears argument on pending motions to dismiss. Motions taken under advisement. The Court grants motion to dismiss David Rainey as stated on the record. Appearances:Patrick Summers, Matthew Peller, John Esmay. Sammy Ford, IV, Marc I Gross, Matthew L Tuccillo, Marc De Leeuw, Thomas W Taylor, Richard C Pepperman, II, Andrew D Abramowitz.(Court Reporter: G. Dye)(Law Clerk: S. Fulford), filed.(arrivera, 4)
May 8, 2017 1553 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss entered. As set forth in their Opposition, the Deka plaintiff's do not seek to assert any "holder" claims as herein defined. (2) Defendants withdraw their motion to DISMISS with respect to the Deka action. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
May 5, 2017 1552 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 5, 2017 1551 Sealed Event, filed.
May 4, 2017 1550 STIPULATION re: Motion to Dismiss - Deka Plaintiff Holder Claims by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 28, 2017 1549 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. (McFarland, John)
April 28, 2017 1548 DESIGNATION of Melissa Ann Fortunato as attorney in charge of Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed.(McFarland, John)
April 24, 2017 1547 REPLY in Support of 1420 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1246 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1371 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1250 , filed by David Rainey. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 24, 2017 1546 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 24, 2017 1545 Featured Case ORDER granting 1544 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
April 21, 2017 1544 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
March 22, 2017 1543 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Document 1383 MOTION to Compel Production without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 22, 2017 1542 STIPULATION re: Stipulation and Order to Withdraw Individual Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Without Prejudice (MDL Dkt. No. 1383) by Avalon Holdings, Inc., The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed.(Kendall, Joe)
March 20, 2017 1541 NOTICE of Setting re: 1420 MOTION to Dismiss, 1418 MOTION to Dismiss. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
March 10, 2017 1540 Sealed Event, filed.
March 10, 2017 1539 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 9, 2017 1538 Sealed Event, filed.
March 9, 2017 1537 Sealed Event, filed.
March 9, 2017 1536 Sealed Event, filed.
March 9, 2017 1535 Sealed Event, filed.
March 9, 2017 1534 RESPONSE in Opposition to 1418 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1206 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1205 , filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii, Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund, Indiana Public Retirement System, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho, Public School and Education Employee Retirement Systems of Missouri, The Nebraska Investment Council, Virginia Retirement System. (Dubbs, Thomas)
March 9, 2017 1533 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 9, 2017 1532 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 9, 2017 1531 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 9, 2017 1530 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 9, 2017 1529 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 9, 2017 1528 RESPONSE in Opposition to 1420 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1246 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1371 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1250 , 1418 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1206 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1205 , filed by Avalon Holdings, Inc.. (Kendall, Joe)
March 9, 2017 1527 RESPONSE in Opposition to 1418 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1206 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1205 , filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Pension Reserves Investment Management Board of Massachusetts. (Reiser, Julie)
March 9, 2017 1526 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 8, 2017 1525 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend (Docket Entry No. 232 in 4:10cv4214).(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 6, 2017 1524 Featured Case ORDER granting 1523 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 2, 2017 1523 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Carlson Fonder AB, DNB Asset Management A.S., DNB Asset Management S.A., Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, GAM Fund Management Ltd., HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Officers Pension Fund Trustee Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, Skandia Global Funds plc, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2017. (Ford, Sammy)
March 2, 2017 1522 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert P Frutkin re: 1511 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
February 27, 2017 1521 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1511 Stipulation and Order, filed. (ssilva, 7)
February 21, 2017 1518 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on February 13, 2017 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathleen Miller. Ordering Party Robin Bleiweis Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2017., filed. (kmiller, )
February 17, 2017 1517 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Defendants' time to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion shall be extended to March 22, 2017.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
February 16, 2017 1520 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber re: 1511 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jdav, 4)
February 16, 2017 1519 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kirk B Hulett re: 1511 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jdav, 4)
February 16, 2017 1516 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 15, 2017 1515 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas W. Taylor for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 2/13/17 before Judge Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 15, 2017 1514 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs for Transcript of Final Settlement Approval Hearing on 02/13/2017, Judge Keith P. Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Block, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2017 1513 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Robin Bleiweis for Transcript of Judge Keith Ellison, 2/13/2017. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (mmapps, 4)
February 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. Final Hearing held on 2/13/2017. The Court grants Lead Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for final approval of class action settlement, grants Lead Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees and expenses, and enters final judgment. Appearances:Julie Riser, Jeff Block, Mark De Leeuw, Patrick Summers, Daryl Libow. Steven Buttacavoli.(Court Reporter: K. Miller)(Law Clerk: S. Fulford), filed.(arrivera, 4)
February 13, 2017 1512 Featured Case ORDER granting 1493 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting 1494 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses, and Final Judgment.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 10, 2017 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/9/2017. (rosaldana, 4)
February 10, 2017 1511 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (rosaldana, 4)
February 9, 2017 1510 STIPULATION re: Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 6, 2017 1509 PROPOSED ORDER re: 1493 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, 1494 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed.(Buttacavoli, Steven)
February 6, 2017 1508 DECLARATION of Eric Schachter re: 1493 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, 1494 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Buttacavoli, Steven)
February 6, 2017 1507 REPLY in Support of 1493 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, 1494 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Buttacavoli, Steven)
January 24, 2017 1506 REDACTION to 1486 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1505 REDACTION to 1481 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1504 REDACTION to 1482 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1503 ANSWER to 1252 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1502 ANSWER to 1255 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1501 ANSWER to 1264 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1500 ANSWER to 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1499 ANSWER to 1349 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 1498 ANSWER to 1306 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 13, 2017 1497 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rosaldana, 4)
January 13, 2017 1496 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 9, 2017 1495 DECLARATION of Julie Goldsmith Reiser and Glen DeValerio re: 1493 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, 1494 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to the Joint Declaration)(Reiser, Julie)
January 9, 2017 1494 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2017. (Reiser, Julie)
January 9, 2017 1493 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Approval Order)(Reiser, Julie)
December 16, 2016 1492 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jengonzalez, 7)
December 9, 2016 1491 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Holmes re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (bgarces, 7)
December 9, 2016 1488 ANSWER to 1210 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 9, 2016 1487 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1486 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1485 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1484 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1483 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1482 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1481 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1480 Sealed Event, filed.
December 9, 2016 1479 Sealed Event, filed.
December 8, 2016 1490 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert P Frutkin as to Thomas Yuen re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (bcampos, 1)
December 7, 2016 1478 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert P Frutkin as to Sunmi Ahn re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (blacy, 4)
December 7, 2016 1477 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
December 6, 2016 1489 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Amber M. Nesbitt as to Ralph Whitley re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (bcampos, 1)
December 2, 2016 1476 Featured Case ORDER granting 1475 Stipulation Regarding Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling. (Response to 1420 MOTION to Dismiss due by 2/16/2017. Reply briefs to be filed 45 days thereafter.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 2, 2016 1475 STIPULATION re: Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 1, 2016 1474 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Motions to Dismiss Various Individual Actions(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 29, 2016 1472 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to All Plaintiffs re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (drodriguez, 7)
November 28, 2016 1473 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Amber M. Nesbitt atty for Ralph Whitley re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
November 22, 2016 1471 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Aasim Stibbins re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (avleal, 1)
November 22, 2016 1470 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (avleal, 1)
November 22, 2016 1469 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Holmes re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 22, 2016 1468 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Christopher Donnelly re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 22, 2016 1467 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jonathan Rich re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 22, 2016 1466 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (avleal, 1)
November 22, 2016 1465 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lionel Howard Sutton re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (avleal, 1)
November 22, 2016 1464 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jeroen van Kwawegen re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (avleal, 1)
November 22, 2016 1463 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Amy Miller re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (avleal, 1)
November 22, 2016 1462 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jeremy Friedman re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (smurdock, 4)
November 22, 2016 1461 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to City of New Orleans Employee's Retirement System, Frances O. Goldman, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, John P Miles re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (amireles, 2)
November 17, 2016 1460 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert P Frutkin re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (mmapps, 4)
November 16, 2016 1457 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Any answers to the amended complaints in the above-captioned actions shall be filed by December 9, 2016. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
November 16, 2016 1454 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
November 16, 2016 1453 STIPULATION re: Filing of Answers by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
November 15, 2016 1459 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jeroen van Kwawegen re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (cvillegas, 7)
November 14, 2016 1456 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kirk B Hulett as to Thomas Yuen re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (vcantu, 5)
November 14, 2016 1455 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber as to Sunmi Ahn, Sunmi Ahn re: 1445 Notice of Setting, filed. (fcarbia, 2)
November 14, 2016 1452 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Christophe Donnelly as to Christopher Donnelly re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
November 14, 2016 1451 Mail Returned Undeliverable to Jonathan Rich as to Robert Ludlow re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
November 14, 2016 1450 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Amber M. Nesbitt as to Ralph Whitley re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
November 11, 2016 1458 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. WHEREAS, pursuant to the order entered on October 24, 2016, the Defendants' response is due on November 30, 2016. WHEREAS, the parties have continued to meet and confer in an effort to resolve their disputes and would benefit from more time to continue doing so; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties: Defendants' time to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion shall be extended to January 20, 2017. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
November 10, 2016 1449 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber re: 1441 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (agarcia, 7)
November 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2016. Defendant's Request for Final Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiffs to submit motion for leave to amend complaint within 15 days. Defendants to file response within thirty days thereafter. Appearances: Thomas W Taylor, Ronald S Kravitz (Court Reporter: F. Warner) (Law Clerk: S. Fulford), filed.(arrivera, 4)
November 7, 2016 1448 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Aasim Stibbins re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 7, 2016 1447 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jonathan Rich re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 7, 2016 1446 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Christopher Donnelly re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
November 4, 2016 1445 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Final Approval Hearing set for 2/13/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (gkelner, 4)
November 4, 2016 1444 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 2, 2016 1441 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 12:00 PM Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (gkelner, 4)
October 31, 2016 1443 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber as to Sunmi Ahn re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
October 31, 2016 1442 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kirk B Hulett as to Thomas Yuen re: 1440 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
October 24, 2016 1440 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Defendants' time to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion shall be extended to November 30, 2016.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
October 24, 2016 1439 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
October 13, 2016 1438 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-457. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
October 7, 2016 1437 Correspondence to Judge Ellison Regarding Withdrawal of Requests for Exclusion by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
October 6, 2016 1436 Correspondence to Judge Ellison by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed.(Reiser, Julie)
October 3, 2016 1435 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1072. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1434 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1085. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1433 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1068. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1432 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1087. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1431 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:15-cv-2704. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1430 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1075. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1429 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER entered as to case 4:12-cv-1272. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1428 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1073. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1427 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-0980. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1426 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1084. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1425 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1083. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
October 3, 2016 1424 Correspondence to District Judge Ellison by Carol Hill Albert Trust, Michael Delpriore, Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., Gargoyle Strategic Investments LLC, Bennett Goodman, Howard Hughes Medical Institute, Huff Energy Offshore Ltd, Robert Johnston, Musashi II Ltd, PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed.(Dees, Tom)
October 3, 2016 1423 RESPONSE to 1402 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Regarding Exclusion from the Class Action Settlement, filed by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles. (Taylor, Thomas)
September 30, 2016 1422 RESPONSE to 1402 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Lead Plaintiffs' Response To Individual Action Plaintiffs' Post-Argument Submission Regarding Exclusion From The Class Action Settlement, filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Reiser, Julie)
September 28, 2016 1421 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re: 1420 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1246 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1371 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1250 by David Rainey, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 1420 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1246 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1371 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1250 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, 1369 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, 1247 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1244 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, 1373 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1370 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1245 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1368 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by David Rainey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 1419 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 28, 2016 1418 MOTION to Dismiss 1374 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1263 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1206 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1372 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1205 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1371 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1247 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1244 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, 1373 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1370 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1245 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1208 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1262 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, 1246 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1250 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, 1369 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, 1207 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 1368 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Carl-Henric Svanberg, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 1417 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:13-cv-0069. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1416 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:12-cv-2362. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1415 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1280. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1414 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:13-cv-129. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1413 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1281. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1412 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1279. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1411 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:13-cv-1393. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1410 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:14-cv-1418. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1409 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:12-cv-3621. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1408 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:13-cv-3397. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 28, 2016 1407 Featured Case ORDER entered as to case 4:12-cv-1256. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
September 27, 2016 1406 Featured Case ORDER granting 1404 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 27, 2016 1405 Featured Case ORDER granting 1403 Stipulation re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel ; ( Response to 1383 MOTION to Compel Production due by 10/28/2016.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 27, 2016 1404 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
September 27, 2016 1403 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 26, 2016 1402 BRIEF INDIVIDUAL ACTION PLAINTIFFS POST-ARGUMENT SUBMISSION REGARDING EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Avalon Holdings, Inc., BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA, Bayerninvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft, MBH, Caisse de Depot El Placement Du Quebec, City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, City of Westminster Council Superannuation Fund, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Cumbria County Council, Deka International S.A. Luxemburg, Deka Investment GmbH, Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii, GIC Private Limited, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, ING (L) Sicav, ING Fund Management B.V., Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund, Illinois State Board of Investment, Indiana Public Retirement System, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Fund Management S.A., Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund, John Hancock Caital Series, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund II, John Hancock Tax Advantage Dividend Income Fund, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lincolnshire County Council, Lnsfrskringar AB, London Borough of Redbridge Pension Fund, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System, MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND, Merchant Navy Officers Pension Fund Trustee Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited, Metzler Investment GmbH, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nomura Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., Norges Bank, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Northern Ireland Local Government Officers' Superannuation Committee, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co., Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, Nykredit Asset Management, Ontario Pension Board, Orange County Employees Retirement System, Premier LTD, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, Public School and Education Employee Retirement Systems of Missouri, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System, San Mateo County Employees' Retirement Association, Shell Pension Trust, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Bewaarneming APG-IS 1, Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Stichting tot Bewaring Cordares Subfonds Aandelen Europa Actief Beheer, Teacher Retirement System of Texas, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Bank of America Pension Plan, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, The Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan, The Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., Utah Retirement Systems, Verizon Investment Management Corp., Virginia Retirement System, Washington State Investment Board, Xerox Pensions Limited, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tuccillo, Matthew) Modified on 9/27/2016 (olindor, 4).
September 23, 2016 1401 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 1400 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
September 22, 2016 1400 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on September 20, 2016 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mayra Malone. Ordering Party Thomas W. Taylor Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2016., filed. (mmalone, )
September 22, 2016 1399 CORRECTED EXHIBIT A re: 1395 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Notice to the Settlement Class by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed.(Buttacavoli, Steven) Modified on 9/22/2016 (arrivera, 4).
