Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. et al v. Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP et al
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Defendant: Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, KA Fund Advisors, LLC and Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP
Case Number: 4:2014cv01903
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 421 REPLY in Support of #413 MOTION for Entry of Judgment, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Powley, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 420 REPLY in Support of #414 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Judgment, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Carter, Winstol)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting #418 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to the Cross-Motions for Entry of Judgment (Replies due by 7/28/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 418 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to the Cross-Motions for Entry of Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
July 14, 2020 Filing 417 RESPONSE in Opposition to #414 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Judgment, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Powley, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 416 RESPONSE to #413 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Carter, Winstol)
June 23, 2020 Filing 415 MEMORANDUM of LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS KAYNE ANDERSON CAPITAL ADVISORS, L.P. AND KA FUND ADVISORS, LLCS MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOLLOWING REMAND re: #414 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed.(Carter, Winstol)
June 23, 2020 Filing 414 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
June 23, 2020 Filing 413 MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powley, Robert)
June 23, 2020 Filing 412 Report Regarding Mediation by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed.(Powley, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 411 Alternative Dispute Resolution Questionnaire provided to all parties of record, filed. (ccassadyadi, 4)
June 17, 2020 Filing 410 Alternative Dispute Resolution Memorandum; case not settled, filed. (Attachments: #1 Fee Report)(Soussan, Susan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 409 SUBMISSION of Mediator by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed.(Powley, Robert)
March 24, 2020 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Levy on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Levy, David)
March 24, 2020 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by Winstol D. Carter, Jr. on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Carter, Winstol)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER for Mediation. (Notice of Settlement or Name and Contact Information of Mediator due by 4/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 6, 2020 Filing 405 Copy of Bill of Costs by USCA in the amount of $262.95 against Kayne Anderson Caital, et al. (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dnoriega, 1)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Order of USCA - PER CURIAM re: #393 Notice of Appeal, #321 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, #396 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 18-20350. We VACATE the copyright infringement judgment and REMAND to the district court for further proceedings. The district court's fees and costs determinations are also VACATED. We AFFIRM the district court's denial of KA's 411(b) referral motion., filed.(dnoriega, 1)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Order of USCA - JUDGMENT; Judgment issued as mandate 2/6/2020 re: #393 Notice of Appeal, #321 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, #396 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 18-20350. the judgment of the district court is vacated, and the cause is remanded to the district court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Case reopened on 2/6/2020, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 28, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #321 Notice of Appeal, #393 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, #396 Notice of Appeal, to Galyn Dwight Gafford. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 26, 2018 Filing 402 Trial EXHIBITS by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Ankrom, Stephen)
November 26, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #321 Notice of Appeal, #393 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, #396 Notice of Appeal, to Andrew Grimm & Maria Calaf. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Order of USCA re: #396 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 18-20353. It is Ordered that the opposed motion of the appellees/cross appellants to supplement the record with Plaintiffs' Exhibit 525 is granted., filed.(dbenavides, 1)
November 23, 2018 Filing 400 Appeal Motion advising Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal and to Temporarily Abate the Briefing Schedule Pending Supplementation (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dbenavides, 1) Modified on 11/23/2018 (dbenavides, 1).
October 31, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #396 Notice of Appeal, to Stephen Ankrom,Robert L. Powley, and George R Gibson. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20615), filed.(dbenavides, 1)
October 2, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #396 Notice of Appeal, to Stephen Ankrom. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dbenavides, 1)
September 25, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #393 Notice of Appeal, to Jason Mueller. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20615), filed.(dbenavides, 1)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Order of USCA re: #393 Notice of Appeal, #321 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, #396 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 18-20350. The Court has granted the motion to consolidate and the motion to suspend the briefing schedule in 18-20350. Briefing will resume once the record is filed in 18-20615, filed.(scastillo, 1)
September 13, 2018 Filing 398 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Stephen M. Ankrom. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding 4/14/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 7/18/2017 Scheduling Conference before Judge Lake, 10/12/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 12/4/2017 Trial Vol. 1 before Judge Lake, 12/5/2017 Trial Vol. 2 before Judge Lake, 12/6/2017 Trial Vol. 3 before Judge Lake, 12/7/2017 Trial Vol. 4 before Judge Lake.. (No transcript is needed). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz. This order form relates to the following: #396 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(Ankrom, Stephen)
September 10, 2018 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20615 re: #396 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
August 31, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #396 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(mperez, 1)
August 31, 2018 Filing 397 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #396 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (mperez, 1)
August 30, 2018 Filing 396 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #392 Final Judgment, #391 Memorandum and Opinion by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20779846), filed.(Ankrom, Stephen)
August 30, 2018 Electronic Access to Supplemental Record on Appeal Provided re: #393 Notice of Appeal, to Stephen Ankrom; George Gibson; W. Scott Hastings; Jason Mueller; Robert Powley. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dnoriega, 1)
August 30, 2018 Supplemental Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #393 Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 18-20350, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
August 15, 2018 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20350 re: #393 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
August 15, 2018 Filing 395 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by W. Scott Hastings. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding 4/14/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 7/18/2017 Scheduling Conference before Judge Lake, 10/12/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 12/4/2017 Trial Vol. 1 before Judge Lake, 12/5/2017 Trial Vol. 2 before Judge Lake, 12/6/2017 Trial Vol. 3 before Judge Lake, 12/7/2017 Trial Vol. 4 before Judge Lake. (No transcript is needed). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz. This order form relates to the following: #393 Notice of Appeal,, filed. (Hastings, William)
August 10, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #393 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid. Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed. (rnieto, 1)
August 10, 2018 Filing 394 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #393 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 NOA) (rnieto, 1)
August 9, 2018 Filing 393 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #392 Final Judgment, #391 Memorandum and Opinion by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20630965), filed.(Mueller, Jason)
August 1, 2018 Filing 392 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #314 MOTION for Costs (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 9, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #321 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, to Stephen Ankrom; George Gibson; W. Scott Hastings; Jason Mueller & Robert Powley. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20350), filed.(dnoriega, 1)
July 9, 2018 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #321 Notice of Appeal, #317 Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 18-20350, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
