Amerijet International, Inc. v. Zero Gravity Corporation
Plaintiff: Amerijet International, Inc. and Amerijet International Inc
Defendant: Zero Gravity Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv00791
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order of USCA re: #183 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 18-20647. The appeal is dismissed pursuant to appellant's motion, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 2, 2018 Filing 187 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #176 Notice of Non-Compliance, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
October 2, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE Zero Gravity Corporation's Release of Judgment and Order on Prejudgment Interest by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. (Smith, Quentin)
September 20, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #183 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - some transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(jtabares, 1)
September 20, 2018 Filing 185 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #183 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): K. Metzger, K. Miller, M. Malone, H. Alcaraz, B. Slavin, J. Sanchez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jtabares, 1)
September 20, 2018 Filing 184 *This entry was incorrectly recorded and has been re-docketed as document #185* Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #183 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): K. Metzger, K. Miller, M. Malone, H. Alcaraz, B. Slavin, J. Sanchez, J. Sanchez, filed.(jtabares, 1) Modified on 9/20/2018 (jtabares, 1).
September 19, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Amerijet International Inc (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20910554), filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt No. 179 Ord On Prejudgment Interest)(Rose, Martin)
September 10, 2018 Filing 182 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #174 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal,, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 6, 2018 Filing 181 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #175 Order on Motion for Leave to File (mail renoticed to updated address). (yhausmann, 6)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Order of USCA - JUDGMENT; Judgment issued as mandate 8/24/2018 re: #173 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 18-20527. the appeal is dismissed as of 8/24/2018 pursuant to appellant's motion, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER on Prejudgment Interest. Zero Gravity recovers from Amerijet International $250,309.87 in prejudgment interest #170 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 15, 2018 Filing 178 ADVISORY by Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rose, Martin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 177 ADVISORY by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
August 15, 2018 Filing 176 Notice of Non-Compliance. Appellant has failed to: Submit the DKT13 transcript order form. Parties notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
August 8, 2018 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20527 re: #173 Notice of Appeal, filed.(rnieto, 1)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER on Leave to Reply terminating #172 . Zero Gravity Corporation's reply is accepted. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 1, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #173 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.A motion for leave to file reply is pending. Hearings were held in the case, some transcripts were produced. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 7, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 1, 2018 Filing 174 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #172 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Amerijet International, Inc.'s Response to Zero Gravity's Application for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses, #173 Notice of Appeal,. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): K. Metzger, K. Miller, M. Malone, H. Alcaraz, B. Slavin, J. Sanchez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jtabares, 1)
July 31, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #169 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, by Zero Gravity Corporation (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20568999), filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mizell, Patrick)
July 31, 2018 Filing 172 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Amerijet International, Inc.'s Response to Zero Gravity's Memorandum in Support by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Quentin)
July 30, 2018 Filing 171 RESPONSE to Zero G's Memo in Support of its Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest, filed by Amerijet International Inc. (Rose, Martin)
July 24, 2018 Filing 170 Memorandum in Support of its #147 MOTION to Amend the Judgment and to Add Prejudgment Interest, filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Mizell, Patrick)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER on Fees and Costs. This was a complex case of many claims and counterclaims based on a history of mutually impermissible behavior. Each party won and lost some of its claims. The court declines to award attorneys' fees and costs #148 , #149 , #150 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 30, 2018 Filing 168 SURREPLY to #149 , #150 , filed by Amerijet International Inc. (ghassan, 4)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: Leave to Reply. Amerijet's surreply is accepted #166 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 30, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Zero G's Reply in Support of Defendant's Application for Attorneys' Fees by Amerijet International Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rose, Martin)
May 25, 2018 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to #149 , #150 , filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (ghassan, 4)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: Leave to Reply. Zero Gravity's reply is accepted #163 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 25, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Amerijet International, Inc.'s Response to Zero Gravity's Application for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Quentin)