September 22, 2016 1398 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sammy Ford IV for Transcript of Hearing, 9/20/2016, Judge Keith P. Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mayra Malone, filed. (Ford, Sammy)
September 20, 2016 1397 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Taylor for Transcript of Hearing on 9/20/16 before Judge Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mayra Malone, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
September 20, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. Conference held on 9/20/2016. Individual action plaintiffs ("IAPs") advise the Court of their proposal for effecting exclusion from the class settlement. The Court orders the IAPs to submit briefing on this proposal within five days. Responses are due five days thereafter. Appearances:Jaren Janghorbani, John Esmay, Matthew Peller,Jonathan Uslaner, Joshua Devore, Mike Hamson, Jeffrey Block. Matthew L Tuccillo, Marc De Leeuw, Thomas W Taylor, Julie Reiser, Mark C Molumphy.(Court Reporter: M. Malone) (Law Clerk: S. Fulford), filed.(arrivera, 4)
September 19, 2016 1396 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Conference set for 9/20/2016 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
September 15, 2016 1395 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Notice to the Settlement Class by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement)(Buttacavoli, Steven)
September 8, 2016 1394 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 8, 2016 1393 NOTICE Relating to Filing Consolidated Complaint Under Seal by John Hancock Caital Series, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund II, John Hancock Tax Advantage Dividend Income Fund, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
September 8, 2016 1392 Sealed Event, filed.
September 7, 2016 1391 STIPULATION re: Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 30, 2016 1389 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 29, 2016 1388 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 26, 2016 1387 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 1383 MOTION to Compel Production Responses due by 9/28/2016.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 26, 2016 1386 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 9, 2016 1384 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 8, 2016 1385 Featured Case Stipulation and ORDER re: 1380 Stipulation (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 8, 2016 1383 MOTION to Compel Production by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Avalon Holdings, Inc., BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA, Caisse de Depot El Placement Du Quebec, City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Cumbria County Council, Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund, KBC Asset Management NV, Lincolnshire County Council, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, Metzler Investment GmbH, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Northern Ireland Local Government Officers' Superannuation Committee, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co., Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, Nykredit Asset Management, Ontario Pension Board, Orange County Employees Retirement System, Premier LTD, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System, San Mateo County Employees' Retirement Association, Shell Pension Trust, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Utah Retirement Systems, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memo, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
August 8, 2016 1382 MOTION to Compel Production by Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
August 8, 2016 1381 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 8, 2016 1380 STIPULATION re: Motions to Amend and Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 8, 2016 1379 PROPOSED ORDER re Motions to Amend and Scheduling, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 1, 2016 1378 Featured Case ORDER granting 1377 MOTION for Meghan Joan Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
July 28, 2016 1377 MOTION for Meghan Joan Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice for GIC Private Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2016. (jguajardo, 4)
July 26, 2016 1376 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 1375 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Filing Amended Petition And Responding To Same (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 26, 2016 1375 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Filing Amended Petition And Responding To Same by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Taylor, Thomas)
July 19, 2016 1374 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, State-Boston Retirement System.(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1373 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority.(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1372 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan.(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1371 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P..(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1370 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by HESTA Super Fund.(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1369 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York.(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1368 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro.(Ford, Sammy)
July 19, 2016 1367 Sealed Event, filed.
July 19, 2016 1366 Sealed Event, filed.
July 19, 2016 1365 Sealed Event, filed.
July 19, 2016 1364 Sealed Event, filed.
July 19, 2016 1363 Sealed Event, filed.
July 19, 2016 1362 Sealed Event, filed.
July 19, 2016 1361 Sealed Event, filed.
July 18, 2016 1360 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sammy Ford IV, counsel for BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., filed. (Ford, Sammy)
July 8, 2016 1359 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 1225 MOTION for Joinder as to 1221 Memorandum,,,,,, 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 1217 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 1218 Memorandum,,,, (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
June 21, 2016 1358 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
June 20, 2016 1357 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Scheduling re Mondrian Global Equity Fund et al individual action by BP America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc, BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 2, 2016 *** Status Conference set for 6/2/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison is CANCELLED. Parties need not appear., filed. (sloewe, 4)
May 31, 2016 1356 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendants motion for summary judgment. Specifically, the Court holds that Plaintiffs have established that there is a genuine dispute of material fact with respect to: the falsity and scienter of Suttless statements on April 24th, April 28th, and April 29th; loss causation for the decline in value of BP ADS on April 29th and May 3rd; and damages for the decline in value of BP ADSon April 29th and May 3rd. Defendants are entitled to judgment has a matter of law, however, to the extent that Plaintiffs claims rely on the decline in value of BP ADS on May 10, June 1, June 9, or June 14. As a result, Defendant Hayward is entitled to judgment as a matter of law as to Plaintiffs Section 10(b) claim because Plaintiffs have failed to provide sufficient evidence that his alleged misrepresentation proximately caused Plaintiffs loss. The Court also DENIES Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment in its entirety. Although Plaintiffs have provided sufficient evidence to create triable issues of fact, their evidence is insufficient to warrant judgment as a matter of law in their favor. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
May 31, 2016 1355 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/2/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
May 31, 2016 1354 Sealed Order, filed.
May 5, 2016 1353 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-10) re: transfer of case 1:16cv2719 from Southern District of New York. (ltien, 4)
May 2, 2016 1350 The petition for a writ of certiorari filed with the Supreme Court has been denied (USCA No. 14-20420) (USSC No. 15-952), filed.(bcampos, 1)
April 14, 2016 1349 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles filed by Shell Pension Trust, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System.(Kendall, Joe)
April 14, 2016 1348 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP Holdings North America Limited, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Avalon Holdings, Inc., BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA, Bayerninvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft, MBH, Caisse de Depot El Placement Du Quebec, City of Westminster Council Superannuation Fund, Cumbria County Council, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund, Lincolnshire County Council, London Borough of Redbridge Pension Fund, Metzler Investment GmbH, Nomura Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., Northern Ireland Local Government Officers' Superannuation Committee, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co., Nykredit Asset Management, Ontario Pension Board, Orange County Employees Retirement System, Premier LTD, San Mateo County Employees' Retirement Association, The Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan, The Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, Utah Retirement Systems, Xerox Pensions Limited.(Kendall, Joe)
April 8, 2016 1347 Featured Case AGREED ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIALITY(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
April 8, 2016 1346 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality re John Hancock Individual Action, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 7, 2016 1345 RESPONSE to 1341 Memorandum, on Loss Causation, filed by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 4, 2016 1344 ANSWER to 1279 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 4, 2016 1343 ANSWER to 1280 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 4, 2016 1342 ANSWER to 1271 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 28, 2016 1341 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: 1081 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 1340 Order by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie G. Reiser, # 2 Exhibit 151, # 3 Exhibit 152, # 4 Exhibit 153, # 5 Exhibit 154, # 6 Exhibit 155, # 7 Exhibit 156, # 8 Exhibit 157, # 9 Exhibit 158, # 10 Exhibit 159)(Reiser, Julie)
March 17, 2016 1340 Featured Case ORDER. Supplemental Briefing due by 3/28/2016. Responses due by 4/7/2016.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 11, 2016 1339 REPLY in Support of 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York. (Ford, Sammy)
March 7, 2016 1338 Featured Case ORDER granting 1332 Motion for Todd Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 4, 2016 1337 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Steven Buttacavoli for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 2/26/2016 before Judge Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Buttacavoli, Steven)
March 4, 2016 1336 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 1333 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (mmapps, 4)
March 3, 2016 1335 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Taylor for Transcript of Status Conference on 10/28/2015 before Judge Keith P Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
March 3, 2016 1334 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Taylor for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 2/26/16 before Judge Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
March 3, 2016 1333 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment held on 2-26-16 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Georgia Lucier Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2016., filed. (lwells, )
March 3, 2016 1332 MOTION for Todd Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2016. (McFarland, John)
March 2, 2016 1331 Featured Case ORDER granting 1328 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: 1225 MOTION for Joinder as to 1221 Memorandum,,,,,, 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 1217 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 1218 Memorandum,,,,. Replies due by 3/17/2016.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 2, 2016 1330 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lawrence Mehringer for Transcript of 02/26/2016. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Gottlieb, Louis)
March 2, 2016 1329 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jessica Cuccurullo for David Kaplan for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 2/26/16 before Judge Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Kaplan, David)
March 2, 2016 1328 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time and Pages for Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
February 26, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 2/26/2016. Arguments for Summary Judgment heard. This matters are taken under advisement. Appearances:(Law Clerk: S. Fulford). Matthew L Tuccillo, Marc De Leeuw, Richard C Pepperman, II, Julie Reiser.(Court Reporter: Laura Wells), filed.(sloewe, 4)
February 24, 2016 1327 Featured Case ORDER; Re: 1318 Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Connecticut Action(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 24, 2016 1326 Featured Case ORDER; Re: 1319 Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Houston Action(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 24, 2016 1325 Featured Case ORDER; Re: 1320 Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the KBC Asset Mgmt Action.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 24, 2016 1324 Featured Case ORDER; Re: 1321 Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Deutsche Asset Mgmt Action(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 24, 2016 1323 Featured Case ORDER; Re: 1322 Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Avalon Action. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 23, 2016 1322 PROPOSED ORDER re Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Avalon Action, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 1321 PROPOSED ORDER re Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Deutsche Asset Mgmt Action, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 1320 PROPOSED ORDER re Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the KBC Asset Mgmt Action, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 1319 PROPOSED ORDER re Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Houston Action, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 1318 PROPOSED ORDER re Replication of Issues Resolved by Prior Orders pertaining to the Connecticut Action, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 *** Correction on Notice of RESETTING. On Friday, 2/26/2016, the Court will NOT hear the Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony from Chad Coffman. It will only be hearing arguments on the two motions for summary judgment., filed. (sloewe, 4)
February 23, 2016 1317 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified.This hearing currently set for 10:30 a.m. on February 25, 2016 must be reset due to a multi-defendant criminal jury trial currently underway. The Motion Hearing has been REset for 2/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. This court still intends to hear arguments pertaining to the following motions filed in the 10-md-2185 federal securities class action: (1) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; (3) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony from Chad Coffman. All parties may appear by telephone by calling in on the Court's Dial-In number at 713-250-5238, filed. (sloewe, 4)
February 17, 2016 1316 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 17, 2016 1315 STIPULATION re: Dismissal of Claim and Answer Deadline by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 17, 2016 1314 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sammy Ford IV for Transcript of Status conference; 5/13/15; Ellison. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (Ford, Sammy)
February 12, 2016 1313 Featured Case ORDER granting 1307 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Alan Callier terminated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 12, 2016 1312 Featured Case ORDER granting 1308 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Alan Callier terminated as counsel for Pension Reserves Investment Management Board of Massachusetts.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 12, 2016 1308 First MOTION for Joseph Alan Callier to Withdraw as Attorney by Pension Reserves Investment Management Board of Massachusetts, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2016. (Callier, Joseph)
February 12, 2016 1307 First MOTION for Joseph Alan Callier to Withdraw as Attorney by Thomas P DiNapoli, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2016. (Callier, Joseph)
February 11, 2016 1311 Featured Case ORDER granting 1304 MOTION for Lawrence P. Eagel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
February 11, 2016 1310 Featured Case ORDER granting 1303 Motion for David J. Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 11, 2016 1309 Featured Case ORDER granting 1305 Motion for Jeffrey Squire to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 11, 2016 1306 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System.(Mustokoff, Matthew)
February 11, 2016 1305 MOTION for Jeffrey H. Squire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2016. (McFarland, John)
February 11, 2016 1304 MOTION for Lawrence P. Eagel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2016. (McFarland, John)
February 11, 2016 1303 MOTION for David J. Stone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2016. (McFarland, John)
February 10, 2016 1302 Featured Case ORDER granting 1301 Motion to Seal Fourth Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws and English Common Law.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 10, 2016 1301 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/2/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mustokoff, Matthew)
February 10, 2016 1300 Sealed Event, filed.
February 10, 2016 1299 Featured Case ORDER granting 1297 Motion to file Amended Complaint under seal.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 10, 2016 1298 Featured Case ORDER granting 1295 Motion to file Amended Complaint under seal..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 9, 2016 1297 MOTION to file Amended Complaint Under Seal by KBC Asset Management NV, Union Asset Management Holding AG, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McFarland, John)
February 9, 2016 1296 Sealed Event, filed.
February 9, 2016 1295 MOTION to file Amended Complaint Under Seal by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McFarland, John)
February 9, 2016 1294 Sealed Event, filed.
February 9, 2016 1293 Featured Case ORDER granting 1292 Motion to Seal second amended complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 9, 2016 1292 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Kendall, Joe)
February 9, 2016 1291 Sealed Event, filed.
February 9, 2016 1290 Featured Case ORDER granting 1289 Motion to Seal 115 Second Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 9, 2016 1289 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Avalon Holdings, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Kendall, Joe)
February 9, 2016 1288 Sealed Event, filed.
February 8, 2016 1287 Featured Case ORDER granting 1220 Motion to Amend and Scheduling.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 4, 2016 1286 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, Carl-Henric Svanberg, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
February 4, 2016 1285 PROPOSED ORDER re Motions to Amend and Scheduling, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 4, 2016 1284 NOTICE of Pendency of Class Action by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (Block, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2016 1283 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 1282 Stipulation. Answer or otherwise respond to First and Second Amended Complaints due by 3/4/2016.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4)
January 25, 2016 1282 STIPULATION re: Response to Tranche IV Plaintiffs' First and Second Amended Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 19, 2016 1281 Letter to Hon. Keith P. Ellison by Carol Hill Albert Trust, Michael Delpriore, Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., Gargoyle Strategic Investments LLC, Bennett Goodman, Howard Hughes Medical Institute, Huff Energy Offshore Ltd, Robert Johnston, PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed.(Dees, Tom)
January 19, 2016 1280 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles filed by Carol Hill Albert Trust, Michael Delpriore, Bennett Goodman, Huff Energy Offshore Ltd, Robert Johnston, Musashi II Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Dees, Tom)
January 19, 2016 1279 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles filed by Gargoyle Strategic Investments LLC, Howard Hughes Medical Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dees, Tom)
January 14, 2016 1278 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
January 11, 2016 *** This motion hearing, which was originally scheduled for February 11, 2016, that has been reset by request to 2/25/2016 at 10:30 a.m. pertains to the following motions filed in the 10-md-2185 federal securities class action: (1) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; (3) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony from Chad Coffman; and (4) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony from Gregg Perkin., filed. (sloewe, 4)
January 4, 2016 1277 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 1179 MOTION to Dismiss BP Litigation Recovery's, BPLR's, and Peak6's Complaints (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
December 21, 2015 1276 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/25/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
December 14, 2015 1275 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 14, 2015 1274 STIPULATION re: Response to Tranche IV Amended Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 8, 2015 1273 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles filed by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dees, Tom)
December 8, 2015 1272 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles filed by BPLR, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Dees, Tom)
December 8, 2015 1271 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles filed by Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dees, Tom)
November 30, 2015 1270 Featured Case ORDER. Defendants' responsive pleading to Second Amended Consolidated ERISA Complaint due by 12/30/2015.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
November 18, 2015 1269 Featured Case ORDER directing class notice and granting 1268 related relief.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
November 17, 2015 1268 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Directing Class Notice and for Related Relief by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice of Pendency of Class Action, # 2 Proposed Order)(Block, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2015 1267 Order of USCA - PER CURIAM re: 931 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-20420. We affirm the judgment of the district court, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 4, 2015 1266 Order of USCA - JUDGMENT re: 931 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-20420. The judgment of the district court is affirmed, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
October 30, 2015 1265 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.