June 26, 2018 Filing 390 SUR-REPLY to #314 MOTION for Costs, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (aboyd, 4)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #347 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply Opposing Kayne's Motion For Costs (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 25, 2018 Filing 388 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2556, #2 Exhibit 2557, #3 Exhibit 2558, #4 Exhibit 2559, #5 Exhibit 2560, #6 Exhibit 2561, #7 Exhibit 2562, #8 Exhibit 2563, #9 Exhibit 2564, #10 Exhibit 2565, #11 Exhibit 2566, #12 Exhibit 2567, #13 Exhibit 2568, #14 Exhibit 2569, #15 Exhibit 2570, #16 Exhibit 2571, #17 Exhibit 2572, #18 Exhibit 2573, #19 Exhibit 2574, #20 Exhibit 2575, #21 Exhibit 2576, #22 Exhibit 2577, #23 Exhibit 2578, #24 Exhibit 2579, #25 Exhibit 2580, #26 Exhibit 2593)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 387 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2489, #2 Exhibit 2490, #3 Exhibit 2491, #4 Exhibit 2492, #5 Exhibit 2493, #6 Exhibit 2494, #7 Exhibit 2495, #8 Exhibit 2496, #9 Exhibit 2497, #10 Exhibit 2498, #11 Exhibit 2499, #12 Exhibit 2500, #13 Exhibit 2501, #14 Exhibit 2502, #15 Exhibit 2503, #16 Exhibit 2504, #17 Exhibit 2505, #18 Exhibit 2506, #19 Exhibit 2507, #20 Exhibit 2508, #21 Exhibit 2509, #22 Exhibit 2510, #23 Exhibit 2511, #24 Exhibit 2512, #25 Exhibit 2513, #26 Exhibit 2514, #27 Exhibit 2515, #28 Exhibit 2516, #29 Exhibit 2517, #30 Exhibit 2518, #31 Exhibit 2519, #32 Exhibit 2520, #33 Exhibit 2521, #34 Exhibit 2522, #35 Exhibit 2523, #36 Exhibit 2524, #37 Exhibit 2525, #38 Exhibit 2526, #39 Exhibit 2527, #40 Exhibit 2528, #41 Exhibit 2529, #42 Exhibit 2530, #43 Exhibit 2531, #44 Exhibit 2532, #45 Exhibit 2533, #46 Exhibit 2534, #47 Exhibit 2535, #48 Exhibit 2536, #49 Exhibit 2537, #50 Exhibit 2538, #51 Exhibit 2539, #52 Exhibit 2540, #53 Exhibit 2541, #54 Exhibit 2542, #55 Exhibit 2543, #56 Exhibit 2544, #57 Exhibit 2545, #58 Exhibit 2546, #59 Exhibit 2547, #60 Exhibit 2548, #61 Exhibit 2549, #62 Exhibit 2550, #63 Exhibit 2551, #64 Exhibit 2552, #65 Exhibit 2553, #66 Exhibit 2554)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 386 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2406, #2 Exhibit 2407, #3 Exhibit 2408, #4 Exhibit 2409, #5 Exhibit 2410, #6 Exhibit 2411, #7 Exhibit 2412, #8 Exhibit 2413, #9 Exhibit 2414, #10 Exhibit 2415, #11 Exhibit 2416, #12 Exhibit 2417, #13 Exhibit 2418, #14 Exhibit 2419, #15 Exhibit 2420, #16 Exhibit 2421, #17 Exhibit 2422, #18 Exhibit 2423, #19 Exhibit 2424, #20 Exhibit 2425, #21 Exhibit 2426, #22 Exhibit 2427, #23 Exhibit 2428, #24 Exhibit 2429, #25 Exhibit 2430, #26 Exhibit 2431, #27 Exhibit 2432, #28 Exhibit 2433, #29 Exhibit 2434, #30 Exhibit 2435, #31 Exhibit 2436, #32 Exhibit 2437, #33 Exhibit 2438, #34 Exhibit 2439, #35 Exhibit 2440, #36 Exhibit 2441, #37 Exhibit 2442, #38 Exhibit 2443, #39 Exhibit 2444, #40 Exhibit 2445, #41 Exhibit 2446, #42 Exhibit 2447, #43 Exhibit 2448, #44 Exhibit 2449, #45 Exhibit 2450, #46 Exhibit 2451, #47 Exhibit 2452, #48 Exhibit 2453, #49 Exhibit 2454, #50 Exhibit 2455, #51 Exhibit 2456, #52 Exhibit 2457, #53 Exhibit 2458, #54 Exhibit 2459, #55 Exhibit 2460, #56 Exhibit 2461, #57 Exhibit 2462, #58 Exhibit 2463, #59 Exhibit 2464, #60 Exhibit 2465, #61 Exhibit 2466, #62 Exhibit 2467, #63 Exhibit 2468, #64 Exhibit 2469, #65 Exhibit 2470, #66 Exhibit 2471, #67 Exhibit 2472, #68 Exhibit 2473, #69 Exhibit 2474, #70 Exhibit 2475, #71 Exhibit 2476, #72 Exhibit 2477, #73 Exhibit 2478, #74 Exhibit 2479, #75 Exhibit 2480, #76 Exhibit 2481, #77 Exhibit 2482, #78 Exhibit 2483, #79 Exhibit 2484, #80 Exhibit 2485, #81 Exhibit 2486, #82 Exhibit 2487)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 385 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2322, #2 Exhibit 2323, #3 Exhibit 2324, #4 Exhibit 2325, #5 Exhibit 2326, #6 Exhibit 2327, #7 Exhibit 2328, #8 Exhibit 2329, #9 Exhibit 2330, #10 Exhibit 2331, #11 Exhibit 2332, #12 Exhibit 2333, #13 Exhibit 2334, #14 Exhibit 2335, #15 Exhibit 2336, #16 Exhibit 2337, #17 Exhibit 2338, #18 Exhibit 2339, #19 Exhibit 2340, #20 Exhibit 2341, #21 Exhibit 2342, #22 Exhibit 2343, #23 Exhibit 2344, #24 Exhibit 2345, #25 Exhibit 2346, #26 Exhibit 2347, #27 Exhibit 2348, #28 Exhibit 2349, #29 Exhibit 2350, #30 Exhibit 2351, #31 Exhibit 2352, #32 Exhibit 2353, #33 Exhibit 2354, #34 Exhibit 2355, #35 Exhibit 2356, #36 Exhibit 2357, #37 Exhibit 2358, #38 Exhibit 2359, #39 Exhibit 2360, #40 Exhibit 2361, #41 Exhibit 2362, #42 Exhibit 2363, #43 Exhibit 2364, #44 Exhibit 2365, #45 Exhibit 2366, #46 Exhibit 2367, #47 Exhibit 2368, #48 Exhibit 2369, #49 Exhibit 2370, #50 Exhibit 2371, #51 Exhibit 2372, #52 Exhibit 2373, #53 Exhibit 2374, #54 Exhibit 2375, #55 Exhibit 2376, #56 Exhibit 2377, #57 Exhibit 2378, #58 Exhibit 2379, #59 Exhibit 2380, #60 Exhibit 2381, #61 Exhibit 2382, #62 Exhibit 2383, #63 Exhibit 2384, #64 Exhibit 2385, #65 Exhibit 2386, #66 Exhibit 2387, #67 Exhibit 2388, #68 Exhibit 2389, #69 Exhibit 2390, #70 Exhibit 2391, #71 Exhibit 2392, #72 Exhibit 2393, #73 Exhibit 2394, #74 Exhibit 2395, #75 Exhibit 2396, #76 Exhibit 2397, #77 Exhibit 2398, #78 Exhibit 2399, #79 Exhibit 2400, #80 Exhibit 2401, #81 Exhibit 2402, #82 Exhibit 2403, #83 Exhibit 2404)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 384 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2269, #2 Exhibit 2270, #3 Exhibit 2271, #4 Exhibit 2272, #5 Exhibit 2273, #6 Exhibit 2274, #7 Exhibit 2275, #8 Exhibit 2276, #9 Exhibit 2277, #10 Exhibit 2278, #11 Exhibit 2279, #12 Exhibit 2280, #13 Exhibit 2281, #14 Exhibit 2282, #15 Exhibit 2283, #16 Exhibit 2284, #17 Exhibit 2285, #18 Exhibit 2286, #19 Exhibit 2287, #20 Exhibit 2288, #21 Exhibit 2289, #22 Exhibit 2290, #23 Exhibit 2291, #24 Exhibit 2292, #25 Exhibit 2293, #26 Exhibit 2294, #27 Exhibit 2295, #28 Exhibit 2296, #29 Exhibit 2297, #30 Exhibit 2298, #31 Exhibit 2299, #32 Exhibit 2300, #33 Exhibit 2301, #34 Exhibit 2302, #35 Exhibit 2303, #36 Exhibit 2304, #37 Exhibit 2305, #38 Exhibit 2306, #39 Exhibit 2307, #40 Exhibit 2308, #41 Exhibit 2309, #42 Exhibit 2310, #43 Exhibit 2311, #44 Exhibit 2312, #45 Exhibit 2313, #46 Exhibit 2314, #47 Exhibit 2315, #48 Exhibit 2316, #49 Exhibit 2317, #50 Exhibit 2318, #51 Exhibit 2319, #52 Exhibit 2320)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 383 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2221, #2 Exhibit 2222, #3 Exhibit 2223, #4 Exhibit 2224, #5 Exhibit 2225, #6 Exhibit 2226, #7 Exhibit 2227, #8 Exhibit 2228, #9 Exhibit 2229, #10 Exhibit 2230, #11 Exhibit 2231, #12 Exhibit 2232, #13 Exhibit 2233, #14 Exhibit 2234, #15 Exhibit 2235, #16 Exhibit 2236, #17 Exhibit 2237, #18 Exhibit 2238, #19 Exhibit 2239, #20 Exhibit 2240, #21 Exhibit 2241, #22 Exhibit 2242, #23 Exhibit 2243, #24 Exhibit 2244, #25 Exhibit 2245, #26 Exhibit 2246, #27 Exhibit 2247, #28 Exhibit 2248, #29 Exhibit 2249, #30 Exhibit 2250, #31 Exhibit 2251, #32 Exhibit 2252, #33 Exhibit 2253, #34 Exhibit 2254, #35 Exhibit 2255, #36 Exhibit 2256, #37 Exhibit 2257, #38 Exhibit 2258, #39 Exhibit 2259, #40 Exhibit 2260, #41 Exhibit 2261, #42 Exhibit 2262, #43 Exhibit 2263, #44 Exhibit 2264, #45 Exhibit 2265, #46 Exhibit 2266, #47 Exhibit 2267)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 382 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2174, #2 Exhibit 2175, #3 Exhibit 2176, #4 Exhibit 2177, #5 Exhibit 2178, #6 Exhibit 2179, #7 Exhibit 2180, #8 Exhibit 2181, #9 Exhibit 2182, #10 Exhibit 2183, #11 Exhibit 2184, #12 Exhibit 2185, #13 Exhibit 2186, #14 Exhibit 2187, #15 Exhibit 2188, #16 Exhibit 2189, #17 Exhibit 2190, #18 Exhibit 2191, #19 Exhibit 2192, #20 Exhibit 2193, #21 Exhibit 2194, #22 Exhibit 2195, #23 Exhibit 2196, #24 Exhibit 2197, #25 Exhibit 2198, #26 Exhibit 2199, #27 Exhibit 2200, #28 Exhibit 2201, #29 Exhibit 2202, #30 Exhibit 2203, #31 Exhibit 2204, #32 Exhibit 2205, #33 Exhibit 2206, #34 Exhibit 2207, #35 Exhibit 2208, #36 Exhibit 2209, #37 Exhibit 2210, #38 Exhibit 2211, #39 Exhibit 2212, #40 Exhibit 2213, #41 Exhibit 2214, #42 Exhibit 2215, #43 Exhibit 2216, #44 Exhibit 2217, #45 Exhibit 2218, #46 Exhibit 2219)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 381 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2126, #2 Exhibit 2127, #3 Exhibit 2128, #4 Exhibit 2129, #5 Exhibit 2130, #6 Exhibit 2131, #7 Exhibit 2132, #8 Exhibit 2133, #9 Exhibit 2134, #10 Exhibit 2135, #11 Exhibit 2136, #12 Exhibit 2137, #13 Exhibit 2138, #14 Exhibit 2139, #15 Exhibit 2140, #16 Exhibit 2141, #17 Exhibit 2142, #18 Exhibit 2143, #19 Exhibit 2144, #20 Exhibit 2145, #21 Exhibit 2146, #22 Exhibit 2147, #23 Exhibit 2148, #24 Exhibit 2149, #25 Exhibit 2150, #26 Exhibit 2151, #27 Exhibit 2152, #28 Exhibit 2153, #29 Exhibit 2154, #30 Exhibit 2155, #31 Exhibit 2156, #32 Exhibit 2157, #33 Exhibit 2158, #34 Exhibit 2159, #35 Exhibit 2160, #36 Exhibit 2161, #37 Exhibit 2162, #38 Exhibit 2163, #39 Exhibit 2164, #40 Exhibit 2165, #41 Exhibit 2166, #42 Exhibit 2167, #43 Exhibit 2168, #44 Exhibit 2169, #45 Exhibit 2170, #46 Exhibit 2171, #47 Exhibit 2172)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 380 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2080, #2 Exhibit 2081, #3 Exhibit 2082, #4 Exhibit 2083, #5 Exhibit 2084, #6 Exhibit 2085, #7 Exhibit 2086, #8 Exhibit 2087, #9 Exhibit 2088, #10 Exhibit 2089, #11 Exhibit 2090, #12 Exhibit 2091, #13 Exhibit 2092, #14 Exhibit 2093, #15 Exhibit 2094, #16 Exhibit 2095, #17 Exhibit 2096, #18 Exhibit 2097, #19 Exhibit 2098, #20 Exhibit 2099, #21 Exhibit 2100, #22 Exhibit 2101, #23 Exhibit 2102, #24 Exhibit 2103, #25 Exhibit 2104, #26 Exhibit 2105, #27 Exhibit 2106, #28 Exhibit 2107, #29 Exhibit 2108, #30 Exhibit 2109, #31 Exhibit 2110, #32 Exhibit 2111, #33 Exhibit 2112, #34 Exhibit 2113, #35 Exhibit 2114, #36 Exhibit 2115, #37 Exhibit 2116, #38 Exhibit 2117, #39 Exhibit 2118, #40 Exhibit 2119, #41 Exhibit 2120, #42 Exhibit 2121, #43 Exhibit 2122, #44 Exhibit 2123, #45 Exhibit 2124)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 379 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2032, #2 Exhibit 2033, #3 Exhibit 2034, #4 Exhibit 2035, #5 Exhibit 2036, #6 Exhibit 2037, #7 Exhibit 2038, #8 Exhibit 2039, #9 Exhibit 2040, #10 Exhibit 2041, #11 Exhibit 2042, #12 Exhibit 2043, #13 Exhibit 2044, #14 Exhibit 2045, #15 Exhibit 2046, #16 Exhibit 2047, #17 Exhibit 2048, #18 Exhibit 2049, #19 Exhibit 2050, #20 Exhibit 2051, #21 Exhibit 2052, #22 Exhibit 2053, #23 Exhibit 2054, #24 Exhibit 2055, #25 Exhibit 2056, #26 Exhibit 2057, #27 Exhibit 2058, #28 Exhibit 2059, #29 Exhibit 2060, #30 Exhibit 2061, #31 Exhibit 2062, #32 Exhibit 2063, #33 Exhibit 2064, #34 Exhibit 2065, #35 Exhibit 2066, #36 Exhibit 2067, #37 Exhibit 2068, #38 Exhibit 2069, #39 Exhibit 2070, #40 Exhibit 2071, #41 Exhibit 2072, #42 Exhibit 2073, #43 Exhibit 2074, #44 Exhibit 2075, #45 Exhibit 2076, #46 Exhibit 2077, #47 Exhibit 2078)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 378 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1987, #2 Exhibit 1988, #3 Exhibit 1989, #4 Exhibit 1990, #5 Exhibit 1991, #6 Exhibit 1992, #7 Exhibit 1993, #8 Exhibit 1994, #9 Exhibit 1995, #10 Exhibit 1996, #11 Exhibit 1997, #12 Exhibit 1998, #13 Exhibit 1999, #14 Exhibit 2000, #15 Exhibit 2001, #16 Exhibit 2002, #17 Exhibit 2003, #18 Exhibit 2004, #19 Exhibit 2005, #20 Exhibit 2006, #21 Exhibit 2007, #22 Exhibit 2008, #23 Exhibit 2009, #24 Exhibit 2010, #25 Exhibit 2011, #26 Exhibit 2012, #27 Exhibit 2013, #28 Exhibit 2014, #29 Exhibit 2015, #30 Exhibit 2016, #31 Exhibit 2017, #32 Exhibit 2018, #33 Exhibit 2019, #34 Exhibit 2020, #35 Exhibit 2021, #36 Exhibit 2022, #37 Exhibit 2023, #38 Exhibit 2024, #39 Exhibit 2025, #40 Exhibit 2026, #41 Exhibit 2027, #42 Exhibit 2028, #43 Exhibit 2029, #44 Exhibit 2030)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 377 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1940, #2 Exhibit 1941, #3 Exhibit 1942, #4 Exhibit 1943, #5 Exhibit 1944, #6 Exhibit 1945, #7 Exhibit 1946, #8 Exhibit 1947, #9 Exhibit 1948, #10 Exhibit 1949, #11 Exhibit 1950, #12 Exhibit 1951, #13 Exhibit 1952, #14 Exhibit 1953, #15 Exhibit 1954, #16 Exhibit 1955, #17 Exhibit 1956, #18 Exhibit 1957, #19 Exhibit 1958, #20 Exhibit 1959, #21 Exhibit 1960, #22 Exhibit 1961, #23 Exhibit 1962, #24 Exhibit 1963, #25 Exhibit 1964, #26 Exhibit 1965, #27 Exhibit 1966, #28 Exhibit 1967, #29 Exhibit 1968, #30 Exhibit 1969, #31 Exhibit 1970, #32 Exhibit 1971, #33 Exhibit 1972, #34 Exhibit 1973, #35 Exhibit 1974, #36 Exhibit 1975, #37 Exhibit 1976, #38 Exhibit 1977, #39 Exhibit 1978, #40 Exhibit 1979, #41 Exhibit 1980, #42 Exhibit 1981, #43 Exhibit 1982, #44 Exhibit 1983, #45 Exhibit 1984, #46 Exhibit 1985)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 376 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1887, #2 Exhibit 1888, #3 Exhibit 1889, #4 Exhibit 1890, #5 Exhibit 1891, #6 Exhibit 1892, #7 Exhibit 1893, #8 Exhibit 1894, #9 Exhibit 1895, #10 Exhibit 1896, #11 Exhibit 1897, #12 Exhibit 1898, #13 Exhibit 1899, #14 Exhibit 1900, #15 Exhibit 1901, #16 Exhibit 1902, #17 