Bobby v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Paul Bobby
Defendant: Mistras Group, Inc. and Bayer Corporation
Case Number: 4:2012cv03417
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #19 Notice of Dismissal against Mistras Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas)
July 1, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Mistras Group, Inc. by Mistras Group, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order of Dismissal)(Fletcher, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2013 Filing 18 DOCKETED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. Please refer to docket entry # 19. NOTICE of Dismissal as to Mistras Group, Inc. by Mistras Group, Inc., filed. (Fletcher, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Stipulation of Dismissal of Bayer Corporation. Bayer Corporation terminated.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas)
May 13, 2013 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Bayer Corporation, Brian Paul Bobby, filed.(Moore, James)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 9/1/2013(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: March 2014. ETT: 3 days. Jury Trial. Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 3/8/2013 Pltf Expert Report due by 6/1/2013. Deft Expert Report due by 7/1/2013. Discovery due by 10/1/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/1/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2014. Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2014. Docket Call set for 2/28/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, )
March 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/8/2013. Scheduling dates entered, order to follow. Appearances: Patrick Ruzzo, James Moore, Alexander Burch, Elizabeth Fletcher..(Court Reporter: Barron), filed.(emares, )
March 4, 2013 Filing 13 STATEMENT Defendants' Joint Statement re: #9 Order Concerning Removal - FORM - Judge Gilmore by Bayer Corporation, filed.(Burch, Alexander)
March 4, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. (TIME CHANGE ONLY). (bthomas, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bayer Corporation, filed.(Burch, Alexander)
February 25, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Fletcher on behalf of Mistras Group, Inc., filed. (Fletcher, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Concerning Removal(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore, filed. Date change (emares, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 6 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bayer Corporation, filed.(Burch, Alexander)
December 10, 2012 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mistras Group, Inc., filed.(Zavitsanos, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 4 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Bayer Corporation, filed.(Moore, James)
November 27, 2012 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #2 Order for Initial Conference and Disclosure, by Bayer Corporation, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Bayer Corporation, filed.(Moore, James)
November 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedure) Parties notified.(hcarr)
November 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, 234th District, case number 2012-61557 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-10625870) filed by Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit B-8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobby v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mistras Group, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Pannill Fletcher
Represented By: John Zavitsanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: James L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Paul Bobby
Represented By: Patrick J Ruzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?