Self, Jr. v. Quinn's Rental Services (USA), LLC
Plaintiff: Gary Self, Jr.
Defendant: Quinn's Rental Services (USA), LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv01569
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: De Witt
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Case is dismissed with prejudice.. Case terminated on 2/24/17.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER entered GRANTING 62 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER entered: Mr. Self must file a supplemental brief addressing solely this issue by November 4, 2016. Quinn's Rental Services may respond by November 11, 2016. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self, Jr. v. Quinn's Rental Services (USA), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Self, Jr.
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn's Rental Services (USA), LLC
Represented By: Randall L Rouse
Represented By: William R Sudela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?