Exhibit 1903, #18 Exhibit 1904, #19 Exhibit 1905, #20 Exhibit 1906, #21 Exhibit 1907, #22 Exhibit 1908, #23 Exhibit 1909, #24 Exhibit 1910, #25 Exhibit 1911, #26 Exhibit 1912, #27 Exhibit 1913, #28 Exhibit 1914, #29 Exhibit 1915, #30 Exhibit 1916, #31 Exhibit 1917, #32 Exhibit 1918, #33 Exhibit 1919, #34 Exhibit 1920, #35 Exhibit 1921, #36 Exhibit 1922, #37 Exhibit 1923, #38 Exhibit 1924, #39 Exhibit 1925, #40 Exhibit 1926, #41 Exhibit 1927, #42 Exhibit 1928, #43 Exhibit 1929, #44 Exhibit 1930, #45 Exhibit 1931, #46 Exhibit 1932, #47 Exhibit 1933, #48 Exhibit 1934, #49 Exhibit 1935, #50 Exhibit 1936, #51 Exhibit 1937, #52 Exhibit 1938)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 375 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1850, #2 Exhibit 1851, #3 Exhibit 1852, #4 Exhibit 1853, #5 Exhibit 1854, #6 Exhibit 1855, #7 Exhibit 1856, #8 Exhibit 1857, #9 Exhibit 1858, #10 Exhibit 1859, #11 Exhibit 1860, #12 Exhibit 1861, #13 Exhibit 1862, #14 Exhibit 1863, #15 Exhibit 1864, #16 Exhibit 1865, #17 Exhibit 1866, #18 Exhibit 1867, #19 Exhibit 1868, #20 Exhibit 1869, #21 Exhibit 1870, #22 Exhibit 1871, #23 Exhibit 1872, #24 Exhibit 1873, #25 Exhibit 1874, #26 Exhibit 1875, #27 Exhibit 1876, #28 Exhibit 1877, #29 Exhibit 1878, #30 Exhibit 1879, #31 Exhibit 1880, #32 Exhibit 1881, #33 Exhibit 1882, #34 Exhibit 1883, #35 Exhibit 1884, #36 Exhibit 1885)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 374 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1806, #2 Exhibit 1807, #3 Exhibit 1808, #4 Exhibit 1809, #5 Exhibit 1810, #6 Exhibit 1811, #7 Exhibit 1812, #8 Exhibit 1813, #9 Exhibit 1814, #10 Exhibit 1815, #11 Exhibit 1816, #12 Exhibit 1817, #13 Exhibit 1818, #14 Exhibit 1819, #15 Exhibit 1820, #16 Exhibit 1821, #17 Exhibit 1822, #18 Exhibit 1823, #19 Exhibit 1824, #20 Exhibit 1825, #21 Exhibit 1826, #22 Exhibit 1827, #23 Exhibit 1828, #24 Exhibit 1829, #25 Exhibit 1830, #26 Exhibit 1831, #27 Exhibit 1832, #28 Exhibit 1833, #29 Exhibit 1834, #30 Exhibit 1835, #31 Exhibit 1836, #32 Exhibit 1837, #33 Exhibit 1838, #34 Exhibit 1839, #35 Exhibit 1840, #36 Exhibit 1841, #37 Exhibit 1842, #38 Exhibit 1843, #39 Exhibit 1844, #40 Exhibit 1845, #41 Exhibit 1846, #42 Exhibit 1847, #43 Exhibit 1848)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 373 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1761, #2 Exhibit 1762, #3 Exhibit 1763, #4 Exhibit 1764, #5 Exhibit 1765, #6 Exhibit 1766, #7 Exhibit 1767, #8 Exhibit 1768, #9 Exhibit 1769, #10 Exhibit 1770, #11 Exhibit 1771, #12 Exhibit 1772, #13 Exhibit 1773, #14 Exhibit 1774, #15 Exhibit 1775, #16 Exhibit 1776, #17 Exhibit 1777, #18 Exhibit 1778, #19 Exhibit 1779, #20 Exhibit 1780, #21 Exhibit 1781, #22 Exhibit 1782, #23 Exhibit 1783, #24 Exhibit 1784, #25 Exhibit 1785, #26 Exhibit 1786, #27 Exhibit 1787, #28 Exhibit 1788, #29 Exhibit 1789, #30 Exhibit 1790, #31 Exhibit 1791, #32 Exhibit 1792, #33 Exhibit 1793, #34 Exhibit 1794, #35 Exhibit 1795, #36 Exhibit 1796, #37 Exhibit 1797, #38 Exhibit 1798, #39 Exhibit 1799, #40 Exhibit 1800, #41 Exhibit 1801, #42 Exhibit 1802, #43 Exhibit 1803, #44 Exhibit 1804)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 372 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1722, #2 Exhibit 1723, #3 Exhibit 1724, #4 Exhibit 1725, #5 Exhibit 1726, #6 Exhibit 1727, #7 Exhibit 1728, #8 Exhibit 1729, #9 Exhibit 1730, #10 Exhibit 1731, #11 Exhibit 1732, #12 Exhibit 1733, #13 Exhibit 1734, #14 Exhibit 1735, #15 Exhibit 1736, #16 Exhibit 1737, #17 Exhibit 1738, #18 Exhibit 1739, #19 Exhibit 1740, #20 Exhibit 1741, #21 Exhibit 1742, #22 Exhibit 1743, #23 Exhibit 1744, #24 Exhibit 1745, #25 Exhibit 1746, #26 Exhibit 1747, #27 Exhibit 1748, #28 Exhibit 1749, #29 Exhibit 1750, #30 Exhibit 1751, #31 Exhibit 1752, #32 Exhibit 1753, #33 Exhibit 1754, #34 Exhibit 1755, #35 Exhibit 1756, #36 Exhibit 1757, #37 Exhibit 1758, #38 Exhibit 1759)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 371 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1680, #2 Exhibit 1681, #3 Exhibit 1682, #4 Exhibit 1683, #5 Exhibit 1684, #6 Exhibit 1685, #7 Exhibit 1686, #8 Exhibit 1687, #9 Exhibit 1688, #10 Exhibit 1689, #11 Exhibit 1690, #12 Exhibit 1691, #13 Exhibit 1692, #14 Exhibit 1693, #15 Exhibit 1694, #16 Exhibit 1695, #17 Exhibit 1696, #18 Exhibit 1697, #19 Exhibit 1698, #20 Exhibit 1699, #21 Exhibit 1700, #22 Exhibit 1701, #23 Exhibit 1702, #24 Exhibit 1703, #25 Exhibit 1704, #26 Exhibit 1705, #27 Exhibit 1706, #28 Exhibit 1707, #29 Exhibit 1708, #30 Exhibit 1709, #31 Exhibit 1710, #32 Exhibit 1711, #33 Exhibit 1712, #34 Exhibit 1713, #35 Exhibit 1714, #36 Exhibit 1715, #37 Exhibit 1716, #38 Exhibit 1717, #39 Exhibit 1718, #40 Exhibit 1719, #41 Exhibit 1720)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 370 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1637, #2 Exhibit 1638, #3 Exhibit 1639, #4 Exhibit 1640, #5 Exhibit 1641, #6 Exhibit 1642, #7 Exhibit 1643, #8 Exhibit 1644, #9 Exhibit 1645, #10 Exhibit 1646, #11 Exhibit 1647, #12 Exhibit 1648, #13 Exhibit 1649, #14 Exhibit 1650, #15 Exhibit 1651, #16 Exhibit 1652, #17 Exhibit 1653, #18 Exhibit 1654, #19 Exhibit 1655, #20 Exhibit 1656, #21 Exhibit 1657, #22 Exhibit 1658, #23 Exhibit 1659, #24 Exhibit 1660, #25 Exhibit 1661, #26 Exhibit 1662, #27 Exhibit 1663, #28 Exhibit 1664, #29 Exhibit 1665, #30 Exhibit 1666, #31 Exhibit 1667, #32 Exhibit 1668, #33 Exhibit 1669, #34 Exhibit 1670, #35 Exhibit 1671, #36 Exhibit 1672, #37 Exhibit 1673, #38 Exhibit 1674, #39 Exhibit 1675, #40 Exhibit 1676, #41 Exhibit 1677, #42 Exhibit 1678)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 369 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1592, #2 Exhibit 1593, #3 Exhibit 1594, #4 Exhibit 1595, #5 Exhibit 1596, #6 Exhibit 1597, #7 Exhibit 1598, #8 Exhibit 1599, #9 Exhibit 1600, #10 Exhibit 1601, #11 Exhibit 1602, #12 Exhibit 1603, #13 Exhibit 1604, #14 Exhibit 1605, #15 Exhibit 1606, #16 Exhibit 1607, #17 Exhibit 1608, #18 Exhibit 1609, #19 Exhibit 1610, #20 Exhibit 1611, #21 Exhibit 1612, #22 Exhibit 1613, #23 Exhibit 1614, #24 Exhibit 1615, #25 Exhibit 1616, #26 Exhibit 1617, #27 Exhibit 1618, #28 Exhibit 1619, #29 Exhibit 1620, #30 Exhibit 1621, #31 Exhibit 1622, #32 Exhibit 1623, #33 Exhibit 1624, #34 Exhibit 1625, #35 Exhibit 1626, #36 Exhibit 1627, #37 Exhibit 1628, #38 Exhibit 1629, #39 Exhibit 1630, #40 Exhibit 1631, #41 Exhibit 1632, #42 Exhibit 1633, #43 Exhibit 1634, #44 Exhibit 1635)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 368 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1550, #2 Exhibit 1551, #3 Exhibit 1552, #4 Exhibit 1553, #5 Exhibit 1554, #6 Exhibit 1555, #7 Exhibit 1556, #8 Exhibit 1557, #9 Exhibit 1558, #10 Exhibit 1559, #11 Exhibit 1560, #12 Exhibit 1561, #13 Exhibit 1562, #14 Exhibit 1563, #15 Exhibit 1564, #16 Exhibit 1565, #17 Exhibit 1566, #18 Exhibit 1567, #19 Exhibit 1568, #20 Exhibit 1569, #21 Exhibit 1570, #22 Exhibit 1571, #23 Exhibit 1572, #24 Exhibit 1573, #25 Exhibit 1574, #26 Exhibit 1575, #27 Exhibit 1576, #28 Exhibit 1577, #29 Exhibit 1578, #30 Exhibit 1579, #31 Exhibit 1580, #32 Exhibit 1581, #33 Exhibit 1582, #34 Exhibit 1583, #35 Exhibit 1584, #36 Exhibit 1585, #37 Exhibit 1586, #38 Exhibit 1587, #39 Exhibit 1588, #40 Exhibit 1589, #41 Exhibit 1590)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 367 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1508, #2 Exhibit 1509, #3 Exhibit 1510, #4 Exhibit 1511, #5 Exhibit 1512, #6 Exhibit 1513, #7 Exhibit 1514, #8 Exhibit 1515, #9 Exhibit 1516, #10 Exhibit 1517, #11 Exhibit 1518, #12 Exhibit 1519, #13 Exhibit 1520, #14 Exhibit 1521, #15 Exhibit 1522, #16 Exhibit 1523, #17 Exhibit 1524, #18 Exhibit 1525, #19 Exhibit 1526, #20 Exhibit 1527, #21 Exhibit 1528, #22 Exhibit 1529, #23 Exhibit 1530, #24 Exhibit 1531, #25 Exhibit 1532, #26 Exhibit 1533, #27 Exhibit 1534, #28 Exhibit 1535, #29 Exhibit 1536, #30 Exhibit 1537, #31 Exhibit 1538, #32 Exhibit 1539, #33 Exhibit 1540, #34 Exhibit 1541, #35 Exhibit 1542, #36 Exhibit 1543, #37 Exhibit 1544, #38 Exhibit 1545, #39 Exhibit 1546, #40 Exhibit 1547, #41 Exhibit 1548)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 366 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1469, #2 Exhibit 1470, #3 Exhibit 1471, #4 Exhibit 1472, #5 Exhibit 1473, #6 Exhibit 1474, #7 Exhibit 1475, #8 Exhibit 1476, #9 Exhibit 1477, #10 Exhibit 1478, #11 Exhibit 1479, #12 Exhibit 1480, #13 Exhibit 1481, #14 Exhibit 1482, #15 Exhibit 1483, #16 Exhibit 1484, #17 Exhibit 1485, #18 Exhibit 1486, #19 Exhibit 1487, #20 Exhibit 1488, #21 Exhibit 1489, #22 Exhibit 1490, #23 Exhibit 1491, #24 Exhibit 1492, #25 Exhibit 1493, #26 Exhibit 1494, #27 Exhibit 1495, #28 Exhibit 1496, #29 Exhibit 1497, #30 Exhibit 1498, #31 Exhibit 1499, #32 Exhibit 1500, #33 Exhibit 1501, #34 Exhibit 1502, #35 Exhibit 1503, #36 Exhibit 1504, #37 Exhibit 1505, #38 Exhibit 1506)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 365 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1428, #2 Exhibit 1429, #3 Exhibit 1430, #4 Exhibit 1431, #5 Exhibit 1432, #6 Exhibit 1433, #7 Exhibit 1434, #8 Exhibit 1435, #9 Exhibit 1436, #10 Exhibit 1437, #11 Exhibit 1438, #12 Exhibit 1439, #13 Exhibit 1440, #14 Exhibit 1441, #15 Exhibit 1442, #16 Exhibit 1443, #17 Exhibit 1444, #18 Exhibit 1445, #19 Exhibit 1446, #20 Exhibit 1447, #21 Exhibit 1448, #22 Exhibit 1449, #23 Exhibit 1450, #24 Exhibit 1451, #25 Exhibit 1452, #26 Exhibit 1453, #27 Exhibit 1454, #28 Exhibit 1455, #29 Exhibit 1456, #30 Exhibit 1457, #31 Exhibit 1458, #32 Exhibit 1459, #33 Exhibit 1460, #34 Exhibit 1461, #35 Exhibit 1462, #36 Exhibit 1463, #37 Exhibit 1464, #38 Exhibit 1465, #39 Exhibit 1466, #40 Exhibit 1467)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 364 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1398, #2 Exhibit 1399, #3 Exhibit 1400, #4 Exhibit 1401, #5 Exhibit 1402, #6 Exhibit 1403, #7 Exhibit 1404, #8 Exhibit 1405, #9 Exhibit 1406, #10 Exhibit 1407, #11 Exhibit 1408, #12 Exhibit 1409, #13 Exhibit 1410, #14 Exhibit 1411, #15 Exhibit 1412, #16 Exhibit 1413, #17 Exhibit 1414, #18 Exhibit 1415, #19 Exhibit 1416, #20 Exhibit 1417, #21 Exhibit 1418, #22 Exhibit 1419, #23 Exhibit 1420, #24 Exhibit 1421, #25 Exhibit 1422, #26 Exhibit 1423, #27 Exhibit 1424, #28 Exhibit 1425, #29 Exhibit 1426)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 363 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1365, #2 Exhibit 1366, #3 Exhibit 1367, #4 Exhibit 1368, #5 Exhibit 1369, #6 Exhibit 1371, #7 Exhibit 1372, #8 Exhibit 1373, #9 Exhibit 1374, #10 Exhibit 1375, #11 Exhibit 1376, #12 Exhibit 1377, #13 Exhibit 1378, #14 Exhibit 1379, #15 Exhibit 1380, #16 Exhibit 1381, #17 Exhibit 1382, #18 Exhibit 1383, #19 Exhibit 1384, #20 Exhibit 1385, #21 Exhibit 1386, #22 Exhibit 1387, #23 Exhibit 1388, #24 Exhibit 1390, #25 Exhibit 1391, #26 Exhibit 1392, #27 Exhibit 1393, #28 Exhibit 1394, #29 Exhibit 1395, #30 Exhibit 1396)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 362 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1326, #2 Exhibit 1327, #3 Exhibit 1328, #4 Exhibit 1329, #5 Exhibit 1330, #6 Exhibit 1331, #7 Exhibit 1332, #8 Exhibit 1333, #9 Exhibit 1334, #10 Exhibit 1335, #11 Exhibit 1336, #12 Exhibit 1337, #13 Exhibit 1338, #14 Exhibit 1339, #15 Exhibit 1340, #16 Exhibit 1341, #17 Exhibit 1342, #18 Exhibit 1343, #19 Exhibit 1344, #20 Exhibit 1345, #21 Exhibit 1346, #22 Exhibit 1347, #23 Exhibit 1348, #24 Exhibit 1349, #25 Exhibit 1350, #26 Exhibit 1351, #27 Exhibit 1352, #28 Exhibit 1353, #29 Exhibit 1354, #30 Exhibit 1355, #31 Exhibit 1356, #32 Exhibit 1357, #33 Exhibit 