May 18, 2018 Filing 162 RESPONSE to #148 Memorandum , filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Smith, Quentin)
May 18, 2018 Filing 161 RESPONSE in Opposition to #150 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Amerijet International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rose, Martin)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Leave to Respond. By 5/18/2018, Zero Gravity may respond #158 , #159 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 4, 2018 Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to File Response by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2018. (Smith, Quentin)
May 4, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2018. (Smith, Quentin)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: Leave to Respond. By 5/18/2018, Amerijet may respond #152 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 4, 2018 Filing 156 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #154 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
May 3, 2018 Filing 155 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff for Transcript of Pretrial, January 3, 2018, Hon Lynn N. Hughes. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Rose, Martin)
May 3, 2018 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT re: Pretrial Conference held on 1-3-18 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber B. Slavin. Ordering Party Defendant/Counter-Claimant Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2018., filed. (bslavin, )
May 3, 2018 Filing 153 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Quentin Smith for Transcript of January 3, 2018. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bruce Slavin, filed. (Smith, Quentin)
May 3, 2018 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Zero Gravity's Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Amerijet International Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2018. (Rose, Martin)
May 3, 2018 Filing 151 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Smith, Quentin)
April 30, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 2-A, #7 Exhibit 2-B, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Proposed Order Order Granting Zero Gravity Corporation's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses)(Mizell, Patrick)
April 30, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 2-A, #7 Exhibit 2-B, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Order Granting Zero Gravity Corporation's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses)(Mizell, Patrick)
April 30, 2018 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM In Support of Final Judgment and in the Alternative, Application for Attorneys Fees by Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Rose, Martin)
April 14, 2018 Filing 147 FINAL JUDGMENT. Zero Gravity Corporation takes $1,002,117.33 from Amerijet International, Inc. Case terminated on 4/14/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 14, 2018 Filing 146 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Zero Gravity will take $1,167,291.58 from Amerijet International less the $165,174.25 that it owes Amerijet, for a total of $1,002,117.33. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
January 12, 2018 Filing 145 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Post-Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Amerijet International Inc(Rose, Bryan)
January 12, 2018 Filing 144 POST-TRIAL BRIEF on the Economic Loss Rule by Zero Gravity Corporation(Milner, Deborah)
January 12, 2018 Filing 143 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by Zero Gravity Corporation(Milner, Deborah)
January 10, 2018 Filing 142 Exhibit List - admitted exhibits by Zero Gravity Corporation. (ghassan, 4)
January 10, 2018 Filing 141 Exhibit List - admitted exhibits by Amerijet International Inc. (ghassan, 4)
January 10, 2018 Filing 140 Minute Entry for Second day of BENCH TRIAL held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 1/10/2018. Evidence taken. Admitted additional exhibits listed. Appearances: Martin Rose, Faith Eaton, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith. (Court Reporter: J. Sanchez) (ghassan, 4)
January 9, 2018 Filing 139 Minute Entry for First day of BENCH TRIAL held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 1/9/2018. Evidence entered. Appearances: Martin Rose, Faith Eaton, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith. (Court Reporter: J. Sanchez) (ghassan, 4)
January 8, 2018 Filing 138 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by Zero Gravity Corporation (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Mizell, Patrick)
January 8, 2018 Filing 137 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by Zero Gravity Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Pre-trial Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Findings of Fact)(Mizell, Patrick)
January 8, 2018 Filing 136 Amended Exhibit List by Zero Gravity Corporation(Mizell, Patrick)
January 5, 2018 Filing 135 Amended Witness List by Amerijet International Inc(Rose, Martin)
January 5, 2018 Filing 134 Amended Exhibit List by Amerijet International Inc(Rose, Martin)
January 3, 2018 Filing 133 Minute Entry for PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 1/3/2018. Appearances: Martin Rose, Faith Eaton, Joan Canny, Deborah Milner, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith. (Court Reporter: B. Slavin) (ghassan, 4)
January 2, 2018 Filing 132 Opposed Exhibit List by Amerijet International Inc(Rose, Martin)
January 2, 2018 Filing 131 Plaintiff's Amended Deposition Designation and Objection to Defendant's Designations by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
January 2, 2018 Filing 130 Witness List by Amerijet International Inc(Rose, Martin)
January 2, 2018 Filing 129 Amended Exhibit List by Amerijet International Inc(Rose, Martin)
January 2, 2018 Filing 128 Objections to Amerijet International Inc.'s Deposition Designations by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
January 2, 2018 Filing 127 Amended Deposition Designations by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
January 2, 2018 Filing 126 Amended Witness List by Zero Gravity Corporation(Mizell, Patrick)
January 2, 2018 Filing 125 Amended Exhibit List by Zero Gravity Corporation(Mizell, Patrick)