October 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/28/2015. Jury Trial set for 7/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison Appearances:(Law Clerk: S. Fulford).(Court Reporter: Warner), filed.(sloewe, 4)
October 28, 2015 1264 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles filed by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1263 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles filed by KBC Asset Management NV, Union Asset Management Holding AG.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1262 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Edmund John Philip Browne, William Castell, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, Carl-Henric Svanberg filed by New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1261 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1260 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P..(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1259 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by HESTA Super Fund.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1258 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1257 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan.(Ford, Sammy)
October 28, 2015 1256 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, State-Boston Retirement System.(Ford, Sammy)
October 27, 2015 1255 AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, Douglas J Suttles filed by Maryland State Retirement and Pension System.(Mustokoff, Matthew)
October 26, 2015 1254 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 10/28/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
October 21, 2015 1253 REPLY in Support of 1179 MOTION to Dismiss BP Litigation Recovery's, BPLR's, and Peak6's Complaints, filed by BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Taylor, Thomas)
October 15, 2015 1252 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Illinois State Board of Investment.(Kendall, Joe)
October 15, 2015 1251 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles filed by Shell Pension Trust, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System.(Kendall, Joe)
October 15, 2015 1250 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Avalon Holdings, Inc., BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA, Bayerninvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft, MBH, Caisse de Depot El Placement Du Quebec, City of Westminster Council Superannuation Fund, Cumbria County Council, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund, Lincolnshire County Council, London Borough of Redbridge Pension Fund, Metzler Investment GmbH, Nomura Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., Northern Ireland Local Government Officers' Superannuation Committee, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co., Nykredit Asset Management, Ontario Pension Board, Orange County Employees Retirement System, Premier LTD, San Mateo County Employees' Retirement Association, The Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan, The Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, Utah Retirement Systems, Xerox Pensions Limited.(Kendall, Joe)
October 14, 2015 1249 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 1248 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
October 13, 2015 1248 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on September 29, 2015, before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Ordering Party Mary B. Sherman Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2016., filed. (gdye, )
October 13, 2015 1247 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd.. Related document: 1242 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd..(Ford, Sammy)
October 13, 2015 1246 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by The Bank of America Pension Plan. Related document: 1241 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by The Bank of America Pension Plan.(Ford, Sammy)
October 13, 2015 1245 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND. Related document: 1240 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND.(Ford, Sammy)
October 13, 2015 1244 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Allianz Global Investors France S.A., IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited. Related document: 1239 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, filed by John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MNOP Trustees Limited, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited.(Ford, Sammy)
October 9, 2015 1243 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 1238 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
October 9, 2015 1242 DOCKETED IN ERROR. First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd.. Related document: 1204 Sealed Event filed by Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd..(Ford, Sammy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (sloewe, 4).
October 9, 2015 1241 DOCKETED IN ERROR. First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by The Bank of America Pension Plan. Related document: 1203 Sealed Event filed by The Bank of America Pension Plan.(Ford, Sammy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (sloewe, 4).
October 9, 2015 1240 DOCKETED IN ERROR. First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND. Related document: 1201 Sealed Event filed by MERSEYSIDE PENSION FUND.(Ford, Sammy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (sloewe, 4).
October 9, 2015 1239 DOCKETED IN ERROR. First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by Allianz Global Investors France S.A., IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MNOP Trustees Limited, Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited. Related document: 1209 Sealed Event filed by John Lewis Partnership Pensions Trust, MNOP Trustees Limited, IBM United Kingdom Pensions Trust Limited, Allianz Global Investors France S.A., Merchant Navy Ratings Pension Fund Trustees Limited.(Ford, Sammy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (sloewe, 4).
October 8, 2015 1238 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/15 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party Steven Garcia. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2016., filed. (halcaraz, )
October 8, 2015 1237 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Steven Garcia. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 09/24/2015 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (sroque, 4)
October 2, 2015 1236 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
October 2, 2015 1235 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Pleadings by BP Exploration & Production Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2015. (Taylor, Thomas)
October 1, 2015 1234 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
September 30, 2015 1233 RESPONSE in Opposition to 1179 MOTION to Dismiss BP Litigation Recovery's, BPLR's, and Peak6's Complaints, filed by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., BPLR, L.L.C., Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stewart Thomas, # 2 Exhibit A to Thomas Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Thomas Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Thomas Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Compendium of Unreported Authorities)(Dees, Tom)
September 29, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 9/29/2015. This matter is taken under advisement. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Scott Fulford) Arvind B. Khurana. Paul J Ondrasik, Jr.(Court Reporter: Dye), filed.(sloewe, 4)
September 25, 2015 1232 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 25, 2015 1231 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 1169 MOTION to Dismiss The Class Action Complaint .(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 25, 2015 1230 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2015. (Taylor, Thomas)
September 25, 2015 1229 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Request for No Further Notice by Robert R Glenn, filed. (Ketterling, Keith)
September 25, 2015 1228 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Savannah Marion by David Rainey, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
September 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 9/24/2015. This matter is taken under advisement. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Scott Fulford).(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(sloewe, 4)
September 16, 2015 1227 COMPLAINT against John Hancock Caital Series, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund II, John Hancock Tax Advantage Dividend Income Fund, john hancock premium, john hancock premium dividend fund (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-15432449) filed by John Hancock Caital Series, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund, John Hancock Preferred Income Fund II, John Hancock Tax Advantage Dividend Income Fund, john hancock premium.(Kendall, Joe)
September 15, 2015 1226 Sealed Event, JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS filed. (With attachments) Modified on 9/21/2015 (sloewe, 4).
September 15, 2015 1225 MOTION for Joinder as to 1221 Memorandum,,,,,, 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 1217 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 1218 Memorandum,,,, by Avalon Holdings, Inc., The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2015. (Kendall, Joe)
September 9, 2015 1224 Featured Case ORDER granting Erica Langsen 1223 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
September 9, 2015 1223 MOTION for Erica G Langsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A Cordray, Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2015. (smurdock, 4)
September 4, 2015 1222 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 4, 2015 1221 MEMORANDUM in Support re: 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, KBC Asset Management NV, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, Union Asset Management Holding AG, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
September 4, 2015 1220 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Electricity Pensions Trustee Limited, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Hadrian Trustees Limited in its Capacity as Trustee of Shipbuilding Industries Pension Scheme, KBC Asset Management NV, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, Union Asset Management Holding AG, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
September 4, 2015 1219 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 4, 2015 1218 MEMORANDUM in Support re: 1217 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, HESTA Super Fund, KBC Asset Management NV, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
September 4, 2015 1217 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, HESTA Super Fund, KBC Asset Management NV, Mondrian All Countries World Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, Nova Scotia Health Employees' Pension Plan, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, Teachers Variable Annuity Funds, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Sammy)
September 1, 2015 1216 Sealed Event, filed.
September 1, 2015 1215 Sealed Event, filed.
September 1, 2015 1214 Sealed Event, filed.
September 1, 2015 1213 Featured Case ORDER granting 1195 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
September 1, 2015 1212 Featured Case ORDER granting 1198 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
September 1, 2015 1211 Featured Case ORDER granting 1200 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
August 31, 2015 1210 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles filed by ING (L) Sicav, ING Bewaar Maatschappij I B.V., ING Fund Management B.V., Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System, Norges Bank, Stichting Bewaarneming APG-IS 1, Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, Stichting tot Bewaring Cordares Subfonds Aandelen Europa Actief Beheer, Teacher Retirement System of Texas.(Nicholas, Blair)
August 31, 2015 1209 Sealed Event, filed.
August 31, 2015 1208 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles filed by Pension Reserves Investment Management Board of Massachusetts.(Devore, Joshua)
August 31, 2015 1207 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Douglas J Suttles filed by Thomas P DiNapoli.(Devore, Joshua)
August 31, 2015 1206 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Indiana Public Retirement System, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho, Public School and Education Employee Retirement Systems of Missouri, The Nebraska Investment Council, Virginia Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chargois, Damon)
August 31, 2015 1205 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii, Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chargois, Damon)
August 31, 2015 1204 Sealed Event, filed.
August 31, 2015 1203 Sealed Event, filed.
August 31, 2015 1202 Sealed Event, filed.
August 31, 2015 1201 Sealed Event, filed.
August 31, 2015 1200 MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint by Illinois State Board of Investment, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
August 31, 2015 1199 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 31, 2015 1198 MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint by GIC Private Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wickert, Benjamin)
August 31, 2015 1197 Sealed Event, filed.
August 31, 2015 1196 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 31, 2015 1195 MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint by Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wickert, Benjamin)
August 31, 2015 1194 Sealed Event, filed.
August 21, 2015 1193 REPLY in Support of 1169 MOTION to Dismiss The Class Action Complaint filed by Peter Kaynes, filed by BP plc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Declaration of R. Paul Steep, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of R. Paul Steep)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1192 Featured Case ORDER re: 1182 Stipulation. Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 9/30/2015. Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response due by 10/21/2015. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
August 11, 2015 1191 REDACTION to 1147 Sealed Event, 1168 Order, by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 150 to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Mtn for Partial SJ)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1190 REDACTION to 1168 Order, 1123 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 to Defendants' Opp. to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1189 REDACTION to 1086 Sealed Event, 1168 Order, by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 2 Exhibit 7 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 3 Exhibit 8 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 4 Exhibit 9 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 5 Exhibit 11 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 6 Exhibit 14 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 7 Exhibit 21 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 8 Exhibit 22 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 9 Exhibit 27 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 10 Exhibit 29 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 11 Exhibit 35 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 12 Exhibit 37 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 13 Exhibit 40 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 14 Exhibit 41 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 15 Exhibit 42 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 16 Exhibit 44 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 17 Exhibit 45 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 18 Exhibit 48 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 19 Exhibit 49 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ, # 20 Exhibit 50 to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Partial SJ)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1188 REDACTION to 1168 Order, 1146 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 to Defendants' Reply in Support of their MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 5 to Defendants' Reply in Support of their MSJ)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1187 REDACTION to 1127 Sealed Event, 1168 Order, by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 65 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 70 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ, # 3 Exhibit 73 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ, # 4 Exhibit 74 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 77 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ, # 6 Exhibit 87 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ, # 7 Exhibit 88 to Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' MSJ)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1186 REDACTION to 1168 Order, 1083 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 35 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit 40 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit 45 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit 48 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 55 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit 57 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit 61 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit 109 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit 110 to BP Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1185 REDACTION to 1168 Order, 1125 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V to Plaintiffs' Opp. to BP's Mtn to Exclude G. Perkins Expert Testimony)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1184 REDACTION to 1080 Sealed Event, 1168 Order, by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G to BP's Mtn to Exclude G. Perkins Expert Testimony, # 2 Exhibit H to BP's Mtn to Exclude G. Perkins Expert Testimony)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2015 1183 STIPULATION re: Briefing Schedule by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., filed.(Dees, Tom)
August 11, 2015 1182 STIPULATION re: Briefing Schedule by BPLR, L.L.C., filed.(Dees, Tom)
August 11, 2015 1181 STIPULATION re: Briefing Schedule by Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed.(Dees, Tom)
August 10, 2015 1180 Letter to Judge Ellison regarding re-filing of exhibits needing redactions by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 1179 MOTION to Dismiss BP Litigation Recovery's, BPLR's, and Peak6's Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints, # 2 Appendix of Unreported Authority, # 3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
July 23, 2015 1178 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset to 9/29/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
July 21, 2015 1177 Corrective NOTICE of Setting re: 1175 Notice of Setting - Judge Ellison. Parties notified. Miscellaneous/Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
July 21, 2015 1176 Corrective NOTICE of Setting re: 1174 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
July 17, 2015 1175 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
July 17, 2015 1174 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
July 9, 2015 1173 Featured Case Stipulation and ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: 1169 MOTION to Dismiss responses due by 7/24/2015. Replies due by 8/21/2015.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 7, 2015 1172 STIPULATION re: Deadline Extension for Kaynes Plaintiffs' Response to BP p.l.c's Motion to Dismiss by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
July 6, 2015 1171 Letter to Judge Ellison responding to defendants' June 17, 2015 correspondence by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed.(DeValerio, Glen)
June 17, 2015 1170 Letter to Judge Ellison regarding recent developments in proceedings against David Rainey by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 16, 2015 1169 MOTION to Dismiss The Class Action Complaint filed by Peter Kaynes by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 BP's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Appendix to BP's Memorandum of Law, # 3 Declaration of Georgia Lucier, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Lucier Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Lucier Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Lucier Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Lucier Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Lucier Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Lucier Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Lucier Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Lucier Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Lucier Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Lucier Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Lucier Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Lucier Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Lucier Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Lucier Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Lucier Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Lucier Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 17 to Lucier Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 18 to Lucier Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 19 to Lucier Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 20 to Lucier Declaration, # 24 Declaration of R. Paul Steep, # 25 Exhibit 1 to Steep Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 2 to Steep Declaration, # 27 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 9, 2015 1168 Featured Case ORDER that parties in this matter are to redact public versions of all briefing and exhibits stated in this order. Redacted, public versions must be docketed within 60 days of entry of this order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
June 2, 2015 1167 Order of USCA - Per Curiam re: 931 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-20499. The judgment of District Court is affirmed., filed.(bcampos, 1)
June 2, 2015 1166 Order of USCA - JUDGMENT; judgment issued as mandate 6/2/2015 re: 931 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-20499. the judgment of the district court is affirmed., filed.(dnoriega, 1)
May 29, 2015 1163 Featured Case ORDER granting 1156 Motion for Lawrence Rolnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
May 29, 2015 1160 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Ryan T. Jenny by BP America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc. Savings Plan Investment Oversight Committee, BP Corporation North America, Inc.'s Board of Directors, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Corey Correnti, Marvin Damsma, Richard J. Dorazil, James Dupree, Patrick Gower, Anthony Hayward, Robert A Malone, Lamar McKay, Patricia H. Miller, Stephanie C Moore, Stephen J. Riney, Neil Shaw, Brian D. Smith, Thomas L Taylor, Gregory T. Williamson, filed. (Jenny, Ryan)
May 28, 2015 1165 Featured Case ORDER granting 1155 Motion for Michael Hampson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
May 28, 2015 1164 Featured Case ORDER granting 1158 Motion for Marc B. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
May 28, 2015 1162 Featured Case ORDER granting 1159 Motion for Sheila A. Sadighi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
May 28, 2015 1161 Featured Case ORDER granting 1157 Motion for Thomas E. Redburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
May 26, 2015 1159 MOTION for Sheila A Sadighi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., BPLR, L.L.C., Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2015. (lusmith, 3)
May 26, 2015 1158 MOTION for Marc B. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., BPLR, L.L.C., Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2015. (rnieto, 1)
May 26, 2015 1157 MOTION for Thomas E Redburn Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., BPLR, L.L.C., Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2015. (lusmith, 3)
May 26, 2015 1156 MOTION for Lawrence J Rolnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., BPLR, L.L.C., Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2015. (lusmith, 3)
May 26, 2015 1155 MOTION for Michael J Hampson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP Litigation Recovery I, L.L.C., BPLR, L.L.C., Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., PEAK 6 Capital Management LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2015. (lusmith, 3)
May 22, 2015 1154 STIPULATION re: Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 22, 2015 1153 STIPULATION re: Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 22, 2015 1152 STIPULATION re: Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/13/2015. The Court agrees to the parties' stipulation dated May 7, 2015. Plaintiffs will have until August 31, 2015 to amend their complaints. No further requests for extension of this deadline are anticipated. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman)Thomas Hoffman. Matthew Mustakoff, Donna Zack, David Handler. Jamie Matska, Julie Rieser, Lucus Oates, Darrell Matthew, Karen Jaider, Tom Taylor, Patrick Linehan. (Court Reporter: Fred Warner), filed.(amwilliams, 4)
May 11, 2015 1151 Featured Case ORDER for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 5/13/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
May 7, 2015 1150 STIPULATION re: Tranche 3 Amended Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc, BP Corporation North America, Inc.'s Board of Directors, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Edmund John Philip Browne, Lord John Browne, Corey Correnti, Marvin Damsma, Richard J. Dorazil, Robert W Dudley, James Dupree, Patrick Gower, Anthony Hayward, Jeanne M. Johns, Robert A Malone, Lamar McKay, Patricia H. Miller, Stephanie C Moore, Stephen J. Riney, Neil Shaw, Douglas J Suttles, Thomas L Taylor, The Savings Plan Investment Oversight Committee, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 16, 2015 1149 Featured Case ORDER granting 1148 Stipulation ( Answer due by 6/16/2015 ).(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
April 15, 2015 1148 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint and Extension of Time to Answer by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 2, 2015 1147 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 2, 2015 1146 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 2, 2015 1145 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 2, 2015 1144 Sealed Event, filed.