1358, #34 Exhibit 1359, #35 Exhibit 1360, #36 Exhibit 1361, #37 Exhibit 1362, #38 Exhibit 1363)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 361 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1282, #2 Exhibit 1283, #3 Exhibit 1284, #4 Exhibit 1285, #5 Exhibit 1286, #6 Exhibit 1287, #7 Exhibit 1288, #8 Exhibit 1289, #9 Exhibit 1290, #10 Exhibit 1291, #11 Exhibit 1292, #12 Exhibit 1293, #13 Exhibit 1294, #14 Exhibit 1295, #15 Exhibit 1296, #16 Exhibit 1297, #17 Exhibit 1298, #18 Exhibit 1299, #19 Exhibit 1300, #20 Exhibit 1301, #21 Exhibit 1302, #22 Exhibit 1303, #23 Exhibit 1304, #24 Exhibit 1305, #25 Exhibit 1306, #26 Exhibit 1307, #27 Exhibit 1308, #28 Exhibit 1309, #29 Exhibit 1310, #30 Exhibit 1311, #31 Exhibit 1312, #32 Exhibit 1313, #33 Exhibit 1314, #34 Exhibit 1315, #35 Exhibit 1316, #36 Exhibit 1317, #37 Exhibit 1318, #38 Exhibit 1319, #39 Exhibit 1320, #40 Exhibit 1321, #41 Exhibit 1322, #42 Exhibit 1323, #43 Exhibit 1324)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 360 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1227, #2 Exhibit 1228, #3 Exhibit 1229, #4 Exhibit 1230, #5 Exhibit 1231, #6 Exhibit 1232, #7 Exhibit 1233, #8 Exhibit 1234, #9 Exhibit 1235, #10 Exhibit 1236, #11 Exhibit 1237, #12 Exhibit 1238, #13 Exhibit 1239, #14 Exhibit 1240, #15 Exhibit 1241, #16 Exhibit 1242, #17 Exhibit 1243, #18 Exhibit 1244, #19 Exhibit 1245, #20 Exhibit 1246, #21 Exhibit 1247, #22 Exhibit 1248, #23 Exhibit 1249, #24 Exhibit 1250, #25 Exhibit 1251, #26 Exhibit 1252, #27 Exhibit 1253, #28 Exhibit 1254, #29 Exhibit 1255, #30 Exhibit 1256, #31 Exhibit 1257, #32 Exhibit 1258, #33 Exhibit 1259, #34 Exhibit 1260, #35 Exhibit 1261, #36 Exhibit 1262, #37 Exhibit 1263, #38 Exhibit 1264, #39 Exhibit 1265, #40 Exhibit 1266, #41 Exhibit 1267, #42 Exhibit 1268, #43 Exhibit 1269, #44 Exhibit 1270, #45 Exhibit 1271, #46 Exhibit 1272, #47 Exhibit 1273, #48 Exhibit 1274, #49 Exhibit 1275, #50 Exhibit 1276, #51 Exhibit 1277, #52 Exhibit 1278, #53 Exhibit 1279, #54 Exhibit 1280)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 359 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1167, #2 Exhibit 1168, #3 Exhibit 1169, #4 Exhibit 1170, #5 Exhibit 1171, #6 Exhibit 1172, #7 Exhibit 1173, #8 Exhibit 1174, #9 Exhibit 1175, #10 Exhibit 1176, #11 Exhibit 1177, #12 Exhibit 1178, #13 Exhibit 1179, #14 Exhibit 1180, #15 Exhibit 1181, #16 Exhibit 1182, #17 Exhibit 1183, #18 Exhibit 1184, #19 Exhibit 1185, #20 Exhibit 1186, #21 Exhibit 1187, #22 Exhibit 1188, #23 Exhibit 1189, #24 Exhibit 1190, #25 Exhibit 1191, #26 Exhibit 1192, #27 Exhibit 1193, #28 Exhibit 1194, #29 Exhibit 1195, #30 Exhibit 1196, #31 Exhibit 1197, #32 Exhibit 1198, #33 Exhibit 1199, #34 Exhibit 1200, #35 Exhibit 1201, #36 Exhibit 1202, #37 Exhibit 1203, #38 Exhibit 1204, #39 Exhibit 1205, #40 Exhibit 1206, #41 Exhibit 1207, #42 Exhibit 1208, #43 Exhibit 1209, #44 Exhibit 1210, #45 Exhibit 1211, #46 Exhibit 1212, #47 Exhibit 1213, #48 Exhibit 1214, #49 Exhibit 1215, #50 Exhibit 1216, #51 Exhibit 1217, #52 Exhibit 1218, #53 Exhibit 1219, #54 Exhibit 1220, #55 Exhibit 1221, #56 Exhibit 1222, #57 Exhibit 1223, #58 Exhibit 1224, #59 Exhibit 1225)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 358 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1102, #2 Exhibit 1103, #3 Exhibit 1104, #4 Exhibit 1105, #5 Exhibit 1106, #6 Exhibit 1107, #7 Exhibit 1108, #8 Exhibit 1109, #9 Exhibit 1110, #10 Exhibit 1111, #11 Exhibit 1112, #12 Exhibit 1113, #13 Exhibit 1115, #14 Exhibit 1116, #15 Exhibit 1117, #16 Exhibit 1118, #17 Exhibit 1119, #18 Exhibit 1120, #19 Exhibit 1121, #20 Exhibit 1122, #21 Exhibit 1123, #22 Exhibit 1124, #23 Exhibit 1125, #24 Exhibit 1126, #25 Exhibit 1127, #26 Exhibit 1128, #27 Exhibit 1129, #28 Exhibit 1130, #29 Exhibit 1131, #30 Exhibit 1132, #31 Exhibit 1133, #32 Exhibit 1134, #33 Exhibit 1135, #34 Exhibit 1136, #35 Exhibit 1137, #36 Exhibit 1138, #37 Exhibit 1139, #38 Exhibit 1140, #39 Exhibit 1141, #40 Exhibit 1142, #41 Exhibit 1143, #42 Exhibit 1144, #43 Exhibit 1145, #44 Exhibit 1146, #45 Exhibit 1147, #46 Exhibit 1148, #47 Exhibit 1149, #48 Exhibit 1150, #49 Exhibit 1151, #50 Exhibit 1152, #51 Exhibit 1153, #52 Exhibit 1154, #53 Exhibit 1155, #54 Exhibit 1156, #55 Exhibit 11157, #56 Exhibit 1158, #57 Exhibit 1159, #58 Exhibit 1160, #59 Exhibit 1161, #60 Exhibit 1162, #61 Exhibit 1163, #62 Exhibit 1164, #63 Exhibit 1165)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 357 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1038, #2 Exhibit 1039, #3 Exhibit 1040, #4 Exhibit 1041, #5 Exhibit 1042, #6 Exhibit 1043, #7 Exhibit 1044, #8 Exhibit 1045, #9 Exhibit 1046, #10 Exhibit 1047, #11 Exhibit 1048, #12 Exhibit 1049, #13 Exhibit 1050, #14 Exhibit 1051, #15 Exhibit 1052, #16 Exhibit 1053, #17 Exhibit 1054, #18 Exhibit 1055, #19 Exhibit 1056, #20 Exhibit 1057, #21 Exhibit 1058, #22 Exhibit 1059, #23 Exhibit 1060, #24 Exhibit 1061, #25 Exhibit 1062, #26 Exhibit 1063, #27 Exhibit 1064, #28 Exhibit 1065, #29 Exhibit 1066, #30 Exhibit 1067, #31 Exhibit 1068, #32 Exhibit 1069, #33 Exhibit 1070, #34 Exhibit 1071, #35 Exhibit 1072, #36 Exhibit 1073, #37 Exhibit 1074, #38 Exhibit 1075, #39 Exhibit 1076, #40 Exhibit 1077, #41 Exhibit 1078, #42 Exhibit 1079, #43 Exhibit 1080, #44 Exhibit 1081, #45 Exhibit 1082, #46 Exhibit 1083, #47 Exhibit 1084, #48 Exhibit 1086, #49 Exhibit 1087, #50 Exhibit 1088, #51 Exhibit 1089, #52 Exhibit 1090, #53 Exhibit 1091, #54 Exhibit 1092, #55 Exhibit 1093, #56 Exhibit 1094, #57 Exhibit 1095, #58 Exhibit 1096, #59 Exhibit 1097, #60 Exhibit 1098, #61 Exhibit 1099, #62 Exhibit 1100)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 356 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 992, #2 Exhibit 993, #3 Exhibit 994, #4 Exhibit 995, #5 Exhibit 996, #6 Exhibit 997, #7 Exhibit 998, #8 Exhibit 999, #9 Exhibit 1000, #10 Exhibit 1001, #11 Exhibit 1002, #12 Exhibit 1003, #13 Exhibit 1004, #14 Exhibit 1005, #15 Exhibit 1006, #16 Exhibit 1007, #17 Exhibit 1008, #18 Exhibit 1009, #19 Exhibit 1010, #20 Exhibit 1011, #21 Exhibit 1012, #22 Exhibit 1013, #23 Exhibit 1014, #24 Exhibit 1015, #25 Exhibit 1016, #26 Exhibit 1017, #27 Exhibit 1018, #28 Exhibit 1019, #29 Exhibit 1020, #30 Exhibit 1021, #31 Exhibit 1022, #32 Exhibit 1023, #33 Exhibit 1025, #34 Exhibit 1026, #35 Exhibit 1027, #36 Exhibit 1028, #37 Exhibit 1029, #38 Exhibit 1030, #39 Exhibit 1031, #40 Exhibit 1032, #41 Exhibit 1033, #42 Exhibit 1034, #43 Exhibit 1035, #44 Exhibit 1036)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 355 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 951, #2 Exhibit 952, #3 Exhibit 953, #4 Exhibit 954, #5 Exhibit 955, #6 Exhibit 956, #7 Exhibit 957, #8 Exhibit 958, #9 Exhibit 959, #10 Exhibit 960, #11 Exhibit 961, #12 Exhibit 962, #13 Exhibit 963, #14 Exhibit 964, #15 Exhibit 965, #16 Exhibit 966, #17 Exhibit 967, #18 Exhibit 968, #19 Exhibit 969, #20 Exhibit 970, #21 Exhibit 971, #22 Exhibit 972, #23 Exhibit 973, #24 Exhibit 974, #25 Exhibit 975, #26 Exhibit 976, #27 Exhibit 977, #28 Exhibit 978, #29 Exhibit 979, #30 Exhibit 980, #31 Exhibit 981, #32 Exhibit 982, #33 Exhibit 983, #34 Exhibit 984, #35 Exhibit 985, #36 Exhibit 986, #37 Exhibit 987, #38 Exhibit 988, #39 Exhibit 989, #40 Exhibit 990)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 354 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 907, #2 Exhibit 908, #3 Exhibit 909, #4 Exhibit 910, #5 Exhibit 911, #6 Exhibit 912, #7 Exhibit 913, #8 Exhibit 914, #9 Exhibit 915, #10 Exhibit 916, #11 Exhibit 917, #12 Exhibit 918, #13 Exhibit 919, #14 Exhibit 920, #15 Exhibit 921, #16 Exhibit 922, #17 Exhibit 923, #18 Exhibit 924, #19 Exhibit 925, #20 Exhibit 926, #21 Exhibit 927, #22 Exhibit 928, #23 Exhibit 929, #24 Exhibit 930, #25 Exhibit 931, #26 Exhibit 932, #27 Exhibit 933, #28 Exhibit 934, #29 Exhibit 935, #30 Exhibit 936, #31 Exhibit 937, #32 Exhibit 938, #33 Exhibit 939, #34 Exhibit 940, #35 Exhibit 941, #36 Exhibit 942, #37 Exhibit 943, #38 Exhibit 944, #39 Exhibit 945, #40 Exhibit 946, #41 Exhibit 947, #42 Exhibit 948, #43 Exhibit 949)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 353 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 857, #2 Exhibit 858, #3 Exhibit 859, #4 Exhibit 860, #5 Exhibit 861, #6 Exhibit 862, #7 Exhibit 863, #8 Exhibit 864, #9 Exhibit 865, #10 Exhibit 866, #11 Exhibit 867, #12 Exhibit 868, #13 Exhibit 869, #14 Exhibit 870, #15 Exhibit 871, #16 Exhibit 872, #17 Exhibit 873, #18 Exhibit 874, #19 Exhibit 875, #20 Exhibit 876, #21 Exhibit 877, #22 Exhibit 878, #23 Exhibit 879, #24 Exhibit 880, #25 Exhibit 881, #26 Exhibit 882, #27 Exhibit 883, #28 Exhibit 884, #29 Exhibit 885, #30 Exhibit 886, #31 Exhibit 887, #32 Exhibit 888, #33 Exhibit 889, #34 Exhibit 890, #35 Exhibit 891, #36 Exhibit 892, #37 Exhibit 893, #38 Exhibit 894, #39 Exhibit 895, #40 Exhibit 896, #41 Exhibit 897, #42 Exhibit 898, #43 Exhibit 899, #44 Exhibit 900, #45 Exhibit 901, #46 Exhibit 902, #47 Exhibit 903, #48 Exhibit 904, #49 Exhibit 905)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 352 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 812, #2 Exhibit 813, #3 Exhibit 814, #4 Exhibit 815, #5 Exhibit 816, #6 Exhibit 817, #7 Exhibit 818, #8 Exhibit 819, #9 Exhibit 820, #10 Exhibit 821, #11 Exhibit 822, #12 Exhibit 823, #13 Exhibit 824, #14 Exhibit 825, #15 Exhibit 826, #16 Exhibit 827, #17 Exhibit 828, #18 Exhibit 829, #19 Exhibit 830, #20 Exhibit 831, #21 Exhibit 832, #22 Exhibit 833, #23 Exhibit 834, #24 Exhibit 835, #25 Exhibit 836, #26 Exhibit 837, #27 Exhibit 838, #28 Exhibit 839, #29 Exhibit 840, #30 Exhibit 841, #31 Exhibit 842, #32 Exhibit 843, #33 Exhibit 844, #34 Exhibit 845, #35 Exhibit 846, #36 Exhibit 847, #37 Exhibit 848, #38 Exhibit 849, #39 Exhibit 850, #40 Exhibit 851, #41 Exhibit 852, #42 Exhibit 853, #43 Exhibit 854, #44 Exhibit 855)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 351 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 770, #2 Exhibit 771, #3 Exhibit 772, #4 Exhibit 773, #5 Exhibit 774, #6 Exhibit 775, #7 Exhibit 776, #8 Exhibit 777, #9 Exhibit 778, #10 Exhibit 779, #11 Exhibit 780, #12 Exhibit 781, #13 Exhibit 782, #14 Exhibit 783, #15 Exhibit 784, #16 Exhibit 785, #17 Exhibit 786, #18 Exhibit 787, #19 Exhibit 788, #20 Exhibit 789, #21 Exhibit 790, #22 Exhibit 791, #23 Exhibit 792, #24 Exhibit 793, #25 Exhibit 794, #26 Exhibit 795, #27 Exhibit 796, #28 Exhibit 797, #29 Exhibit 798, #30 Exhibit 799, #31 Exhibit 800, #32 Exhibit 801, #33 Exhibit 802, #34 Exhibit 803, #35 Exhibit 804, #36 Exhibit 805, #37 Exhibit 806, #38 Exhibit 807, #39 Exhibit 808, #40 Exhibit 809, #41 Exhibit 810)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 350 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 728, #2 Exhibit 729, #3 Exhibit 730, #4 Exhibit 731, #5 Exhibit 732, #6 Exhibit 733, #7 Exhibit 734, #8 Exhibit 735, #9 Exhibit 736, #10 Exhibit 737, #11 Exhibit 738, #12 Exhibit 739, #13 Exhibit 740, #14 Exhibit 741, #15 Exhibit 742, #16 Exhibit 743, #17 Exhibit 744, #18 Exhibit 745, #19 Exhibit 746, #20 Exhibit 747, #21 Exhibit 748, #22 Exhibit 749, #23 Exhibit 750, #24 Exhibit 751, #25 Exhibit 752, #26 Exhibit 753, #27 Exhibit 754, #28 Exhibit 755, #29 Exhibit 756, #30 Exhibit 757, #31 Exhibit 758, #32 Exhibit 759, #33 Exhibit 760, #34 Exhibit 761, #35 Exhibit 762, #36 Exhibit 763, #37 Exhibit 764, #38 Exhibit 765, #39 Exhibit 766, #40 Exhibit 767, #41 Exhibit 768)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 349 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 678, #2 Exhibit 679, #3 Exhibit 680, #4 Exhibit 681, #5 Exhibit 682, #6 Exhibit 683, #7 Exhibit 684, #8 Exhibit 685, #9 Exhibit 686, #10 Exhibit 687, #11 Exhibit 688, #12 Exhibit 689, #13 Exhibit 690, #14 Exhibit 691, #15 Exhibit 692, #16 Exhibit 693, #17 Exhibit 694, #18 Exhibit 695, #19 Exhibit 696, #20 Exhibit 697, #21 Exhibit 698, #22 Exhibit 699, #23 Exhibit 700, #24 Exhibit 701, #25 Exhibit 702, #26 Exhibit 703, #27 Exhibit 704, #28 Exhibit 705, #29 Exhibit 706, #30 Exhibit 707, #31 Exhibit 708, #32 Exhibit 709, #33 Exhibit 710, #34 Exhibit 711, #35 Exhibit 712, #36 Exhibit 713, #37 Exhibit 714, #38 Exhibit 715, #39 Exhibit 716, #40 Exhibit 717, #41 Exhibit 718, #42 Exhibit 719, #43 Exhibit 720, #44 Exhibit 721, #45 Exhibit 722, #46 Exhibit 723, #47 Exhibit 724, #48 Exhibit 725, #49 Exhibit 726)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 348 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 639, #2 Exhibit 640, #3 Exhibit 641, #4 Exhibit 642, #5 Exhibit 643, #6 Exhibit 644, #7 Exhibit 645, #8 Exhibit 646, #9 Exhibit 647, #10 Exhibit 648, #11 Exhibit 649, #12 Exhibit 650, #13 Exhibit 651, #14 Exhibit 652, #15 Exhibit 653, #16 Exhibit 654, #17 Exhibit 655, #18 Exhibit 656, #19 Exhibit 657, #20 Exhibit 658, #21 Exhibit 659, #22 Exhibit 660, #23 Exhibit 661, #24 Exhibit 662, #25 Exhibit 663, #26 Exhibit 664, #27 Exhibit 665, #28 Exhibit 666, #29 Exhibit 667, #30 Exhibit 668, #31 Exhibit 669, #32 Exhibit 670, #33 Exhibit 671, #34 Exhibit 672, #35 Exhibit 673, #36 Exhibit 674, #37 Exhibit 675, #38 Exhibit 676)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 347 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply Opposing Kayne's Motion For Costs by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Surreply Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Powley, Robert)