January 2, 2018 Filing 124 TRIAL BRIEF by Amerijet International Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiff's Trial Brief)(Rose, Martin)
January 2, 2018 Filing 123 TRIAL BRIEF by Zero Gravity Corporation (Attachments: #1 Appendix Transcript Excerpts)(Mizell, Patrick)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Resetting Trial terminating #121 . Pretrial conference reset for 1/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Joint pretrial order due by 1/2/2018. Bench trial reset for 1/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 2, 2017 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of TRIAL by Amerijet International Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rose, Martin)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Setting Trial terminating #106 . Joint pretrial order due by 11/27/2017. Pretrial conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Bench trial set for 12/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 19, 2017 Filing 119 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Mediation held. Appearances: Martin Rose, Faith Eaton, Joan Canny, David Adcock, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith, Therese Brewster, Mike Hinke. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Consent to Mediation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 23, 2017 Filing 117 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Faith E. Dewberry Eaton for Transcript of Conference on 4/11/2017 before Judge Hughes. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (Rose, Martin)
June 5, 2017 Filing 116 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Benjamine Reid re: #107 Conference Memorandum,, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, )
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Setting Mediation. Mediation set for 7/19/2017 at 10:00 AM at Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 18, 2017 Filing 114 STATUS REPORT by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Smith, Quentin)
April 27, 2017 Filing 113 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #111 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
April 26, 2017 Filing 112 RESPONSE to #97 Document Amerijet's Report to the Court, Request for Mediation, and Jury Trial, filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Smith, Quentin)
April 26, 2017 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT re: Conference held on 4/11/2017 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber K. Metzger. Ordering Party Quentin Smith Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2017, filed. (kmetzger)
April 18, 2017 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #108 Order on Mediation, filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Mizell, Patrick)
April 18, 2017 Filing 109 Statement Regarding Mediation by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
April 12, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION for Jury Trial by Amerijet International Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2017. (Rose, Martin)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER. By 4/18/2017, each party must decide whether it would like to mediate and file its decision with the court. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Pretrial conference held. Appearances: Martin Rose, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith. Ct Reporter: K. Metzger. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 4/24/2017. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 10, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Faith Eaton on behalf of Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Dewberry Eaton, Faith)
April 7, 2017 Filing 104 RESPONSE to #97 Document Amerijet's Report to the Court, Request for Mediation, and Jury Trial, filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mizell, Patrick)
April 7, 2017 Filing 103 RESPONSE to #97 Document Amerijet's Report to the Court, Request for Mediation, and Jury Trial, filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Mizell, Patrick)
April 7, 2017 Filing 102 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #101 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
April 6, 2017 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT re: Conference held on 12/1/16 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party Quentin Smith. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2017, filed. (halcaraz, )
April 6, 2017 Filing 100 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by MARTIN E. Rose for Transcript of Status Conference Hearing 12/01/2016, Judge Lynn Hughes. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (sroque, 4)
March 30, 2017 Filing 99 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Quentin Smith for Transcript of Status Conference on December 1, 2016. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (LinhthuDo, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2017 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 21, 2017 Filing 97 Status Report and Request for Mediation and Jury Trial by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
March 21, 2017 Filing 96 Request for a Bench Trial Setting by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
January 31, 2017 Filing 95 Redacted Contract between Zero Gravity and Everts, filed. (ghassan, 4)
December 19, 2016 Filing 94 STATUS REPORT by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Discovery ORDER. By 12/14/2016, the parties must tell the court the search terms they have agreed upon. By 12/19/2016, Amerijet will report to the court the items in the manuals it thinks are unique. By 12/19/2016, Amerijet will give Zero Gravity the sale documents and the financial statistics on which the sale was based. By 12/19/2016, Amerijet will tell the court if it has ever sold an aircraft with manuals and the purchase price for those sales. Internal review set for 12/19/2016. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 1, 2016 Filing 92 Minute Entry for PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 12/1/2016. Evidence taken. Order to be entered. Appearances: Martin Rose, Faith Eaton, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz) (ghassan, 4)
November 30, 2016 Filing 91 REPLY Regarding Inspection of Manuals and Motion to Compel Production, filed by Amerijet International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Rose, Martin)