March 31, 2015 1143 Featured Case ORDER granting 1142 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
March 31, 2015 1142 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
March 25, 2015 1141 Featured Case AGREED ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIALITY (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
March 17, 2015 1140 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
March 17, 2015 1139 Featured Case ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
March 13, 2015 1138 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 13, 2015 1137 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 10, 2015 1136 Order of USCA re: 931 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-20420. The cross appeal is dismissed as of March 10, 2015 as to Douglas J. Suttles, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion Mr. Suttles remains a party to the main appeal, filed.(dahumada, 1)
March 6, 2015 1135 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. The deadline to submit the Proposed Deposition Protocol Order will be extended until a date agreed by the parties. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
March 5, 2015 1134 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: granting 1133 Stipulation. Amended Complaints due by 6/1/2015. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
March 4, 2015 1133 STIPULATION re: Tranche 3 Amendments by Paul Anderson, Stephanie C. Atkins, BP America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc. Savings Plan Investment Oversight Committee, BP Corporation North America, Inc. Savings Plan Investment Oversight Committee, BP Corporation North America, Inc.'s Board of Directors, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Jeffrey C. Block, British Petroleum, Edmund John Philip Browne, Lord John Browne, Antony Burgmans, CA through CZ Insurance Companies as Insurers of Cameron International, Cameron International Corporation, Cynthia Carroll, William Castell, Iain C Conn, Corey Correnti, Marvin Damsma, George David, Erroll B Davis, Jr, Ian Davis, Does 1-20, Richard J. Dorazil, Robert W Dudley, James Dupree, Douglas J Flint, Patrick Gower, Byron E Grote, HA through HZ Insurance Companies as Insurers of Halliburton, Halliburton Energy Services Inc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Andy Inglis, John Does 1-10, John Does 1-20, Jeanne M. Johns, Deanne S Julius, Jason M. Leviton, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Lamar McKay, Tom McKillop, Patricia H. Miller, Stephanie C Moore, Ian MG Prosser, David Rainey, Stephen J. Riney, Neil Shaw, Brian D. Smith, State Street Bank and Trust Co., Whitney E. Street, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, Carl-Henric Svanberg, TA through TZ Insurance Companies as Insurers of Transocean, Thomas L Taylor, The Investment Committee, The Savings Plan Investment Oversight Committee, Transocean Deepwater Inc, Transocean, Ltd., filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 4, 2015 1132 Featured Case AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4) (Main Document 1132 replaced on 3/5/2015) (sloewe, 4).
March 4, 2015 1131 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
March 2, 2015 1130 STIPULATION re: Proposed Deposition Protocol Order by BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 26, 2015 1129 Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Letter advising The court has granted an extension of time to and including March 16, 2015 for filing cross Appellants reply brief in this case. (USCA No. 14-20420), filed.(dahumada, 1)
February 23, 2015 1128 Sealed Event, filed.
February 20, 2015 1127 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
February 20, 2015 1126 Sealed Event, filed.
February 20, 2015 1125 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
February 20, 2015 1124 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
February 20, 2015 1123 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
February 18, 2015 1122 Featured Case ORDER granting 1120 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
February 18, 2015 1120 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reiser, Julie)
February 17, 2015 1121 Featured Case ORDER granting 1119 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
February 17, 2015 1119 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
January 28, 2015 1118 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
January 28, 2015 1117 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 27, 2015 1116 STIPULATION re: Proposed Deposition Protocol Order by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 15, 2015 1115 Memorandum and Order.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) (amwilliams, 4) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
January 8, 2015 1114 Fourth Amended Scheduling/Docket Control Order Governing Claims of Post-Explosion Class. ETT: 20 days. Jury Trial. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/18/2014. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/18/2014. Responses due by 4/2/2015. Objections due by 2/20/2015. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2015. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
January 8, 2015 1113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/8/2015. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman).(Court Reporter: Metzger), filed.(sloewe, 4)
January 5, 2015 1112 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Mitchell L. Mariniello re: 1038 Stipulation and Order, filed. (lusmith, 3)
December 30, 2014 1111 ANSWER to 871 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1110 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1109 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1108 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1107 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1106 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1105 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1104 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1103 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1102 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1101 ANSWER to Complaint by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 30, 2014 1100 NOTICE of Setting as to 1098 Stipulation. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 1/8/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
December 24, 2014 1099 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Thomas P DiNapoli, filed. (Kolsky, Joshua)
December 23, 2014 1098 STIPULATION re: Deadline to file Oppositions to Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motions by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 18, 2014 1097 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 1096 Motion for Entry of Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
December 18, 2014 1096 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Scheduling by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2015. (Taylor, Thomas)
December 8, 2014 1095 NOTICE of Change of Address by Covington & Burling LLP, counsel for BP plc, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 1094 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 1093 Motion for Entry of Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
December 2, 2014 1093 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Scheduling by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 1092 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
November 21, 2014 1091 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file defendants answer the complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 ***Address for attorney Charles Robert Watkins located on Illinois bar website and updated. Order 1034 re-noticed to attorney, filed. (dkelly, 4)
November 20, 2014 1090 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1034 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dkelly, 4)
November 19, 2014 1089 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: 931 Notice of Appeal. The electronic record on CD is being sent to Steven Buttacavoli via Mail. (USCA No. 14-20420), filed. (blacy, 4)
November 18, 2014 1088 EXHIBIT re: 1084 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (DVD containing video file kep in Houston file room.)(dkelly, 4)
November 18, 2014 1087 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 931 Notice of Appeal, filed.(emathis, 4)
November 18, 2014 1086 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 18, 2014 1085 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 18, 2014 1084 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2014. (Reiser, Julie)
November 18, 2014 1083 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 18, 2014 1082 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 18, 2014 1081 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
November 18, 2014 1080 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 18, 2014 1079 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony from Gregg S. Perkin by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 18, 2014 1078 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 18, 2014 1077 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony on Loss Causation and Damages from Chad Coffman by BP America Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 18, 2014 1076 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 910 Notice of Appeal by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed.(Buttacavoli, Steven)
November 18, 2014 1075 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 1039 Stipulation and Order, filed. (sbejarano, 1)
November 13, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/13/2014 GRANTING 1068 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 1072 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman).(Court Reporter: Warner), filed.(sloewe, 4)
November 13, 2014 1074 NOTICE of Setting as to 1068 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2014 at 03:30 PM Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
November 13, 2014 1073 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 1029 Request for Record filed by Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, BP plc, filed. (hler, 4)
November 13, 2014 1072 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reiser, Julie)
November 13, 2014 1071 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 1058 Request for Record filed by BP plc, filed. (hler, 4)Frwd to intake for pickup
November 13, 2014 1070 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 1049 Request for Record filed by Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Paul Huyck, Leslie J. Nakagiri, filed. (hler, 4)Frwd to intake for pickup
November 13, 2014 1068 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 1069 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 1038 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jtabares, 1)
November 12, 2014 1067 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA re: 1041 Stipulation and Order, filed. (mmapps, 4)
November 12, 2014 1066 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Scott D Egleston as to BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA re: 1043 Stipulation and Order, filed. (mmapps, 4)
November 10, 2014 1065 Letter from Office of the State Public Defender re: James Holmes. (Clerk notes that letter is docketed only in mdl case.) (yhausmann, 6)
November 10, 2014 1064 Letter from the Office of The State Public Defender, Tamara A. Brady re: James Holmes, filed. (amireles, 2)
November 10, 2014 1063 Letter from Office of the State Public Defender re: James Holmes. (yhausmann, 6)
November 10, 2014 1062 Letter from Tamara A. Brady re: James Holmes, filed. (jtabares, 1)
November 10, 2014 1061 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1042 Stipulation and Order. (yhausmann, 6)
November 10, 2014 1060 Featured Case ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
November 7, 2014 1059 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Syed Arshadullah re: 1040 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jtabares, 1)
November 7, 2014 1058 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 931 Notice of Appeal by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
November 4, 2014 1057 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
November 4, 2014 1056 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1043 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 4, 2014 1055 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1037 Stipulation and Order, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
November 3, 2014 1054 Mail Returned Undeliverable Jarrell Edward Godfrey atty for Victor Skomedal re: 1034 Stipulation and Order, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
November 3, 2014 1053 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey attorney Victor Skomedal re: 1043 Stipulation and Order, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
November 3, 2014 1052 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 1039 Stipulation and Order, filed. (gsalinas, 5)
November 3, 2014 1051 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 1035 Stipulation and Order, filed. (gsalinas, 5)
November 3, 2014 1050 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 1041 Stipulation and Order, filed. (gsalinas, 5)
October 31, 2014 1049 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 910 Notice of Appeal by Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, filed.(Mithoff, Richard)
October 30, 2014 1048 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1035 Stipulation and Order, filed. (lrivera, 2)
October 29, 2014 1047 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Proposed Deposition Protocol Order by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
October 29, 2014 1046 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 1044 Document filed by Robert R Glenn, filed. (hler, 4)Emailed out link.
October 28, 2014 1045 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas by BP Exploration & Production Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
October 28, 2014 1044 Request for Record -Docket Sheet by Robert R Glenn, filed.(Collmer, Mark)
October 15, 2014 1043 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1042 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1041 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1040 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1039 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1038 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1037 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1036 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1035 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1034 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 15, 2014 1033 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for the Reply Date and Page Limits by Syed Arshadullah, David M Humphries, Jerry T. McGuire, Edward F. Mineman, Charis Moule, Frankie Ramirez, Maureen S. Riely, Thomas P Soesman, Ralph Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ajamie, Thomas)
October 13, 2014 1032 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
October 13, 2014 1031 STIPULATION re: Defendants' Time to Answer Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
October 10, 2014 1030 Unopposed MOTION to Amend by Syed Arshadullah, David M Humphries, Jerry T. McGuire, Edward F. Mineman, Charis Moule, Frankie Ramirez, Maureen S. Riely, Thomas P Soesman, Ralph Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ajamie, Thomas)
October 9, 2014 1029 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 931 Notice of Appeal by BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
October 9, 2014 1028 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 1008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (lcayce, 2)
October 7, 2014 1027 STIPULATION re: Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
October 2, 2014 1026 Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER advising The Court has granted appellant's motion to consolidate case No. 14-20499 with No. 14-20466. The court has granted an extension of time to and including November 6, 2014, for the filing of appellant's brief in the consolidated cases (USCA No. 14-20466 and 14-20499), filed.(lusmith, 3)
September 30, 2014 1025 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:13-cv-129). (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1024 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:12-cv-2362) (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1023 Sealed Order, filed.
September 30, 2014 1022 Memorandum and Order granting 717 Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss, filed. (glyons, 4).
September 30, 2014 1021 Sealed Order, filed.
September 30, 2014 1020 Featured Case ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:13-cv-3397) (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1019 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:13-cv-1393) (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1018 Featured Case ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:13-cv-517)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1017 Featured Case ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:13-cv-887)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1016 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:13-cv-69)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1015 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:12-cv-3714)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 30, 2014 1014 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part Defendants' Amended Second Tranche Consolidated Motion to Dismiss. (Copy filed in 4:12-cv-3621.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
September 29, 2014 1013 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr re: 1008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (lcayce, 2)
September 29, 2014 1012 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 994 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (lusmith, 3)
September 25, 2014 1011 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 991 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (lusmith, 3)
September 24, 2014 1010 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Mitchell L. Marinello as to David M Humphries re: 995 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (sguevara, 4)
September 19, 2014 1009 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Syed Arshadullah, Charis Moule, Ron Pierce, Thomas P Soesman re: 995 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (mperez, 1)
September 16, 2014 1008 Featured Case ORDER granting 1001 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Fortunato.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
September 16, 2014 1007 CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 1003 Request for Record filed by Robert R Glenn, filed. (hler, 4)Frwd to intake for pickup
September 15, 2014 1006 Letter from Aasim Stibbins re: request to withdraw names on case, filed. (lrivera, 2)
September 12, 2014 1005 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lionel Howard Sutton, III, as to Charis Moule, Jerry T McGuire and Maureen S Riely re: 995 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (mmarquez, 5) Modified on 9/12/2014 (mmarquez, 5).
