Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. v. Pacific Drilling SA et al

Plaintiff: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Defendant: Pacific Drilling SA, Pacific Drilling Services, Inc., Pacific Santa Ana S.A.R.L., Pacific Sharav S.A.R.L., Pacific Drilling, Inc. and Pacific Drilling Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv01088
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered: Pacific moved to stay this action pending the resolution of the inter partes review of the Transocean patents. (Docket Entry No. 149). Transocean is unopposed. Pacific's motion is granted. The case is administratively closed pe nding the outcome of the inter partes review. The pending motions, (Docket Entry Nos. 85, 86, 88, 89, 140), are denied, without prejudice. They may be resubmitted and modified, as appropriate, depending on the resolution of the inter partes review. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
December 7, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pacific's Summary Judgment Motions (Dkt Nos. 87, 89, 86, and 91) and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Expert (Dkt. No. 88). Responses are due by December 23, 2015. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 27, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER CONSTRUING DISPUTED CLAIMS entered: A Status Conference is set for 6/18/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. v. Pacific Drilling SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bruce Walker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Drilling SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Drilling Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Santa Ana S.A.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Sharav S.A.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Drilling Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?