June 21, 2018 Filing 346 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 595, #2 Exhibit 596, #3 Exhibit 597, #4 Exhibit 598, #5 Exhibit 599, #6 Exhibit 600, #7 Exhibit 601, #8 Exhibit 602, #9 Exhibit 603, #10 Exhibit 604, #11 Exhibit 605, #12 Exhibit 606, #13 Exhibit 607, #14 Exhibit 608, #15 Exhibit 609, #16 Exhibit 610, #17 Exhibit 611, #18 Exhibit 612, #19 Exhibit 613, #20 Exhibit 614, #21 Exhibit 615, #22 Exhibit 616, #23 Exhibit 617, #24 Exhibit 618, #25 Exhibit 619, #26 Exhibit 620, #27 Exhibit 621, #28 Exhibit 622, #29 Exhibit 623, #30 Exhibit 624, #31 Exhibit 625, #32 Exhibit 626, #33 Exhibit 627, #34 Exhibit 628, #35 Exhibit 629, #36 Exhibit 630, #37 Exhibit 631, #38 Exhibit 632, #39 Exhibit 633, #40 Exhibit 634, #41 Exhibit 635, #42 Exhibit 636, #43 Exhibit 637)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 345 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 461-2, #2 Exhibit 462, #3 Exhibit 463, #4 Exhibit 464, #5 Exhibit 465, #6 Exhibit 474-1, #7 Exhibit 474-2, #8 Exhibit 474-3, #9 Exhibit 503, #10 Exhibit 505, #11 Exhibit 509, #12 Exhibit 511, #13 Exhibit 542, #14 Exhibit 546, #15 Exhibit 547, #16 Exhibit 548, #17 Exhibit 549, #18 Exhibit 576-1, #19 Exhibit 576-2, #20 Exhibit 577, #21 Exhibit 578, #22 Exhibit 579, #23 Exhibit 580, #24 Exhibit 581, #25 Exhibit 582, #26 Exhibit 583, #27 Exhibit 584, #28 Exhibit 585, #29 Exhibit 586, #30 Exhibit 587, #31 Exhibit 588, #32 Exhibit 589, #33 Exhibit 590, #34 Exhibit 591, #35 Exhibit 592, #36 Exhibit 593)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 344 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 356, #2 Exhibit 357, #3 Exhibit 358, #4 Exhibit 359, #5 Exhibit 360, #6 Exhibit 361, #7 Exhibit 362, #8 Exhibit 363, #9 Exhibit 364, #10 Exhibit 365, #11 Exhibit 366, #12 Exhibit 367, #13 Exhibit 370, #14 Exhibit 371, #15 Exhibit 372, #16 Exhibit 373, #17 Exhibit 374, #18 Exhibit 375, #19 Exhibit 376, #20 Exhibit 377, #21 Exhibit 378, #22 Exhibit 379, #23 Exhibit 380, #24 Exhibit 381, #25 Exhibit 382, #26 Exhibit 383, #27 Exhibit 384, #28 Exhibit 385, #29 Exhibit 386, #30 Exhibit 387, #31 Exhibit 388, #32 Exhibit 393, #33 Exhibit 394, #34 Exhibit 395, #35 Exhibit 396, #36 Exhibit 397, #37 Exhibit 398, #38 Exhibit 399, #39 Exhibit 400, #40 Exhibit 401, #41 Exhibit 402, #42 Exhibit 403, #43 Exhibit 404, #44 Exhibit 405, #45 Exhibit 406, #46 Exhibit 407, #47 Exhibit 408, #48 Exhibit 409, #49 Exhibit 410, #50 Exhibit 411, #51 Exhibit 412, #52 Exhibit 413, #53 Exhibit 414, #54 Exhibit 415, #55 Exhibit 416, #56 Exhibit 417, #57 Exhibit 418, #58 Exhibit 419, #59 Exhibit 420, #60 Exhibit 421, #61 Exhibit 422, #62 Exhibit 423, #63 Exhibit 424, #64 Exhibit 425, #65 Exhibit 426, #66 Exhibit 427, #67 Exhibit 428, #68 Exhibit 429, #69 Exhibit 430, #70 Exhibit 433, #71 Exhibit 434, #72 Exhibit 435, #73 Exhibit 436, #74 Exhibit 437, #75 Exhibit 438, #76 Exhibit 439, #77 Exhibit 440, #78 Exhibit 441, #79 Exhibit 442, #80 Exhibit 443, #81 Exhibit 444, #82 Exhibit 446, #83 Exhibit 447, #84 Exhibit 448, #85 Exhibit 452, #86 Exhibit 453, #87 Exhibit 457, #88 Exhibit 458)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 343 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 274, #2 Exhibit 275, #3 Exhibit 276, #4 Exhibit 277, #5 Exhibit 278, #6 Exhibit 279, #7 Exhibit 280, #8 Exhibit 281, #9 Exhibit 282, #10 Exhibit 283, #11 Exhibit 284, #12 Exhibit 285, #13 Exhibit 286, #14 Exhibit 287, #15 Exhibit 288, #16 Exhibit 289, #17 Exhibit 292, #18 Exhibit 293, #19 Exhibit 294, #20 Exhibit 295, #21 Exhibit 296, #22 Exhibit 297, #23 Exhibit 298, #24 Exhibit 299, #25 Exhibit 303, #26 Exhibit 304, #27 Exhibit 305, #28 Exhibit 306, #29 Exhibit 307, #30 Exhibit 308, #31 Exhibit 309, #32 Exhibit 310, #33 Exhibit 311, #34 Exhibit 312, #35 Exhibit 313, #36 Exhibit 314, #37 Exhibit 315, #38 Exhibit 316, #39 Exhibit 318, #40 Exhibit 320, #41 Exhibit 322, #42 Exhibit 324, #43 Exhibit 325, #44 Exhibit 328, #45 Exhibit 329, #46 Exhibit 330, #47 Exhibit 331, #48 Exhibit 332, #49 Exhibit 333, #50 Exhibit 334, #51 Exhibit 335, #52 Exhibit 336, #53 Exhibit 337, #54 Exhibit 338, #55 Exhibit 339, #56 Exhibit 340, #57 Exhibit 342, #58 Exhibit 343, #59 Exhibit 344, #60 Exhibit 345, #61 Exhibit 346, #62 Exhibit 347, #63 Exhibit 348, #64 Exhibit 349, #65 Exhibit 350, #66 Exhibit 351, #67 Exhibit 352, #68 Exhibit 353)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 342 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 222, #2 Exhibit 223, #3 Exhibit 224, #4 Exhibit 225, #5 Exhibit 226, #6 Exhibit 227, #7 Exhibit 228, #8 Exhibit 229, #9 Exhibit 230, #10 Exhibit 231, #11 Exhibit 232, #12 Exhibit 233, #13 Exhibit 234, #14 Exhibit 236, #15 Exhibit 237, #16 Exhibit 238, #17 Exhibit 239, #18 Exhibit 240, #19 Exhibit 241, #20 Exhibit 242, #21 Exhibit 245, #22 Exhibit 246, #23 Exhibit 247, #24 Exhibit 248, #25 Exhibit 249, #26 Exhibit 250, #27 Exhibit 251, #28 Exhibit 254, #29 Exhibit 256, #30 Exhibit 257, #31 Exhibit 258, #32 Exhibit 260, #33 Exhibit 261, #34 Exhibit 262, #35 Exhibit 263, #36 Exhibit 264, #37 Exhibit 265, #38 Exhibit 267, #39 Exhibit 269, #40 Exhibit 270, #41 Exhibit 271)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 20, 2018 Filing 341 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 183, #2 184, #3 185, #4 186, #5 187, #6 188, #7 189, #8 190, #9 191, #10 192, #11 193, #12 194, #13 195, #14 196, #15 197, #16 198, #17 199, #18 200, #19 201, #20 202, #21 203, #22 204, #23 205, #24 206-1, #25 206-2, #26 207, #27 208, #28 209, #29 210, #30 212, #31 213, #32 214, #33 215, #34 216, #35 217, #36 218, #37 220)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 20, 2018 Filing 340 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 129, #2 Exhibit 131, #3 Exhibit 132, #4 Exhibit 133, #5 Exhibit 135, #6 Exhibit 137, #7 Exhibit 138, #8 Exhibit 139, #9 Exhibit 140, #10 Exhibit 143, #11 Exhibit 144, #12 Exhibit 145, #13 Exhibit 146, #14 Exhibit 147, #15 Exhibit 151, #16 Exhibit 152, #17 Exhibit 153, #18 Exhibit 154, #19 Exhibit 156, #20 Exhibit 157, #21 Exhibit 158, #22 Exhibit 159, #23 Exhibit 160, #24 Exhibit 161, #25 Exhibit 162, #26 Exhibit 164, #27 Exhibit 165, #28 Exhibit 166, #29 Exhibit 167, #30 Exhibit 168, #31 Exhibit 170, #32 Exhibit 171, #33 Exhibit 173, #34 Exhibit 174, #35 Exhibit 175, #36 Exhibit 176, #37 Exhibit 177, #38 Exhibit 178, #39 Exhibit 179, #40 Exhibit 180, #41 Exhibit 181, #42 Exhibit 169)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 20, 2018 Filing 339 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 70, #2 Exhibit 72, #3 Exhibit 73, #4 Exhibit 74, #5 Exhibit 75, #6 Exhibit 76, #7 Exhibit 77, #8 Exhibit 78, #9 Exhibit 79, #10 Exhibit 80, #11 Exhibit 81, #12 Exhibit 82, #13 Exhibit 83, #14 Exhibit 84, #15 Exhibit 85, #16 Exhibit 86, #17 Exhibit 87, #18 Exhibit 88, #19 Exhibit 89, #20 Exhibit 90, #21 Exhibit 91, #22 Exhibit 92, #23 Exhibit 93, #24 Exhibit 94, #25 Exhibit 96, #26 Exhibit 97, #27 Exhibit 98, #28 Exhibit 99, #29 Exhibit 100, #30 Exhibit 101, #31 Exhibit 102, #32 Exhibit 103, #33 Exhibit 104, #34 Exhibit 105, #35 Exhibit 106, #36 Exhibit 107, #37 Exhibit 108, #38 Exhibit 109, #39 Exhibit 110, #40 Exhibit 111, #41 Exhibit 112, #42 Exhibit 113, #43 Exhibit 115, #44 Exhibit 116, #45 Exhibit 118, #46 Exhibit 121, #47 Exhibit 122, #48 Exhibit 124, #49 Exhibit 127, #50 Exhibit 95)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 20, 2018 Filing 338 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John A. Marsala for Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on May 11, 2017 before Judge Sim Lake. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (LaurenWebster, 4)
June 20, 2018 Filing 337 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #336 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
June 19, 2018 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT re: Pretrial Conference held on May 11, 2017 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter J. Sanchez. Ordering Party Matthew Abbott Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2018., filed. (jsanchez, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 335 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit 38, #18 Exhibit 39, #19 Exhibit 40, #20 Exhibit 41, #21 Exhibit 42, #22 Exhibit 43, #23 Exhibit 44, #24 Exhibit 45, #25 Exhibit 46, #26 Exhibit 47, #27 Exhibit 48, #28 Exhibit 49, #29 Exhibit 50, #30 Exhibit 51, #31 Exhibit 52, #32 Exhibit 53, #33 Exhibit 54, #34 Exhibit 55, #35 Exhibit 56, #36 Exhibit 57, #37 Exhibit 58, #38 Exhibit 59, #39 Exhibit 60, #40 Exhibit 61, #41 Exhibit 62, #42 Exhibit 63, #43 Exhibit 64, #44 Exhibit 65, #45 Exhibit 66, #46 Exhibit 67, #47 Exhibit 68)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 19, 2018 Filing 334 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18-25, #2 Exhibit 18-26, #3 Exhibit 18-27, #4 Exhibit 18-28, #5 Exhibit 18-29, #6 Exhibit 18-30, #7 Exhibit 18-31, #8 Exhibit 18-32, #9 Exhibit 18-33)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 19, 2018 Filing 333 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by W. Scott Hastings. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding 4/14/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 7/18/2017 Scheduling Conference before Judge Lake, 10/12/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 12/4/2017 Trial Vol. 1 before Judge Lake, 12/5/2017 Trial Vol. 2 before Judge Lake, 12/6/2017 Trial Vol. 3 before Judge Lake, 12/7/2017 Trial Vol. 4 before Judge Lake.. (No transcript is needed). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz. This order form relates to the following: #244 Transcript, #284 Transcript, #282 Transcript, #283 Transcript, #321 Notice of Appeal, #281 Transcript, #195 Transcript, #258 Transcript, filed. (Hastings, William)