November 3, 2016 Filing 90 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #87 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, filed. (mcodina, 7)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 1, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION for Status Conference Conference by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2016. (Smith, Quentin)
October 13, 2016 Filing 87 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #86 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
October 12, 2016 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on August 2, 2016 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mayra Malone. Ordering Party Faith Eaton Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2017., filed. (mmalone, )
September 19, 2016 Filing 85 RESPONSE to #84 Status Report to the Court on Inspection of Manuals, filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Quentin)
September 7, 2016 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
August 12, 2016 Filing 83 Joint Report on Search Terms by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
August 10, 2016 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
August 4, 2016 Filing 81 Letter from Martin Rose (Amerijet) re: Corresponding e-mails about 7/25/2014 NASA letter, filed. (ghassan, 4)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER on Search Terms. By 8/10/2016, Amerijet must provide three search terms to Zero Gravity that it thinks will locate the primary, secondary, and tertiary documents requested by Zero Gravity. By 8/12/2016, Zero Gravity will report if it finds those terms agreeable. Internal review set for 8/15/2016. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER on Documents. By 8/5/2016, Zero Gravity must send the court: the letter sent to it from NASA drafted on 7/25/2016; and its contract with Everts from 11/2014. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Allowing Inspection of Manuals. By 8/22/2016, Clark and Adams may have a frank and cordial discussion about the sources used to create the manuals for the airplanes operated by Everts on behalf of Zero Gravity. Only Clark and Adams may be present when inspecting the manuals and sources. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 2, 2016 Filing 77 Minute Entry for HEARING held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 8/2/2016. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 8/8/2016. Appearances: Martin Rose, Faith Eaton, Patrick Mizell, Quentin Smith, Mike Henke. (Court Reporter: M. Malone) (ghassan, 4)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Hearing. Hearing on discovery and scheduling set for 8/2/2016 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 15, 2016 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT by Amerijet International Inc, filed.(Rose, Martin)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER to Report. By 7/15/2016, the parties must report what next steps should be taken to advance this case. Internal review set for 7/18/2016. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 1, 2016 Filing 73 Status Report Extension Request by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to Report. By 7/1/2016, the parties must report what next steps should be taken to advance the litigation. Internal review set for 7/4/2016. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
January 28, 2016 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
December 22, 2015 Filing 70 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Niall Torrence McLachlan as to Zero Gravity Corporation re: #69 Order, filed. (ocasas, 7)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to Report. By 1/29/2016, the parties must report what next steps should be taken to advance this case. Internal review set for 2/1/2016. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 13, 2015 Filing 68 LETTER OF AGREEMENT by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER to Report. By 11/13/2015, the parties must report what next steps should be taken to advance this case. Internal review set for 11/16/2015. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER on depositions. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(hcarr 4)
June 26, 2015 Filing 64 ADVISORY by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Milner, Deborah)
June 23, 2015 Filing 63 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #61 Order, filed. (dahumada, 1)
June 22, 2015 Filing 65 Minute Entry for PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N. Hughes on 6/22/2015. Order to be entered. Appearances: Martin Rose, Patrick Mizell, Deborah Milner, Quentin Smith. (Court Reporter: K. Miller) (ghassan, 4)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:15-cv-791 and Member Case No. 4:14-cv-1258. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER on Schedule. By 6/26/2015, the parties must give the court a revised list of the people they propose to depose. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
June 2, 2015 Filing 59 STATEMENT Ameneded Handwritten Staement of Zachary Adams by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Quentin)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Substituting Counsel terminating #55 . Martin E. Rose, Christopher M. McDowell, and Bryan P. Rose are substituted as counsel for Amerijet. Jad J. Stepp and Andrew Robbins are withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 29, 2015 Filing 58 STATEMENT of Zachary Adams by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Mizell, Patrick)
May 29, 2015 Filing 57 ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Carlo Postell)(Rose, Martin)
May 28, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin E. Rose; Christopher M. McDowell; Bryan P. Rose on behalf of Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Rose, Martin)
May 22, 2015 Filing 55 MOTION for Jad J Stepp to Withdraw as Attorney( Motion Docket Date 6/12/2015.), MOTION to Substitute Attorney Martin E. Rose in place of Jad J. Stepp by Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stepp, Jad)
May 22, 2015 Filing 54 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #53 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
May 21, 2015 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing held on 4/22/2015 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber K. Metzger. Ordering Party Jad J. Stepp Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2015, filed. (kmetzger)
