BHL Boresight, Inc. v. Geo-Steering Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
BHL Boresight, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Geo-Steering Solutions, Inc., Geo-Steering Solutions USA, Inc. and Statoil Gulf Services LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
Geo-Steering Solutions USA, Inc. and Geo-Steering Solutions, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
BHL Boresight, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00627 |
Filed: |
March 10, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Texas |
Office: |
Houston Office |
County: |
Harris |
Presiding Judge: |
Melinda Harmon |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
88 U.S.C. § 8888 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
466
ORDER. The Court GRANTS 439 Plaintiff's motion to dismiss counterclaims; DENIES 454 Plaintiff's motion to compel the depositions of Defendants Joy and Tice; and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 456 Defendants' Cross Motion to St ay. The Court further amends the current docket control order as contained under separate order and DENIES without prejudice 446 Motion to lift the confidentiality designation from BHL's Trade Secret Memorandum.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
|
June 27, 2018 |
Filing
419
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDERS. GSSI's Objection to the Magistrate's Orders, Doc. 415 is OVERRULED and Magistrate Judge's Orders, Docs. 410 and 414 are AFFIRMED. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing
406
OPINION AND ORDER denying 253 Sealed Event (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing
402
OPINION AND ORDER denying 357 Opposed MOTION to Strike; denying 246 , 333 & 334 Motions to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2); granting in part, denying in part 230 , 323 , 246 , 259 , 317 , 333 & 334 Motions to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6). (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
389
OPINION AND ORDER re: 318 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File His Answer, re: 312 Opposed MOTION for Post-Appearance Default Judgment Against Darrell Joy, Or Alternatively, For Order Requiring Defendant Joy To File Answer. ORDERED t hat BHLs Motion for Post-Appearance Default Judgment, or Alternatively,for Order Requiring Defendant Joy to File Answer, re: 312 , is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendant Joys Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, re: 318 is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
375
OPINION AND ORDER. BHL's Motion 206 for Continuance is GRANTED. GSSI's Motion 185 for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to GSSI to summarily reurge at a later date.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing
373
OPIONION AND ORDER granting 150 MOTION for Reconsideration of 140 Order. The Court modifies its March 29, 2016 Opinion and Order and now denies BHL's Motion to Dismiss as to GSSI's declaratory-judgment claims for copyright non-infringement (Counts I-III).(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing
235
OPINION AND ORDER granting 214 EMERGENCY MOTION, denying 210 Sealed Event and 212 EMERGENCY MOTION.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?