June 18, 2018 Filing 332 Trial EXHIBITS re: #331 Exhibits, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18-1, #2 Exhibit 18-2, #3 Exhibit 18-3, #4 Exhibit 18-4, #5 Exhibit 18-5, #6 Exhibit 18-6, #7 Exhibit 18-7, #8 Exhibit 18-8, #9 Exhibit 18-9, #10 Exhibit 18-10, #11 Exhibit 18-11, #12 Exhibit 18-12, #13 Exhibit 18-13, #14 Exhibit 18-14, #15 Exhibit 18-15, #16 Exhibit 18-16, #17 Exhibit 18-17, #18 Exhibit 18-18, #19 Exhibit 18-19, #20 Exhibit 18-20, #21 Exhibit 18-21, #22 Exhibit 18-22)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 18, 2018 Filing 331 Trial EXHIBITS by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, part 2, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, part 3, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 18, 2018 Filing 330 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited / Stephen M. Ankrom. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding 4/14/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 10/12/2017 Docket Call and Hearing before Judge Lake, 12/4/2017 Trial Vol. 1before Judge Lake, 12/5/2017 Trial Vol. 2 before Judge Lake, 12/6/2017 Trial Vol. 3 before Judge Lake, 12/7/2017 Trial Vol. 4 before Judge Lake. (No transcript is needed). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz. This order form relates to the following: #284 Transcript, #282 Transcript, #283 Transcript, #281 Transcript, #317 Notice of Appeal, #195 Transcript, #258 Transcript, filed.(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 18, 2018 Filing 329 Notice of Non-Compliance. Appellant has failed to: Submit the DKT13 transcript order form1 Parties notified, filed. (jtabares, 1)
June 13, 2018 Filing 328 REPLY in Support of #314 MOTION for Costs, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason)
June 11, 2018 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20350 re: #317 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 8, 2018 Filing 327 Trial EXHIBITS re: #325 Exhibits,,, by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0381, #2 Exhibit DX0446, #3 Exhibit DX0447, #4 Exhibit DX0448, #5 Exhibit DX0449, #6 Exhibit DX0450, #7 Exhibit DX0451, #8 Exhibit DX0452, #9 Exhibit DX0453, #10 Exhibit DX0454, #11 Exhibit DX0455, #12 Exhibit DX0456, #13 Exhibit DX0457, #14 Exhibit DX0458, #15 Exhibit DX0459, #16 Exhibit DX0460, #17 Exhibit DX0462, #18 Exhibit DX0464, #19 Exhibit DX0467, #20 Exhibit DX0501, #21 Exhibit DX0502, #22 Exhibit DX0506, #23 Exhibit DX0507, #24 Exhibit DX0508, #25 Exhibit DX0513, #26 Exhibit DX0514, #27 Exhibit DX0519, #28 Exhibit DX0520, #29 Exhibit DX0521 - Redacted)(Hastings, William)
June 8, 2018 Filing 326 Trial EXHIBITS re: #325 Exhibits,,, by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0227, #2 Exhibit DX0228, #3 Exhibit DX0229, #4 Exhibit DX0230, #5 Exhibit DX0231, #6 Exhibit DX0232, #7 Exhibit DX0233, #8 Exhibit DX0234, #9 Exhibit DX0235, #10 Exhibit DX0236, #11 Exhibit DX0237, #12 Exhibit DX0238, #13 Exhibit DX0239, #14 Exhibit DX0240, #15 Exhibit DX0241, #16 Exhibit DX0242 - Redacted, #17 Exhibit DX0243, #18 Exhibit DX0244 - Redacted, #19 Exhibit DX0250, #20 Exhibit DX0251, #21 Exhibit DX0253, #22 Exhibit DX0256, #23 Exhibit DX0257, #24 Exhibit DX0258, #25 Exhibit DX0259, #26 Exhibit DX0340, #27 Exhibit DX0342, #28 Exhibit DX0375, #29 Exhibit DX0376, #30 Exhibit DX0377)(Hastings, William)
June 8, 2018 Filing 325 Trial EXHIBITS by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0002, #2 Exhibit DX0004, #3 Exhibit DX0007, #4 Exhibit DX0009, #5 Exhibit DX0010, #6 Exhibit DX0011, #7 Exhibit DX0012, #8 Exhibit DX0013, #9 Exhibit DX0014, #10 Exhibit DX0015, #11 Exhibit DX0016, #12 Exhibit DX0017, #13 Exhibit DX0021, #14 Exhibit DX0022, #15 Exhibit DX0023, #16 Exhibit DX0024, #17 Exhibit DX0025, #18 Exhibit DX0028, #19 Exhibit DX0029, #20 Exhibit DX0030, #21 Exhibit DX0031, #22 Exhibit DX0032, #23 Exhibit DX0033, #24 Exhibit DX0034, #25 Exhibit DX0037, #26 Exhibit DX0038, #27 Exhibit DX0039, #28 Exhibit DX0044, #29 Exhibit DX0076, #30 Exhibit DX0226)(Hastings, William)
June 6, 2018 Filing 324 RESPONSE to #314 MOTION for Costs filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew F. Abbott & Exhibits A through S, #2 Proposed Order)(Powley, Robert)
June 6, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #321 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1. Exhibits offered and admitted to be filed by parties, filed.(mperez, 1)
June 6, 2018 Filing 323 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #321 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (mperez, 1)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER denying #319 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 5, 2018 Filing 321 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #313 Final Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20207501), filed.(Mueller, Jason)
June 4, 2018 Filing 320 RESPONSE in Opposition to #319 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Mueller, #2 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
June 4, 2018 Filing 319 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 4, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #317 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(mperez, 1)
June 4, 2018 Filing 318 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #317 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (mperez, 1)
June 1, 2018 Filing 317 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #312 Memorandum and Opinion, #313 Final Judgment, #254 Minute Entry Order,, by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20189696), filed.(Powley, Robert)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER striking #315 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 30, 2018 Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powley, Robert)
May 16, 2018 Filing 314 MOTION for Costs by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Mueller Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Kleber Declaration, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
May 2, 2018 Filing 313 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 5/2/2018. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #287 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs; denying #289 MOTION for Post-Judgment Relief; and granting in part, denying in part #290 Application for Attorney's Fees. The Clerk is Ordered to unseal all documents filed under seal in this case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 12, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE of Change of Address by Galyn Gafford, counsel for KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Gafford, Galyn)
March 12, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason E. Mueller, counsel for KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Mueller, Jason)
February 20, 2018 Filing 309 SURREPLY to #289 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #304 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Application For Attorney's Fees (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #302 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 12, 2018 Filing 306 PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, filed. (With attachments)
February 12, 2018 Filing 305 REPLY in Support of #289 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen M. Ankrom in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Powley, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Filing 304 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Application For Attorney's Fees by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
February 12, 2018 Filing 303 DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS, filed. (With attachments)
February 12, 2018 Filing 302 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying #198 Motion to Seal And/ Or Keep Under Seal Confidential Portions Of The Parties' Court Filings. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #297 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #294 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 29, 2018 Filing 298 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS, filed. (With attachments)
January 29, 2018 Filing 297 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
January 29, 2018 Filing 296 RESPONSE to #289 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
January 29, 2018 Filing 295 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, filed. (With attachments)
January 29, 2018 Filing 294 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #288 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Application under 17 U.S.C. 505 for an award of Attorneys Fees and Costs (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #286 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave to Seal Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, filed.
January 8, 2018 Filing 290 Plaintiffs' Application for Attorney's Fees, filed. (With attachments)
January 8, 2018 Filing 289 MOTION to Alter Judgment( Motion Docket Date 1/29/2018.), MOTION for New Trial by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
January 8, 2018 Filing 288 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Application under 17 U.S.C. 505 for an award of Attorneys Fees and Costs by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Thomas)
January 8, 2018 Filing 287 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS, filed. (With attachments)
January 8, 2018 Filing 286 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave to Seal Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
December 15, 2017 Filing 285 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #284 Transcript, #282 Transcript, #283 Transcript, #281 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
December 14, 2017 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial Vol. 4 held on 12/7/17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party George Gibson. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018, filed. (halcaraz, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial Vol. 3 held on 12/6/17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party George Gibson. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018, filed. (halcaraz, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 282 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Trial Vol. 2 held on 12/5/17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party George Gibson. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018, filed. (halcaraz, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT re: Jury Selection and Jury Trial Vol. 1 held on 12/4/17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party George Gibson. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018, filed. (halcaraz, )
December 8, 2017 Filing 280 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. / George R. Gibson for Transcript of Trial before Judge Lake 12/4/17 - 12/7/17. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (Gibson, George)
December 8, 2017 Filing 276 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Stephen Ankcom and Jason Mueller for Transcript of 12/04/2017 All Witnesses. Realtime turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (sroque, 4)
December 7, 2017 Filing 279 Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibits. (gclair, 4)
December 7, 2017 Filing 278 Defendant's Exhibit List. (gclair, 4)
December 7, 2017 Filing 277 Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Continuation 1, #2 Continuation 2)(gclair, 4)
December 7, 2017 Filing 275 Jury Note No. 4(gclair, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2017: #1 unredacted) (gclair, 4).