May 11, 2015 Filing 52 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Benjamine Reid as to Zero Gravity Corporation re: #48 Order,, filed. (hler, 4)
April 27, 2015 Filing 51 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Benjamine Reid as to Zero Gravity Corporation re: #38 Order Setting Hearing, filed. (srussell, 2)
April 27, 2015 Filing 50 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #40 Order Resetting Hearing, filed. (mxperez, 5)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER on Schedule. By 5/1/2015, Zero Gravity must give Amerijet the information ordered. By 5/1/2015, the parties must exchange one-page, itemized calculations of their damages and send a copy to the court's case manager. By 5/1/2015, Amerijet must give Zero Gravity the information ordered. Zero Gravity may depose Carlo Postell, Sam Sadek, and Nina Duncan. Amerijet may depose Dexter Franklin and Scott Stambaugh. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 22, 2015 Filing 47 Minute Entry for HEARING held before Judge Lynn N. Hughes on 4/22/2015. Order to be entered. Appearances: Jad Stepp, Andrew Robbins, Patrick Mizell, Deborah Milner, Quentin Smith. (Court Reporter: K. Metzger) (ghassan, 4)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Resetting Hearing. Hearing reset for 4/22/2015 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 17, 2015 Filing 45 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Herb Stettin re: #38 Order Setting Hearing. (yhausmann, 6)
April 17, 2015 Filing 44 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Benjamine Reid as to Zero Gravity Corporation re: #36 Notice in a Removed or Transferred Case, filed. (vrios, 2)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Resetting Hearing. Hearing reset for 4/22/2015 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 2, 2015 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Hearing scheduled for April 6, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. by Amerijet International Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stepp, Jad)
April 2, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jad J. Stepp and Andrew Robbins on behalf of Amerijet International Inc, filed. (Stepp, Jad)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Resetting Hearing. Hearing reset for 4/6/2015 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 30, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Quentin L. Smith on behalf of Zero Gravity Corporation, filed. (Smith, Quentin)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order: Hearing set for 4/7/2015 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 27, 2015 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Amerijet International Inc by Zero Gravity Corporation, filed.(Milner, Deborah)
March 26, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(smurdock, 4)
March 26, 2015 Filing 35 Case transferred in from Florida Southern. Case Number 0:14-cv-61714; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
March 26, 2015 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case per #34 Order. (yha) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS denying #5 Motion to Dismiss; denying #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #5 Motion to Change Venue; denying #15 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #21 Motion to Strike ; denying #21 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 3/26/2015. (yha)
March 10, 2015 Filing 33 Notice of Mediation Hearing before Mediator, Herbert Stettin filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. Mediation Hearing set for 7/28/2015 10:00 AM (McLachlan, Niall)
November 26, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Hon. Herb Stettin selected.(Canny, Joan)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order on Trial Instructions. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 11/5/2014. (bc)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 11/5/2014. (bc)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Pre-Trial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2015 at 9:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William J. Zloch. Pretrial Stipulation due by Noon, 10/23/2015. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 11/5/2014. (bc)
November 4, 2014 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amerijet International, Inc. (Canny, Joan)
November 4, 2014 Filing 27 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Amerijet International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order deadlines)(Canny, Joan)
October 27, 2014 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Strike #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Continue filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (McLachlan, Niall)
October 19, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE by Amerijet International, Inc. re #21 MOTION to Strike #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Continue of filing of Amended and Corrected Opposition to motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended & corrected Opposition with exhibit 1) (Canny, Joan)
October 17, 2014 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Strike #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Continue filed by Amerijet International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amerijet initial brief in 5th Circuit)(Canny, Joan)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of Instructions. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 10/10/2014. (bc)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 , #7 and #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Deborah C. Milner, Quentin Smith and Patrick W. Mizell are permitted to appear on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 10/3/2014. (bc)
September 30, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Continue by Zero Gravity Corporation. Responses due by 10/17/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Henke)(McLachlan, Niall)
September 26, 2014 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zero Gravity Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Space Adventures, Ltd. for Zero Gravity Corporation (McLachlan, Niall)
