Taylor v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Sheryl D Taylor
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv02929
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER entered: In light of this courts July 16, 2013 order staying these proceedings for 90 days, the deadline for the parties to submit their joint proposed pretrial order is set for January 17, 2014. Docket call is rescheduled for January 24, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11-B. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 23 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:12-cv-02929 and Member Case No. 4:13-cv-01719.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered clarifying the minute entry for the November 19, 2012 hearing and the status of Taylor's claims.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Rachel N LeMay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl D Taylor
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?