December 7, 2017 Filing 274 Jury Note No. 3(gclair, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2017: #1 unredacted) (gclair, 4).
December 7, 2017 Filing 273 Jury Note No. 2(gclair, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2017: #1 unredacted) (gclair, 4).
December 7, 2017 Filing 272 Jury Note No. 1(gclair, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2017: #1 unredacted) (gclair, 4).
December 7, 2017 Filing 271 JURY VERDICT (gclair, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2017: #1 unredacted) (gclair, 4).
December 7, 2017 Filing 270 Court's Instructions to the Jury. (gclair, 4)
December 7, 2017 Filing 269 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sim Lake. Fourth day of JURY TRIAL held on 12/7/2017. Jury verdict reached. Post verdict motions shall be filed within 30 days. Appearances: James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford, Edward Louis Friedman.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(gclair, 4)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER to provide meal to jury on 12/7/2017. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 6, 2017 Filing 267 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sim Lake. THIRD DAY OF JURY TRIAL held on 12/6/2017. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Appearances: E. Friedman for Defendants. L. Larson and J. Kenney for Plaintiffs. James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford. Appearances: (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed. (aboyd, 4)
December 6, 2017 Filing 266 OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM, filed by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC. (Friedman, Edward)
December 6, 2017 Filing 265 MOTION for Judgment by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2017. (Friedman, Edward)
December 6, 2017 Filing 263 MOTION to Supplement by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Kleber, Kody)
December 5, 2017 Filing 264 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sim Lake. SECOND DAY OF JURY TRIAL held on 12/5/2017. Jury Trial recessed until 12/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Appearances: E. Friedman for Defendants. L. Larson and J. Kenney for Plaintiffs. James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed. (aboyd, 4)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Pre-Admissibility of Trial Exhibits (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 4, 2017 Filing 261 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sim Lake. FIRST DAY OF JURY TRIAL held on 12/4/2017. Jury Trial recessed until 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Appearances:E. Friedman for Defendants. L. Larson and J. Kenney for Plaintiffs. James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed. (aboyd, 4)
December 4, 2017 Filing 260 Trial EXHIBITS by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Klantschi, Fritz)
October 16, 2017 Filing 259 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #258 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
October 13, 2017 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT re: Docket Call and Hearing held on 10-12-17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party Defendant Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2018., filed. (bslavin, )
October 13, 2017 Filing 257 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. / George R. Gibson for Transcript of Docket Call Hearing on 10/12/17 at 3:00 PM before Judge Lake. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Gibson, George)
October 12, 2017 Filing 256 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs/Matthew F. Abbott for Transcript of Docket Call on 10/12/17 before Judge Lake. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Abbott, Matthew)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Docket Call held. Appearances: E. Larson for Plaintiff. S. Hastings for Defendant. George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Kody D L Kleber, Jason Erik Mueller. Ct Reporter: B. Slavin. (Advisement of Intent to Pursue Claim for Prejudgment Interest due by 10/20/2017. Objections to Deposition Excerpts due by 10/20/2017. Responses due by 10/27/2017. Plaintiff's Ordered List of Witnesses due by 11/27/2017. Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake.) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 12, 2017 Filing 253 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP et al. for Transcript of Docket Call Hearing on 10/12/17 at 3:00 PM before Judge Lake. Hourly turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Kleber, Kody)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER. Docket Call set for 10/12/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
July 28, 2017 Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 7/28/2017. Settlement Conference was held with counsel and the following representatives for the parties: Plaintiff Representatives: Mark Wellman and John Hitchcock; Defendant Representatives: Kevin McCarthy and David Shladovsky. The case did not settle. Appearances: James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford.(Digital # 8:30 -4:30)(ERO:N/A), filed.(ltrevino, 3)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference held. Case did not settle. Jury Trial set for 7/31/2017 at 1:00 PM is cancelled until further notice of court. Appearances: S. Ankrom and L. Larson for Plaintiffs. E. Friedman and S. Hastings for Defendants.. Appearances: James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Jason Erik Mueller. Ct Reporter: K. Metzger. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 26, 2017 Filing 249 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Final Pretrial Conference tentatively set for 7/28/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake, filed. (aboyd, 4)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #236 MOTION to Strike #232 Reply in Support of Motion and Declaration of Ralph Oman, denying #204 Sealed Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights and a Concurrent Stay (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 26, 2017 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Hastings on behalf of Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (Hastings, William)
July 24, 2017 Filing 246 NOTICE of Setting - SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Parties notified. Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9B, Ninth Floor, 515 Rusk Avenue, Houston, Texas, before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (dwilkerson, 3) .
July 21, 2017 Filing 245 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #244 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
July 20, 2017 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT re: Scheduling Conference held on 7-19-17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party Plaintiffs Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2017., filed. (bslavin, )
July 19, 2017 Filing 243 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant Kayne Anderson/Mueller for Transcript of Pretrial Scheduling Conference 7/19/2017 Judge Lake. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Mueller, Jason)
July 19, 2017 Filing 242 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs/Stephen M. Ankrom for Transcript of Scheduling Conference on 7/19/2017 before Judge Lake. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Ankrom, Stephen)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Sheduling Conference held Appearances: Ed Friedman for Defendants. Appearances: George R Gibson, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Kody D L Kleber, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford. Ct Reporter: B. Slavin. Jury Trial set for 7/31/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Settlement Conference TO BE SET before Judge George C. Hanks on 7/28/2017 at 9:00 AM in Houston. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 14, 2017 Filing 240 RESPONSE to #235 MOTION for Telephone Conference filed by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 6, 2017 Filing 238 RESPONSE to #236 MOTION to Strike #232 Reply in Support of Motion, and Declaration of Ralph Oman filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration, #12 Proposed Order)(Kleber, Kody)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER re: #236 Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Ralph Oman. (Responses due by 7/6/2017.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 23, 2017 Filing 236 MOTION to Strike #232 Reply in Support of Motion, and Declaration of Ralph Oman by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen M. Ankrom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 23, 2017 Filing 235 MOTION for Telephone Conference by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen M. Ankrom, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #233 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time file or otherwise respond to Defendants' Reply Memorandum (Sur-Reply or Other Response due by 6/23/2017.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 15, 2017 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time file or otherwise respond to Defendants' Reply Memorandum by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
June 9, 2017 Filing 232 REPLY in Support of #204 Sealed Event, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Oman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Kleber, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Kleber, Kody)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Trial Date until after decision on #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 5, 2017 Filing 230 Joint PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Trial Date, filed.(Ankrom, Stephen)
May 24, 2017 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition to #204 Sealed Event, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen M. Ankrom, #2 Exhibit A-Q to the Declaration of Stephen M. Ankrom, #3 Affidavit of John Hitchcock, #4 Affidavit of Deborah A. Brown, #5 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
May 12, 2017 Filing 228 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants/Kody D. L. Kleber for Transcript of Pre-Trial Motion Hearing on 5/11/17 before Judge Lake.. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Kleber, Kody)
May 11, 2017 Filing 227 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs/Matthew F. Abbott for Transcript of Pre-Trial Motion Hearing on 5/11/17 before Judge Lake. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Abbott, Matthew)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial Conference held granting in part and denying in part #164 Sealed Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters, denying #221 MOTION to Strike #204 Sealed Event Defendants' Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and for a Concurrent Stay, granting in part and denyin n part #166 MOTION In Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine, granting in part and denying in part #171 Sealed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony and Materials from Trial. (Written Settlement Demand to be tendered by 12:00 PM on 5/12/2017.) Appearances: Ed Friedman for Defendants. George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Kody D L Kleber, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford. Ct Reporter: J. Sanchez. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #223 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO THE REGISTER OF COPYRIGHTS (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting #201 MOTION to Strike #197 Proposed Pretrial Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
May 9, 2017 Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO THE REGISTER OF COPYRIGHTS by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kleber, Kody)
May 9, 2017 Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition to #221 MOTION to Strike #204 Sealed Event Defendants' Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and for a Concurrent Stay, filed by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kleber, Kody)
May 5, 2017 Filing 221 MOTION to Strike #204 Sealed Event Defendants' Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and for a Concurrent Stay by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ankrom, Stephen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 220 REPLY in Support of #166 MOTION In Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason)
May 5, 2017 Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition to #198 MOTION to Seal And/Or Keep Under Seal Confidential Portions Of The Parties' Court Filings, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit FF, #5 Exhibit HH, #6 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
May 5, 2017 Filing 218 REPLY in Support of #166 MOTION In Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason)
May 5, 2017 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition to #198 MOTION to Seal And/Or Keep Under Seal Confidential Portions Of The Parties' Court Filings, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit FF, #5 Exhibit HH, #6 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason) (will re-file only page 1 of main document was filed.) Modified on 5/5/2017 (mmapps, 4).
May 5, 2017 Filing 216 SURREPLY to #171 Sealed Event, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jason)
May 5, 2017 Filing 215 RESPONSE to #201 MOTION to Strike #197 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
May 5, 2017 Filing 214 SURREPLY to #164 Sealed Event, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jason)
May 3, 2017 Filing 213 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 212 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 211 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 210 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 209 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 208 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 207 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 206 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 205 Exhibits to #204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 204 Defendants Motion for Referral to the Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b) and a Concurrent Stay by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (With attachments) Unsealed Per #225 Order - Modified on 5/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
May 3, 2017 Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO THE REGISTER OF COPYRIGHTS PURSUANT TO 17 U.S.C. 411(b) AND A CONCURRENT STAY by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kleber, Kody)
April 26, 2017 Filing 202 REPLY in Support of #171 Sealed Event, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Curtin, Thomas)
April 25, 2017 Filing 201 MOTION to Strike #197 Proposed Pretrial Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
April 24, 2017 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition to #166 MOTION In Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas H. Curtin, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P)(Curtin, Thomas)
April 21, 2017 Filing 199 REPLY in Support of #164 Sealed Event, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas H. Curtin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Curtin, Thomas)
April 21, 2017 Filing 198 MOTION to Seal And/Or Keep Under Seal Confidential Portions Of The Parties' Court Filings by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Thomas)
April 21, 2017 Filing 197 Amended Proposed Pretrial Order by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP(Mueller, Jason)
April 21, 2017 Filing 196 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #195 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (olindor, 4)
April 20, 2017 Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT re: Docket Call and Hearing held on 4-14-17 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party All Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2017., filed. (bslavin, )
April 19, 2017 Filing 194 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants/Jason Mueller for Transcript of Transcript of Pretrial conference and docketing call on 4/14/2017 before Judge Lake. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Mueller, Jason)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #191 Joint MOTION to Amend (Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 19, 2017 Filing 192 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited for Transcript of Pretrial conference and docketing call on 4/14/2017 before Judge Lake. Realtime turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Ankrom, Stephen)
April 18, 2017 Filing 191 Joint MOTION to Amend by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Docket Call held mooting #152 Sealed Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Westin Anson. Appearances: E. Friedman for Defedants. Appearances: James M. Gibson, George R Gibson, Stephen Ankrom, Robert L Powley, Roy William Hardin, Kody D L Kleber, Jason Erik Mueller, Galyn Dwight Gafford. Ct Reporter: B. Slavin. (Jury Trial set for 6/12/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Notification to Court of which docket entries should remain under seal due by 4/21/2017.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying #184 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying #170 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony and Materials from Trial (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying #163 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 13, 2017 Filing 186 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, L.P., KA Fund Advisors, LLC. (With attachments) Unsealed per 189 Order - Modified on 4/14/2017 (aboyd, 4).
April 13, 2017 Filing 185 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, L.P., KA Fund Advisors, LLC. (With attachments) Unsealed per #189 Order - Modified on 4/14/2017 (aboyd, 4).
April 13, 2017 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #175 MOTION to Strike #167 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count Four of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, striking #167 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count Four of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 12, 2017 Filing 182 OBJECTIONS Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jason)
April 12, 2017 Filing 181 OBJECTIONS To Defendants Trial Exhibit List and Deposition Designations with Supplemental Counter Designations, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Objections and Supplemental Counter Depo Designations)(Abbott, Matthew)
April 12, 2017 Filing 180 RESPONSE to #175 MOTION to Strike #167 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count Four of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint Judgment filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
April 11, 2017 Filing 179 RESPONSE to #171 Sealed Event filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Kleber, Kody)
April 11, 2017 Filing 178 REPLY in Support of #152 Sealed Event, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jason)
April 11, 2017 Filing 177 REPLY to #152 Sealed Event Defendants Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Mr. Weston Anson, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason) Modified on 4/11/2017 (smurdock, 4). filed in error see entry #178 for correct entry
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #173 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion For Leave to Seal Defendants Motions in Limine (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 11, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION to Strike #167 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count Four of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying #168 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Joint Pretrial Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 10, 2017 Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion For Leave to Seal Defendants Motions in Limine by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
April 9, 2017 Filing 172 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP(Mueller, Jason)
April 7, 2017 Filing 171 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony and Materials from Trial by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (With attachments) Unsealed per #188 Order - Modified on 4/14/2017 (aboyd, 4).
