Clearline Technologies Ltd. v. Cooper B-Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clearline Technologies Ltd.
Defendant: Cooper Industries PLC, Cooper Technologies Company and Cooper B-Line, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01420
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 221 Renewed MOTION to Alter Judgment (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 205 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing Regarding Calculations of Post-Verdict Damages and Prejudgment Interest ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/18/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 156 MOTION for Enhanced Damages, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 155 MOTION Award of Interest, DENYING 159 MOTION to Amend, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING 184 O pposed MOTION for Supplemental Actual and Enhanced Damages Judgment, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 157 MOTION for Permanent Injunction,TERMINATING 181 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees, DENYING 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees, DENYING 161 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Judgment, DENYING 160 Renewed MOTION for (Matter of Law) Judgment (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 93 Sealed Event (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 59 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, granting 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fraud Claim.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 24 MOTION to Dismiss 17 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 26 MOTION to Dismiss 17 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clearline Technologies Ltd. v. Cooper B-Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries PLC
Represented By: Robin L Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Technologies Company
Represented By: Robin L Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper B-Line, Inc.
Represented By: Robin L Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clearline Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Robert D. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?