Electrostim Medical Services, Inc. v. Health Care Service Corporation
Plaintiff: Electrostim Medical Services, Inc.
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv02745
Filed: July 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: The motion for leave to amend, (Docket Entry No. 150), is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to dismiss, (Docket Entry No. 153), is granted in part, to require repleading as stated, without prejudice. The fifth amended complaint must be filed by September 29, 2017. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER entered: Electrostim must file the unredacted spreadsheets under seal and file in the public records a redacted version that removes personal identifiers but is otherwise complete, by September 18, 2017. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: The motion for leave to amend, (Docket Entry No. 136), is denied. Electrostim may file another motion for leave to amend with a proposed amended complaint that does not have the deficiencies identified in this Memorand um and Order. The motion for leave must be filed no later than June 30, 2017. After Electrostim files its motion for leave to file another amended complaint, Blue Cross may file any opposition in the usual course. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING 92 MOTION to Amend 90 Memorandum and Opinion, 91 Order of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Case closed on 8/2/13. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER entered: The court will address both sets of claims at the April 16, 2013 hearing. Counsel for the parties must be prepared to discuss the status of all claims and any outstanding motions at that hearing. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING 23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrostim Medical Services, Inc. v. Health Care Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrostim Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas S. Gregory
Represented By: Jose I Maldonado, Jr
Represented By: Jon Leonard McNeely
Represented By: Henry Dwayne Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Fairles MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?