April 7, 2017 Filing 170 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony and Materials from Trial by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To File Under Seal)(Curtin, Thomas)
April 7, 2017 Filing 169 Joint Pretrial Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (With attachments) Unsealed per #174 Order - Modified on 4/10/2017 (aboyd, 4).
April 7, 2017 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Joint Pretrial Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
April 7, 2017 Filing 167 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count Four of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
April 7, 2017 Filing 166 MOTION In Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Mueller, Jason)
April 7, 2017 Filing 165 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew F. Abbott in Support of Pre-trial Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Ankrom, Stephen)
April 7, 2017 Filing 164 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (With attachments) Unsealed per #187 Order - Modified on 4/14/2017 (aboyd, 4).
April 7, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of Ambreen Salters by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To file under seal)(Curtin, Thomas)
April 6, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward L. Friedman and Kody D. L. Kleber on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Kleber, Kody)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Stephen M. Ankrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
April 5, 2017 Filing 160 MOTION for Stephen M. Ankrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/26/2017. (Ankrom, Stephen)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #157 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Weston Anson (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 4, 2017 Filing 158 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MR. WESTON ANSON, filed. (With attachments)
April 4, 2017 Filing 157 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Weston Anson by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, James)
March 24, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy W. Hardin on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Hardin, Roy)
March 23, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Tim Johnson on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Johnson, Timothy)
March 22, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by George R. Gibson on behalf of Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. (Gibson, George)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #151 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Weston Anson UNDER SEAL (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 14, 2017 Filing 152 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MR. WESTON ANSON, filed. (With attachments)
March 14, 2017 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Weston Anson UNDER SEAL by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying #139 Sealed Motion to Compel (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #147 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Information Underlying Defendants' Revenue Summary (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 6, 2017 Filing 148 DEFENDANTS SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL INFORMATION UNDERLYING DEFENDANTS REVENUE SUMMARY, filed. (With attachments)
March 6, 2017 Filing 147 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Information Underlying Defendants' Revenue Summary by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #144 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Compel Information Underlying Defendants' Revenue Summary (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 1, 2017 Filing 145 PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL INFORMATION UNDERLYING DEFENDANTS REVENUE SUMMARY, filed. (With attachments)
March 1, 2017 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Compel Information Underlying Defendants' Revenue Summary by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Leave to File. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 21, 2017 Filing 142 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL INFORMATION UNDERLYING DEFENDANTS REVENUE SUMMARY, filed. (With attachments)
February 21, 2017 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #138 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Information Underlying Defendants Revenue Summary (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 31, 2017 Filing 139 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL INFORMATION UNDERLYING DEFENDANTS REVENUE SUMMARY, filed. (With attachments)
January 31, 2017 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Information Underlying Defendants Revenue Summary by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Telephone Conference held on Discovery Dispute. Appearances: Robert L Powley, Jason Erik Mueller. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part #105 Sealed Event, granting in part and denying in part #129 MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 8, 2016 Filing 134 PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed. (With attachments)
December 8, 2016 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Protective Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 28, 2016 Filing 131 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed. (With attachments)
November 28, 2016 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File File Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion For Protective Order Under Seal by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
November 4, 2016 Filing 129 MOTION for Protective Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew F. Abbott, #2 Abbott Decl. Table of Contents, #3 Ex. A to Abbott Decl., #4 Ex. B to Abbott Decl., #5 Ex. C to Abbott Decl., #6 Ex. D to Abbott Decl., #7 Ex. E to Abbott Decl., #8 Ex. F to Abbott Decl., #9 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 25, 2016 Filing 127 DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed.
October 25, 2016 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #123 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 20, 2016 Filing 124 PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed. (With attachments)
October 20, 2016 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs'Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #119 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 7, 2016 Filing 120 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed. (With attachments)
October 7, 2016 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
October 7, 2016 Filing 118 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed. (With attachments)
October 7, 2016 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Stay Deadlines (Discovery due by 2/17/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2017. Docket Call set for 4/14/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #113 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion For Three Month Stay of Case Deadlines (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 5, 2016 Filing 114 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Three Months Stay of Case Deadlines, filed. (With attachments)
October 5, 2016 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion For Three Month Stay of Case Deadlines by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #92 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Reply in Support of their Motion to Quash (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 23, 2016 Filing 110 PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed. (With attachments)
September 23, 2016 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Reply in Support of their Motion to Quash by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #104 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #102 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Under Seal. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #99 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Defendants Response To Motion To Quash/Protective Order Under Seal. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 16, 2016 Filing 105 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed. (With attachments)
September 16, 2016 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
September 16, 2016 Filing 103 DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed. (With attachments)
September 16, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Under Seal by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
September 16, 2016 Filing 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
September 16, 2016 Filing 100 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO QUASH/PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed. (With attachments)
September 16, 2016 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Defendants Response To Motion To Quash/Protective Order Under Seal by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
September 9, 2016 Filing 98 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #38 Second Amended Complaint by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (aboyd, 4)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 8, 2016 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit E to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 2, 2016 Filing 94 Exhibit, filed.
September 2, 2016 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit E to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
September 2, 2016 Filing 92 MOTION for Protective Order by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Abbott, #2 Affidavit Wellman, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
August 25, 2016 Filing 91 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed.(Mueller, Jason)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying #46 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Motion For Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying #82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER vacating #87 Order; Motions No Longer Referred: #82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nancy K. Johnson: #82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 29, 2016 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
June 29, 2016 Filing 84 REPLY in Support of #82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason) Sealed per #86 Order - Modified on 6/30/2016 (aboyd, 4).
June 21, 2016 Filing 83 Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to #82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Klantschi with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Table of Contents)(Klantschi, Fritz)
May 31, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Gafford Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #65 Motion to Compel and Request for Extension. Plaintiffs' request for reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses is denied. (Production of Third-Party Publication Subscription Agreements due by 5/13/2016. Production of Responsive Documents due by 5/27/2016. Expert Reports due by 8/5/2016. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 9/9/2016. Discovery due by 11/18/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/16/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2017. Docket Call set for 1/13/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #75 MOTION to Seal the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
April 25, 2016 Filing 79 SURREPLY to #65 Sealed Event, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Mueller, Jason)
April 22, 2016 Filing 78 REPLY to #65 Sealed Event in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Klantschi Declaration with Exhibts A thru D)(Klantschi, Fritz)
April 18, 2016 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition to #75 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion to Seal the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Abbott Declaration & Exhibits A - G)(Abbott, Matthew)
April 15, 2016 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #65 Sealed Event Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 O'Neil Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
March 28, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion to Seal the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion-related deadline set re: #65 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 4/15/2016.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(mmiller, 4)
March 25, 2016 Filing 73 REPLY in Support of #70 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Expedited Briefing Requested), filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mueller, Jason)
March 24, 2016 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition to #70 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Expedited Briefing Requested), filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gibson Declaration & Exhibit A)(Abbott, Matthew)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Comply with Case Deadlines (Deft Expert Report due by 8/5/2016. Discovery due by 9/23/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/4/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2017. Mediation due by 6/27/2016. Pltf Expert Report due by 7/8/2016. Docket Call set for 1/13/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 23, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Expedited Briefing Requested) by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - O'Neil Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gafford Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
March 23, 2016 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Comply with Case Deadlines by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Docket Control Order Dates)(Klantschi, Fritz)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #39 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Seal. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 4, 2016 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
March 4, 2016 Filing 65 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES AND OTHER RELIEF, filed. (With attachments)
January 11, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Address by Locke Lord LLP, counsel for KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC, filed. (Mueller, Jason)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Compliance With Case Deadlines (Deft Expert Report due by 5/6/2016. Discovery due by 6/24/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/5/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2016. Mediation due by 3/29/2016. Pltf Expert Report due by 4/8/2016. Docket Call set for 10/14/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 23, 2015 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Compliance With Case Deadlines by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Matthew)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply Opposing Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 10, 2015 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply Opposing Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
December 10, 2015 Filing 59 PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY OPPOSING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed. (With attachments)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed MOtion for Leave to File Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Under Seal (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 4, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed MOtion for Leave to File Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Under Seal by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
December 4, 2015 Filing 56 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed.
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Seal. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 3, 2015 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal, Klantschi Declaration and Exhibits A-J by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
December 3, 2015 Filing 53 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL, filed. (With attachments)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgement (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 24, 2015 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgement by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
November 24, 2015 Filing 50 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, filed. (With attachments)
November 19, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Marlin on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Marlin, Jason)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Matthew F. Abbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 12, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION by Matthew Abbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2015. (sguevara, 4)
November 12, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Motion For Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Answer due by 11/12/2015.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 9, 2015 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Comply With Case Deadlines (Deft Expert Report due by 2/16/2016. Discovery due by 3/22/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/6/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2016. Mediation due by 3/29/2016. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/8/2016. Docket Call set for 7/8/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Matthew F. Abbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 6, 2015 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Comply With Case Deadlines by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
November 6, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION for Matthew F. Abbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2015. (Klantschi, Fritz)
November 4, 2015 Filing 39 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, L.P. and KA Fund Advisors, LLC. (With attachments)
October 22, 2015 Filing 38 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. Related document: #12 First Amended Complaint, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H) (aboyd, 4)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 16, 2015 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #34 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 8)(Klantschi, Fritz)
October 13, 2015 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #34 MOTION for Leave to File filed by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason)
September 17, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit C-2, #7 Exhibit C-3, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H)(Klantschi, Fritz)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Thomas H. Curtin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 22, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Thomas H. Curtin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2015. (Klantschi, Fritz)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Docket Control Order Dates (Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2015. Deft Expert Report due by 12/18/2015. Discovery due by 1/22/2016. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/13/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 9/18/2015. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2016. Mediation due by 1/29/2016. Pltf Expert Report due by 11/9/2015. Docket Call set for 5/13/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 2, 2015 Filing 30 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Docket Control Order Dates by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines of the Docket Control Order dates. Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2015. Deft Expert Report due by 10/8/2015. Discovery due by 11/5/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2015. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2016. Pltf Expert Report due by 9/3/2015. Docket Call set for 2/12/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)
April 13, 2015 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines of the Docket Control Order dates by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klantschi, Fritz)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Joint MOTION to Extend the Deadline for the Filing of Motions to Add New Parties and Amend the Pleadings (Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 4/20/2015.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
February 26, 2015 Filing 26 Unopposed PROPOSED ORDER re: #25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Extending the Deadline for the Filing of Motions to Add New Parties and Amend the Pleadings, filed.(Klantschi, Fritz)
February 25, 2015 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Extending the Deadline for the Filing of Motions to Add New Parties and Amend the Pleadings by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2015. (Klantschi, Fritz)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2015. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/5/2015. Deft Expert Report due by 7/10/2015. Discovery due by 8/7/2015. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2015. Docket Call set for 10/9/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference held. Appearances: Fritz Klantschi, James M. Gibson, Galyn Dwight Gafford. Ct Reporter: M. Malone. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 28, 2014 Filing 22 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed.(Powley, Robert)
October 22, 2014 Filing 21 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to KA Fund Advisors, LLC served on 8/21/2014, answer due 9/11/2014, filed.(Klantschi, Fritz)
October 22, 2014 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP served on 8/20/2014, answer due 9/10/2014, filed.(Klantschi, Fritz)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 11, 2014 Filing 18 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order, filed.(Powley, Robert)
September 10, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Galyn Gafford on behalf of KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed. (Gafford, Galyn)
September 10, 2014 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed.(Mueller, Jason)
September 10, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed.(Mueller, Jason)
August 14, 2014 Summons Re-Issued as to KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person.(wbostic, 4)
July 28, 2014 Summons Issued as to KA Fund Advisors, LLC, Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP. Issued summons returned to counsel for plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 25, 2014 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, filed.(Klantschi, Fritz)
July 25, 2014 Filing 13 Request for Issuance of Summons as to KA Fund Advisors, LLC, filed.(Klantschi, Fritz)
July 25, 2014 Filing 12 First AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, KA Fund Advisors, LLC filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Klantschi, Fritz)
July 23, 2014 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed.(Klantschi, Fritz)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Robert L. Powley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for James M. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Fritz Klantschi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 10, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Robert L. Powley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2014. (Klantschi, Fritz)
July 9, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION for James M. Gibson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2014. (Gibson, James)
July 9, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Fritz Klantschi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2014. (Klantschi, Fritz)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/7/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(wbostic, 4)
July 9, 2014 Filing 3 Register of Copyrights, AO-121, Notified, filed.(wbostic, 4)
July 9, 2014 Summons Issued as to Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP, Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC. Issued summons returned to counsel for plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 8, 2014 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Request for Issuance)(Powley, Robert)
July 8, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13393123) filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Rule 7.1 Statement)(Powley, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. et al v. Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Abbott
Represented By: Stephen Ankrom
Represented By: Robert L Powley
Represented By: Thomas H. Curtin
Represented By: Fritz Klantschi
Represented By: James M. Gibson
Represented By: George R Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Represented By: Matthew Abbott
Represented By: Stephen Ankrom
Represented By: Robert L Powley
Represented By: Thomas H. Curtin
Represented By: Fritz Klantschi
Represented By: James M. Gibson
Represented By: George R Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayne Anderson Fund Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Edward Louis Friedman
Represented By: Jason Erik Mueller
Represented By: Kody D L Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KA Fund Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Galyn Dwight Gafford
Represented By: Winstol Dean Carter, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Johnson
Represented By: Roy William Hardin
Represented By: Jason Erik Mueller
Represented By: Kody D L Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors, LP
Represented By: Galyn Dwight Gafford
Represented By: Edward Louis Friedman
Represented By: Winstol Dean Carter, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Johnson
Represented By: Roy William Hardin
Represented By: Jason Erik Mueller
Represented By: Kody D L Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?