September 12, 2014 1004 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 995 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (bcampos, 1)
September 10, 2014 1003 REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 931 Notice of Appeal by Robert R Glenn, filed.(Collmer, Mark)
September 10, 2014 1002 Mail returned undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey, filed. (vcantu, 5)
September 9, 2014 1001 MOTION for Melissa Fortunato to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deutsche Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, GIC Private Limited, Helaba Invest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, KBC Asset Management NV, LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH, Landesbank Berlin Investment GmbH, Lnsfrskringar AB, SGSS Deutschland Kapitalanlagegesellschaft mbH, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Universal-Investment-Gesellschaft mbH, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2014. (Walker, John)
September 9, 2014 1000 MEMORANDUM in Support re: 999 MOTION to Transfer Case to S.D. Tex. by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed.(Muething, Brian)
September 9, 2014 999 MOTION to Transfer Case to S.D. Tex. by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2014. (Muething, Brian)
September 9, 2014 998 RESPONSE in Opposition to 925 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Muething, Brian)
September 8, 2014 997 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to All Plaintiffs re: 994 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (bcampos, 1)
September 5, 2014 996 ANSWER to 928 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
September 3, 2014 995 Featured Case ORDER granting 992 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristi Stahnke McGregor.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
August 29, 2014 994 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 993 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
August 28, 2014 993 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 6-17-2011 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Originally filed at Docket Entry 118 in 4:10CV3447 on 7-1-2011. Court Reporter/Transcriber cbarron. Ordering Party T. Ajamie Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2014., filed. (cbarron, )
August 28, 2014 992 MOTION for Kristi Stahnke McGregor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jerry T. McGuire, Charis Moule, Maureen S. Riely, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2014. (Ajamie, Thomas)
August 27, 2014 991 Featured Case ORDER granting 912 Motion for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
August 27, 2014 990 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 958 Stipulation and Order, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 27, 2014 989 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 956 Scheduling Order, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 27, 2014 988 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 960 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 25, 2014 987 RESPONSE to 965 Notice (Other) , filed by Avalon Holdings, Inc., The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Kendall, Joe)
August 22, 2014 986 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Paul Anderson re: 957 Stipulation and Order, filed. (sbejarano, 1)
August 22, 2014 985 Corrected RESPONSE to 965 Notice (Other) of Recent Authority, filed by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro. (Ford, Sammy)
August 21, 2014 984 RESPONSE to 965 Notice (Other) of Recent Authority, filed by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Employees' Retirement System, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek. (Ford, Sammy)
August 21, 2014 983 Letter from Attorney Tamara A. Brady re: James Holme; not involved in this case, filed. (sbejarano, 1)
August 21, 2014 982 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 960 Order on Motion for Leave to File. The address was updated and the order was re-noticed, filed. (avleal, 1)
August 21, 2014 981 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard re: 958 Stipulation and Order, filed. (lcayce, 2)
August 20, 2014 980 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 957 Stipulation and Order, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 20, 2014 979 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 956 Scheduling Order, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 20, 2014 978 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 960 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 19, 2014 971 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert A Izard, Jr as to Syed Arshadullah re: 958 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dterrell, 2)
August 18, 2014 977 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 956 Scheduling Order,,, filed. (hler, 4)
August 18, 2014 976 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 957 Stipulation and Order, filed. (hler, 4)
August 18, 2014 975 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 958 Stipulation and Order, filed. (hler, 4)
August 18, 2014 974 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 952 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (hler, 4)
August 18, 2014 973 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 952 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (hler, 4)
August 18, 2014 972 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 952 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (hler, 4)
August 18, 2014 970 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Rhys Tucker. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 07/25/2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison (copy). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Hall. Transcript Order Form was electronically forwarded to Court Reporter H. Hall on 8/18/2014., filed. (sroque, 4)
August 18, 2014 969 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Serena E. Pollack re: 952 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (jguajardo, 4)
August 18, 2014 968 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Serena E. Pollack re: 958 Stipulation and Order, filed. The address was updated and the order was re-noticed (avleal, 1) Modified on 8/20/2014 (avleal, 1).
August 18, 2014 967 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Serena E. Pollack re: 956 Scheduling Order, filed. The address was updated address and the order was re-noticed (avleal, 1) Modified on 8/20/2014 (avleal, 1).
August 18, 2014 966 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Serena E. Pollack Alameda County Employees Retirement Association re: 957 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dgonzalez, 5)
August 16, 2014 965 NOTICE of Recent Authority by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 15, 2014 964 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Steven Paul Schneck as to Edward F. Mineman re: 958 Stipulation and Order, filed. (jguajardo, 4)
August 14, 2014 963 REPLY in Support of 912 MOTION for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena, filed by BP plc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 13, 2014 962 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Answer to complaint due by 9/5/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4)
August 11, 2014 961 Agreed MOTION for Approval of Stipulation and Order by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
August 11, 2014 960 Featured Case ORDER denying 878 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
August 8, 2014 959 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Charles Robert Watkins re: 921 Memorandum and Order, filed. (vrios, 2)
August 7, 2014 958 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
August 7, 2014 957 Featured Case SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
August 7, 2014 956 Featured Case THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING/DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Governing Claims of Post-Explosions Class. ETT: 20 Days. Jury Trial. Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/18/2014. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/18/2014. Oppositions to Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2015. Replies to Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2015. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 4/27/2015. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
August 7, 2014 955 STIPULATION re: Scheduling and Order by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
August 7, 2014 953 STIPULATION re: Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed.(Muething, Brian)
August 7, 2014 952 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 949 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
August 6, 2014 951 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr re: 921 Memorandum and Order, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 6, 2014 950 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Serena E. Pollack re: 921 Memorandum and Order, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 6, 2014 949 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 7/25/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Hall. Ordering Party Thomas Taylor Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2014., filed. (hhall, )
August 5, 2014 954 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Jacob S. Gill for Robert Glenn. No hearings. This order form relates to the following: 931 Notice of Appeal, filed. (marflores, 4).
August 5, 2014 948 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 5, 2014 947 RESPONSE in Opposition to 912 MOTION for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena, filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Julie Reiser)(Reiser, Julie)
August 1, 2014 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 14-20499 re: 931 Notice of Appeal, filed.(blacy, 4)
July 31, 2014 946 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Serena E. Pollock re: 922 Final Judgment, filed. (dahumada, 1)
July 31, 2014 945 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Serena E. Pollack as to Alameda County Employees Retirement Association re: 920 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (lcayce, 2)
July 30, 2014 944 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 922 Final Judgment, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
July 30, 2014 943 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 922 Final Judgment, filed. (amireles, 2)
July 29, 2014 942 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 921 Memorandum and Order, filed. (amireles, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2014: # 1 Envelope) (amireles, 2).
July 28, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00, receipt number 0541-13444241 re: 931 Notice of Appeal paid in related civil action 4:13cv3660, filed.(smurdock, 4)
July 28, 2014 941 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 888 Scheduling Order,,, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
July 28, 2014 Appeal Review Notes re: 931 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. The appeal filing fee has not been paid, and the appellant is represented by counsel.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(smurdock, 4)
July 28, 2014 940 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 925 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 912 MOTION for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena, 878 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention, 931 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. Reporter(s): K Miller, C Barron & H Hall, filed. (smurdock, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2014: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Docket sheet) (smurdock, 4). Modified on 7/28/2014 (smurdock, 4). Not a new Appeal see 4:13cv3660 for correct Notice of Appeal
July 28, 2014 939 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lionel Howard Sutton, III as to Cody A Nedved re: 920 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
July 28, 2014 938 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins, filed. (vrios, 2)
July 28, 2014 937 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 922 Final Judgment, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
July 28, 2014 936 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 909 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
July 28, 2014 935 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 920 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
July 28, 2014 934 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 920 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison, filed. (jtabares, 1)
July 28, 2014 933 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Aasim Stibbins re: 922 Final Judgment, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
July 28, 2014 932 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Thomas Taylor. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: H. Hall, filed. (mmapps, 4)
July 28, 2014 Filing fee assessed re: 923 Notice (Other) 931 Notice of Appeal (Filing fee $ 505.00), filed. (smurdock, 4) Modified on 7/28/2014 (smurdock, 4).
July 25, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/25/2014. Appearances:Steven Toll by phone, Mark Delaney by phone. Richard C Pepperman, II, Glen DeValerio by phone, Wynn McKlosky by phone,Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr. by phone. The Court will take the matter under advisement.(Court Reporter: H. Hall), filed.(rsmith, 4)
July 25, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 7/25/2014. Appearances:Brian Humphrey, Patrick Linehan, Patrick Somers by phone, Mark Delaney by phone, Marc I Gross, Matthew L Tuccillo, Marc De Leeuw, Thomas W Taylor, Daryl A Libow, Richard C Pepperman, II, Daniel J Mirarchi, Mark S Willis, Jamie J McKey, John Brandon Walker. The Court will take this matter under advisement.(Court Reporter: H. Hall), filed.(rsmith, 4)
July 25, 2014 930 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins as to Charis Moule re: 909 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (jtabares, 1)
July 25, 2014 929 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 909 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (jtabares, 1)
July 24, 2014 928 Third AMENDED Complaint (Redacted) with Jury Demand against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System.(Mithoff, Richard)
July 24, 2014 927 Sealed Event, filed.
July 22, 2014 926 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: 925 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of David J. Jackson)(Taylor, Thomas)
July 22, 2014 925 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
July 21, 2014 924 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lionel Howard Sutton, III as to Cody A Nedved re: 909 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (amireles, 2)
July 18, 2014 931 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 922 Final Judgment, 921 Memorandum and Order by Robert R Glenn (Filing fee $ 505) Duplicates entry 923 for case manangement purposes, filed.(smurdock, 4)
July 18, 2014 923 NOTICE titled as, "Notice of Appeal to the US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit" re: 922 Final Judgment by Robert R Glenn, filed. (Collmer, Mark)
July 18, 2014 920 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. This hearing is regarding the class action, filed. (rsmith, 4)
July 17, 2014 919 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard Mithoff. This is to order a transcript of the Hearing held on 6/17/2011 before Judge Keith Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cheryll Barron. This order form relates to the following: 312 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(mmapps, 4)
July 17, 2014 918 NOTICE Regarding the Impact of Interlocutory Appeal on Scheduling Deadlines, and Request to Schedule Status Conference re: 888 Scheduling Order,, by BP America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
July 16, 2014 917 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Defendants, BP pic, Anthony Hayward, Douglas Suttles. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office. Class Certification Hearing held on 4/21/14 before Judge Keith P. Ellison Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller. This order form relates to the following: 910 Notice of Appeal, filed.(bcampos, 1)
July 16, 2014 915 Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 914 Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal, filed.(blacy, 4)
July 16, 2014 Full Filing fee: $505 re: 914 Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal, receipt number HOU046862, filed. (wbostic, 4)
July 16, 2014 914 Order of USCA; USCA No. 14-20420. Order granting permission to Appeal (Filing fee $ 505) (Document docketed for the appeal purpose), filed.(wbostic, 4) Modified on 7/16/2014 (blacy, 4).
July 16, 2014 913 AMENDED Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 910 Notice of Appeal, filed.(blacy, 4)
July 15, 2014 916 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard C. Pepperman. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office. This order form relates to the following: 908 Transcript, 907 Transcript, filed.(lusmith, 3)
July 15, 2014 912 MOTION for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
July 15, 2014 Filing fee received: $505.00 re: 910 Notice of Appeal, 911 Notice of the Filing of an Appeal, receipt number HOU046851, filed. (psparks, 4)
July 15, 2014 911 Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 910 Notice of Appeal, filed. # 1 Docket Sheet) (blacy, 4).
July 15, 2014 909 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 908 Transcript, 907 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
July 14, 2014 908 TRANSCRIPT re: Pretrial Conference held on June 13, 2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber J. Sanchez. Ordering Party Thomas Taylor Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2014., filed. (jsanchez, )
July 14, 2014 907 TRANSCRIPT re: Discovery Hearing held on November 18, 2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber J. Sanchez. Ordering Party Richard Mitthoff Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2014., filed. (jsanchez, )
July 11, 2014 906 STIPULATION re: Service and Answer to Complaint by Universities Superannuation Scheme, Ltd., filed.(Ford, Sammy)
July 11, 2014 905 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 888 Scheduling Order, filed. (dahumada, 1)
July 10, 2014 910 Order of USCA; USCA No. 14-20420. Order granting permission to Appeal (Filing fee $ 505) (Document docketed for the appeal purpose), filed.(blacy, 4) Modified on 7/16/2014 (blacy, 4).
July 10, 2014 904 Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER (USCA No. 14-90024), filed.(sscotch, 2)
July 9, 2014 903 STIPULATION re: Scheduling by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
July 8, 2014 902 STIPULATION re: Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
July 7, 2014 901 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Bruce Howard re: 890 Stipulation and Order, filed. (lrivera, 2)
July 7, 2014 900 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 888 Scheduling Order,,, filed. (lusmith, 3)
July 3, 2014 899 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Serena E. Pollack as to Alameda County Employees Retirement Association re: 890 Stipulation and Order, filed. (sbejarano, 1)
July 3, 2014 898 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Serena E. Pollack as to Alameda County Employees Retirement Association re: 888 Scheduling Order,,, filed. (sbejarano, 1)
July 3, 2014 897 RESPONSE in Opposition to 878 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention, filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reiser, Julie)
July 1, 2014 896 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 888 Scheduling Order, filed. (glyons, 4)
June 30, 2014 895 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 893 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (mmapps, 4)
June 30, 2014 894 Mail Returned Undeliverable to Jarrell Edward Godfrey re: 890 Stipulation and Order, filed. (mxperez, 5)
June 27, 2014 893 TRANSCRIPT re: Status Conference held on 12-20-13 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party Defendant BP Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2014., filed. (bslavin, )
June 25, 2014 892 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by David Kaplan. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 6/13/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Copy-Expedited). Court Reporter/Transcriber: J Sanchez, filed. (smurdock, 4) receiveed via fax contact if deposit needed Modified on 6/25/2014 (smurdock, 4).