September 24, 2014 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Carlo Postell. re #16 Statement, Exhibit C to Statement of Undisputed Facts by Amerijet International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att 1 - hand delivered parts list, #2 Exhibit Att 2 - ILS prices spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit Att 3 - Pro rated labor charge, #4 Exhibit Att 4 - expense report, #5 Exhibit Att 5 - FAA submission and approval, #6 Exhibit Att 6 - Proprietary legends electronic, #7 Exhibit Att 7 - proprietary legends on aircraft, #8 Exhibit Att 8 - parabolic op specs approval, #9 Exhibit Att 9 - Capex request, #10 Exhibit Att 10 - Benisch excerpt, #11 Exhibit Att 11 - Capex receipts, #12 Exhibit Att 12 - FAA approval announcement)(Canny, Joan)
September 24, 2014 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Juana Villa. re #16 Statement, Exhibit B to Statement of Undisputed Facts by Amerijet International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att 1 - 30-day notice, #2 Exhibit Att 2 - civil theft notice, #3 Exhibit Att 3 - June 25 contested charges, #4 Exhibit Att 4 - April 28 invoice, #5 Exhibit Att 5 - engine lease extension, #6 Exhibit Att 6 - May 20 parts support, #7 Exhibit Att 7 - items belonging to Amerijet, #8 Exhibit Att 8 - July 8 revised invoices, #9 Exhibit Att 9 - mediation invitatin, #10 Exhibit Att 10 - July 8 receipt, #11 Exhibit Att 11 - May 30 receipt, #12 Exhibit Att 12 - return of manuals request, #13 Exhibit Att 13 - parts return refusal, #14 Exhibit Att 14 part 1 - May 30 invoices, #15 Exhibit Att 14 part 2 - May 30 invoices, #16 Exhibit Att 4 part 3 - May 30 invoices, #17 Exhibit Att 4 part 4 - May 30 invoices, #18 Exhibit Att 15 - May 6 remove engines)(Canny, Joan)
September 24, 2014 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Todd Vitko. re #16 Statement, Exhibit A to Statement of Undisputed Facts by Amerijet International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att 1 parabolic agreement part 1, #2 Exhibit Att 1 parabolic agreement part 2, #3 Exhibit Att 2 airframe lease, #4 Exhibit Att 3 management agreement, #5 Exhibit Att 4 engine lease part 1, #6 Exhibit Att 4 engine lease part 2, #7 Exhibit Att 5 option notice, #8 Exhibit Att 6 aircraft Bill of Sale)(Canny, Joan)
September 24, 2014 Filing 16 Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts by Amerijet International, Inc. re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Ex D - 8-6-14 transcript excerpt, #2 Affidavit Ex E -D'Arch declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex F - NASA SOW excerpt, #4 Exhibit Ex G - Zero-G website excerpt, #5 Exhibit Ex H - post-mediation correspondenc)(Canny, Joan)
September 24, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Amerijet International, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2014 (Canny, Joan)
September 22, 2014 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 13 MOTION to Change Venue. Correction Motion docketed in error. (cbr)
September 18, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 13 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cbr)
September 18, 2014 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Change Venue (Amended) filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (McLachlan, Niall)
September 18, 2014 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Change Venue filed by Zero Gravity Corporation. (McLachlan, Niall)
September 18, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niall Torrence McLachlan on behalf of Zero Gravity Corporation. Attorney Niall Torrence McLachlan added to party Zero Gravity Corporation(pty:dft). (McLachlan, Niall)
September 9, 2014 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Change Venue filed by Amerijet International, Inc.. (Canny, Joan)
August 29, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick W. Mizell, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 85718. (ksa)
August 29, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Quentin Smith, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 85719. (ksa)
August 29, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Deborah C. Milner, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 85728. (ksa)
August 20, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 9/8/2014), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 9/8/2014), MOTION to Change Venue by Zero Gravity Corporation. Attorney Benjamine Reid added to party Zero Gravity Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Petition (Texas), #2 Exhibit Responsive Pleading (Texas), #3 Exhibit Motion to Stay (Texas), #4 Exhibit 5/12/14 Transcript (Texas), #5 Exhibit 6/27/14 Transcript (Texas), #6 Exhibit 7/28/14 Transcript (Texas), #7 Exhibit 6/4/14 Order (Texas), #8 Exhibit 5/23/14 Statement (Texas), #9 Exhibit 7/10/14 Status Report (Texas), #10 Exhibit 7/15/14 Status Report (Texas), #11 Exhibit 8/6/14 Order (Texas), #12 Exhibit 8/6/14 Case Management Order (Texas), #13 Exhibit 7/29/14 Order to Show Cause (Texas), #14 Exhibit 6/18/14 Filing (Texas), #15 Exhibit 6/27/14 Management Order (Texas), #16 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick W. Mizell)(Reid, Benjamine)
July 30, 2014 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued to Zero Gravity Corporation Acknowledgment filed by Amerijet International, Inc.. (Canny, Joan)
July 29, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Zero Gravity Corporation. (vjk)
July 28, 2014 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge William J. Zloch (vjk)
July 28, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zero Gravity Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6945173, filed by Amerijet International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Summon(s) summons)(Canny, Joan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerijet International, Inc. v. Zero Gravity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amerijet International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amerijet International Inc
Represented By: Joan Marie Canny
Represented By: Martin E Rose
Represented By: Jad J Stepp
Represented By: Christopher M McDowell
Represented By: Faith E. Eaton
Represented By: Bryan P Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zero Gravity Corporation
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: Benjamine Reid
Represented By: Deborah Carleton Milner
Represented By: Quentin L Smith
Represented By: Niall Torrence McLachlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?