Jamal v. Saks & Company Featured Case

Plaintiff: Leyth O. Jamal
Defendant: Saks & Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv02782
Filed: September 30, 2014
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: 21 Stipulation of Dismissal. Case terminated on March 10, 2015(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez)
March 4, 2015 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Leyth O. Jamal, filed.(Weiss, Jillian)
January 26, 2015 20 MOTION for Sheryl M. Golkow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2015. (ltrevino, 3)
January 26, 2015 19 STATEMENT Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, filed.(Wyatt, Keith)
January 26, 2015 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Saks & Company, filed. (Mitchell, Michael)
January 22, 2015 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Juarez, Edward)
January 20, 2015 16 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE by National Center for Lesbian Rights, filed.(Nichols, Christopher)
January 20, 2015 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Leyth O. Jamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Weiss, Jillian)
January 13, 2015 14 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 4/1/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
January 12, 2015 13 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re 12 Unopposed MOTION for Unopposed Motion to Reset Initial Scheduling Conference Conference, filed. (rhawkins, 4)
January 9, 2015 12 Unopposed MOTION for Unopposed Motion to Reset Initial Scheduling Conference Conference by Saks & Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael)
January 9, 2015 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Saks & Company, filed.(Mitchell, Michael)
January 8, 2015 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Saks & Company, filed.(Mitchell, Michael)
December 29, 2014 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Saks & Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael)
December 10, 2014 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Saks & Company, filed.(Mitchell, Michael)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jillian T. Weiss.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins, 4)
October 14, 2014 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Saks & Company, filed.(Katine, Mitchell)
October 9, 2014 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Leyth O. Jamal, filed.(Katine, Mitchell)
October 1, 2014 Summons Issued as to Saks & Company. Issued summons returned to counsel for plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/3/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
September 30, 2014 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Saks & Company, filed.(Katine, Mitchell)
September 30, 2014 2 Agreed MOTION for Jillian T. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leyth O. Jamal, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2014. (Katine, Mitchell)
September 30, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Saks & Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13783266) filed by Leyth O. Jamal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Katine, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamal v. Saks & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leyth O. Jamal
Represented By: Mitchell Katine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?