June 24, 2014 891 MEMORANDUM In Opposition to Motion to Intervene re: 878 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention by BP America Inc, BP Corporation North America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 20, 2014 890 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
June 20, 2014 889 STIPULATION re: Scheduling by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 20, 2014 888 Featured Case AMENDED SCHEDULING/DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ETT: 20 days. Jury. Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2014. Dispositive Motion and Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/15/2014. Oppositions to Dispositive Motion and Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/24/2014. Replies on Dispositive Motion and Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2014. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 4/27/2015. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rsmith, 4)
June 20, 2014 887 Joint Letter to Judge Ellison regarding proposed Amended Scheduling/Docket Control Order by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 18, 2014 886 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Serena E. Pollack as to Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Sacramento County Employees Retirement System re: 868 Notice of Setting, filed. (amireles, 2)
June 17, 2014 885 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard W. Mithoff. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 06/13/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison (copy). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (sroque, 4)
June 16, 2014 884 STIPULATION re: RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 16, 2014 883 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 868 Notice of Setting, filed. (vrios, 2)
June 16, 2014 882 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lionel Howard Sutton, III as to Cody A Nedved re: 868 Notice of Setting, filed. (vrios, 2)
June 16, 2014 881 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Thomas Taylor. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 6/13/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: J Sanchez, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
June 16, 2014 880 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 16, 2014 879 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 13, 2014 878 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention by Edward Breivik, Christopher Donnelly, James Holmes, Jonathan Rich, Aasim Stibbins, Frank Taylor, Jimmy James Thule, Christopher Wirth, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/7/2014. (ccarnew, 3)
June 13, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/13/2014. The Court construes the 867 Ludlow Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Certification of the Pre-Explosion Subclass as a motion for leave to file a renewed motion for class certification and denies leave. Parties must confer and within 7 days provide the Court with agreed deadlines for discovery and dispositive motion filing. ( Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison). Appearances:(Law Clerk: S. Bauman).(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez), filed.(glyons, 4)
June 12, 2014 875 STATEMENT Regarding Trial Setting by Thomas P DiNapoli, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed.(Reiser, Julie)
June 10, 2014 877 Scheduling Stipulation granting 872 Stipulation re: Proposed Deposition Protocol Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
June 10, 2014 876 Order and Stipulation re: Service and Discovery (Civil Case No. 4:14-cv-1068).(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
June 10, 2014 874 REPLY in Support of 867 Sealed Event, filed by Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri. (Mithoff, Richard)
June 9, 2014 873 Letter to Judge Ellison Regarding Ludlow plaintiffs' "renewed motion" (ECF No. 867) by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Thomas)
June 9, 2014 872 STIPULATION re: Proposed Deposition Protocol Order by City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Los Angeles County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, San Diego City Employees' Retirement System, filed.(Garza, Bernardo)
June 9, 2014 871 Second AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against BP plc filed by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio.(Muething, Brian)
June 6, 2014 870 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Thomas Taylor. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 12/20/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (mmapps, 4)
June 6, 2014 869 MOTION for Deborah R. Gross to Withdraw as Attorney by Thomas Yuen, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Deborah)
June 6, 2014 868 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/13/2014 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (rsmith, 4)
June 3, 2014 867 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 30, 2014 866 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
May 28, 2014 865 Sealed Order, filed.
May 20, 2014 864 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 850 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4)
May 20, 2014 863 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 851 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4)
May 20, 2014 862 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 852 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4)
May 20, 2014 861 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 853 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4)
May 20, 2014 860 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 854 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4)
May 20, 2014 859 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 855 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4)
May 20, 2014 858 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 856 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (sclement, 4) Modified on 5/21/2014 (sclement, 4).
May 20, 2014 857 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 739 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
May 14, 2014 856 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 855 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 854 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 853 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 852 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 851 STIPULATION re: Service of Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 13, 2014 850 STIPULATION re: Service by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, David Rainey, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 12, 2014 849 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 9, 2014 848 REPLY in Support of 784 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, filed by BP plc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 8, 2014 847 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard W Mithoff. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on 5/7/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison (copy). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Stephanie White, filed. (lusmith, 3)
May 8, 2014 846 Letter to Judge Ellison Regarding Setting of Trial Date by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 7, 2014 845 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pension Reserves Investment Management Board of Massachusetts, filed.(Callier, Joseph)
May 7, 2014 844 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Thomas P DiNapoli, filed.(Callier, Joseph)
May 7, 2014 843 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Thomas W Taylor. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 5/7/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original-Expedited). Court Reporter/Transcriber: S White, filed. (smurdock, 4)
May 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/7/2014. The Court will grant an enlargement of time until at least June 19th. Dispositive Motion and Trial Dates are vacated. Appearances:(Court Reporter: Stephanie White), filed.(sloewe, 4)
May 7, 2014 842 Sealed Event, filed.
May 6, 2014 841 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 6, 2014 840 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
May 6, 2014 839 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 11:00 AM Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
May 2, 2014 838 RESPONSE to 826 Notice (Other),,, DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 30, 2014 837 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 30, 2014 836 Sealed Event, filed.
April 29, 2014 835 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Matthew L. Mostokoff. This is to order a transcript of Hearing on Renewed Motion for Class Certification held on 4/21/2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Copy request). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Miller, filed. (jdav, 4)
April 29, 2014 834 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 831 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
April 28, 2014 833 Sealed Event, filed.
April 28, 2014 832 STIPULATION re: Extending Time to Amend Complaint by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed.(Muething, Brian)
April 28, 2014 831 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on April 21, 2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Miller. Ordering Party Mithoff Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014., filed. (kmiller, )
April 25, 2014 830 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 25, 2014 829 Transcript Order by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
April 24, 2014 828 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Blair A. Nicholas. This is to order a transcript of Hearing on Motion held on 4/21/2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Miller, filed. (mmapps, 4)
April 23, 2014 827 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard Mithoff. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 4/21/2014 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Copy), filed. (mmapps, 4)
April 23, 2014 826 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints re: 717 Sealed Event by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ford, Sammy)
April 23, 2014 825 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Thomas W Taylor. This is to order a transcript of Hearing Proceedings held on 4/21/14 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Orignal), filed. (smurdock, 4)
April 23, 2014 824 NOTICE Transcript Order Request (Form AO435), by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 23, 2014 823 NOTICE AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, filed. (Mithoff, Richard)
April 22, 2014 822 REDACTION to 788 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 15 Exhibit N to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier)(Taylor, Thomas)
April 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING held on 4/21/2014. Testifying Witness: Mr. Chad Coffmann. This matter is taken under advisement. Appearances:Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman.(Court Reporter: Kathy Miller), filed.(sloewe, 4)
April 21, 2014 821 NOTICE of Recent Authority re: 739 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (Mithoff, Richard)
April 16, 2014 817 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
April 15, 2014 820 Scheduling Stipulation granting 814 Stipulation. Proposed Deposition Protocol Order is due 6/9/2014. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
April 15, 2014 819 Scheduling Stipulation and Order granting 816 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
April 15, 2014 818 Featured Case ORDER granting 809 Motion for Scott W. Fawkes to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
April 11, 2014 816 STIPULATION re: Scheduling by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 11, 2014 815 REDACTION to 777 Sealed Event by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 4 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
April 9, 2014 814 STIPULATION re: Scheduling by Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, filed.(Garza, Bernardo)
April 8, 2014 813 APPENDIX re: 811 Response in Opposition to Motion by Robert R Glenn, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs 1-6, # 2 Tab 7, # 3 Tabs 8-17)(Collmer, Mark)
April 3, 2014 812 DECLARATION of Jacob S. Gill re: 811 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A (cont.), # 3 Exhibit Ex. A (cont.), # 4 Exhibit Ex. A (cont.), # 5 Exhibit Ex. B, # 6 Exhibit Ex. C, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D, # 8 Exhibit Ex. E)(Collmer, Mark)
April 3, 2014 811 RESPONSE in Opposition to 784 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, filed by Robert R Glenn. (Collmer, Mark)
March 28, 2014 810 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Fowkes, P.C. on behalf of BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
March 28, 2014 809 MOTION for Scott W. Fawkes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
March 26, 2014 808 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 21, 2014 807 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 21, 2014 806 REDACTION to 799 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 3 Exhibit 2 (part 1 of 5) to the Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 4 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 5) to the Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 5 Exhibit 2 (part 3 of 5) to the Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 6 Exhibit 2 (part 4 of 5) to the Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 7 Exhibit 2 (part 5 of 5) to the Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C.)(Taylor, Thomas)
March 13, 2014 805 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Plaintiff shall have until April 2, 2014 to file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint and that Defendant shall until May 9, 2014 to file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 12, 2014 804 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 12, 2014 803 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 12, 2014 802 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 11, 2014 801 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff to File Response to the Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint by Robert R Glenn, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2014. (Collmer, Mark)
March 10, 2014 800 REPLY Memorandum of Law In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints, filed by David Rainey. (Pringle, Lara)
March 10, 2014 799 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 10, 2014 798 Featured Case ORDER granting 795 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
March 10, 2014 797 Featured Case ORDER granting 794 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
March 7, 2014 796 REPLY in Support of 737 MOTION to Dismiss 707 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by BP plc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier)(Taylor, Thomas)
March 7, 2014 795 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
March 7, 2014 794 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
March 6, 2014 793 Featured Case ORDER granting 786 STIPULATION re: Proposed Deposition Protocol Order. Deadline is extended by 45 days to 4/10/2014. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
March 6, 2014 792 Featured Case ORDER granting 789 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Expand Page Limits.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
March 6, 2014 791 Featured Case ORDER granting 790 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Motion to Expand Page Limits. Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law is due 3/21/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
March 6, 2014 790 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Motion to Expand Page Limits by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
March 5, 2014 789 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Expand Page Limits by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
March 4, 2014 788 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 3, 2014 787 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daryl A. Libow and Amanda F. Davidoff, counsel for BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 24, 2014 786 STIPULATION re: Proposed Deposition Protocol Order by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
February 19, 2014 785 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re: 784 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 10 Affidavit Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 11 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C., # 12 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C. (Part 1 of 3), # 13 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C. (Part 2 of 3), # 14 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Martin Moore Q.C. (Part 3 of 3), # 15 Affidavit Declaration of David J. Jackson, # 16 Exhibit A to Declaration of David J. Jackson)(Taylor, Thomas)
February 19, 2014 784 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
February 14, 2014 783 RESPONSE in Opposition to 739 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class, filed by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 7 Exhibit Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz)(Taylor, Thomas)
February 14, 2014 782 RESPONSE in Opposition to 737 MOTION to Dismiss 707 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Muething, Brian)
February 13, 2014 781 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss (Redacted), filed by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro. (Ford, Sammy)
February 12, 2014 780 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Tucillo - Amended, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
February 12, 2014 779 Featured Case ORDER granting 776 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
February 12, 2014 778 RESPONSE to 717 Sealed Event filed by Avalon Holdings, Inc., The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix Compendium of Unreported Authorities Cited in Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(McKey, Jamie)
February 11, 2014 777 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
February 10, 2014 776 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
February 7, 2014 775 EXHIBITS by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 2, # 2 Exhibit Tab 3, # 3 Exhibit Tab 4, # 4 Exhibit Tab 5, # 5 Exhibit Tab 6, # 6 Exhibit Tab 7, # 7 Exhibit Tab 8, # 8 Exhibit Tab 9, # 9 Exhibit Tab 10, # 10 Exhibit Tab 11, # 11 Exhibit Tab 12, # 12 Exhibit Tab 13, # 13 Exhibit Tab 14, # 14 Exhibit Tab 15, # 15 Exhibit Tab 16, # 16 Exhibit Tab 17, # 17 Exhibit Tab 18, # 18 Exhibit Tab 19, # 19 Exhibit Tab 20, # 20 Exhibit Tab 21, # 21 Exhibit Tab 22, # 22 Exhibit Tab 23)(Ford, Sammy)
February 7, 2014 774 EXHIBITS by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 1)(Ford, Sammy)
February 7, 2014 773 DECLARATION of Thomas William Gordon Lowe, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
February 7, 2014 772 DECLARATION of Matthew L.Tuccillo, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Ford, Sammy)
February 7, 2014 771 Sealed Event, filed.
February 5, 2014 770 Featured Case ORDER granting 768 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
February 5, 2014 769 Featured Case ORDER granting 766 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of 737 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 3/10/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
February 5, 2014 768 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2014. (Ford, Sammy)
February 4, 2014 767 NOTICE of Setting as to 739 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class. Parties notified. Class Certification Hearing set for 4/21/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
February 4, 2014 766 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP Holdings North America Limited, BP plc, Lord John Browne, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 3, 2014 765 Featured Case ORDER granting 762 Motion for Mike Brock to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
January 31, 2014 764 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
January 29, 2014 763 NOTICE of Appearance by Mike Brock on behalf of BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
January 29, 2014 762 MOTION for Mike Brock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2014. (Taylor, Thomas)
January 28, 2014 761 ANSWER to 102 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by David Rainey, filed.(Pringle, Lara)
January 22, 2014 759 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 22, 2014 758 STIPULATION re: Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed.(Muething, Brian)
January 21, 2014 760 Stipulation and Order granting 757 Stipulation. Answer due for BP plc 2/19/2014. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
January 21, 2014 757 STIPULATION by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
January 21, 2014 756 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL by David Rainey, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
January 21, 2014 755 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL by David Rainey, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
January 17, 2014 754 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Manger and Lara D. Pringle on behalf of David Rainey, filed. (Pringle, Lara)
January 10, 2014 753 SCHEDULING STIPULATION. It is HEREBY STIPULATED, that an opposition brief not to exceed fifty pages, exclusive of tables,exhibits, declarations, appendices and other ancillary supporting documents, shall be due February 7, 2014 and that the reply brief thereto such be subsequently due March, 10, 2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 10, 2014 752 SCHEDULING STIPULATION. The deadline for a Proposed Deposition Protocol Order is extended until February 24, 2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 10, 2014 751 Featured Case ORDER granting 744 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss is due 1/31/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
January 10, 2014 750 Featured Case ORDER granting 747 Houston Municipal Employees Pension System's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
January 10, 2014 749 Featured Case ORDER granting 746 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
January 10, 2014 748 Featured Case ORDER granting 745 Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief in Opposition to Amended Motion to Dismiss. Opposition Brief due 1/31/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
January 10, 2014 747 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
January 10, 2014 746 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Avalon Holdings, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
January 9, 2014 745 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss by The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
January 9, 2014 744 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss by Avalon Holdings, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McKey, Jamie)
January 9, 2014 743 STIPULATION re: MTD Opposition by HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
January 9, 2014 742 STIPULATION re: Depo Protocol by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Board of Education Retirement System, New York City Employees' Retirement System, New York City Fire Department Pension Fund, New York City Group Trust, New York City Police Pension Fund, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
January 6, 2014 741 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
January 6, 2014 740 DECLARATION of Richard W. Mithoff re: 739 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Edling, Matthew)
January 6, 2014 739 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Compendium of Unreported Authorities, # 3 Proposed Order)(Edling, Matthew)
January 6, 2014 738 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Defendant's re: 737 MOTION to Dismiss 707 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier)(Taylor, Thomas)
January 6, 2014 737 MOTION to Dismiss 707 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by BP plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
December 31, 2013 736 STIPULATION re: Scheduling by BP plc, filed.(Taylor, Thomas) (Main Document 736 replaced on 12/31/2013) (sloewe, 4).
December 26, 2013 735 SUPPLEMENT to 718 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 23, 2013 732 REDACTION to 718 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 7 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 8 Exhibit D to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 9 Exhibit E to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 10 Exhibit F to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 11 Exhibit G to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 12 Exhibit H to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 13 Exhibit I to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 14 Exhibit J to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 15 Exhibit K to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 16 Exhibit L to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 17 Exhibit M to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 18 Exhibit N to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 19 Exhibit O to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 20 Exhibit P to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 21 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 22 Exhibit R to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 23 Exhibit S to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 24 Exhibit T to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 25 Exhibit U to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 26 Exhibit V to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 27 Exhibit W to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 28 Exhibit X to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 29 Exhibit Y to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 30 Exhibit Z to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 31 Exhibit AA to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 32 Exhibit BB to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 33 Exhibit CC to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 34 Exhibit DD to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier)(Taylor, Thomas)
December 23, 2013 731 REDACTION to 717 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
December 20, 2013 734 Stipulation and Order; Answer due for David Rainey to First Amended Consolidated Complaint by 1/28/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 20, 2013 733 Featured Case ORDER granting 729 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal and Order. Attorney Jason S Cowart terminated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 20, 2013 730 Featured Case SCHEDULING/ DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Renewed Motion for Class Certification due 1/6/2014. Opposition to Class Certification due 2/14/2014. Reply on Motion for Class Certification. Fact Discovery due 1/31/2014. Pltf Expert Report due by 3/17/2014. Deft Expert Report due by 4/29/2014. Discovery due by 5/29/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/5/2014. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/5/2014. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2014. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/14/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 20, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/20/2013. The Court will allow the extension and enter an amended scheduling order. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman).(Court Reporter: Slavin), filed.(sloewe, 4)
December 20, 2013 729 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal and Order by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Employees' Retirement System, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, State-Boston Retirement System, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed. (Ford, Sammy)
December 19, 2013 728 NOTICE of Setting as to 725 Notice (Other). Parties notified. Status Conference set for 12/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe, 4)
December 18, 2013 727 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Response to Amended Complaint (4:12-cv-1837 Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, et al v. BP p.l.c.)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 18, 2013 726 Joint RESPONSE to 725 Notice (Other) Defendants' Letter of December 17, 2013, filed by Robert Ludlow, New York State Common Retirement Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Mithoff, Richard)
December 17, 2013 725 NOTICE of Request for Telephonic Conference by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
December 17, 2013 724 REDACTION to 715 Answer to Amended Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 16, 2013 723 STIPULATION re: RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 13, 2013 722 REDACTION to 716 Answer to Amended Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 11, 2013 721 Featured Case ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
December 11, 2013 718 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
December 11, 2013 717 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
December 11, 2013 716 ANSWER to 453 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Andy Inglis, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 11, 2013 715 ANSWER to 439 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
December 10, 2013 720 Featured Case SCHEDULING/ DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 10, 2013 719 Stipulation and Order in Advance of Motion to Dismiss Briefing re: 713 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 9, 2013 714 Letter to Court by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, HESTA Super Fund, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement)(Ford, Sammy)
December 6, 2013 713 STIPULATION re: Order in Advance of Motion to Dismiss by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Avalon Holdings, Inc., Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, HESTA Super Fund, KBC Asset Management NV, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Employees' Retirement System, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
December 6, 2013 712 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Docket Control Order, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
December 6, 2013 711 PROPOSED ORDER re Steering Committee For MDL, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
December 6, 2013 710 Letter to Court by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Avalon Holdings, Inc., Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, HESTA Super Fund, KBC Asset Management NV, Mondrian All Countries WOrld Ex-US Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Focused International Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Global Equity Fund, L.P., Mondrian Group Trust, Mondrian International Equity Fund, L.P., New York City Employees' Retirement System, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, South Yorkshire Pensions Authority, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa, Stichting Aandelenfonds Mn Services Europa III, Stichting Pensioenfonds Metaal En Techniek, Stichting Pensioenfonds van de Metalelektro, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
December 6, 2013 709 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 652 Motion for Class Certification. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
December 5, 2013 708 NOTICE of Consent to File Amended Complaint by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. (Muething, Brian)
December 5, 2013 707 AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against BP plc filed by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio.(Muething, Brian)
December 5, 2013 706 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
November 26, 2013 705 Featured Case ORDER granting 703 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Brief in support of amended motion to dismiss may be up to 50 pages in length, exclusive of tables and cover.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 26, 2013 704 Featured Case ORDER granting 702 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended motion to dismiss due 12/11/2013. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 25, 2013 703 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 25, 2013 702 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Amended Motion To Dismiss by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 22, 2013 701 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 22, 2013 700 Featured Case STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 22, 2013 699 Featured Case ORDER granting 685 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will revise and reissue the Alameda County Order and Connecticut Order.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 22, 2013 698 STIPULATION re: PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
November 22, 2013 697 STIPULATION by David Rainey, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
November 20, 2013 696 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Charles Schwartz. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 11/18/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (mmapps, 4)
November 18, 2013 695 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard W. Mithoff. This is to order a transcript of Hearing on Class Certification held on 11/18/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original/expedited), filed. (jdav, 4)
November 18, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING held on 11/18/2013. Oral arguments made. The matter is under advisement. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman).(Court Reporter: Sanchez), filed.(sloewe, 4)
November 15, 2013 694 RESPONSE to 688 Defendant's Sur-reply in Further Opposition to 652 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (glyons, 4)
November 15, 2013 693 Featured Case ORDER granting 691 Motion for Leave to File Response.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 14, 2013 692 SUPPLEMENT to 664 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 14, 2013 691 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Sur-Reply by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
November 13, 2013 690 Featured Case ORDER granting 689 Motion to Supplement the Record.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
November 12, 2013 689 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement The Record as to 664 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 12, 2013 688 SURREPLY to 652 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles. (Attachments: # 1 Stulz Report, # 2 Appendix to Stulz Report)(Taylor, Thomas)
November 8, 2013 687 Featured Case ORDER granting 686 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
November 7, 2013 686 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Stultz Report, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
October 25, 2013 685 MOTION for Reconsideration of 678 Memorandum and Order by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
October 17, 2013 684 Featured Case ORDER granting 682 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended Motion to Dismiss is due 11/27/2013. Opposition to motion is due 1/17/2014. Replies are due 2/14/2014.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
October 16, 2013 682 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
October 15, 2013 683 Stipulation and Order on Time to Answer Complaints re: 681 Stipulation. Remaining defendants shall answer the complaints by 11/27/2013. Proposed case management order is due by 11/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
October 15, 2013 681 STIPULATION re: Time to Answer Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
October 11, 2013 680 Featured Case ORDER granting 676 Motion for Steven Buttacavoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
October 7, 2013 677 REPLY to Response to 652 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reiser Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reiser Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Reiser Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Reiser Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Reiser Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Reiser Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Reiser Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Reiser Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Reiser Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Reiser Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J to Reiser Declaration, # 12 Affidavit Conboy Declaration)(Mithoff, Richard)
October 4, 2013 676 MOTION for Steven Buttacavoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2013. (Yetter, R)
October 3, 2013 675 Featured Case ORDER granting 671 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons, 4)
October 1, 2013 671 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
September 30, 2013 679 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
September 30, 2013 678 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
September 30, 2013 674 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
September 30, 2013 673 Sealed Order, filed.
September 30, 2013 672 Sealed Order, filed.
September 5, 2013 670 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 28, 2013 669 Featured Case ORDER granting 668 Motion for Extension of Time; Reply in support of 652 MOTION to Certify Class due by 10/7/2013.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons)
August 28, 2013 668 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Filing of Class Certification Reply Brief by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
August 20, 2013 667 NOTICE of Setting as to 652 MOTION to Certify Class. Parties notified. Class Certification Hearing set for 11/18/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe)
August 16, 2013 666 NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED EXHIBITS TO THE EXPERT REPORT OF REN M. STULZ re: 664 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to the Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to the Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 15, 2013 665 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 659 Stipulation and Order, filed. (hler, )
August 14, 2013 664 RESPONSE in Opposition to 652 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Thomas W. Taylor, # 12 Affidavit Declaration of Karen Miller, # 13 Exhibit A to Declaration of Karen Miller, # 14 Exhibit B to Declaration of Karen Miller, # 15 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher J. Schoennagel, # 16 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey McGurk, # 17 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey McGurk, # 18 Exhibit Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 19 Appendix A to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 20 Appendix B to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 21 Appendix C to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 22 Exhibit 1 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 23 Exhibit 2 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 24 Exhibit 3 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 25 Exhibit 4 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 26 Exhibit 5 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 27 Exhibit 6 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 28 Exhibit 7 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz, # 29 Exhibit 8 to Expert Report of Rene M. Stulz)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 12, 2013 663 Featured Case ORDER granting 662 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota)
August 12, 2013 662 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 5, 2013 *** REMARK - address for attorney Kirk Hulett updated and Document 659 renoticed. (dwilkerson, )
August 5, 2013 661 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kirk B Hulett as to Sunmi Ahn, Thomas Yuen re: 659 Stipulation and Order, filed. (dwilkerson, )
August 5, 2013 660 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber re: 659 Stipulation and Order, filed. (bcampos, )
July 30, 2013 659 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 658 stipulation. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ltien, )
July 29, 2013 658 AGREED STIPULATION by all parties, filed.(Taylor, Thomas) Modified on 7/29/2013 (klinds, ).
July 22, 2013 657 Featured Case ORDER granting 655 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
July 18, 2013 656 MOTION for Alexia Koritz to Appear as Attorney by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
July 18, 2013 655 MOTION for Alexia Koritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
July 1, 2013 654 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Imtiaz A. Siddiqui by Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, filed. (Edling, Matthew)
June 14, 2013 653 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, filed. (Garza, Bernardo)
June 14, 2013 652 MOTION to Certify Class by Thomas P DiNapoli, Paul Huyck, Peter D. Lichtman, Robert Ludlow, Leslie J. Nakagiri, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit Mithoff Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G)(Mithoff, Richard)
June 13, 2013 651 Featured Case ORDER granting 627 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
June 13, 2013 650 Amended Unopposed Order Concerning Depositions(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons)
June 12, 2013 649 Amended PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Depositions, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 11, 2013 648 Featured Case ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
June 7, 2013 647 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: 645 Proposed Order by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 6, 2013 646 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Gregory M Utter. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 5/10/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison (original), filed. (vcantu)
June 4, 2013 645 Unopposed PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Depositions, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
June 4, 2013 644 RESPONSE to 619 MOTION to Amend 605 Memorandum and Order filed by BP plc. (Taylor, Thomas)
June 4, 2013 643 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Edmund John Philip Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles filed by Shell Pension Trust, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System.(Kendall, Joe)
June 4, 2013 642 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Edmund John Philip Browne, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles filed by Avalon Holdings, Inc., BNP Paribas Investment Partners Belgium NV/SA, Bayerninvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft, MBH, Caisse de Depot El Placement Du Quebec, City of Westminster Council Superannuation Fund, Cumbria County Council, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund, Lincolnshire County Council, London Borough of Redbridge Pension Fund, Metzler Investment GmbH, Nomura Trust and Banking Co., Ltd., Northern Ireland Local Government Officers' Superannuation Committee, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Co., Nykredit Asset Management, Ontario Pension Board, Orange County Employees Retirement System, Premier LTD, San Mateo County Employees' Retirement Association, Shell Pension Trust, Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York, The Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan, The Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, Utah Retirement Systems, Xerox Pensions Limited.(Kendall, Joe)
June 4, 2013 638 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber re: 626 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (amwilliams, )
June 3, 2013 641 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lionel Howard Sutton, III as to Cody A Nedved re: 626 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (RTS)(sguevara, )
June 3, 2013 640 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 626 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed.(RTS)(sguevara, )
June 3, 2013 639 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bruce C. Howard as to Edward F. Mineman re: 626 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed.(RTS)(sguevara, )
June 3, 2013 637 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kirk B Hulett as to re: 626 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (ckrus, )
May 31, 2013 635 MOTION for Jeroen van Kwawegen, Mark Lebovitch, Amy Miller, and Jeremy Friedman to Withdraw as Attorney by Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2013. (van Kwawegen, Jeroen)
May 31, 2013 634 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Kathryn B. Allen by KBC Asset Management NV, filed. (Allen, Kathryn)
May 30, 2013 633 REDACTION to 628 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia Lucier, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W, # 28 Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Y, # 30 Exhibit Z, # 31 Exhibit AA, # 32 Exhibit BB, # 33 Exhibit CC, # 34 Exhibit DD, # 35 Exhibit EE, # 36 Exhibit FF, # 37 Exhibit GG, # 38 Exhibit HH, # 39 Exhibit II, # 40 Affidavit Declaration of Martin Moore, # 41 Exhibit 1, # 42 Exhibit 2, # 43 Exhibit 2-1, # 44 Exhibit 2-2, # 45 Exhibit 2-3, # 46 Exhibit 2-4, # 47 Exhibit 2-5, # 48 Exhibit 2-6, # 49 Exhibit 2-7, # 50 Exhibit 2-8, # 51 Exhibit 2-9, # 52 Exhibit 2-10, # 53 Exhibit 2-11, # 54 Exhibit 2-12, # 55 Exhibit 2-13, # 56 Exhibit 2-14, # 57 Exhibit 2-15, # 58 Exhibit 2-16, # 59 Exhibit 2-17, # 60 Exhibit 2-18, # 61 Exhibit 2-19, # 62 Exhibit 2-20, # 63 Exhibit 2-21, # 64 Exhibit 2-22, # 65 Exhibit 2-23, # 66 Exhibit 2-24, # 67 Exhibit 2-25, # 68 Exhibit 2-26, # 69 Exhibit 2-27, # 70 Exhibit 2-28, # 71 Exhibit 2-29, # 72 Exhibit 2-30, # 73 Exhibit 2-31, # 74 Exhibit 2-32, # 75 Exhibit 2-33, # 76 Exhibit 2-34, # 77 Exhibit 2-35)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 30, 2013 632 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 617 Order, filed. (hler, )
May 29, 2013 631 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Kathleen Goodhart. This is to order a transcript of Hearing proceedings held on 5/10/13 before Judge Keith P Ellison (Copy). Court Reporter/Transcriber: G Dye, filed. (smurdock, )
May 21, 2013 630 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 20, 2013 629 MEMORANDUM in Support Defendant David Rainey's Memorandum of Law in Support of re: 627 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints by David Rainey, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 20, 2013 628 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
May 20, 2013 627 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 20, 2013 626 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 621 Transcript, 622 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr)
May 17, 2013 625 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jarrell Edward Godfrey, Jr as to Victor Skomedal re: 582 Scheduling Order,,,, filed.RTS; UTF)(sguevara, )
May 17, 2013 624 Featured Case ORDER granting 623 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota)
May 17, 2013 623 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
May 17, 2013 622 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing regarding 4:12-CV-1837 held on May 10, 2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2013., filed. (gdye, )
May 17, 2013 621 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on May 10, 2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2013., filed. (gdye, )
May 14, 2013 620 MEMORANDUM in Support re: 619 MOTION to Amend 605 Memorandum and Order by Robert R Glenn, filed.(Gill, Jacob)
May 14, 2013 619 MOTION to Amend 605 Memorandum and Order by Robert R Glenn, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gill, Jacob)
May 9, 2013 617 Stipulation and Order re: Dismissal of Action(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons)
May 9, 2013 616 NOTICE of Appearance of Matthew L. Tuccillo by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, State-Boston Retirement System, filed. (Ford, Sammy)
May 9, 2013 615 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Mustokoff on behalf of City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Public Employees Retirement Association of Colorado, filed. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
May 9, 2013 614 NOTICE Corrected Notice of Appearance by Jason S. Cowart by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, State-Boston Retirement System, filed. (Cowart, Jason)
May 9, 2013 613 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Cowart on behalf of Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, State-Boston Retirement System, filed. (Cowart, Jason)
May 9, 2013 612 STIPULATION of Dismissal Agreed Stipulation and Order RE: Dismissal of Action by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Oregon Public Employee Retirement Board, State of Oregon, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
May 9, 2013 611 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc I. Gross on behalf of Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, State-Boston Retirement System, filed. (Gross, Marc)
May 8, 2013 618 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-7) re: transfer of case 1:13cv2551 from Southern District of New York. (ltien, )
April 30, 2013 610 Featured Case ORDER granting 608 Motion for Patrick J Somers to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons)
April 29, 2013 609 Unopposed MOTION to Modify MOTION TO REVISE THE SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS ANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
April 19, 2013 608 MOTION for Patrick J. Somers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/10/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 19, 2013 607 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Somers on behalf of Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 19, 2013 606 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 16, 2013 604 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Thomas P Soesman, filed. (McKenna, Thomas)
April 16, 2013 603 Featured Case ORDER granting 601 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
April 12, 2013 605 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
April 12, 2013 602 REDACTION to 594 Sealed Event by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Georgia L. Lucier, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Martin L. Moore, QC)(Taylor, Thomas)
April 11, 2013 601 MOTION for Amanda F. Davidoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 5, 2013 600 ANSWER to Complaint by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 4, 2013 598 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Patrice Lyn Bishop as to Edward F. Mineman re: 474 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (gsalinas)
April 2, 2013 597 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Roberto Finzi re: 582 Scheduling Order, filed. (rosaldana)
April 1, 2013 599 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber re: 582 Scheduling Order, filed. (mlothmann, )
April 1, 2013 596 JOINDER DEFENDANT ANDREW INGLIS JOINDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS, filed by Andrew G Inglis. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 1, 2013 595 REPLY in Support of 507 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints, filed by David Rainey. (Taylor, Thomas)
April 1, 2013 594 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
March 29, 2013 593 Featured Case ORDER granting 590 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
March 29, 2013 592 Featured Case ORDER granting 587 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
March 28, 2013 591 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Patrice Lyn Bishop as to Edward F. Mineman re: 582 Scheduling Order,,,, filed. (ccarnew, )
March 27, 2013 590 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File CONSOLIDATED OVER-LENGTH REPLY BRIEFS IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/17/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
March 25, 2013 589 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Thomas W. Taylor. This is to order a transcript of Civil held on 2/22/2013 before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sguevara, )
March 22, 2013 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint due by 4/5/2013. (kpicota, )
March 22, 2013 587 MOTION for Bryan A. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A Cordray, Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2013. (Yetter, R)
March 21, 2013 588 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
March 21, 2013 586 STIPULATION by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Richard A Cordray, David Rainey, Thomas P DiNapoli, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert Ludlow, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 21, 2013 585 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Patrice Lyn Bishop re: 474 Notice of Filing of Official Transcri. Address updated and renoticed., filed. (isoto)
March 20, 2013 583 Agreed Order Protecting Confidentiality (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(amaly)
March 19, 2013 584 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 580 Stipulation (Answer due by 5/20/2013, Opposition to motion due 7/12/2013, Defendants' reply in further support of the motion due by 8/19/2013)((Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
March 19, 2013 581 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 19, 2013 580 STIPULATION by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Anthony Hayward, KBC Asset Management NV, Douglas J Suttles, Union Asset Management Holding AG, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 18, 2013 582 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 20 days. Jury trial. Pltf Motion for Class Certification due by 6/14/2013. Deft Opposition to Class Certification due by 8/14/2013.Pltf reply on Motion for Class Certification due by 9/27/2013. Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2013. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/9/2014. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/9/2014. Deft Expert Witness List due by 2/21/2014. Deft Expert Report due by 2/21/2014. Expert Discovery due by 3/21/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/28/2014. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/28/2014. Oppositions to Dispositive and Non-dispositive motions due by 5/16/2014. Replies on Dispositive and Non-dispositive motions due by 6/9/2014. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/18/2014. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
March 18, 2013 579 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Patrice Lyn Bishop re: 505 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed. (mlothmann, )
March 15, 2013 578 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling/Docket Control Order, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
March 11, 2013 577 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims of DNB Asset S.A., DNB Asset Management A.S. and Carlson Fonder AB are hereby dismissed from this cause of action. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(glyons)
March 8, 2013 576 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
March 6, 2013 575 NOTICE of Change of Statutory Litigation Counsel by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, filed. (Yetter, R)
March 5, 2013 574 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe)
March 5, 2013 573 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe )
February 27, 2013 572 STIPULATION by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP Holdings North America Limited, BP plc, Lord John Browne, David Rainey, Robert W Dudley, Byron E Grote, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Shell Pension Trust, Peter Sutherland, Douglas J Suttles, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 27, 2013 571 NOTICE of Recent Authority by Robert Ludlow, filed. (Molumphy, Mark)
February 26, 2013 570 EXHIBITS re: 569 Declaration,,,,,,, by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 56, # 2 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 57, # 3 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 58, # 4 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 59, # 5 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 60, # 6 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 61, # 7 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 62, # 8 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 63, # 9 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 64)(Ford, Sammy)
February 26, 2013 569 DECLARATION of Thomas Williams Lowe, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Annex 1, # 2 Exhibit Annex 2, # 3 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 1, # 4 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 2, # 5 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 3, # 6 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 4, # 7 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 5, # 8 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 6, # 9 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 7, # 10 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 8, # 11 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 9, # 12 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 10, # 13 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 11, # 14 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 12, # 15 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 13, # 16 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 14, # 17 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 15, # 18 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 16, # 19 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 17, # 20 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 18, # 21 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 19, # 22 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 20, # 23 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 21, # 24 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 22, # 25 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 23, # 26 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 24, # 27 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 25, # 28 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 26, # 29 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 27, # 30 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 28, # 31 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 29, # 32 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 30, # 33 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 31, # 34 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 32, # 35 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 33, # 36 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 34, # 37 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 35, # 38 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 36, # 39 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 37, # 40 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 38, # 41 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 39, # 42 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 40, # 43 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 41, # 44 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 42, # 45 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 43, # 46 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 44, # 47 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 45, # 48 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 46, # 49 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 47, # 50 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 48, # 51 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 49, # 52 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 50, # 53 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 51, # 54 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 52, # 55 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 53, # 56 Exhibit Annex 2 - Tab 54)(Ford, Sammy)
February 25, 2013 568 MEMORANDUM Opposition re: 507 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association, Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
February 22, 2013 567 Featured Case ORDER granting 561 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
February 22, 2013 565 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER AGREED ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIALITY, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 22, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2013. Arguments are made regarding schedule. The Court will send out a trial date. Appearances:(Law Clerk: Stephanie Bauman) Appearances on the record..(Court Reporter: Warner), filed.(sloewe)
February 21, 2013 566 Featured Case ORDER granting 553 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe )
February 21, 2013 564 Featured Case ORDER granting 559 Motion for Theodore V. Wells, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 21, 2013 563 Featured Case ORDER granting 557 Motion for Samson Enzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 21, 2013 562 Featured Case ORDER granting 555 Motion for Roberto Finzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 21, 2013 561 MOTION for Daniel E. Barenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A Cordray, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2013. (Yetter, R)
February 21, 2013 560 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER AGREED ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIALITY, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 559 MOTION for Theodore V. Wells Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 558 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore V. Wells Jr on behalf of Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 557 MOTION for Samson Enzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 556 NOTICE of Appearance by Samson Enzer on behalf of Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 555 MOTION for Roberto Finzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 554 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Finzi on behalf of Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 553 MOTION for Jaren Janghorbani to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Suttles, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2013. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 552 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaren Janghorbani on behalf of Douglas J Suttles, filed. (Taylor, Thomas)
February 19, 2013 551 DECLARATION of Thomas William Gordon Lowe QC re: 550 Sealed Event, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Annex 1, # 2 Annex 2, # 3 Annex 2 - Tab 1, # 4 Annex 2 - Tab 2, # 5 Annex 2 - Tab 3, # 6 Annex 2 - Tab 4, # 7 Annex 2 - Tab 5, # 8 Annex 2 - Tab 6, # 9 Annex 2 - Tab 7, # 10 Annex 2 - Tab 8, # 11 Annex 2 - Tab 9, # 12 Annex 2 - Tab 10, # 13 Annex 2 - Tab 11, # 14 Annex 2 - Tab 12, # 15 Annex 2 - Tab 13, # 16 Annex 2 - Tab 14, # 17 Annex 2 - Tab 15, # 18 Annex 2 - Tab 16, # 19 Annex 2 - Tab 17, # 20 Annex 2 - Tab 18, # 21 Annex 2 - Tab 19, # 22 Annex 2 - Tab 20, # 23 Annex 2 - Tab 21, # 24 Annex 2 - Tab 22, # 25 Annex 2 - Tab 23, # 26 Annex 2 - Tab 24, # 27 Annex 2 - Tab 25, # 28 Annex 2 - Tab 26, # 29 Annex 2 - Tab 27, # 30 Annex 2 - Tab 28, # 31 Annex 2 - Tab 29, # 32 Annex 2 - Tab 30, # 33 Annex 2 - Tab 31, # 34 Annex 2 - Tab 32, # 35 Annex 2 - Tab 33, # 36 Annex 2 - Tab 34, # 37 Annex 2 - Tab 35, # 38 Annex 2 - Tab 36, # 39 Annex 2 - Tab 37, # 40 Annex 2 - Tab 38, # 41 Annex 2 - Tab 39, # 42 Annex 2 - Tab 40, # 43 Annex 2 - Tab 41, # 44 Annex 2 - Tab 42, # 45 Annex 2 - Tab 43, # 46 Annex 2 - Tab 44, # 47 Annex 2 - Tab 45)(Mustokoff, Matthew)
February 19, 2013 550 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
February 19, 2013 549 RESPONSE in Opposition to 507 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints, filed by Ohio Police & Fire Pension Fund, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Muething, Brian)
February 19, 2013 547 Featured Case ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
February 19, 2013 546 Featured Case ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
February 15, 2013 548 Featured Case DOCKETED IN ERROR. SEE DOC. 546 . [STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, ) Modified on 2/19/2013 (sloewe).
February 15, 2013 545 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, )
February 15, 2013 544 STIPULATION re: Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, State of Oregon, filed.(Gill, Jacob)
February 14, 2013 543 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Page Limitation, filed.(Muething, Brian)
February 11, 2013 542 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 538 Stipulation. Answer due for Defendant's 3/22/2013.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas)
February 11, 2013 541 Order of USCA; judgment issued as mandate 2/7/2013; USCA No. 12-20018. Judgment of the District Court is affirmed., filed.(amwilliams)
February 11, 2013 540 Order of USCA; judgment issued as mandate 2/7/13 re: 312 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 12-20018. Judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Plaintiff-appellant is to pay the appellees the costs on appeal., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Per Curiam)(glyons)
February 11, 2013 539 Record on Appeal Returned from the US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 312 Notice of Appeal, ; consisting of 1 envelope (USCA No. 12-20018), filed.(glyons)
February 11, 2013 538 STIPULATION by BP America Inc, BP Exploration & Production Inc, BP plc, Richard A Cordray, David Rainey, Thomas P DiNapoli, Robert W Dudley, Anthony Hayward, Andrew G Inglis, Robert Ludlow, Robert A Malone, H Lamar McKay, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, Douglas J Suttles, filed.(Taylor, Thomas)
February 8, 2013 537 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (sloewe)
February 6, 2013 536 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 360 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
February 4, 2013 535 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kirk B Hulett as to Sunmi Ahn re: 516 Order, filed. (bdaniel, )
February 4, 2013 534 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sarah P Weber as to Sunmi Ahn re: 516 Order, filed. (bdaniel, )
February 4, 2013 533 Featured Case ORDER granting 532 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven G Spears, Wilber H Boies and Aron J Frakes terminated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas)
January 28, 2013 532 MOTION for Wilber H. Boies, Aron Frakes, and Steven G. Spears to Withdraw as Attorney by State Street Bank and Trust Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Spears, Steven)
January 22, 2013 531 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles Robert Watkins re: 517 Order,, filed. (cfelchak)
January 22, 2013 530 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert D Allison & Associates, filed. (cfelchak)
January 17, 2013 529 NOTICE Notice of Recent Authority re: 447 Memorandum,, 506 Reply, by BP plc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Thomas)
January 17, 2013 528 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 527 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (sclement, )
January 16, 2013 527 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on November 29, 2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison. Court Reporter J. Sanchez. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2013., filed. (jsanchez, )
January 11, 2013 526 Featured Case AGREED ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIALITY granting 524 . (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas)
January 9, 2013 525 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Richard Mithoff. This is to order a transcript of a Civil Hearing held on 11/29/2012 before Judge Keith P Ellison (First Copy), filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 524 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
January 9, 2013 523 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Protecting Confidentiality, filed.(Ford, Sammy)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to Douglas J Suttles, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to Peter Sutherland, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to Andrew G Inglis, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to Lord John Browne, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to Robert A Malone, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to Robert W Dudley, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013 Summons Issued as to David Rainey, filed. (wbostic)
January 9, 2013